Ronald Eugene Stover- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Oregon Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-03265
District Judge Randall L. Dunn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 6:44 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "US Trustee"

Represented by Law Offices of M VIVIENNE POPPERL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY M VIVIENNE POPPERL +1 503 326 7656
v.
No Logo Ronald Eugene Stover, Defendant

Represented by Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerrit Michael Pronske +1 214 658 6500 +1 214 658 6509
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2015, Entered: None
Certificate of Notice Re: 10 Initial Scheduling Order. Further Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 6/9/2015 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing.. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
    Certificate of Notice Re: 9 Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (gjd). (Admin.) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
      Initial Scheduling Order. Further Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 6/9/2015 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (Entered: 01/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
        Order Re: Application of FRCP 26 (gjd) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
          Hearing Held. Re:1 Complaint. Court to prepare scheduling order. (gjd) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
            Answer to Complaint Filed by Ronald Eugene Stover (PRONSKE, GERRIT) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
              Special Notice Request Filed By Creditor Barbara A Bruno. (Bruno, Barbara) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                Special Notice Request Filed By Interested Party James Ray Streinz (STREINZ, JAMES) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                  Summons Served on Ronald Eugene Stover 11/19/2014 (^US Trustee8, Portland) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                    Summons Issued for service on Ronald Eugene Stover Date Issued 11/19/2014, Answer Due 12/19/2014 1 Complaint Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 01/06/2015 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. (dtl) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                      Special Notice Request Filed By Interested Party Peter C McKittrick (LEONARD, JUSTIN) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                        Adversary case 14-03265. Complaint by US Trustee against Ronald Eugene Stover Fee Exempt Nature of Suit:(41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)))(US Trustee, Portland) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 1,379 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?