Industrial Print Technologies LLC v. Cenveo, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00165
District Judge David C Godbey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 19, 2017 at 3:29 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Industrial Print Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
No Logo Cenveo, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Navisite, Inc.
Unknown Role, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Unknown Role, Novadigm, Inc.
v.
No Logo Cenveo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Special Master, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Scott Woloson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Scott Woloson +1 281 352 9878 +1 281 978 2172 scott@scottwolosonlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the details of Mr. Woloson's time incurred for his services and related expenses through 2/18/2016. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS payment to be promptly made to Mr. Woloson as follows: Plaintiff: $33,806.24 Defendants: $33,806.24. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/24/2016) (bdb) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/12/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is ORDERED that S. Brannon Latimer is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Industrial Print Technologies LLC in Civil Action Nos. 3:15-cv-00165 and 3:15-cv-01104. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/10/2016) (sss) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney S. Brannon Latimer filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC's 30 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel: It is ORDERED that Jared E. Hedman be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 2/8/2016) (twd) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Rueckheim on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rueckheim, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              Memorandum Opinion and Order denying (64 in 3:15-cv-00165-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, Cenveo Inc, (155 in 3:15-cv-01100-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics, Inc., Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (73 in 3:15-cv-01101-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Hewlett Packard Company, O'Neil Data Systems Inc, (50 in 3:15-cv-01103-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Quad/Graphics Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (51 in 3:15-cv-01104-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, (53 in 3:15-cv-01106-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Vistaprint USA Inc, Hewlett-Packard Company, (68 in 3:15-cv-01195-M) Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Hewlett-Packard Company filed by Fort Dearborn Company, Hewlett-Packard Company. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 10/7/2015) (jrr) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Brett Johnson on behalf of Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Johnson, M) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    AGREED JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/28/2015) (axm) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER. In light of the parties' Stipulations, the Court ORDERS the following deadlines: Parties exchange citations to intrinsic and documentary extrinsic evidence, and identify claim terms for which they expect to offer expert opinions due by August 25. Meet and confer regarding Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement submission on or before August 26-28. Parties submit final Joint Claim Construction Chart and Prehearing Statement to Court due by August 31. Parties exchange expert reports on claim construction due by September 8. No additional expert reports on claim construction will be permitted. All other deadlines set forth in the Court's Preliminary Patent Scheduling Order remain unchanged. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/27/2015) (axm) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                        Agreed STIPULATION Regarding Claim Construction Schedule by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Gosse, David) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                          Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                            Sur-reply filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC re: 64 (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Amend (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING IPT'S 71 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PLEADINGS TO ADD ACACIA RESEARCH GROUP, LLC AS A COUNTER-DEFENDANT: Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies LLC may file its Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant, in the form attached to its Motion. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/20/2015) (twd) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 69 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL THEIR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS TO ADD ACACIA RESEARCH GROUP, LLC AS A COUNTERDEFENDANT : Defendants may file under seal their Reply In Support of Their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/20/2015) (twd) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File IPT's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add ARG As a Counterclaim Defendant filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 IPT's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add ARG As a Counterclaim Defendant) (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 08/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                    (Document Restricted) CORRECTED SEALED Reply in support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend [69-2] (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company (Perito, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                      (Document Restricted) SEALED Motion to File Under Seal Defs' Reply ISO Motion for Leave to Amend (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order SEALED Proposed Order Re Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 SEALED Reply ISO Defs' Motion for Leave to Amend, # 3 Exhibit(s) Ex. R) (Perito, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2015. The Court held a telephone conference to discuss Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in 3:15cv1101, Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, and scheduling matters. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Alison Richards, Nicole Little, Tim Maloney, Steven Schroer; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness, Andrew Perito. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :30 ttl. (tln) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                          (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: 66 Sealed Response in Opposition filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (tln) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                            (Document Restricted) Sealed Response in Opposition to 64 SEALED Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (a Texas Corporation). (tln) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting sealed Opposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant 63 . Pursuant to Local Rule 79.3, the Clerk is directed to file under seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant and its accompanying Appendix [Docket Nos. 63-1 and 63-2]. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 8/4/2015) (tln) Modified on 8/5/2015 (ali). (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                (Document Restricted) SEALED Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant filed by Cenveo Inc and Hewlett Packard Company. (ran) (Main Document 64 replaced on 8/20/2015) (twd). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 63 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                  (Document Restricted) IPT's Opposed Motion For Leave to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - IPT's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counterclaim Defendant, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 61 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sonal N Mehta terminated (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/25/2015) (ran) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sonal N. Mehta filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        PRELIMINARY PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/27/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2015. All motions that would dispose of all or any part of this case, including motions for summary judgment, shall be filed by 285 days after the Court's Markman ruling. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/22/2015) (axm) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Agreement for Technical Advisor and for Agreed Tasks and Activities to be Performed by the Technical Advisor, jointly filed by the Parties. Having reviewed the parties' recommendation for a technical advisor, the Court hereby appoints Scott Woloson as technical advisor to the Court, with his fees and costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant, and to be timely paid as billed, at the rate of $340 per hour. The parties are ordered to send courtesy copies of claim construction briefs, exhibits, and technology tutorials no later than one business day after their filing: (1) in PDF form to scott@scottwolosonlaw.com; and (2) in paper form, double-sided, in a 3-ring binder, with tabbed exhibits to the Law Office of Scott Woloson, P.C., 1431 Wirt Road #141, Houston, TX 77055. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/13/2015) (tln) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Agreement for Technical Advisor and For Agreed Tasks and Activities to be Performed by the Technical Advisor filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings. The Motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 79.3, Defendant may file under seal their Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings, as well as the Amended Answers and Counterclaims and excerpts from the December 11, 2015 Deposition Transcript of Cristin Wagner, which are attached as exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings. The foregoing documents will be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/8/2015) (tln) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER: Plaintiff Industrial Print Technologies, LLC ("IPT") and Defendants Cenveo, Inc., Fort Dearborn Co., Hewlett Packard Co., O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Quad/Graphics, Inc., and Vistaprint U.S.A., Inc. (collectively, "Defendants") have presented the Court with their Stipulations regarding Infringement and Invalidity Contentions. In light of the parties' Stipulations, the Court ORDERS that the parties' respective Amended Infringement and Amended Invalidity Contentions are deemed served as of May 11 and June 12, 2015 respectively. This Order is without regard to the sufficiency of the amended contentions or to any requests for leave to further amend such contentions in the future. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 7/7/2015) (tln) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  (Document Restricted) Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Amend (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit(s) SEALED Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Pleadings to Add Acacia Research Group, LLC as a Counter-Defendant, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F, # 9 Exhibit(s) G, # 10 Exhibit(s) H, # 11 Exhibit(s) I, # 12 Exhibit(s) J, # 13 Exhibit(s) K, # 14 Exhibit(s) L, # 15 Exhibit(s) M, # 16 Exhibit(s) N, # 17 Exhibit(s) O, # 18 Exhibit(s) P, # 19 Exhibit(s) Q, # 20 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to Amend) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Joint STIPULATION Regarding Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      AGREED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY: This order supplements all other discovery rules and orders. It streamlines Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") production to promote a "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of this action, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 1. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/30/2015) (axm) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn: The Court held a Rule 16 conference to discuss scheduling matters and other issues raised in the parties' Joint Status Report. No order to enter. See record for specifics. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Tim Maloney, Nicole Little, Tom Cecil; Defense - Edward Reines, Audrey Maness. (Court Reporter: Keith Johnson) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (tln) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Perito on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Perito, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Redline of Previously-Agreed PO) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: In light of the parties' Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that Defendants Cenveo, Inc., Fort Dearborn Co., Quad/Graphics, Inc., Vistaprint U.S.A., Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015 to serve Initial Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv-00165-M, Case No. 3:15-cv- 01106-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01195-M; and Defendants O'Neil Data Systems, Inc., Quad/Graphics, Inc. and Hewlett-Packard Company have until 6/12/2015, to provide IPT with proposed Amended Invalidity Contentions in Case No. 3:15-cv- 01100-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01101-M, Case No. 3:15-cv-01103-M, and Case No. 3:15-cv-01104-M. The parties are ORDERED to thereafter meet and confer regarding their respective proposed amendments prior to presenting the Court with any motions for leave to amend. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 6/2/2015) (twd) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Joint STIPULATION Regarding Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Industrial Print Technologies LLC, Cenveo, Inc., Fort Dearborn Co., Hewlett Packard Co., ONeil Data Systems, Inc., Quad/Graphics, Inc., and Vistaprint U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Little, Nicole) Modified filers on 6/2/2015 (anf). (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Evan Budaj terminated. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/15/2015) (skt) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Evan N. Budaj filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Audrey Maness on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Maness, Audrey) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 39 Defendants' MOTION to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/12/2015) (jrr) (Main Document 44 replaced to correct format on 5/12/2015) (gmg). (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Compliance with Miscellaneous Order Paragraphs 3-2 & 3-2 filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company re: 39 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 40 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Replies due by 5/8/15. Responses due by 5/6/15. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 5/1/2015) NOTE: Originally entered in Master Case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Agreed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' 39 Motion to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference filed by Edward Reines with Brief/Memorandum in Support. NOTE: Originally filed in Master Case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Defendants' MOTION to Stay Discovery Prior to the Rule 16 Conference[Opposed] with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s)) NOTE: Originally filed in Master case 3:15-md-2614 (gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: 37 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      (Document Restricted) Sealed Response re: Motion to Stay, 3:15-MD-2614-M, Dkt. No. 005 (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven C Schroer on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Schroer, Steven) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy P Maloney on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Maloney, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared E Hedman on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hedman, Jared) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Gosse on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Gosse, David) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole L Little on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Little, Nicole) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Aubry Richards on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Richards, Alison) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Budaj on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sonal N Mehta on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding pretrial proceedings in MDL Master Docket 3:15-md-2614 and individual cases. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2015 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1570, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn. A default agenda routinely used in patent cases before Judge Lynn is included as Exhibit A. (Ordered by Judge Barbara M.G. Lynn on 4/27/2015) (gmg) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Barbara M.G. Lynn. All future pleadings shall be filed under case No. 3:15-CV-0165-M. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/10/2015) (tln) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. Related document: 14 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. Related document: 13 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Gosse. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole L. Little. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alison Aubry Richards. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/3/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David A Gosse (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80987) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (tln) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Nicole L Little (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80986) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (tln) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Alison Aubry Richards (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 80985) filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (tln) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct. Status Report due by 4/13/2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/27/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Order, filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company, Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Guy, T) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/16/2015) (tln) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Hewlett Packard Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Industrial Print Technologies LLC filed by Hewlett Packard Company (Guy, T) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cenveo Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against Industrial Print Technologies LLC filed by Cenveo Inc (Guy, T) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Answer or responsive pleadings due March 13, 2015. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 2/17/2015) (chmb) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hewlett Packard Company. (Guy, T) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cenveo Inc. (Guy, T) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Guy, T) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Cenveo Inc, Hewlett Packard Company. (jrr) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Complaint) (jrr) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Godbey. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jrr) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (see document 1 for image). (jrr) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Industrial Print Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6543567) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, # 3 Exhibit(s) A, # 4 Exhibit(s) B, # 5 Exhibit(s) C, # 6 Exhibit(s) D, # 7 Exhibit(s) E, # 8 Exhibit(s) F) (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?