Partners for Payment Relief, L v. Dreambuilder Investments, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-144

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 12:26 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 05/08/2015, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1506150] [15-144] [Entered: 05/08/2015 04:39 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
    FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[1506134] [15-144] [Entered: 05/08/2015 04:34 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
      NEW CASE MANAGER, Yana Segal, ASSIGNED.[1506016] [15-144] [Entered: 05/08/2015 03:37 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
        FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 05/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1505816] [15-144] [Entered: 05/08/2015 01:48 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Partners for Payment Relief, LLC and Partners for Payment Relief-De, LLC, FILED. Service date 02/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1446099] [15-144] [Entered: 02/25/2015 11:43 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE, to Appellee Partners for Payment Relief, LLC and Partners for Payment Relief-De, LLC , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1442160] [15-144] [Entered: 02/19/2015 04:46 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
              ORDER, dated 02/19/2015, dismissing appeal by 03/05/2015, unless appellants DBI Funding III, LLC, DBI Residential Fund Management, LLC and Dreambuilder Investments, LLC, submits forms C and D, FILED.[1442153] [15-144] [Entered: 02/19/2015 04:43 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1418209] [15-144] [Entered: 01/16/2015 04:07 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                  DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 12/16/2014, RECEIVED.[1418208] [15-144] [Entered: 01/16/2015 04:06 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                    DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/11/2014, RECEIVED.[1418204] [15-144] [Entered: 01/16/2015 04:05 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant DBI Funding III, LLC, DBI Residential Fund Management, LLC and Dreambuilder Investments, LLC, FILED. [1418201] [15-144] [Entered: 01/16/2015 04:01 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 295 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?