Selene Communication Technologies LLC v. Trend Micro Incorporated, et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00259

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 2:10 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Selene Communication Technologies, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara E. Bussiere +1 302 429 4230 sbussiere@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark S. Raskin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S. Raskin

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, James, Hitchens & Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD D. KIRK + 302 571 1750
v.
No Logo Trend Micro America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis DiGiovanni +1 302 467 4200 +1 302 467 4201 francis.digiovanni@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thatcher A. Rahmeier +1 302 467 4200 +1 302 467 4201 thatcher.rahmeier@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 audrey.lo@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
No Logo Trend Micro Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trend Micro Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis DiGiovanni +1 302 467 4200 +1 302 467 4201 francis.digiovanni@dbr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thatcher A. Rahmeier +1 302 467 4200 +1 302 467 4201 thatcher.rahmeier@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 audrey.lo@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey M Ratinoff +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 jeffrey.ratinoff@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Brief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Certification of Mediation Session
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Case Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 84 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015) Modified on 7/28/2015 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATIN AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 66 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by February 4, 2015. This is a text only entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Trend Micro Incorporated, Trend Micro America Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/16/2015. (rpg) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF SELENE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLC'S INITIAL CLAIM CHART PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 7(c) OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of TREND MICRO INCORPORATED AND AMERICA INC.S RESPONSE TO SELENE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS FIRST SET OF COMMON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-71); TREND MICRO INCORPORATED AND TREND MICRO AMERICA, INC.S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SELENE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS FIRST SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1-17); and TREND MICRO INCORPORATED AND AMERICA INC.S AMENDED RESPONSE TO SELENE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS FIRST SET OF COMMON REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (NOS. 1-71) filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.(DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER Setting Mediation Conference: A Telephone Conference is set for 1/12/2015 at 11:15 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/31/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00399-LPS, 1:14-cv-00432-LPS, 1:14-cv-00435-LPS, 1:14-cv-01014-LPS(dlk) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Selene Communication Technologies, LLC's First Set of Common Interrogatories to [No. 1-17]; (2) Plaintiff Selene Communication Technologies, LLC's First Set of Common Requests for Production [Nos. 1-71]; and (3) this Notice of Service filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF SELENE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, LLCS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES NOS. 1-7; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER /Agreed Proposed Protective Order by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties to Submit a Protective Order to November 7, 2014 - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFFS AMENDED DISCLOSURES OF ACCUSED PRODUCTS AND CLAIMS and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (rpg). (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS INITIAL DISCLOSURES and DEFENDANTS INITIAL ESI DISCLOSURES filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.(DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit a Protective Order to November 3, 2014 - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 26(a) AND PARAGRAPH 3 OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiff Selene Communication Technologies, LLC filed by EMC Corporation, AT&T Corp., Alert Logic, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Selene Communication Technologies, LLC's Amended Objections and Responses to Defendants Trend Micro Incorporated and Trend Micro America, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-70) and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Selene Communication Technologies, LLC's Objections and Responses to Defendants Trend Micro Incorporated and Trend Micro America, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-70) and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. Amendment to 41 Notice of Service Amended Notice of Service. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS INITIAL DISCLOSURES and DEFENDANTS INITIAL ESI DISCLOSURES filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.(DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER \Stipulation and Order by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties to Submit a Protective Order, and to Submit Their Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) and Paragraph 3 of the Delaware Default Standard for Discovery to October 14, 2014 and October 9, 2014, Respectively - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of TREND MICRO INCORPORATED AND TREND MICRO AMERICA, INC.S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.(Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Status Report due by 3/13/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2016. An Oral Argument is set for 4/26/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/27/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/7/2015. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 6/9/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 6/29/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. A Pretrial Conference is set for 7/29/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2016. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 8/8/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/9/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00126-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFFS DISCLOSURES OF ACCUSED PRODUCTS AND CLAIMS and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Telephone Conference held on August 15, 2014 before Chief Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan. Phone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER /Proposed Scheduling Order by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Oral Argument by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 31 Reply Brief Declaration of Thatcher A. Rahmeier by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file their Reply Brief in support of their Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California to August 12, 2014 - filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling teleconference has been scheduled for August 15, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the teleconference call to 302-573-4571. No further submissions are needed. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/6/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00126-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER /Amended [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/7/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER \[Proposed] Scheduling Order with Competing Proposals by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Patent Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Selene Communication Technologies Acquisition LLC for Selene Communication Technologies LLC filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to submit a proposed scheduling order to July 25, 2014 - filed by Fluke Electronics Corporation, Verizon Communications Inc., Jungle Disk LLC, Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Barracuda Networks Inc., AT&T Corp., Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated, McAfee Inc., Enterasys Networks Inc., Extreme Networks Inc., Juniper Networks Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John F. Petrsoric - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of John F. Petrsoric)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME /Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California from July 14, 2014 to July 28, 2014 to - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposal, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than July 18, 2014. The parties are to review the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Patent Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/1/14. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00126-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re 17 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Thatcher A. Rahmeier, Esq. by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit Z)(Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re 17 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Felix Sterling by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re 17 Opening Brief in Support, Declaration of Jessie Keung by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/14/2014. (Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rahmeier, Thatcher) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Trend Micro America Inc. for Trend Micro Incorporated; Corporate Parent Trend Micro Incorporated (Japan) for Trend Micro America Inc. filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated.(DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint to June 16, 2014 to - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis DiGiovanni (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to Selene's May 15, 2014 letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Coordination of Proceedings and Rule 16 Conference. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey M. Ratinoff and Bryan J. Sinclair - filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Trend Micro Incorporated on April 9, 2014, filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to May 30, 2014 - filed by Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, having reviewed counsel's letter of April 15, 2104; IT IS ORDERED that, on or before May 15, 2014, counsel for plaintiff shall file a supplemental submission to inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/15/2014.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/21/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00126-SLR et al.(nmfn) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark S. Raskin and Eric P. Berger - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Mark S. Raskin, # 2 Certification of Eric P. Berger)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. Trend Micro America Inc. served on 4/9/2014, answer due 4/30/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,143,444. (rwc) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against Trend Micro America Inc., Trend Micro Incorporated - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0311-1493700.) - filed by Selene Communication Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?