LaSalle, et al v. Medco Research Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-05381
District Judge George M. Marovich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 11:51 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Totah, Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony LaSalle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aram A. Hartunian & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aram A. Hartunian +1 312 427 3600
v.
No Logo Archie W Prestayko, Defendant
No Logo Donald B Siegel, Defendant
No Logo John R Boettiger, Defendant
No Logo Kemper Securities Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ulmer & Berne, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Robert Sonderby +1 312 324 8000 +1 312 658 6513 psonderby@ulmer.com
No Logo Medco Research, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondy & Schloss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/20/1995 Joseph B. Pritti
TERMINATED: 09/20/1995, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph S. Rosenthal
TERMINATED: 09/20/1995 Joan A Zooper

Toggle Switch Represented by Hofheimer Gartlir & Gross, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Lawrence Birch +1 212 897 7896 +1 212 897 4996 dbirch@hgg.com
Space Douglas Alan Gross , +1 212 897 7895 +1 212 897 4980 dgross@hgg.com
Space Scott R. Kipnis +1 212 897 7898 +1 212 897 4999 skipnis@hgg.com
Space Richard Gordon Klein +1 212 897 7883
Space Y. Jeffrey Rotblat

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Daly +1 312 782 3939 +1 312 782 8585 jrdaly@jonesday.com
Space Robert C. Micheletto +1 212 326 3690 +1 212 755 7306 rmicheletto@jonesday.com
Space John J. Reidy, III +1 312 782 3939

Toggle Switch Represented by Krislov & Associates, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clinton A. Krislov +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207 clint@krislovlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea and Larocque

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Nachsin +1 847 501 1191 jnachsin@gmail.com
No Logo Sanford J Hillsberg, Defendant
No Logo Vector Securities International, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (141) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY of judgment-with oral argument from the 7th Circuit, dated 05/15/97: The judgment of the District Court is affirmed, with costs, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. Regarding appeal no. [134-1] (USCA Case Nos. 96-2344 and 96-2345) (ar) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
    OPINION from the 7th Circuit: Argued 02/20/97; Decided 05/15/97. (USCA Case nos. 96-2344 and 96-2345) (ar) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: None
      CERTIFIED copy of Order from the 7th Circuit. ( 996-2344 & 96-2345) (yap) (Entered: 06/24/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: None
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 7/27/95 before Honorable George M. Marovich (1 vol) (rmm) (Entered: 10/16/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/4/1996, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal USCA 96-2345 (Attachments). (tlm) (Entered: 06/04/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: None
            RECEIPT #474698 for payment in the amount of $105.00 for plaintiffs' notice of appeal filed by attorney Aram A. Hartunian. (fce) (Entered: 05/31/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: None
              LETTER regarding docketing statement acknowledged by plaintiffs. (fce) (Entered: 05/30/1996)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/29/1996, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiffs from judgment entered [132-1], from motion minute order [131-2] and from order [130-1] (NO FEE PAID) (fce) (Entered: 05/30/1996)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: None
                  MINUTE ORDER of 5/24/96 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Status hearing set for 5/24/96 is stricken. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been resolved, this case is returned to the assigned judge. Termiante case referral of 11/1/95. terminating case referral to Hon. Joan B. Gottschall Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 05/28/1996)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: None
                    ENTERED JUDGMENT (rmm) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: None
                      MINUTE ORDER of 5/9/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Defendants motions for summary judgment [107-1], [108-1], [109-1] are granted as to Counts I and II. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Count III and dismisses that claim without prejudice. terminating case Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER (rmm) (Entered: 05/10/1996)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                          REPLY by the Medco defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg to plaintiffs' 12(N) statement [121-1], [123-1] (Attachments); Notice of filing. (rmm) (Entered: 04/24/1996)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                            REPLY by joinder defendant Vector Sec Intl Inc in defendant Medco Research Inc's memorandum in support of its motion for summary judgment [107-1]; Notice of filing (rmm) (Entered: 04/24/1996)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                              MEDCO REPLY brief by joinder of defendants John R Boettiger, Kemper Sec Grp Inc in support of motion for summary judgment [108-1]; Notice of filing and proof of service (rmm) (Entered: 04/24/1996)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/22/1996, Entered: None
                                REPLY brief by Medco defendants' Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg in supply of their motion for summary judgment [109-1] (rmm) (Entered: 04/24/1996)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE ORDER of 4/16/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Defendants' motion for extension of time to file reply briefs to 4/22/96 in support of the motion for summary judgment [124-1] is granted. Telephoned notice (rmm) (Entered: 04/17/1996)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: None
                                    AGREED MOTION by defendants for extension of time to file brief in support of the motion for summary judgment ; Notice of motion (rmm) (Entered: 04/17/1996)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None
                                      STATEMENT pursuant to local Rule 12(N) in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment (Part B) by plaintiffs (Attachments) (rmm) (Entered: 04/03/1996)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: None
                                        MINUTE ORDER of 4/2/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages [119-1] is granted. No notice (rmm) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None
                                          STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 12(N) in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment (Part A) by plaintiffs (Exhibits) (rmm) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM of law by plaintiffs in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [107-1], [108-1], [109-1] (rmm) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by plaintiff for leave to file a brief in excess of fifteen pages ; Notice of filing. (rmm) (Entered: 04/02/1996)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: None
                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 1/17/96 before Honorable George M. Marovich (rmm) (Entered: 03/29/1996)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 3/7/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment [116-1]. Time is extended to 4/1/96. Defendants' reply is to be filed by 4/15/96 to motion for summary judgment [107-1], [108-1] [109-1]. Plaintiffs voluntarily withdraw motion for class certification [73-1] pending resolution of the summary judgment motion. Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 03/08/1996)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs for an extension of time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment ; Notice of motion. (rmm) (Entered: 03/08/1996)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: None
                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 2/28/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Defendants, Kemper Securities Group, John R. Boettiger, and Vector Securities International join in defendant Medco Research Inc.'s motion for summary judgment. No notice (rmm) (Entered: 02/29/1996)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: None
                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 2/21/96 by Hon. Harry D. Leinenweber : Defendants' agreed motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of fifteen pages, instanter [110-1], granted. Mailed notice (ar) (Entered: 02/27/1996)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                          APPENDIX filed (2 vols: 113-1, 113-2) (rmm) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                            STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 12(M) in support of their motion for summary judgment by the Medco defendants, Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg (rmm) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM by Medco defendants, Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg in support of the motion for summary judgment [109-1] (Attachments) (rmm) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                AGREED MOTION by Medco defendants, Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg for leave to file memorandum in excess of fifteen pages, instanter (rmm) (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION by Medco defendants, Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg for summary judgment ; Notice of filing. (rmm) Modified on 03/01/1996 (Entered: 02/22/1996)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                    JOINDER MOTION of defendants John R Boettiger, Kemper Sec Grp Inc in Medco motion for summary judgment ; Notice of filing and proof of service. (rmm) (Entered: 02/21/1996)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: None
                                                                      JOINDER MOTION of Vector Sec Intl Inc in defendant Medco Research Inc.'s motion for summary judgment ; Notice of filing. (rmm) Modified on 03/01/1996 (Entered: 02/21/1996)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: None
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 10/31/95 before Honorable George M. Marovich (1 vol) (rmm) (Entered: 02/07/1996)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/17/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Status hearing held. Defendants are to file their motion for summary judgment by 2/20/96. Plaintiffs' answer to the motion is to be filed by 03/12/96, and defendants' reply is to be filed by 03/26/96. Court will rule by mail. No notice (fce) (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                            RULE 39 Affidavit of John J. Reidy III (fce) Modified on 06/12/1996 (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of Robert C Micheletto (fce) Modified on 06/12/1996 (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                RULE 39 Affidavit of James R. Daly (fce) Modified on 06/12/1996 (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Medco research Inc. Archie W. Prestayko, Donald B. Siegel, Sanford J. Hillsberg by James R. Daly, Robert c. Micheletto, John J. Reidy III (fce) Modified on 06/12/1996 (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 1/17/96 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting defendants' motion for leave to file the appearance of additional attorneys [99-1] No notice (fce) (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg for leave to file the appearance of additional attorneys ; Notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 01/18/1996)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by plaintiffs of entry of appearance of Stephan H. Goldstein (rmm) (Entered: 01/17/1996)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/15/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 12/15/95 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Status hearing held; continued to 10:00 2/14/96. No notice (rmm) (Entered: 12/18/1995)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER with affirmative defenses by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg; Notice of filing (rmm) Modified on 11/09/1995 (Entered: 11/09/1995)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER by defendant Vector Sec Intl Inc; jury demand; Notice of filing (rmm) (Entered: 11/08/1995)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                ANSWER by defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger; jury demand; Notice of filing (rmm) (Entered: 11/08/1995)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/3/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 11/3/95 by Hon. Joan B. Gottschall : Initital status hearing is set for 10:00 a.m. 11/17/95 before Magistrate Judge Gottschall. Parties are directed to furnish courtesy copies of complaint, answer and any pending matter to chambers 2490 by 11/15/95. Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 11/06/1995)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 11/2/95 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Enter confidentiality agreement and order. Any confidential material filed under seal with the Clerk of the Court shall be returned to the filing party thirty days after the conclusion of this litigation. Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 11/03/1995)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER (rmm) (Entered: 11/03/1995)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REFERRAL ORDER of 11/2/95: Case referred to Hon. Joan B. Gottschall from Hon. George M. Marovich pursuant to General Rule 2.41(b) (For further detail see order). Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 11/03/1995)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RULE 39 Affidavit of Richard G. Klein (rmm) (Entered: 10/04/1995)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg by Richard G. Klein; Notice of filing (rmm) (Entered: 10/04/1995)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of Y. Jeffrey Rotblat (rmm) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RULE 39 Affidavit of Scott R. Kipnis (rmm) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RULE 39 Affidavit of Douglas Gross (rmm) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RULE 39 Affidavit of David L. Birch (rmm) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg by David L. Birch, Douglas Gross, Scott R. Kipnis, Y. Jeffrey Rotblat; Notice of filing. (rmm) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 9/20/95 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting Medco defendants motion for substitution of counsel [80-1]. Richard G. Klein is given leave to file his appearance and Joseph Rosenthal, Joseph Pritti and Joan Zooper are given leave to withdra. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of substitution of counsel [80-1] (fce) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg for substitution of counsel ; Notice of motion (fce) (Entered: 09/21/1995)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Y. Jeffrey Rotblat for defendant Medco Research Inc ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. George M. Marovich (eav) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Scott R. Kipnis for defendant Medco Research Inc ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. George M. Marovich (eav) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Richard G. Klein for defendant Medco Research Inc ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. George M. Marovich (eav) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Douglas Gross for defendant Medco Research Inc ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. George M. Marovich (eav) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by David L. Birch for defendant Medco Research Inc ; Order entered granting leave by Hon. George M. Marovich (eav) (Entered: 08/04/1995)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs of law in support of their motion for class certification [73-1] (eav) (Entered: 07/18/1995)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs for class certification (eav) (Entered: 07/18/1995)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            LETTER from the USCA for the 7th Circuit Court returning the complete record on appeal, regarding appeal nos. 94-3576, 94-3577 [61-1] consisting of: 3 volumes of pleadings, 1 loose pleadings (Temporarily unavailable for docketing) (eav) (Entered: 06/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              BILL OF COSTS submitted by the U.S. Court of Appeals. Taxed in favor of Anthony LaSalle, Alan Totah, Mark Law, in the amount of $428.24 (Temporarily unavailable for docketing) (eav) (Entered: 06/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFIED COPY of order from the USCA for the 7th Circuit entered 5/15/95: The judgment of the District Court is Reversed, with costs, and the case is Remanded, in accordance with the decision of this Court entered on this date. [Appeal nos. 94-3576, 94-3577 [61-1] (Temporarily unavailable for docketing) (eav) (Entered: 06/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit argued 4/13/95 ; decided 5/15/95. appeal nos. 94-3576, 94-3577 [61-1] (Temporarily unavailable for docketing) (eav) (Entered: 06/14/1995)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 1/26/95 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting defendants' Medco Research, Inc., Archie W. Prestayko, Donald B. Siegel and Sanford J. Hillsberg motion for preparation of supplemental record [67-1]. The Clerk of this Court is directed to prepare a suppplemental record consisting of the Medco defendants' motion to dismiss and to transmit it to the Clerk of the Court of Appeals. Mailed notice (ldg) (Entered: 01/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg for preparation of supplemental record (Exhibits); Notice of motion (ldg) (Entered: 01/30/1995)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/94 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting plaintiffs' motion to withdraw appearance of Steven Schneck as attorney for plaintiffs [65-1]. Mailed notice (ldg) (Entered: 12/23/1994)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs to withdraw appearance of Steven Schneck as attorney for plaintiffs ; Notice of motion (ldg) (Entered: 12/23/1994)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal USCA 94-3576 (ldg) (Entered: 11/08/1994)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/7/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RECEIPT #444724 for notice of appeal filed by plaintiffs on 10/21/94. (fce) (Entered: 11/07/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                JURISDICTIONAL STATEMENT by plaintiffs Anthony LaSalle and Alan Totah regarding appeal [61-1]. (fce) (Entered: 11/01/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiffs Anthony LaSalle and Alan Totah from motion minute order [59-2], from order [58-1] and from judgment entered [60-1] (FEE NOT PAID). (fce) (Entered: 11/01/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED JUDGMENT (ldg) (Entered: 09/30/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 9/28/94 by Hon. George M. Marovich : The Court grants the defendants' motions to dismiss Counts I, II, and IV [31-1], [30-1]. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Count III and dismisses it without prejudice. terminating case Mailed notice (ldg) (Entered: 09/30/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER (ldg) (Entered: 09/30/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger of change of address (ldg) (Entered: 08/11/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/17/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing by defendant Vector Sec Intl Inc. re: appearances and rule 39 affidavits of Timothy A. Nelsen and Donna L. McDevitt as counsel for Vector. (ldg) (Entered: 05/24/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/3/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CITATION of supplemental authority by defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger, Vector Sec Intl Inc. (Exhibit); Notice of filing (ldg) (Entered: 05/04/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/23/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY by plaintiffs in opposition to motion to dismiss [30-1] (eav) (Entered: 03/24/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/23/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 3/23/94 by Hon. Harry D. Leinenweber : Granting plaintiffs motion for leave to file surreply. [52-1] Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 03/24/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/23/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file surreply ; Notice of motion (eav) (Entered: 03/24/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Aram A. Hartunian to Judge Marovich dated March 16, 1994 (eav) (Entered: 03/21/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY memorandum by Underwriter defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger, Vector Sec Intl Inc in support of motion to dismiss [31-1]; Notice of filing. (fce) (Entered: 03/11/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY memorandum by defendant Medco Research Inc in support of motion to dismiss [30-1] (Exhibit). (fce) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 3/10/94 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting motion for leave to file instanter a reply memorandum in excess of fifteen pages in support of their motion to dismiss [47-1] Telephoned notice (fce) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant Medco Research Inc for leave to file instanter a reply memorandum in excess of fifteen pages in support of their motion to dismiss ; Notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/15/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by defendant's attorney Peter R. Sonderby of change of address (Temporarily unavailable for docketing) (eav) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs of law in opposition to the motions to dismiss filed by the Medco defendants and the Underwriter defendants [31-1], [30-1] (eav) Modified on 02/16/1994 (Entered: 02/16/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 2/9/94 by Hon. James B. Zagel : Plaintiffs are given leave to file memorandum of law in opposition to the motion to dismiss in excess of fifteen pages. Telephoned notice (eav) (Entered: 02/16/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 2/9/94 by Hon. James B. Zagel : Motion granted by agreement of the parties for reassignment and consolidation. [42-1] No notice (eav) (Entered: 02/16/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/9/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiffs for reassignment and consolidation ; Notice of motion (eav) (Entered: 02/16/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/18/94 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Plaintiffs' motion to extend time to 02/09/94 to file answer to defendants' motion to dismiss [40-1] is granted. Defendants time to reply [30-1][31-1] is reset to 03/09/94. Mailed notice (vkd) (Entered: 01/20/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to respond to defendants'motion to dismiss ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 01/20/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Plaintiffs' motion to strike certain exhibits from defendants' motion to dismiss [28-1] is denied. The Court does not need assistance in determining what material it may properly consider in deciding a motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' answer to the motions to dismiss [30-1] [31-1] is to be filed by 01/21/94. Defendants are given until 02/04/94 to reply. The Court will rule by mail. No notice (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of law by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg in support of their motion to dismiss [30-1] (Exhibits). (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : The Medco defendants' motion for leave to file instanter a memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss [35-1] in excess of 15 pages [35-2] is granted. No notice (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of motions by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg regarding their motion to dismiss and for leave to file instanter a memorandum of law in excess of 15 pages. (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg for leave to file instanter a memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss in excess of 15 pages . (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of law by defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John Boettiger and Vector Sec Intl Inc in support of their motion to dismiss [31-1]. (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 12/22/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : The Underwriter defendants' motion for leave to file instanter a memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss [32-1] in excess of 15 pages [32-2] is granted. No notice (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendants Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger and Vector Sec Intl Inc for leave to file instanter a memorandum of law in support of their motion to dismiss in excess of 15 pages . (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by the Underwriter defendants, Kemper Sec Grp Inc, John R Boettiger and Vector Sec Intl Inc to dismiss ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/22/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Medco defendants, Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg to dismiss . (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Medco defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko,Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to strike certain exhibits from defendants' motion to dismiss [28-1]; Notice of filing. (vkd) (Entered: 01/03/1994)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/17/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs to strike certain exhibits from defendants' motion to dismiss ; (vkd) (Entered: 12/20/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 11/16/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting defendant's motion for an extension of time for defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead [26-1]. Time is extended to 12/06/93. Mailed notice (fce) (Entered: 11/17/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/16/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendants for an extension of time for defendant to answer, move or otherwise plead ; notice of motion. (fce) (Entered: 11/17/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 39 Affidavit of Joan A Zooper (fce) (Entered: 11/09/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 39 Affidavit of Joseph B. Pritti (fce) (Entered: 11/09/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 39 Affidavit of Joseph S. Rosenthal (fce) (Entered: 11/09/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Medco Research Inc, defendant Archie W Prestayko, defendant Donald B Siegel, defendant Sanford J Hillsberg by Joseph S. Rosenthal, Joseph B. Pritti, and Joan A. Zooper; Notice of filing. (fce) (Entered: 11/09/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 10/26/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting defendants' motion to admit Joseph S. Rosenthal [15-1] Joseph B. Pritti [17-1] and Joan A. Zooper as counsel pro hac vice [19-1] for defendants Medco Research, Inc., Archie W. Prestyko, Donald B. Siegel and Sanford J. Hillsberg. However, the attorneys must submit the petition for admission form. Mailed notice (vkd) Modified on 10/27/1993 (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Joan A. Zooper in support of motion to admit Joan A. Zooper as counsel pro hac vice [19-1] as counsel for defendants Medco Research, Inc., Archie W. Prestayko, Donald B. Sigel and Sanford J. Hillsberg. (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, Sanford J Hillsberg to admit Joan A. Zooper as counsel pro hac vice ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Joseph B. Pritti in support of motion to admit Joseph B. Pritti as counsel pro hac vice for defendants Medco Research, Inc. Archie W. Prestayko, Donald B. Siegel and Sanford J. Hillsburg [17-1] (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel and Sanford J Hillsberg to admit Joseph B. Pritti as counsel pro hac vice ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Joseph S. Rosenthal in support of motion to admit Joseph S. Rosenthal as counsel pro hac vice for defendants Medco Research, Inc., Archie W. Prestayko, Donald B. Siegel and Sanford J. Hillsberg [15-1]. (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko and Donald B Siegel to admit Joseph S. Rosenthal as counsel pro hac vice ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 10/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 10/5/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Agreed motion for an extension of time until 11/15/93 for defendants to answer, move or otherwise plead with respect to plaintiffs' complaint [13-1] is granted. Mailed notice (vkd) Modified on 10/06/1993 (Entered: 10/06/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/5/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED MOTION by defendants for an extension of time for defendants to answer, move or otherwise plead ; Notice of motion (vkd) (Entered: 10/06/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 39 Affidavit of Donna L. McDevitt (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 39 Affidavit of Timothy Alan Nelsen (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Vector Securities by Timothy Alan Nelsen, Donna L. McDevitt (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 39 Affidavit of Jonathan Nachsin (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 39 Affidavit of Clinton A. Krislov (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Medco Research Inc, Archie W Prestayko, Donald B Siegel, and Sanford J Hillsberg by Clinton A. Krislov, Jonathan Nachsin; Notice of filing. (vkd) Modified on 10/05/1993 (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 39 Affidavit of Peter Robert Sonderby (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Kemper Securities Group, Inc. and John R Boettiger by Peter Robert Sonderby (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 9/28/93 by Hon. George M. Marovich : Granting defendants Kemper Securities Group, Inc. and John R. Boettinger's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead [3-1]. Time is extended to 10/29/93. Mailed notice (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION by defendants Kemper Securities Group, Inc., and John R Boettiger for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead ; (vkd) (Entered: 10/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONTINGENCY FEE AGREEMENT (Not in public case file). (fce) (Entered: 09/02/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT; jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of Aram A. Hartunian as attorney(s) for plaintiff Anthony LaSalle, plaintiff Alan Totah with Rule 39 affidavits ( 7 originals and 7 copeis summons(es) issued.) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-4) (fce) (Entered: 09/02/1993)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 221 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?