Hannon v. Ford
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00085

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 12:44 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Hannon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Hannon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Hannon
v.
No Logo Anette Santana, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Bowman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Maryland Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Sergeant Rex Schultz Gordon +1 410 576 6424 +1 410 576 6880 rgordon@oag.state.md.us
No Logo Cote, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Early, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Kileen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Lyons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Ortiz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
cop David Richard Condron +1 312 603 3368 drcondron@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
cop Lesley Berson Mbaye +1 212 788 0408 +1 212 788 0940 lmbaye@law.nyc.gov
cop Mary Theresa O'Flynn +1 212 788 0886 +1 212 788 9776 moflynn@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1750

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
cop John Coughlin Coyne +1 312 583 9500 jcc@johnccoynelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
cop Rachel G. Balaban +1 718 254 6028 +1 718 254 6081 rachel.balaban@usdoj.gov
cop Jean-David Barnea +1 212 637 2679 +1 212 637 2717 jean-david.barnea@usdoj.gov
cop Brian Marc Feldman +1 212 637 2777 +1 212 637 2717 brian.feldman@usdoj.gov
No Logo Prior, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
CO Carmel A. Motherway +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 carmel.motherway@ct.gov
No Logo Quieros, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Richardson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by GoodSmith Gregg & Unruh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dr. Patrick F. Russell +1 312 676 2011 prussell@ggulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Cook County State's Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Dr. Jordan Lane Matthis +1 312 603 5527 jordan.matthis@cookcountyil.gov
Dr. Anthony E. Zecchin +1 312 603 3373 anthony.zecchin@cookcountyil.gov
No Logo Rivera, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Joseph Myers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Detective, in his individual and official capacity
TERMINATED: 09/01/2015 Lee Alan Adlerstein +1 212 416 6157 +1 212 416 6009 lee.adlerstein@oag.state.ny.us
Detective, in his individual and official capacity
TERMINATED: 09/01/2015 Efthimios Parasidis +1 212 416 8118 +1 212 416 6075 efthimios.parasidis@oag.state.ny.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of William J. Melley III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Detective, in his individual and official capacity
TERMINATED: 09/01/2015 William J. Melley, III +1 860 247 9933 +1 860 247 9944 wjmelley@wjmelley.com
No Logo Scagliarini, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo Sinelli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov
No Logo John S. Beulick, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Michael David Jacobs +1 847 939 9719 +1 847 518 6495 Michael.Jacobs.Esq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Barkett and Gumpert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Valentina Reiner +1 916 481 3683 +1 916 481 3948

Toggle Switch Represented by CAVANAGH LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Michael Jude Sorich +1 312 425 1900 mjs@CavanaghLawGroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Stamford, Connecticut

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Barbara L. Coughlan +1 203 977 4087 +1 203 977 5560 bcoughlan@ci.stamford.ct.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Virginia Brette Bensinger +1 312 704 3000 bbensinger@hinshawlaw.com
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 James Matthias Lydon +1 312 704 3000 jlydon@hinshawlaw.com
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Robert Thomas Shannon +1 312 704 3901 +1 312 704 3001 rshannon@hinshawlaw.com
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Gretchen Harris Sperry +1 312 704 3521 gsperry@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacobs & Hazan, Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Stuart E. Jacobs +1 646 510 1523 +1 212 283 5003 sjacobs@jacobshazan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by James G. Sotos & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Lisa Marie Meador +1 630 735 3300 +1 630 735 0980 lmeador@jsotoslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF PETER J. McNAMARA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Daniel P Duffy +1 312 782 7150 dduffy@pjmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LEGAL COUNCIL FOR HEALTH JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Emma Dorothy Steimel +1 217 785 4555 +1 217 524 5091 esteimel@atg.state.il.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The Cook County State's Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Lyle Kevin Henretty +1 312 603 1426 lyle.henretty@cookcountyil.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Peterson Johnson & Murray - Chicago LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Dominick L Lanzito +1 312 724 8024 dlanzito@pjmchicago.com
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Paul A O'Grady +1 312 782 7150 pogrady@pjmchicago.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Shlomit Aroubas +1 212 442 2715 +1 212 788 9776 saroubas@law.nyc.gov
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Curt Peter Beck +1 212 676 1395 +1 212 788 9776 cbeck@law.nyc.gov
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Arthur Gabriel Larkin, III +1 212 788 1599 +1 212 788 9776 alarkin@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Rainwater, Holt & Sexton PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Geoffrey Thompson +1 501 868 2500 thompson@rainfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 120

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
16004
TERMINATED: 01/06/2012 Frank George Gumpert +1 916 933 3200 +1 916 605 4075 frank@caulfieldlawfirm.com
No Logo Walter Ford, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Wilson, Jr. +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 e.wilson@ct.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Chief State's Attorney - Rocky Hill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Warden, Suing in Official and Individual Capacities Neil D. Parille +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 neil.parille@po.state.ct.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Warden, Suing in Official and Individual Capacities Terrence M. O'Neill +1 860 808 5450 +1 860 808 5591 terrence.oneill@ct.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Bowman, Cote, Early, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas, Anette Santana, Walter Ford against Michael Hannon.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2016.(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Because plaintiff has failed to file the required statement of undisputed facts pursuant to D. Conn. Local R. Civ. P. 56(a)2 and about which requirement plaintiff was specifically advised (Doc. #42-9), the Court accepts as true the statement of undisputed facts set forth in defendants' statement of undisputed facts pursuant to D. Conn. Local R. Civ. P. 56(a)1. See Vermont Teddy Bear Co., Inc. v. 1-800 Beargram Co., 373 F.3d 241, 244 (2d Cir. 2004). For substantially the reasons set forth in defendants' accompanying memorandum, I conclude that there is no genuine issue of fact that remains for trial. As to plaintiff's claim that his placement on grievance restriction was retaliatory, it is undisputed that plaintiff has an extensive and dismal history of filing an abusive number of grievances; under the prison's rules, this track record lawfully warranted plaintiff's being placed under a grievance restriction. No genuine issue of fact remains to suggest that any of the defendants placed him on a grievance restriction for an improper retaliatory reason. See, e.g., Lowrance v. Achtyl, 20 F.3d 529, 535 (2d Cir. 1994) (affirming grant of summary judgment on retaliation claim and "not[ing] that the conclusion that the state action would have been taken in the absence of improper motives is readily drawn in the context of prison administration where we have been cautioned to recognize that 'prison officials have broad administrative and discretionary authority over the institutions they manage.'"). Plaintiff's response does not otherwise address many of the other points raised in defendants' summary judgment motion and, instead, focuses on his contention that his note to a female correctional officer was not threatening. But plaintiff does not dispute having written the note, and the evidence easily suffices to conclude that the note--in which plaintiff told the officer that he found her attractive and wished to see her after he served his term of imprisonment (a sentence he was serving for first-degree manslaughter)--could reasonably be perceived by the correctional officer as a threat to her safety. Although plaintiff quarrels with the outcome of the disciplinary hearing, the record is clear that plaintiff received advance notice of this charge before the hearing, advocated for himself at that hearing, and had the ability to present evidence and witnesses in his defense. The undisputed facts demonstrate that the defendants did not violate plaintiff's due process rights. Wolff v. McDonnell, 418 U.S. 539, 563-73 (1974). The defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. # 42 ) is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/19/2016. (Gruber, Sarah) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in Opposition to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Hannon. (Caffrey, A.) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STATUS REPORT TO COURT AS ORDERED AT DOC. 57 by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STATUS REPORT AS ORDERED AT DOC. 57 by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER. The motion for order (Doc. # 56 ) is GRANTED. On the basis of plaintiff's representation that such documents have been removed from him, the Clerk of Court shall mail plaintiff a copy of defendants' summary judgment motion (with attachments) [Doc. # 42 ] and a copy of plaintiff's motion to compel [Doc. # 47 ]. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/25/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER. The motion for extension of time (Doc. # 55 ) to file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED until July 1, 2016. No further extensions will be granted. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a timely opposition to the motion for summary judgment may result in the dismissal with prejudice of all his claims. On or before April 29, 2016, defendants shall file a statement with the Court certifying that they are in full compliance with the Court-ordered discovery in this case. (Responses due by 7/1/2016) Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/25/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION for ORDER for copy(s) by Michael Hannon. (Owens, T.) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 07/01/2016 by Michael Hannon. (Owens, T.) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Following In Camera Review (see Dkt. #51): Familiarity is presumed with this Magistrate Judge's Electronic Order, filed 3/11/16 (Dkt. #51) which granted plaintiff's Motion to Compel in limited part to the extent that defendants were to submit to this Magistrate Judge's Chambers for her in camera review documents responsive to Nos. 4 (from July 2014 through November 2014), 13 (also from July 2014 through November 2014), 16 and 20. In addition, the motion was granted in limited part with respect to Nos. 17, 18 and 19, to the extent that defendants could isolate out limited footage relevant to this lawsuit on October 8, 2014, October 16, 2014, and November 6-20, 2014, which can be shown to plaintiff. (See also Dkts. ##52-53). On 4/4/16, defendants submitted their compliance with this Order, in which they represent that there are no responsive documents to Nos. 4, 13, 16B, and 20, and that there are no videos responsive to Nos. 17 and 18. Defendants further represent that they have now provided to plaintiff redacted documents responsive to No. 16A and they will show plaintiff the video responsive to No. 19.Thus, no further production is required at this time.In accordance with the deadline set by Judge Meyer on 2/16/16 (Dkt. #50), plaintiff's brief in opposition to defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #42) shall be filed on or before April 27, 2016. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/5/16.(Watson, M.) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/4/16. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/29/16. (Margolis, Joan) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 4, 2016 to Respond to Courts Order 51 Order on Motion for Order,,,, by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Complete Discovery Requests (Dkt. #47): Plaintiff's motion is denied with respect to Nos. 1, 2, 3, 5, 7, 8, 9, and 10, as defendants already have complied, and is denied with respect to Nos. 6, 11, 12, 14, 15 and 21 on the merits.Plaintiff's motion is granted in limited part to the extent that on or before March 28, 2016, defendants shall submit responsive documents to this Magistrate Judge's Chambers for her in camera review with respect to Nos. 4 (from July 2014 through November 2014), 13 (also from July 2014 to November 2014), 16 and 20.Plaintiff's motion is also granted in limited part with respect to Nos. 17, 18 and 19, to the extent that defendants can isolate out limited footage relevant to this lawsuit on October 8, 2014, October 16, 2014, and November 6-20, 2014, which can be shown to plaintiff. Defendants shall comply on or before March 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/11/2016. (Watson, M.) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER. Plaintiff's 48 motion for extension of time is GRANTED pending resolution by Judge Margolis of plaintiff's motion for order to complete discovery requests (Doc. # 47 ). Plaintiff shall file any opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment either within 21 days of any order by Judge Margolis that denies plaintiff's motion to complete discovery requests or within 21 days of defendants' production of any additional discovery materials that Judge Margolis may order, whichever date is later. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/16/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis re: 47 MOTION for Complete Discovery Requests Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/16/2016.Motions referred to Joan G. Margolis(Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Michael Hannon. (Caffrey, Andrew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Order to Complete Discovery Requests by Michael Hannon. (Caffrey, Andrew)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 2/12/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/20/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 30 days by Michael Hannon. (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 2/15/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/7/2016. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment for 30 days by Michael Hannon. (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: 12/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas.Responses due by 1/8/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Statement of Material Facts, # 9 Attachment)(Wilson, Edward)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/4/2015. (Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2015 to file its dispositive motion by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time until December 3, 2015 To File Dispositive Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/3/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 3, 2015 To File Dispositive Motion by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER. The motion to compel (Doc. # 35 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in light of defendants' response and once defendants' counsel has had the opportunity to communicate with plaintiff with respect to his requests. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/21/2015. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas re 35 MOTION to Compel (Wilson, Edward)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery by Michael Hannon.Responses due by 10/7/2015 (O'Connor, T) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER. Parties shall have a telephone conference within one week to discuss the discovery plan. Defense counsel shall file a status report concerning discovery within two weeks. Plaintiff's oral motion for counsel appointment is DENIED in absence of additional showing of the merits of his claims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/26/2015.(Oakes, A.) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic/Video Status Conferen held on 8/26/2015. Total Time: 27 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/28/2015.(O'Connor, T) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic/Video Status Conference set for 8/26/2015 02:30 PM in Chambers Room 208, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Plaintiff shall participate via video conference. The Court will initiate the call. (Gutierrez, Y.) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/28/2015.(Anastasio, F.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 23 Motion for Leave to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY [CORRECTED FILING] in light of corrected filing (Doc. #24). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/24/2015. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time until JUNE 22, 2015, NUNC PRO TUNC, [CORRECTED FILING] TO FILE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Counsel is advised that the appropriate procedure in federal court is to seek an extension of time before a filing is due rather than to seek an extension of time nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/24/2015. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot in light of corrected filing (Doc.# 24 ) 21 Motion for Leave to File to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/24/2015. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY [CORRECTED FILING]. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/24/2015. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas.(Wilson, Edward)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY [CORRECTED FILING] by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY [CORRECTED FILING] by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until JUNE 22, 2015, NUNC PRO TUNC, [CORRECTED FILING] TO FILE DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File DOCUMENTS ELECTRONICALLY by Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas. (Wilson, Edward)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hannon. Richardson served on 4/27/2015, answer due 5/17/2015; Rivera served on 4/27/2015, answer due 5/17/2015. This corrects 19 and updates answer deadline (Campbell, A) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hannon. (Campbell, A) Modified on 5/11/2015 (Campbell, A). (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance Individual Capacity by Edward Wilson, Jr on behalf of Bowman, Cote, Early, Walter Ford, Kileen, Lyons, Ortiz, Prior, Quieros, Richardson, Rivera, Anette Santana, Scagliarini, Sinelli, Thomas (Payton, R.)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: 4/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richardson waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. filed by Michael Hannon. (Perez, J.)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kileen waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Rivera waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. filed by Michael Hannon. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s).Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 5/6/2015 (Campbell, A) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: 4/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Richardson, Rivera* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Plaintiff *Michael Hannon, 183238* *OSBORN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION* *335 Bilton Road, PO Box 100* *Somers, CT 06071*. (Campbell, A)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hannon as to Defendants - c/o Attorney General - OFFICIAL CAPACITY. (Campbell, A) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Early waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. filed by Michael Hannon. (Campbell, A)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bowman waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Cote waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Walter Ford waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Ortiz waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Prior waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Quieros waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Anette Santana waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015; Scagliarini waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. filed by Michael Hannon. (Campbell, A) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Thomas waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. filed by Michael Hannon. (Campbell, A) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lyons waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015 filed by Michael. **This corrects 8 to correct wrong event. (Campbell, A). (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        ***ENTERED IN ERROR*** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lyons waiver sent on 3/12/2015, answer due 5/11/2015 filed by Michael Hannon. (Campbell, A) Modified on 3/20/2015 (Campbell, A). (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s).Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 3/31/2015 (Campbell, A) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to * All Defendants * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Hannon, 183238* *335 Bilton Road* *P.O. Box 100* *Somers, CT 06071*. (Campbell, A)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              INITIAL REVIEW ORDER. Discovery due by 10/3/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 11/3/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/3/2015. (Ramesh, S)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at anytime during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you must notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 1/23/2015. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    PRISCS - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/20/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Hannon. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Hannon.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?