Fernando v. Ashcroft
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12085-JLT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 5:03 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Campana Fernando, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Bruce E. Chadbourne, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank Crowley +1 617 565 2415 Frank.Crowley@dhs.gov
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo John Ashcroft, Respondent
No Logo Steven Farquharson, Respondent
Office Boston
Filed 9/23/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Plymouth
Terminated 9/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, HABEAS
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. In accordance with this Court's order [4] dated September 30, 2004, it is ORDERED that the within action be and it is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (Weissman, Linn)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
    Judge Joseph L. Tauro : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. The habeas petition is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons within the memorandum and order.(Weissman, Linn)
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
      MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION to Dismiss , Return, and Notice of Intent to Execute Removal Order on October 11, 2004 filed by Bruce E. Chadbourne. (Crowley, Frank)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004, Terminated: 9/30/2004 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss by Bruce E. Chadbourne.(Crowley, Frank)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Terminated Case
          Civil Case Terminated. (Weissman, Linn)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
            If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Alexander. (Jenness, Susan)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2254
              PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus $ 0.00, receipt number 0.00, filed by Campana Fernando.(Jenness, Susan)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Remark
                Case received for filing without payment of the filing fee or submission of an application to waive the filing fee. (Jenness, Susan)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 35 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?