USA v. Alcott
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-10286-PBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack W. Pirozzolo +1 617 748 3189 +1 617 748 3960 jack.pirozzolo@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Boston
Filed 9/16/2004
County Norfolk
Terminated 3/31/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 BANK FRAUD
Count 2-3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 False Statements
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344 BANK FRAUD
Count 2s-3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 False Statements
Count 4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1952-7400.F
Offense Level 4
181952 - Travel Act
Def Custody Status Released
Flags APPEAL, VICTIM
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Docket Sheet sent
Docket sheet sent to Michael Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Letter (non-motion)
    Letter to Robert Alba regarding status of case from Michael W. Alcott (Patch, Christine)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Objection (unrelated to a motion)
      Objection as to Michael W. Alcott: [91] Response to Motion, filed by USA. (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered as to Michael W. Alcott..."The Court hereby vacates its February 27, 2008 endorsed order regarding Mr. Alcott's Letter to the Court (Doc.#90)." (Patch, Christine)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Mail Returned
          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Alcott. Re-sent to current address. (Patch, Christine)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Letter (non-motion)
            Letter to Christine Patch regarding his 2255 motion, from Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Copies of electronic orders)(Patch, Christine)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Letter (non-motion)
              Letter requesting copies of all documents filed pertaining to his 2255 Motion from Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Service Order)(Patch, Christine)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Michael W. Alcott re [85] MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Attachments: # (1) Agreement, # (2) 7/20/05 Transcript of Plea, # (3) 3/3/06 Transcript of Sentencing Hrg (Pages 1-33), # (4) 3/3/06 Transcript of Sentencing Hrg. (Pages 34-66), # (5) 2/9/07 Judgment From the U.S. Court of Appeal For The First Circuit, # (6) Affidavit of FBI Special Agent Scott Robbins)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of change of address or firm
                  NOTICE of change of address for Michael Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Letter (non-motion)Court Filing
                    Letter to Judge Saris regarding undelivered motions, from Michael W. Alcott (Patch, Christine)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                      Judge Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT as to Michael W. Alcott re [90] Letter (non-motion). "The Court has not received any motions. The government informed the Court that it has received copies of the motion. However, no motion has been filed on the docket." (Patch, Christine)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                        Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered granting [89] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [85] Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, [88], as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to March 7, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to [85] MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, [88] Order, as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials
                            Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered re [87] Motion for Release of Brady Materials as to Michael W. Alcott (1). "The government shall inform the Court whether it has ever seen this e-mail." (Patch, Christine)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                              Judge Patti B. Saris: SERVICE ORDER entered re [85] MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Michael W. Alcott. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2255 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 20 days of receipt of this order. (Patch, Christine)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Motion for Release of Brady Materials
                                MOTION for Release of Brady Materials as to Michael W. Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Memorandum in Support
                                  Brief in Support by Michael W. Alcott re [85] MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Patch, Christine)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                    MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 as to Michael W. Alcott. (Patch, Christine)Civil case 1:08-cv-10198 opened.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time for 90 days to File 2255 Petition as to Michael W. Alcott. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Appeals Judgment# (2) Exhibit Letter to Kevin Barron)(Patch, Christine)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [84] Motion for Extension of Time to File 2255 Petition as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 USCA Mandate
                                          MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Michael W. Alcott re [63] Notice of Appeal. The government's motion for summary disposition is ALLOWED, and the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (Mandate issued in the USCA 3/2/2007). (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                                            Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcott re [63] Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 81 & electronic order (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [81] Motion to Make Documents Part of Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007, Terminated: 1/11/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Assented to MOTION To Make Documents Part of Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Attachments: # (1) A - Motion for Modification of Release Conditions# (2) B - 4/28/05 Transcript)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: document No. 71 corrected because: is a duplicate of document No. 72 as to Michael W. Alcott (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Order on Motion to Unseal Document
                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [80] Motion to Unseal Document [23] Sealed MOTION by Peter J. Muse., [18] Sealed MOTION as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006, Terminated: 12/11/2006 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                      MOTION to Unseal Document (for Inclusion in Record Appendix) as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                                                        Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcott re [63] Notice of Appeal,, [64] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, Documents included: 78 (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Plea as to Michael W. Alcott held on July 20, 2005 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Nancy L. Eaton. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/633-5178 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                            Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Sentencing Transcript docket entry #74 was corrected because: Date of Sentencing was incorrect. as to Michael W. Alcott (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Letter (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                              Letter from Judge Saris regarding transfer to a high security prison as to Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter to Rebecca Tamez# (2) Exhibit Letter to Judge Saris)(Patch, Christine)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 Supplemental Record Sent USCA
                                                                Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcott re [63] Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 73-74 (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on March 30, 2006 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli 617/345-6787. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 11/29/2006 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing Status Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on December 20, 2005 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli 617/345-6787. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 7/13/2006 Letter (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                      Letter to Judge Saris from Rebecca Tamez as to Michael W. Alcott regarding the recommendations to the Residential Drug Abuse Program (Patch, Christine)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 USCA Mandate
                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to Michael W. Alcott re [64] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appellant having failed to file a timely response, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned appeal be dismissed in accordance with Local Rule 3(b). Defendant's appeal shall proceed under No. 06-1756. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 USCA Judgment
                                                                          JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to Michael W. Alcott re [64] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appellant having failed to file a timely response, it is hereby ordered that the above-captioned appeal be dismissed in accordance with Local Rule 3(b). Defendant's appeal shall proceed under No. 06-1756. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006 Transcript Order Acknowledgment Form received from
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT FORM received from USCA and addressed to Lee A. Marzilli as to Michael W. Alcott' Transcript order form filed in USCA on April 26, 2006. Sentencings on 12/20/05 and 3/30/06. Transcripts due by 7/31/2006. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                              USCA Case Number as to Michael W. Alcott 06-1757 for [64] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Michael W. Alcott,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 USCA Case Number
                                                                                USCA Case Number as to Michael W. Alcott 06-1756 for [63] Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael W. Alcott,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                  Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal as to Michael W. Alcott to US Court of Appeals re [63] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Michael W. Alcott (1), Count(s) 1, Dimissed on government motion.; Count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, ORIGINAL: Defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 92 months. The last 6 months are to be served as a consecutive sentence. The court makes a recommendation to a FCI in Minnesota and a recommendation to a 500 hour alcohol program. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 60 months with conditions: Alcohol Anonymoun counseling, mental health counseling, sexual abuse counseling, and standard financial conditions. The $400.00 Special Assessment is due immediately. The $2,032,345.60 Restitution is to be paid in accordance with a payment plan established by US Probation. AMENDED: The court makes a recommendation to FMC Rochester, Minnesota and to a 500 hour alcohol program.; Count(s) 2-3, Dismissed on government motion.; Count(s) 4s, ORIGINAL: Defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 92 months. The last 6 months are to be served as a consecutive sentence. The court makes a recommendation to a FCI in Minnesota and a recommendation to a 500 hour alcohol program. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 60 months with conditions: Alcohol Anonymoun counseling, mental health counseling, sexual abuse counseling, and standard financial conditions. The $400.00 Special Assessment is due immediately. The $2,032,345.60 Restitution is to be paid in accordance with a payment plan established by US Probation. AMENDED: The Court makes a recommendation to FMC Rochester, Minnesota and to a 500 hour alcohol program. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                      Letter (non-motion) regarding Designation FMC Rochester as to Michael W. Alcott (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Letter (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                        Letter to Judge Saris regarding a recommendation to FMC - Rochester (MN) as to Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Judgment)(Patch, Christine)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael W. Alcott re [62] Judgment. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/26/2006. Please note: this is a duplicate of Document No. 63. (Patch, Christine) Modified on 5/8/2006 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael W. Alcott re [62] Judgment,,,. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 4/26/2006. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Michael W. Alcott (1), Count(s) 1, Dimissed on government motion.; Count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s, Defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of 92 months. The last 6 months are to be served as a consecutive sentence. The court makes a recommendation to a FCI in Minnesota and a recommendation to a 500 hour alcohol program. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Upon release from imprisonment, defendant shall be on supervised release for a term of 60 months with conditions: Alcohol Anonymoun counseling, mental health counseling, sexual abuse counseling, and standard financial conditions. The $400.00 Special Assessment is due immediately. The $2,032,345.60 Restitution is to be paid in accordance with a payment plan established by US Probation.; Count(s) 2-3, Dismissed on government motion. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of SA Scott Robbins by USA as to Michael W. Alcott [56] MOTION to Seal Exhibits A Through M of SA Scott Robbins Affidavit filed by USA,, [59] Affidavit filed by USA,, Order on Motion to Seal, (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15))(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Sentencing
                                                                                                  ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris:Sentencing held on 3/30/2006 for Michael W. Alcott (1), Count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s. Court sentences defendant to 92 months imprisonment, 60 months supervised release w/conditions, $2,032,345.60 Restitution, $400 special assessment. Defendant informed of right of appeal. (Court Reporter Lee Marzilli.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                    Letter (non-motion) regarding Sentencing as to Michael W. Alcott (submitted by Daughter and Newphew of Defendant) (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of SA Scott Robbins (Corrected) by USA as to Michael W. Alcott (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                        OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Michael W. Alcott (Address Correction) (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Michael W. Alcott re [56] MOTION to Seal Exhibits A Through M of SA Scott Robbins Affidavit (Barron, Kevin) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2006 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2006 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Exhibits A Through M of SA Scott Robbins Affidavit as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Affidavit
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Scott A. Robbins by USA as to Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A Through M - Filed Under Seal)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered denying [56] Motion to Seal Exhibits A through M of the Affidavit of Scott Robbins as to Michael W. Alcott (1). "However, the government may delete the children's names and other confidential information like Social Security numbers." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SENTENCING as to Michael W. Alcott. At the request of counsel, the Sentencing previously rescheduled to March 28, 2006, has been rescheduled to March 30, 2006, at 9:00 a.m. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SENTENCING as to Michael W. Alcott. The Sentencing previously scheduled for March 23, 2006, has been rescheduled to March 28, 2006, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Certain "Victim" Evidence as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006 Amended Document - NOT Motion
                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT Amendment to [50] Sentencing Memorandum, Exhibit G, Omitted Letters, as to Michael W. Alcott: (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Michael W. Alcott (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) # (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) # (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhibit S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Supplement TABLE OF CONTENTS)(Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            MOTION Upward Departure re [48] Sentencing Memorandum as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Michael W. Alcott (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered granting [47] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Michael W. Alcott. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006, Terminated: 3/16/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered re [46] Motion to Continue and to Enlarge Time as to Michael W. Alcott (1). "The parties can file sentencing memoranda on 3/16, but the sentencing shall remain on 3/23/06 at 2:00 PM." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/9/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Continue to 03/16/2006 to file memoranda as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Sentencing
                                                                                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for sentencing/status held on 12/20/05 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Court and counsel discuss sentencing issues. Defense expert report due in 60 days. Briefing by both counsel due in 60 days. Evidentiary Sentencing set for 3/23/2006 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Court Reporter Lee Marzilli.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT as to Michael W. Alcott re [45] Letter to Judge Saris. "I will treat 12/20 as a status and address non-evidentiary matters." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                            Letter (non-motion) regarding Defendant's Request for Status Conference as to Michael W. Alcott (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/07/2005 to File Object to PSR as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered allowing [44] MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/07/2005 to File Object to PSR as to Michael W. Alcott. "Allowed." (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Order on Motion for Interim Compensation
                                                                                                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered regarding [43] MOTION for Interim Compensation as to Michael W. Alcott. "I will allow one interim voucher, but not quarterly vouchers." (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered denying [42] MOTION to Continue to 2/13/2006 to sentencing hearing as to Michael W. Alcott. "Denied. We will begin the sentencing hearing on 12/20. If the psychiatrist is unable to prepare a timely report, I will schedule a second sentencing date to complete the hearing." (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Interim Compensation
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Interim Compensation as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue to 2/13/2006 to sentencing hearing as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Order on Motion for Investigative Funds
                                                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Ex Parte Motion as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Motion for Investigative Funds
                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION as to Michael W. Alcott, filed under seal. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris : ElectronicORDER entered granting [40] Motion to Seal as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 11/9/2005 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Pursuant to LR 7.2 (Impoundment) as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SENTENCING as to Michael W. Alcott. At the request of U.S. Probation, the Sentencing previously scheduled for November 22, 2005, has been rescheduled to December 20, 2005, at 3:00 p.m. In Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Patti B. Saris: ElectronicORDER entered allowing [38] MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott. "ALLOWED. THE SENTENCING IS CONTINUED TO NOVEMBER 22, 2005, AT 2:00 P.M."(Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                      Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Michael W. Alcott: 10/21/05 sentencing to be rescheduled. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005, Terminated: 9/26/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing to 11/21/2005 as to Michael W. Alcott. (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Medical Treatment
                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Sealed Motion as to Michael W. Alcott (1). "Allowed without opposition." (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005, Terminated: 9/6/2005 Motion for Medical Treatment
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed MOTIONas to Michael W. Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Michael W. Alcott (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Michael W. Alcott (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Procedural Order re sentencing hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Michael W. Alcott Sentencing set for 10/21/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris :Arraignment as to Michael W. Alcott (1) Count 1s,2s-3s,4s held on 7/20/2005, Plea entered by Michael W. Alcott (1) Guilty Count 1s,2s-3s,4s. Sentencing set for 10/21/2005 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Court Reporter Nancy Eaton.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Information - Felony
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Michael W. Alcott (1) count(s) 1s, 2s-3s, 4s. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on April 28, 2005 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Niles Jon Fowlkes. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/469-0756 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on May 9, 2005 before Judge Saris. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-2346 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [30] Ex Parte Motion as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Michael W. Alcott Time excluded from April 28, 2005 until July 20, 2005. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Order on Motion to Exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [28] Motion to Exclude as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION as to Michael W. Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005, Terminated: 6/15/2005 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Excludable Delay from April 28, 2005 to July 20, 2005 as to Michael W. Alcottby Michael W. Alcott, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Order Granting Excludable Delay)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005 Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris:Pretrial Conference as to Michael W. Alcott held on 6/10/2005. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/20/2005 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2005 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Court Reporter Nancy Eaton.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Notice of ReschedulingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE as to Michael W. Alcott. At the request of counsel, the Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for June 1, 2005, has been rescheduled to June 10, 2005, at 3:45 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Terminate Hearings as to Michael W. Alcott: 6/1/05 pretrial conference. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Michael W. Alcott. The Revocation Hearing previously scheduled for May 16, 2005, has been rescheduled to a Pretrial Conference on June 1, 2005, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Waiver of Rule 32.1 Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER of Rule 32.1 Hearings by Michael W. Alcott (Barron, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attorney update in case as to Michael W. Alcott. Attorney Kevin L. Barron for Michael W. Alcott added. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Terminate 5/16/05 Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott. Proceding to be rescheduled. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005, Terminated: 5/9/2005 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Record as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Attorney Assignment RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY ASSIGNMENT Request as to Michael W. Alcott forwarded to Clerk to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Order on Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris: Electronic ORDER entered granting [22] Motion to Unseal Record as to Michael W. Alcott. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Attorney update in case as to Michael W. Alcott. Attorney Peter J. Muse terminated. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Patti B. Saris : Electronic ORDER entered granting [23] Sealed Motion as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris:Motion Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on 5/9/2005 re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Court allows Motion to Withdraw filed by Attorney Peter Muse. Defendant informs Court that he will need appointed counsel. Court orders CJA counsel be appointed. Court sets Revocation Hearing for 5/16/2005 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Court Reporter Valerie O'Hara.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed MOTION as to Michael W. Alcott. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Letter (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter as to Michael W. Alcott (Patch, Christine) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2005 (Patch, Christine). Modified on 5/9/2005 (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed MOTION as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Change of Plea Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Patti B. Saris:Change of Plea Hearing as to Michael W. Alcott held on 4/28/2005. Defendant informs the Court that he does not wish to plea at the present time. Court modifies defendant's conditions of pretrial release as set forth on the record. Change of Plea Hearing rescheduled to 5/24/2005 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Court Reporter Niles Fowlkes.) (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Order on Motion to ExcludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered granting [16] Motion to Exclude as to Michael W. Alcott (1) (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2005 Motion for Excludable Delay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Excludable Delay from 3/28/05 to 4/28/05 as to Michael W. Alcottby USA. (Attachments: # (1) Tab A - Order)(Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED RULE 11 HEARING as to Michael W. Alcott. The Rule11 Hearing previously scheduled for April 11, 2005, has been rescheduled to April 28, 2005, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Terminate Hearings as to Michael W. Alcott: Rule 11 Hearing. (Alba, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael W. Alcott Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/11/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Michael W. Alcott. Time excluded from 3/8/05 until 3/28/05. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. FINAL STATUS REPORT as to Michael W. Alcott. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA as to Michael W. Alcott (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Judith G. Dein : ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Michael W. Alcott Time excluded from 1/7/05 until 3/8/05. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Judith G. Dein : ElectronicORDER entered. STATUS REPORT as to Michael W. Alcott Status Conference set for 3/8/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein :Status Conference as to Michael W. Alcott held on 1/7/2005; AUSA Pirozzolo and Attorney Muse report case status and request further conference for 3/8/05 @ 10:00 am. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Concerning Local Rule 116.5(A) by Michael W. Alcott, USA as to Michael W. Alcott (Pirozzolo, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Michael W. Alcott Time excluded from 12/6/04 until 1/7/05. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Status Report by Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered STATUS REPORT as to Michael W. Alcott Status Conference set for 1/7/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein :Status Conference as to Michael W. Alcott held on 12/6/2004; AUSA Pirozzolo and Attorny Muse report current case status and request further conference for 1/7/05 @ 10:00am. (Court Reporter D.R.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Defendant promises to appear at all proceedings as required and to surrender for service of any sentence imposed. Defendant shall report to Pretrial Services as directed; shall surrender any passport to Pretrial Services; shall refrain from possessing a firearm, destructive device, or other dangerous weapons; shall refrain from excessive use of alcohol; shall refrain from use or unlawful possession of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance...unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner; shall report as soon as possible, to the pretrial services office or an supervising officer any contact with any law enforcement personnel, including, but not limited to, any arrest, questioning, or traffic stop; shall notify Pretrial Services of any financial transaction which exceeds $10,500. Travel is restricted to continental United States. Defendant is ordered released after processing. (Patch, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Order on Excludable DelayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Michael W. Alcott. Time excluded from 10/14/04 until 12/6/04. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Michael W. Alcott. Status Conference set for 12/6/2004 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein :Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Michael W. Alcott (1) Count 1,2-3 held on 10/14/2004,; AUSA Pirozzolo and Attorney Muse for the dft.; USMJ Dein informs the dft. of his rights and charges; Dft. pleads not guilty, will proceed with automatic discovery and seeks to have 1st status conference for December 6,2004 @ 2:30pm.; Dft. is released on personal recognizance with conditions. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Michael W. Alcott. Attorney Peter J. Muse for Michael W. Alcott added. Attorney Robert M Goldstein terminated. (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Reason for referral: pretrial proceedings as to Michael W. Alcott (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT as to Michael W. Alcott (1) count(s) 1, 2-3. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,613 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?