Air Crash TWA, et al v. , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-07986
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 11:10 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Catherine Dadi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Adams +1 617 951 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY James P. Kreindler +1 212 973 3449 +1 212 972 9432 jkreindler@kreindler.com
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Lee S. Kreindler +1 212 687 8181
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Pounian +1 212 687 8181
No Logo marc Dadi, Plaintiff
No Logo Marguerite Dadi, Plaintiff
No Logo Martine Fournier, Plaintiff
No Logo Maurice Dadi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Lee S. Kreindler +1 212 687 8181
No Logo Max Dadi, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael Steward, Plaintiff
No Logo Michel Dadi, Plaintiff
No Logo Mireille Brami, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert J. Loffredo, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Hydro-aire, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth E. Lee +1 212 837 6730 +1 212 422 4726 leek@hugheshubbard.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Demeo & Feigin Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY Cynthia Alice Feigin +1 212 792 7778

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Scott Bell +1 206 359 8493 +1 206 359 9493 SBell@perkinscoie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Keith Gerrard +1 206 359 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William I. Sussman +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 841 5725 william.sussman@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/05/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY George F. Hritz +1 212 751 3001 +1 212 751 3113 george.hritz@karlinskyllc.com
No Logo Trans World Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haight, Gardner, Poor & Havens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Randal R. Craft +1 212 341 7000
LEAD ATTORNEY Randal Craft, Jr. +1 212 341 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Randal Robert Craft +1 212 513 3200
LEAD ATTORNEY Alan D. Reitzfeld +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 alan.reitzfeld@hklaw.com
No Logo Alfred Babb, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Angelo Callas, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Verhaeghe, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Betty L. Miller, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Carol M. Olsen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Emerson, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hazell, Thomas, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michel Francis Baumeister +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 mbaumeister@baumeisterlaw.com
No Logo James, Alexander, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jennifer Bone, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Babb, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John L. Hull, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Krista A. Koponen, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Lindley H. Eshleman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Meryem Ersoz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schaden, Katzman, Lampert & McClune

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/27/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Francis Schaden +1 303 465 3663 +4653 465 465 3884
No Logo Nathaniel Ersoz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert P Thomas, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel Berthe, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Sotiria Callas, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Crane Company, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Crane Co."
No Logo Hydro-Air, Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com
No Logo Lear Romec, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Henry Allen, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Jonathan C. Reiter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Charles Reiter +1 212 244 2000 +1 212 268 5297
No Logo Joceil Allen, Intervenor Plaintiff
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Intervenor Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
No Logo Trans World Airlines, Inc., Intervenor Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332wd
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (462) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973. Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973. Original document filed under case number 93-cv-8948, document number 69. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 3/30/2005) (jp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL of all defts from the consolidated action purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) and MDL 7.6(a) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This Consolidated Action shall remain open and this Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of implementing the Court's Order of 10/18/02 concerning the plntfs' committee's fees and expenses, discharging the plntfs' committee, and dismissing this Consolidated Action. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 3/10/04) (cd, ) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER (this document relates to all cases) The Plaintiffs' Committee fees shall be distributed as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 2/3/04) (yv, ) (Entered: 02/10/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; this action is dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the FRCP as to the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Marcel Dadi with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (db) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER of (this stipulation is refered to case #97cv6882) dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Namik Ersoz (including John D. Babb, Jr., Afred W. Babb, Meryem Ersoz and Nathaniel Ersoz) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 09/25/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER of (this stipulation is refered to case #97cv6881) dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Clara Jean Ersoz (including John D. Babb, Jr., Afred W. Babb, Meryem Ersoz and Nathaniel Ersoz) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 09/25/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 465 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 464 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: None
                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 06/30/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 463 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None
                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER (This Document Relates to: All Cases), granting [459-1] motion for an order approving the payment to the individual Committee members of Committee expenses incurred totaling $1,045,120.58, granting [459-2] motion for an order reimbursing overpaid expenses and earned interest totaling $236,447.36, resulting in the rebate of $1,115.32 to each of the 211 plaintiffs that paid both the $1,000 and $5,000 expense assessment, and a rebate of $115.32 to the one plaintiff that paid only the $5,000 expense assessment, granting [459-3] motion for an order directing the payment of a Committee fee of 4% of the recovery above $75,000 in each non-Committee case to be paid from the Committee fee account established purs. to a prior order of this Court . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (ae) Modified on 11/04/2002 (Entered: 11/04/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Pounian by Plaintiffs' Committee in support of [459-1] motion for an order approving the payment to the individual Committee members of Committee expenses incurred totaling $1,045,120.58; [459-2] motion for an order reimbursing overpaid expenses and earned interest totaling $236,447.36, resulting in the rebate of $1,115.32 to each the 211 plaintiffs that paid both the $1,000 and $5,000 expense assessment, and a rebate of $115.32 to the one plaintiff that paid only the $5,000 expense assessment; [459-3] motion for an order directing the payment of a Committee fee of 4% of the recovery above $75,000 in each non-Committee case to be paid from the Committee fee account established purs. to a prior order of this Court. (ae) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Plaintiffs' Committee in support of [459-1] motion for an order approving the payment to the individual Committee members of Committee expenses incurred totaling $1,045,120.58; [459-2] motion for an order reimbursing overpaid expenses and earned interest totaling $236,447.36, resulting in the rebate of $1,115.32 to each of the 211 plaintiffs that paid both the $1,000 and $5,000 expense assessment, and a rebate of $115.32 to the one plaintiff that paid only the $5,000 expense assessment; [459-3] for an order directing the payment of a Committee fee of 4% of the recovery above $75,000 in each non-Committee case to be paid from the Committee fee account established purs. to a prior order of this Court. (ae) Modified on 09/25/2002 (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Plaintiffs' Committee; for an order approving the payment to the individual Committee members of Committee expenses incurred totaling $1,045,120.58 ; for an order reimbursing overpaid expenses and earned interest totaling $236,447.36, resulting in the rebate of $1,115.32 to each of the 211 plaintiffs that paid both the $1,000 and $5,000 expense assessment, and a rebate of $115.32 to the one plaintiff that paid only the $5,000 expense assessment , and for an order directing the payment of a Committee fee of 4% of the recovery above $75,000 in each non-Committee case to be paid from the Committee fee account established purs. to a prior order of this Court . No Return Date (ae) (Entered: 09/25/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal (This document reltes to: Hazelton v Boeing et al), with prejudccie, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal (This document relates to: Tofani v Boeing, et al), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge George B. Daniels ) (cd) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Order of dismissal (this document relates to 01 civ. 5338) of all claims claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Janet Wolf Christopher (including Charles W. Christopher III and Charles Wesley Christopher IV) with prejudice, each party to bearit own costs and expenses. Baumeister & Samuels, P.C. is relieved as counsel for plaintiff. A copy of this Order shall be promptly served by the Clerk of Court on Mr. Christopher by US mail, addressed to Mr. Christopher's last known address as follows: Mr. Charles Christopher III, 2 Idlewood Drive, P.O. Box 21, Brodheadsville, Pennsylvania 18322. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (Mailed copy to Mr. Christopher). (kw) Modified on 06/19/2002 (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of (this stipulation is refered to case # 98cv6344) dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Jill Victoria Watson (including James Felton Watson and Janice Marlene Watson), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (tp) Modified on 05/31/2002 (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER (this Order relates to 97cv5248 (RWS) of dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), with prejudice of all claims arising from the dealth of Yvon Alain Henri Lamour (including Martine Lamour, Elisa Lamour, Amelie Lamour and Ann Lamour). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) Modified on 05/30/2002 (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER (This document relates to 98 civ. 5061) of dismissal of the action pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Daniel Gaspar Cremades-Vila and with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT of Gabriel Del Virginia by Plaintiff Maria Angela Guarducci Tofani in support of application for compromise of this wrongful death action and approval of attorneys' fees and disbursements. (yv) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 451 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None
                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Sylvain Pierre Delange (including Mariko Namba Delange, Hana Delange, Christophe and Emily Strickland), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (This Document Relates to 96 Civ.8701). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Guy Marie Henri Dupont (inlcuding Agnes Monique Josette Herpin and Nicolas Gabriel Dupont), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (This Document Relates to 96 Civ.8298). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Lucy Y. Bossuyt, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (This Document relates to 97 Civ.5162) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Seana Michelle Anderson (This Document Relates to 97 Civ.6808(RWS). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jane Elizabeth Reardon Labys (This Document Relates to 98 Civ.5424 (RWS); ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 98 civ. 6786, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims arising from the death of Grace Melotin, w/ prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 97 civ. 6341, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims arising from the death of Ghassan Haurani, w/ prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 97 civ. 6340, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims arising from the death of Nina J. Haurani, w/ prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action 96 civ. 9205, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims arising from the death of Anthony Roger Peter Caillaud, w/ prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 96 Civ. 9206, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims arising from the death of Daniel Marie Georges Caillaud, w/ prejudice each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) Modified on 04/22/2002 (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Order that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate all pending motions and the action is dismissed. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Jule Edward Anderson and Patricia A. Anderson purs to FRCP 41(a)(1); including all claims by or on behalf of the estates or the beneficiaries of Jule Edward Anderson and Patricia A. Anderson (including William N. Maxson, Meredith Kelly Anderson, Emily Claire Anderson, Jared Ryan Anderson and Patricia Ann Marion; Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand - Part I) (djc) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 438 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 03/08/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Elisabeth Marie Henriette Puichaud purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decedent Elisabeth Marie Henriette Puichaud (including Paul Puichaud, Marguerite Puichaud, Pierre Puichaud, Claire Puichaud and Benoit Puichaud); Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ) (djc) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Clara Jean Ersoz (including John D. Babb, Jr., Alfred W. Babb, Meryem Ersoz and Nathaniel Ersoz), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand- Part I )(sn) Modified on 03/01/2002 (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent William Robert Story (including Judith Mary Story, Anna Elizabeth Story and Jillian Mary Smith) with prejudice, and each party bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand, Part 1 ) (tp) Modified on 02/28/2002 (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Line Chaufer Berth, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (tp) Modified on 02/28/2002 (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Namik Ersoz, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); (also docketed in 97 cv 4255) (cd) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees ( signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand ); (also docketed in 97 cv 7120) (cd) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Dominique D'Humieres (including Dominique d'Humieres, Francois d'Humieres, Emmanuel d'Humieres, Benoit d'Humieres, Gerard David, Claude David, Eric David and Denise Lesieur); Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with Prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Kyle Charles Russell Miller (including Todd G. Miller, Trevor H. Miller, Glenn Miller and Melanie Dillman); This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 02/14/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Barbara Lynn Kwan (including Pamela J. Kwan, Alec Kwan McDuffie and Larry Kai Kwan), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the beneficiaries of decedent Elisabeth Marie Henriette Puichaud (including Gilles Roger), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Deborah A. Dickey (including Eugene R. Lorson, Drew E. Dickey, Lauren Nicole Dickey, Shannon Danielle Dickey and Maxine Lorson) pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Lonnie Lee Ingenhuett, in case #97cv5195. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) Modified on 03/01/2002 (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jenny Nelly Chaillou, in case #98cv5072. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) Modified on 03/01/2002 (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Douglas C. Dickey with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 98 cv 1042) (cd) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) of all claims arising from the deaths of Josette Thierry -Chauffer Line Chauffer Berthe and Jenny Nelly Chaillou ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 97 cv 6632) (cd) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Elizabeth S. Miller and Robert P. Miller (including Kristina Miller). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (tp) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent O. Lamar Allen (including Christine Grogan) are dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 01/30/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) arising from the death of Otis Lamar Allen with prejudice and each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 97 cv 6033) (cd) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Joseph Arthur Von Hedrich, III, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and atty fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 98 cv 4863) (cd) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with Prejudice purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims arising from the Death of Ashton Lamar Allen. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Richard Gordon Campbell ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 97 cv 6887) (cd) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Mirco Buttaroni and Monica Omiccioli, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jed Johnson purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Brent Leon Richey purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice (partial), purs. to 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Rick Lee Verhaeghe (including Barbara Jo Verhaeghe, Bryce Lee Verhaeghe and Grant Douglas Verhaeghe). Each party to bear its own costs and attornesys' fees.( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Pietro DiIorio (including Vincenzo DiIorio, Assunta Genitori Gallo, Giuseppina DiIoro). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 12/18/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 98 civ. 1668, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims w/ prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Ludovic Sebastien Pierre Chanson. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action no. 97 civ. 8868, w/ prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jill Ann Ziemkiewicz. This dismissal shall be w/ prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Mohammed Samir Ferrat (including Ahmed Ferrat and Chiraz Ferrat). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Antoine Jerome Francois Marie LaCaille d'Esse (including Christophe LaCaille d'Esse, Beatrice LaCaille d'Esse, Caroline LaCaille d'Esse and Hughes LaCaille d'Esse. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Barbara Lynn Kwan or the beneficiaries of decedent Barbara Lynn Kwan (including Joanne Ying Kwan). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kg) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Melinda Torche (including Trevor Bradford Minnis and Ralph Minnis, Trustee), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedents Ruth Daugherty Brooks and Edwin Bickford Brooks (including Melville Chapin, Edwin H. Brooks, II, Susan Mastrola, Sarah Foehl and Stephanie Elliman), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Cybele Marie Claire Alefsen de Boisredon (including Philippe Alefsen de Boisredon, Florence Alefsen de Boisredon, Eloise Alefsen de Boisredon, Elvina Alefsen de Boisredon, Timothee Alefsen de Boisredeon and Priscille Alefsen de Boisedon), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Eric W. Harkness (including Priscilla Ann Harkness, Velma O. Harkness and Swan Harkness, Jr.) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Michelle Jean Becker (including Walter F. Becker, Aurelie Becker, Christine M. Becker, Katherine A. Becker and Walter J. Becker), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Christine Susan Bailey DiIorio (including Chelsey Amanda Beaumont, Stephen Beaumont, Martin Beaumont and Andrew Beaumont) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Dalila Lucien (including Maria E. Lucien and Jon M. Lucien), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Daniel Callas (including Angelo Callas, Sotiria Callas and Joanne Callas), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Dalila Lucien (including Jon Marcus Lucien and Maria E. Lucien), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Dalila Lucien (including Jon Marcus Lucie and Maria E. Lucien), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Rodolphe Yves Charles Merieux (including Alain Merieux, Chantal Merieux, Chritophe Merieux and Alexandre Merieux). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Courtney Elizabeth Johns (including Frederick J. Johns, Barbara Johns, Geoffrey Johns and Jeremy Johns), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Constance Martin-Charbonnier (including Simon Charbonnier, Melvin Martin, Kenneth Martin and Marion Wayne Martin) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Sweet from Steven S. Bell, dated 10/2/01; counsel for the parties writes to request that the schedule another 3 to 4 day mediation session during the week of 11/26/01 or the week of 12/10/01. Mediation will be held, parties and counsel present on 11/26 through 11/28/01 . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (jp) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Chrisha Louise Siebert and Brenna Rae Siebert purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedents Chrisha Louise Siebert and Brenna Rae Siebert (including Larry R. Siebert and Helen L. Siebert). This dismissal shall be with prejduice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Victor Marrero ) (djc) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Eric Bernard Holst; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Eric Bernard Holst (including John R. Holst, Sr. and Joan M. Holst) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Victor Marrero, Part 1 ) (kkc) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Susan Carol Hill (including Mary-Ellen Houck and David Gerald Houck) are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Michel Jean Armand Breistroff (including Michel Evariste Armand Breistroff, Audrey Marguerite Petit Breistroff, Catherine Nancy Marguerite Breistroff and Caroline Audrey Sylvaine Jeanne Breistroff) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party is to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz ) (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estates or the beneficiaries of decedents Noemine Marie Richter and Anne-Lyse Gabrielle Richter (including Norbert Richter and Michelle Richter) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Alain Dominique Jean LaForge (including Valerie Jennequin LaForge, Julie LaForge, Laura LaForge, Christelle LaForge, Jean LaForge, Suzanne LaForge, Olivier LaForge, Jean-Noel LaForge, and Thierry LaForge). Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz, Part 1 ) (kg) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Alexandre Estival (including Michel Estival, Marie-Claude Roux, Marie-Anne Estival and Benjamin Estival, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz , Part I ) (kg) Modified on 08/08/2001 (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Lydie Teang and Chan Rachana Teang (including Soy Teang, Sokha Teang and Putheary Teang), with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz, Part I ) (kg) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the the death of Rance McKenzie Hettler, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Allen G. Schwartz, Part I ) (kg) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Elaine Frances Loffredo. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Barrington D. Parker Jr. ) (kg) (Entered: 07/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    PLNTF'S RESPONSE Re: Individual Cae Settlement Information (cd) (Entered: 07/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jordan Michael Bower purs to FRCP 41(a)(1); including all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent of Jordan Michael Bower (including Scott Arthur Bower and Cindy Mae Archanmbeau Tittinger); each party to bear its own costs and attorenys' fees; ( signed by Judge John S. Martin - Part I) (djc) Modified on 07/13/2001 (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jody Lea Loudenslager purs to FRCP 41(a)(1); including all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Jody Lea Loudenslager (including Elwood Leroy Loudenslager, Jr. and Norma Jean Loudenslater; Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge John S. Martin - Part I) (djc) Modified on 07/13/2001 (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Monica Michelle Weaver (including Robert C. Weaver and Louise Weaver), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Claire Aldona Gallagher (including Robert A. Gallagher and Barbara A. Gallagher), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Cheryl Lynne Nibert (including Donald Nibert and Donna C. Nibert), with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (pl) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) with prejudice of all claims by or on behalf from the death of Larissa Michele Uzupis (including Steven Uzupis and Michele Uzupis). ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (pl) Modified on 07/13/2001 (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees of all claims arising from the death of Jessica Lynn Aikey (including David R. Aikey and Sandra Aikey) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); also docketed in 98 cv 6334) (cd) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees of all claims arising from the death of Monica E. Cox (including Rober A. Cox and Cynthia E. Cox) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 98 cv 6338) (cd) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Amanda Marie Karschner; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Amanda Marie Karschner (including Dale M. Karschner and Pamela A. Karschner) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (kkc) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Seana Michelle Anderson (including Eugene W. Sullivan) shall be and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Kimberly Marie Rogers (including Kathy R. Rogers) shall be and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Michelle Elizabeth Bohlin (including Jeffrey Alan Bohlin and Yvonne Elizabeth Lundquist) shall be and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Daniel Edward Baszczewski; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Daniel Edward Baszczewski (including Edward J. Baszczewski and Dorothea A. Baszczewski) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (kkc) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Julia Danielle Grimm; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Julia Grimm (including Charles F. Grimm and Glenda Grimm) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ) (kkc) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Avishai Meshulam purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent (including Shimon Meshulam, Aiava Meshulam, Noam Meshulam and Oshat Grienberg); Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of Kathleen Veronica Feeney and Deirdre Mairead Feeney purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estates or the beneficiaries of decedents (named above - including John James Feeney); Eadh party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Susanne Grandt Jensen, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); also docketed in 97 cv 3651 (cd) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Wendy Yvonne Wolfson. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Eleanor Veronica Wolfson (including Steven Jay Wolfson and Robert Wolfson) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kkc) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 362 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 05/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Benoit Jacquemot (including Bernard Paul Antoine Jacquemot, Christiane Jacquemot, Laurent Jean-Marie Jacquemot and Isabelle Gisele Jacquemot), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Elsie Lopez Ostachiewicz; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the deaths of John Joseph O'Hara, III, Janet Marie Schmitz O'Hara and Caitlin Marie O'Hara; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Giuseppe Mercurio (including Michelino Mercurio, Prudenza Giovannelli, Carla Mercurio, Serafina Mercurio, Vita Mercurio, Pasquale Mercurio, Rosa Mercurio and Maria Mercurio) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Beverly C. Hammer (including Richard B. Hammer and Richard Andrew Hammer), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Serge Emmanuel Pares (including Emmanuel Pares, Josiane Podda and Sandrine Pares), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Larkyn Lynn Dwyer (including Ronald J. Dwyer and Ann K. Dwyer), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Lois Rose Van Epps (including Rose Mary Taylor, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedents Dennis G. Price and Peggy N. Price (including Anna-Marie Normile, Daniel K. Normile, Evan Kelly Price and Logan Lange Price) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Judith Connelly Delouvrier (including Philippe Delouvrier, Isabelle Delouvrier and Henry Delouvrier) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Edouard Francois Manchuelle (including Maryann Manchuelle, Julien Manchuelle, Irene Manchuelle and Elisabeth Manchuelle Deshayes) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Carine Emmanuelle Straus purs to FRCP 41(a)(l); this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jacquelin Alexis Watson purs to FRCP 41(a)(l); this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Joan Williams Miller purs to FRCP 41(a)(l); this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Celine Rio purs to FRCP 41(a)(l); this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Paula Ann Carven purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Paula Ann Carven (including Ann Veronica Carven, Arthur Francis Carven, III, Thomas Joseph Carven, Peter Joseph Carven and Sean Patrick Carven; each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Ronald W. Krick purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Ronald W. Krick (including Margaret J. Krick and Christopher Krick); each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 05/14/2001 (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Tracy Anne Hammer purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Tracy Hammer (including Richard B. Hammer and Richard Andrew Hammer), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 05/14/2001 (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Marie A. Louise Ellison (including all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Marie A. Louise Ellison - including Kirk Kress, Kathy Kress Burkhardt and Buck Charles Raymond Kress), purs to FRCP 41(a)(1); each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 05/14/2001 (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Pamela McPherson, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jean Jacques Zara, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41 (a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Jean-Paul Ronald Galland (including Aime Laurent Galland, Jeanne Claudia and Michel Jules Galland) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Christian Pierre Alex, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Benoit Jacquemot (98 cv 4951), purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Anna D'Alessandro purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 05/14/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) arising from the death of Katherine Elizabeth Lychner, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) ; also docketed in 97cv2079 (cd) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent James Robert Hull (including Richard Baxter Hull, Liessy Ramirez Hull, Michelle E. Hull, Cindy A. Hull and John Laurence Hull), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries fo decedent Chelsea Lynn Harris (including Jonathan P. Harris), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Daniel Paul Cyrille Grivet (including Jeanne M. Xena Brenna, Therese Emma Meyer Grivet, Jean Philippe Francois Grivet and Madeleine Francoise Grivet), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Rebecca Jane Olsen (including Carol Evelyn Miller Olsen, Donald Robert Olsen and Elizabeth Scott Olsen) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party is to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Alecia Creda Carlos-Nelson (including Richard A. Kassel, Kent Mancefield Nelson, Joseph Carlos and Michael Carlos) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party are to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (sac) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Marion Ott Percy pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) in case 97 civ. 8231. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum/Part I) (kw) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Pamela Sue Lychner pursaunt to FRCP 41(a)(1) in case 97 civ. 2077. Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum/Part I) (kw) Modified on 03/29/2001 (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Charles Roderick Foster pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) in case 98 civ. 1396. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum/Part I) (kw) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Douglas Alan Eshleman (including Lindley Heath Eshleman, Marilyn Sue Eshleman, Lindley J. Eshleman and Eric Eshleman) shall be, and hereby are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear it sown costs and attnys' fees; ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (lf) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Twyla Jewel Nelson (including Richard A. Kassel, Kent Mancefield Nelson, Joseph Carlos and Michael Carlos) shall be, and hereby are dismissed; this dismissal shall be w/ prejudice, ea. party to bear its own costs and attnys' fees; ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (lf) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of James Robert Hull (case #97cv7120), each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (lam) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Margot M. Krikhan (case #97cv3652), each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (lam) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Judith Katheryn Rupert (case #98cv1044) purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum, Part I ) (lam) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of Partial dismissal of action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Matthew James Alexander purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Matthew James Alexander (including Julian Alexander and Tari Alice Alexander; This dismisaal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum ) (djc) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 321 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (af) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of Barbara T. Romagna (including Leonard A. Romagna, Russell Romagna and John Romagna), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of Virginia Pelaez Holst (including Luz Mari Pelaez and Helmer Pelaez), with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 02/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Carol A. Fry, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Stephanie R. Thomas-Gaetke, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lam) Modified on 03/01/2001 (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of partial dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Gid Miller (including Betty L. Miller, Karla Esh, Michael Scott Miller and Arie Miller) in this suit with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) Modified on 02/06/2001 (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Donald E. Gough (including William E. Smith, Erik E. Gough and Eileen Zaharioudakis) pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Harry David Hogan (including Terry Hassen Hogan and Hilary H. Hogan) purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 97 cv 5161) (cd) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of action purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Britta Ruth Lohan (including Marie Luise Sophie Emma Lohan, Helmuth Lohan and Gerhard Lohan); This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decendent Britta Ruth Lohan (including Marie Luise Sophie Emma Lohan, Helmuth Lohan and Gerhard Lohan) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Angela Jean Murta, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), of all claims arising from the death of Jacqueline Remy, with prejudice each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (cd) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that, purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Brenda Privette (Including Jennifer Bone, Barry Privette, and Taylor Bone) in this suit are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (jp) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Debra Collins Di Luccio (including Antonio Di Luccio, Lauren Di Luccio and Pasquale Di Luccio) are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (jp) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Raili-Anneli Gough (including William E. Smith), are dismissed; this dismissal shall be with prejudice, ea. party to bear its own costs and attnys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lf) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Andrew H. Krukar including Julieanne Stuart, Richard Perry, Jared M. Krukar and Victoria Kiska, Guardina Ad Litem for Kyle P. Krukar) are dismissed; this dismissal shall be w/ prejudie, ea. party to bear its own costs and atnys' fees; (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lf) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; upon letter application of Reed Smith LLP, dated January 10, 2001, Reed Smith LLP is relieved as counsel for the plaintiff Maria Angela Guarducci Tofani, individually, and as persons representative and Administrator in Fact of the Estate of Mauro Tofani, and as Mother and Natural Guardian of Ilaria Tofani and Lorenzo Tofani, in the instant action purs to Local Civil Rule 1.4 ; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 01/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Rosario Furlano Pares, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones- Part I ) (sn) (Entered: 12/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Amy C. Miller purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones, Part I ) (lam) (Entered: 12/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by Petitioners Tiffany Rhoads Olson and Matthew S. Rhoads, co-administrators of the Estate of Harry Scott by Petitioners Tiffany Rhoads Olson and Matthew S. Rhoads, co-administrators of the Estate of Harry Scott Rhoads, III Deceased and approving order of distribution ; Return date not indicated. (djc) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Fracois Jean Albert Darlay (96cv8849), purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet) (lam) (Entered: 12/19/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, the wrongful death settlement of $1,900,00.00 to the Estate of Harry "Scott" Rhoads, III, deceased, is fair and reasonable and approved by the Court. Corboy & Demetrio, P.C., attorneys for plaintiffs, the Estate of Harry "Scott" Rhoads III, deceased, are entitled to attorneys fees in the amount of $380,000.00, and those fees are fair and reasonable. Corboy & Demetrio, P.C. is entitled to reimbursement of expenses attributable uniquely to this wrongful death cause of action in the amount of $2,816.13, as itemized in this order. The settlement is approved and the Co-Administrators, Tiffany Rhoads Olson, and Matthew Rhoads, are authorized and directed to execute releases upon receipt of the sum offered and to distribute the proceeds in accordance with the provisions of this order ; this cause is dismissed with prejudice and without costs . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Pascal Luc Simon Michel (including Odette Madeleine Jeannine Chareyron, Jean Edouard Louis Michel, Marie Agnes Aline Marthe Michel, Olivier Guy Andre Michel, Marie-Isabelle Josee Danielle Michel, Jean-Christophe Marc Francois Michel and Marie-Christelle Josyane Claude Michel) pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 12/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with Prejudice of all claims purs to FRCP 41(a)(1) of all claims by on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Nicholas William Pierre Maresq ( including Jacques Gerard Charles Maresq, Bernadette Augustine Berthe Maresq, Simone Alexandrine Barey, Roland Germain Georges Allix, Helene Endree Henriette Emilienne Blanchet Allix and DIdier Olivier Andre) arising from the death of Nicholas William Pierre Maresq; Each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 12/13/2000 (Entered: 12/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 297 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (da) (Entered: 12/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaies of decedent Monique Chemtob (including Helene Mursinna, Simone Chemtob, Salomon Chemtob and Jacques Chemtob) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) Modified on 12/05/2000 (Entered: 12/05/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims (this document relates to Snyder, et al. v. Boenig, et al. 98 cv 4991) by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Steven Edward Snyder (including Thomas L. Snyder, Henry W. Snyder and Ian Zepp) This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 12/05/2000 (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims (this document relates to Bergman, et al. v. Boenig, et al., 97 cv 6889) by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent D. Silverman (including Richard A. Bergman and Ronald P. Silverman) with prejudice arising from the death of Eugene D. Silverman purs to FRCP 41(a)(1). This dismissal shall be with prejudice each party to bear its own costs ansd attorneys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) Modified on 12/05/2000 (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of al claims arising from the death of Nicholas H. Bluestone (including Robert J. Bluestone, Barbara Bluestone and Cormac Bluestone) purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), with prejudice, each party to bear its costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); also docketed in 98 cv 4288 (cd) Modified on 12/04/2000 (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice of all claims, arising form the dath of Arthur Copeland Benjamin (including Caleb Benjamin, Rachel Benjamin and Sara Benjamin), purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); also docketed in 98 cv 1124 (cd) Modified on 12/04/2000 (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Jo-Anne Griffith, purs to FRCP 41(a)(l), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiciaries of decedent Jo-Anne Griffith (including Dane Sookram, Falcon Cara Griffith and Gerald Emile Griffith, II with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); also docketed in 97 cv 2073 (cd) Modified on 12/04/2000 (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims in case #98cv4099 that are by or on behalf of the estate or on the behalf of decendt Daniel Josephy Gaetke (including David Lee Gaetke, Lisa Cordova, Craig Gaetke, and Todd Gaetke) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. The dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 12/04/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendents Marietta Silverman, Candace Beth Silverman and Jamie Silverman (including Richard A. Bergman, Andrew Buckler, Andrew T. Buckler, Jr., James L. Buckler, Lewis R. Buckler, Ray E. Buckler and William M. Buckler) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. Theis dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the benefiiciaries of decedent Joan Evelyn Bauer Benjamin (including Caleb Benjamin, Rachel Benjamin and Sara Benjamin) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party are to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). This doc. relates to: 98 Civ. 1123 (RWS). (sac) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Michael George Schuldt (including Judith Arlene Schuldt) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). This doc. relates to: 98 civ. 6333 (RWS). (sac) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Alan J. Orman (including Judith Lewis and Sylvia Orman) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party is to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). This doc. is related to 97 Civ. 6811 (RWS). (sac) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, that Samuel Berthe, Krista A. Koponen, Robert O. Thomas and Dorothy Emerson are closed out and that the Clerk of the Court terminate all pending motions relating to and the action is closed as to these named parties ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Lani E. Cross (a/k/a Lani Warren Cross, Lani T. Warren and Lani T. Cross) are dismissed. This dismissal is with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 10/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal witn prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Lawrence E. Harris. Purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims oor on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decedent Lawrence E. Harris (including Lenore Harris and Theodore Harris) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees; This case relates to 97 Civ.1197. (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet) (djc) Modified on 10/26/2000 (Entered: 10/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (af) (Entered: 10/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, that in the event that defts pay damages, either by settlement or judgment, in any case for the death of an individual passenger or crew member, the defts shall pay the sum of $5,000 of the recovery directly to Pltffs' Liason Counsel, who shall deposit that sum in a Special Escrow Acct pending this Court's determination of the amount of the Pltffs' Commitee's expenses; in the event that defts pay damages, either by settlement or judgment, in any case for the death of an individual passenger or crew member in which the pltff is not represented by a member of the Pltffs' Commitees, the defts shall pay the sum of 4% of the gross recovery above $75,000 directly to Pltffs' Liaison Counsel, who shall deposit that sum in a Special Escrow Acct pending this Court's determination of the amount of the Pltffs' Committee's fee; in the event that a pltff has already received settlement monies from the defts from a settlement reached after 3/29/00, that such pltff and his or her counsel are responsible to make the payments of $5,000 and 4% of the gross recovery above $75,000 (in non-Copmmitee cases) as provided above (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 10/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Francis Gasq (including Angelita Pangan-Gasq, Murielle Gasq Coste and Sandrine Gasq-Dion) are hereby dismissed. This dismissal is with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 10/12/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; that purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Ingrid E. Paquet (including Siegfried E. Paquet) are dismissed. This dismissal is with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (sac) Modified on 10/12/2000 (Entered: 10/12/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs to FRCP 41(a)(l) with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Thomas Ralph Weatherby, III. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); (also docketed in 98 cv 5653) (cd) (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decendent Myriam Bellazoug (including Ammar Bellazoug, Ludmila Bellazoug, Yasmina Bellazoug, and Jean Michel Casnuau) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, and each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (pl) (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Donna Lynn Griffith (including Don E. Griffith and Marva Lee Griffith) shall be, and hereby are dismissed; this dismissal shall be w/ prejudice, ea. party to bear its own costs and attnys' fees; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (lf) Modified on 10/11/2000 (Entered: 10/11/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice of all claims arising from the death of Claire Suzanne Chambardon Gasq, purs. to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1); all claims on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decendent Claire Suzanne Chambardon Gasq (including Murielle Gasq Coste, Sandrine Gasq-Dion, Michel Jacques Ernest Gasq and Serge Henri Georges Gasq) are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sn) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Anna Kristina Skjold (including Sven Fagrenius, Gosta Skjold, Kerstin Skjold and Sara Skjold). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (This document relates to: Fargrenius, et al. v. Boeing, et al. 98 civ. 2640 (RWS). (kw) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or beneficiaries of decedent Anne Margaret Gustin (including Lawrence Gustin, Lawrence M. Gustin, and Kenneth Gustin) pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (This document relates to Gustin, et al. v. Boeing, et al. 97 Civ. 5731 (RWS)). (kw) Modified on 10/10/2000 (Entered: 10/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs to FRCP 41(a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Daniel Gabor (including Ann Gabor and Catherine Gabor); This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet) (djc) (Entered: 10/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal purs to FRCP (a)(1), of all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Huguette Meusnier Paquet (including Siegfried E. Paquet). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet) (djc) (Entered: 10/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, in the event that defts (or their insurers) pay damages, either by settlment or judgment, in any case for the death of an individual passenger or crew member, the defts (or their insurers) shall pay the sum of $5,000 of the recovery directly to Pltffs' Liason Counsel, who shall deposit that sum in a Special Escrow Acct pending this Court's determination of the amount of the Pltffs' Committee's expenses; in the event that defts (or their insurers) pay damages, either by settlement or judgment, in any case for the death of an individual passenger or crew member in which the pltff is not represented by a member of the Pltffs' Committee, the defts (or their insurers) shall pay the sum of 4% of the gross recovery above $75,000 directly to Pltffs' Liaison counsel, who shall deposit that sum in a Special Escrow Acct pending this Court's determination of the amount of the Pltffs' Committee's fees; in the event that a pltff has already received settlement monies from the defts (or their insurers) from a settlement reached after 3/29/00, that such pltff and his or her counsel are responsible to make the payments of $5,000 and 4% of the gross recovery above $75,000 (in non-Committee cases) as provided above ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 09/28/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: Order Affirm and matter is Remanded to district court in accordance with the opinion of this court. 98-9622, Roseann B. Mackechnie, Clerk. Statement of Costs taxed in tha amount of $649.50 in favor of Appelles Catherine Dadi etal. (sl) (Entered: 08/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Sweet from James P. Kreindler, dated 7/24/00, $50,000.00 has been advanced, and the final distribution includes the $50,000.00 advance ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 08/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff Committee's AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Pounian in support of [262-1] motion for an order requiring the payment of certain sums from settlement to be held in escrow pending determination of expenses and fees of the plaintiffs' committee . (djc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff Committee's MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [262-1] motion for an order requiring the payment of certain sums from each settlement to be held in escrow pending determination of the expenses and fees of the plaintiffs' committee. (djc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff Committee's NOTICE OF MOTION for an order requiring the payment of certain sums from each settlement to be held in escrow pending determination of the expenses and fees of the plaintiffs' committee ; Return date 8/9/00. (djc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decedent Ralph George Kevorkian (including Douglas Kevorkian and Christine Enlow) are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ri) (Entered: 05/25/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of name and address of attorney appearance for Catherine Dadi, John L. Hull, Betty L. Miller, Jennifer Bone, Samuel Berthe, Lindley H. Eshleman, Carol M. Olsen, Krista A. Koponen, Robert P Thomas, Dorothy Emerson, James Alexander, Barbara Verhaeghe, Crane Co., Lear Romec, Meryem Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Maurice Dadi, Marguerite Dadi, marc Dadi, Mireille Brami, Max Dadi, Michel Dadi, Martine Fournier, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo, Hazel L. Thomas, Angelo Callas, Sotiria Callas by Samuel Adams, Samuel Adams (djc) Modified on 05/15/2000 (Entered: 05/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Robert W. Sweet for the date(s) of 12/9/99. (ls) (Entered: 02/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/5/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND CONSENT; Reboul, MacMurray, Hewitt, Maynard & Kristol, 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, NY 10111, is substituted at co-counsel and co-attorneys of record for deft The Boeing Company, in place of Davis Weber & Edwards, P.C., 100 Park Ave. New York, NY 10017 as of 12/30/99 . ( signed by Judge Richard Owen- Part I ) (sn) Modified on 01/10/2000 (Entered: 01/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/13/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REVISED OPINION # 82953, defendants The Boeing Company and Trans World Arilines, Inc., have moved, on the ground of forum non conveniens, to dismiss each action in this multidistrict litigation arising from the death of a French domiciliary (the "French Actions"). For the reasons set forth herein, the motion is denied (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 10/14/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Pounian, James P. Kreindler, Frank H. Granito, Jr., Michael F. Baumeister, Floyd A. Wisner, Brian S. Riepen & Van Kirk Reeves by Catherine Dadi, pltffs in opposition to defts' joint motion to dismiss claims on behalf of all French decedents on the ground of Forum Non Conveniens (sac) (Entered: 10/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Catherine Dadi, pltffs in opposition to defts' joint motion to dismiss claims on behalf of all French decedents on the ground of Forum Non Conveniens (sac) (Entered: 10/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION # 82953, for the reasons set forth in this Opinion, defendants the Boeing Company and Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s motion to dismiss on the ground of forum non conveniens, is denied . (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet); Copies mailed. (ri) (Entered: 10/08/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by on or behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Maurice Andre Berthe (Samual Berthe, Genevieve Payan and Roger Berthe) in this suit shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Sweet from George F. Hritz, dated 7/28/99; granting defendants request that the Court order an additional extension of the briefing schedule on our forum non conveniens motion so that our reply papers are due on 8/6/99 . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 08/11/1999 (Entered: 08/10/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by Trans World Airlines, The Boeing Company in Support of Joint motion to dismiss claims on behalf of all French Decedents on the Ground of Forum Non Conveniens (djc) (Entered: 08/09/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz from the Firm: Davis Scott et al) . (cd) (Entered: 08/02/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Sweet from George F. Hritz, dated 7/9/99; defendants' reply to response to motion reset to 7/30/99 for [233-1] cross motion for an order granting a protective order, pursuant to FRCP 26(c), limiting plaintiffs' discovery into different model aircraft, different component parts, and dissimilar prior accidents and incidents . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 07/22/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 248 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault (af) (Entered: 07/13/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Catherine Dadi, Judith M. Story, John M. Lucien, John L. Hull, Betty L. Miller, Jennifer Bone, Berthe, Lindley H. Eshleman, Carol M. Olsen, Dorothy Emerson, James Alexander, Barbara Verhaeghe, Crane Co., Meryem Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Maurice Dadi, Marguerite Dadi, marc Dadi, Mireille Brami, Max Dadi, Michel Dadi, Martine Fournier, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo, Hazel L. Thomas, Angelo Callas, Sotiria Callas in opposition to defendants' joint motion to dismiss claims on behalf of all French Decedents on the ground of forum non conveniens (pl) (Entered: 06/23/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Frank H. Granito, Jr. by Catherine Dadi, Judith M. Story, John M. Lucien, John L. Hull, Betty L. Miller, Jennifer Bone, Samuel Berthe, Lindley H. Eshleman, Carol M. Olsen, Dorothy Emerson, James Alexander, Barbara Verhaeghe, Meryem Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Maurice Dadi, Marguerite Dadi, marc Dadi, Mireille Brami, Max Dadi, Michel Dadi, Martine Fournier, John Babb, Alfred Babb, Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo, Hazel L. Thomas, Angelo Callas, Sotiria Callas in opposition to defts' motion to dismiss the actions of the French nationals as forum non conveniens. (sac) (Entered: 06/24/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER, regarding procedures that will govern the handling of confidential information by non-party Honeywell ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed (cd) (Entered: 06/16/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault (da) (Entered: 05/28/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; purs. to FRCP 41(a)(1), all claims by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Steven K. Graham (including Kenneth Graham, Sandra Graham, and Ann Koistinen) shall be, and hereby are dismissed. This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (sac) (Entered: 04/06/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice that the record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (dt) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulated index to the record for interlocutory review of the 6/2/98 Opinion on the scope of the death on the high seas act. (jp) (Entered: 04/02/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter filed by Kenneth J. Lee, atty for Hydro-Aire and Crane Co. dated 03/01/99 re to update counsel address. (djc) (Entered: 03/03/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for pltffs Meville Chapin and Edwin H. Brooks, II, Executors of the Estate of Ruth D. Brooks a/k/a Ruth Daugherty Brooks a/k/a Ruth Louise Brooks, and Melville Chapin and Edwin H. Brooks, II, Executors of the Estate of Edwin B. Brooks a/k/a Edwain Bickford Brooks in the captioned matter (ls) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE (sac) (Entered: 01/12/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 237 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault (af) (Entered: 01/11/1999)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION #81658; that the title page of the opinion of this Court in the action, dated 12/14/98, is amended as follows: The name of Camille R. Nicodemus, Esq. is to be added as counsel to the firm of Haight, Gardner, Holland & Knight, atty for deft Trans World Airlines, Inc. ( Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (jp) (Entered: 12/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION # 81658 granting [136-1] cross motion for an order, granting summary judgment in favor of TWA on the ground that pltffs' decedents were not "passengers" aboard Flight 800 for purposes of the Warsaw Convention and pltffs are therefore limited to remedies purs. to state workers compensation law, denying [120-1] motion for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law ( Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. Document sent to Judgment Clerk. (jp) (Entered: 12/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by The Boeing Company to [227-1] motion to compel production of documents from defendant Boeing. (kw) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by The Boeing Company for an order granting a protective order, pursuant to FRCP 26(c), limiting plaintiffs' discovery into different model aircraft, different component parts, and dissimilar prior accidents and incidents ; affidavits in support are attached; Return date 12/2/98. (kw) (Entered: 12/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 12/01/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr.) (sac) (Entered: 12/01/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims by or on behalf of the estate of the beneficiaries of decedent Marit E. Rhoads (including plaintiff Robert O. Thomas) in this action, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ae) (Entered: 11/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in support of Steven R. Pounian by Catherine Dadi Re: [227-1] motion to compel production of documents from defendant Boeing (djc) (Entered: 11/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Committee's MEMORANDUM of LAW by Catherine Dadi in support of [227-1] motion to compel production of documents from defendant Boeing (djc) (Entered: 11/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLAINTIFF'S COMMITTEE'S NOTICE OF MOTION by Catherine Dadi (Plaintiffs' Committee) to compel production of documents from defendant Boeing ; Return date 12/2/98 (djc) Modified on 11/17/1998 (Entered: 11/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION #81499; the litigation arising from the loss of TWA 800 is difficult and complicated, and may burden the parties, this Court, and other federal trial and appellate courts from some time to come. Interlocutory appeal of the Opinion concerning the applicability of DOHSA should materially advance the ultimate termination of this litigation, particularly, of course, in the view of this Court, if happily the Opinion should be affirmed. The Opinion contains a controlling question of law, and there is a substantial ground for difference of opinion. The opinion is therefore certified for an immediate appeal ( Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (sac) Modified on 11/18/1998 (Entered: 11/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by Hydro-Aire, Inc. and Crane Co., to amended complaint; by attorney Mark Dombroff for defendant Hydro-Aire, Inc. (djc) (Entered: 11/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (cd) (Entered: 11/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (cd) (Entered: 11/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; Firm of: Haight Gardner by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (cd) (Entered: 11/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6787) (kw) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6787) (kw) Modified on 10/29/1998 (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6754) (kw) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6754) (kw) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6332) (kw) Modified on 10/29/1998 (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this document relates to 98 civ. 6332) (kw) (Entered: 10/29/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by Trans World Airlines, The Boeing Company, Hydro-Aire, Inc. re: in support of [162-1] motion for an order certifying the Court's 6/2/98 Opinion for an interlocutory appeal purs. to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1292 (b) (sac) (Entered: 10/26/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of all claims pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), by or on behalf of the estate or the beneficiaries of decedent Sandra J. Meade (including plaintiff Krista A. Koponen). This dismissal shall be with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 10/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; (this doc. relates to Melvin Martin and Kenneth Martin 98 Civ. 6755); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 10/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 10/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to 98 civ. 6753) (kw) (Entered: 10/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM in opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. (djc) (Entered: 10/15/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 10/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (sac) (Entered: 10/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (sac) (Entered: 10/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (sac) (Entered: 10/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to 98 civ. 6346) (kw) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. ( this document relates to 98 civ. 6343) (kw) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz); This doc. relates to: Robert C. Weaver, Jr. 98 Civ. 6345 (ae) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz); This doc. relates to Elwood L. Loudenslager, Jr. and Norma J. Loudenslager 98 Civ. 6341 (ae) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (this docmt relates to Delange, 97 cv 8701) (djc) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ) ; by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (related to Celestina Melotin, 98 cv 6786) (djc) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ) ; by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (William S. Rogers, Jr. and Kathy R. Rogers) (djc) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company; relates to Charles G. Grimm and Glenda Grimm. (djc) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (this document relates to: Allen, 97 Civ. 6033 ); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; (this doc. relates to: Robert A. Gallagher 98 Civ. 6339); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 10/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6344) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this document relates to 98 civ. 6344) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this document relates to 98 civ. 6345) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (this document relates to 98 civ. 6345)(kw) Modified on 10/05/1998 (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this relates to 98 civ. 6336) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 6339) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (this relates to 98 civ. 6339) (kw) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate (this doc. relates to Grimm) filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; (this doc. relates to Grimm); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; (this document relates to Judgith Arlene Schuldt ); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; (this doc. relates to Robert A. Cox and Cynthia E. Cox ); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 1.9 certificate ( this doc. relates to Bower ) filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; (this doc. relates to Bower ); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of service of Complaint in Intervention as to Trans World Airlines by Connie Bertini, General Agent, on 9/23/98; Answer to Intervenor Complaint due on 10/13/98 for Trans World Airlines (ae) (Entered: 10/01/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this document relates to Aikey, 98 civ. 6334) (kw) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate (This Doc. Relates To: Loudenslager) filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER (This Doc. Relates To: Loudenslager) to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 1.9 certificate (This Doc. Relates to: Carven) filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER (This Doc. Relates To: Carven) to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney ); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Text not available. (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER (This Doc. Relates To: Bohlin) to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) Modified on 09/23/1998 (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER (This Doc. Relates To: Aikey) to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) Modified on 09/23/1998 (Entered: 09/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in support of Paul A. Marber Re: [168-1] notice (sac) (Entered: 09/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Suzanne P. Beatty (sac) (Entered: 09/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (sac) (Entered: 09/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (this doc. relates to: Mariko Namba Delange 96 Civ. 8701) (ae) (Entered: 09/22/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION/JURY DEMAND by Henry Allen, Joceil Allen against Trans World Airlines, The Boeing Company (ls) Modified on 09/18/1998 (Entered: 09/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter to Judge Sweet from Steven R. Pounian dated 09/01/98, Return date reset to 10/14/98 for [162-1] motion for an order certifying the Court's 6/2/98 Opinion for an interlocutory appeal purs. to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1292 (b) ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (djc) (Entered: 09/11/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Trans World Airlines, The Boeing Company, Hydro-Aire, Inc. in support of [162-1] motion for an order certifying the Court's 6/2/98 Opinion for an interlocutory appeal purs. to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1292 (b) (ls) (Entered: 08/31/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Trans World Airlines, The Boeing Company, Hydro-Aire, Inc.; for an order certifying the Court's 6/2/98 Opinion for an interlocutory appeal purs. to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1292 (b) ; return date 9/16/98 (ls) (Entered: 08/31/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; regarding procedures that will govern the handling of "Confidential Information" ( signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff ); Copies mailed (sac) (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRIVACY ACT ORDER; to the extent that the FBI objects to the production of witness statements, summaries, or other doc's. on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act of 1974, 5 U.S.C. sec. 552a, that objection is overruled and the FBI and the NTSB under 5 U.S.C. sec. 552a(b) (1) shall produce the witness statements, summaries, and other doc's. to Boeing, as redacted, who shall make the doc's. available for inspection or copying by the other parties to the litigation in accordance w/ F.R.C.P. 34; should a party to the litigation demonstrate a need to know the names, addresses, other identifying particulars or personal info. of specific witnesses, the FBI and/or the NTSB shall produce the unredacted doc's. under 5 U.S.C. sec. 552a (b) (11) ; that should the FBI and/or the NTSB determine in good faith that a party to the litigation has failed to demonstrate sufficient need for add'l. unredacted doc's., this Court may review that determination at the request of the party and direct the release of add'l. unredacted doc's. as apropriate under 5 U.S.C. sec. 552a (b) (11); this order is w/o prejudice to any other objections that the FBI or NTSB may have to any party's discovery requests; ( signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff, Part I ); copies mailed (ls) Modified on 08/28/1998 (Entered: 08/28/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/25/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter to Judge Sweet from George F. Hritz dated 8/14/98; granting counsel for defts The Boeing Co., Trans World Airlines and Hydro-Aire's request for permission to serve and file a Memorandum of Law longer than 25 pages, purs. to the Judge's Indiv. Practice Rule 2C, effective 7/15/98 ; ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (ls) (Entered: 08/26/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 08/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr.) (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr.) (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Trans World Airlines) (sac) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (This doc. relates to: Karschner, 98 Civ. 5427) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr.) (This doc. relates to: Karschner, 98 Civ. 5427) (ae) Modified on 08/21/1998 (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (This doc. relates to: Donald Nibert and Donna Nibert, 98 Civ. 5426) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (This doc. relates to: Nibert, 98 Civ. 5426) (ae) Modified on 08/21/1998 (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr.) (This doc. relates to: Nibert, 98 Civ. 5426) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (This doc. relates to: Priscilla A. Harkness, 98 Cvi. 4817) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (This doc. relates to: Miller, 98 Civ. 4816) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (This doc. relates to: Miller, 98 Civ. 4816) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz), (This doc. relates to: Kristina A. Miller 98 Civ. 4816) (ae) (Entered: 08/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Hydro-Aire, Inc. (Attorney ); by attorney Mark Dombroff for defendant Hydro-Aire, Inc. (ls) Modified on 08/21/1998 (Entered: 08/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 56.1 statement filed by Trans World Airlines in opposition to pltff's Loffredo and Steward's motion for summary judgment (sac) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in opposition of William C. Brown, III by Trans World Airlines Re: in opposition to [120-1] motion for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law; in support of [136-1] cross motion for an order, granting summary judgment in favor of TWA on the ground that pltffs' decedents were not "passengers" aboard Flight 800 for purposes of the Warsaw Convention and pltffs are therefore limited to remedies purs. to state workers compensation law (sac) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Trans World Airlines re: in opposition to [120-1] motion for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law; in support of [136-1] cross motion for an order, granting summary judgment in favor of TWA on the ground that pltffs' decedents were not "passengers" aboard Flight 800 for purposes of the Warsaw Convention and pltffs are therefore limited to remedies purs. to state workers compensation law (sac) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 56.1 statement filed by Trans World Airlines (sac) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION by Trans World Airlines for an order, granting summary judgment in favor of TWA on the ground that pltffs' decedents were not "passengers" aboard Flight 800 for purposes of the Warsaw Convention and pltffs are therefore limited to remedies purs. to state workers compensation law ; Return date 8/26/98 (sac) Modified on 08/28/1998 (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (sac) (Entered: 08/19/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER; it is hereby stip. and agreed that the Complaint be amended to reflect that the pltff Terry H. Hogan be identified as the Administrator and/or Personal Representative of the Estate of H. David Hogan, Deceased, and accordingly, the caption to the Complaint be amended as set forth herein. The complaint in said action is hereby amended to reflect that the heirs and distributees of the decedent, H. David Hogan, include Terry H. Hogan and Hilary Hogan ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (sac) (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER; it is hereby stip. and agreed that the Complaint be amended to reflect that the pltff Myriam Marie Bossuyt brings this action Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Luc Y. Bossuyt, deceased, and accordingly, the caption to the Complaint is amended as set forth herein ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl ). (sac) (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER; it is hereby stipulated and agreed that the body of the Complaint in said action is hereby amended to add the names of the decedent's alleged next of kin. It is further stip. and agreed that Paragraph 6 of the Complaint in this action is hereby amended as set forth herein ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (sac) (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER, betw. the attorneys for the parties to this action for the deaths of the decedents, Chrisha L. Siebert and Brenna R. Siebert that the complaint be amended to reflect that the plaintiffs Larry R. Siebert and Helen L. Siebert bring this action each individually and as co-personal representatives of the Estates of Chrish L. Siebert, deceased and Brenna R. Siebert, deceased, and accordingly, the caption to the complaint be amended to read as set forth in this stipulation ; the answers previously served by defendants TWA, Inc and The Boeing Co., shall constitute their answers to the complaint as deemed amended in this action and it is understood and agreed that the allegations, denials and affirmative defenses set forth in said answers apply with equal effect to the amended complaint (signed by Judge John G. Koeltl, Part I ). (djc) Modified on 08/21/1998 (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, the caption to the Complaint shall be amended as set forth in this Stipulation and Order; Paragraph 6 of the Complaint shall be amended to reflect that this action is brought by and on behalf of the named plaintiff set forth in this Stipulation and Order; these amendments shall deemed corrected throughout the body of the Complaint; the Answer previously served by defendant The Boeing Co. shall constitute their Answer to the Complaint as deemed amended in this action and it is understood and agreed that the allegations, denials and affirmative defenses set forth in said Answer apply with equal effect to the amended complaint ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl, Part I ). (ae) Modified on 08/17/1998 (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER, the caption to the Complaint shall be amended to read as set forth in this Stipulation and Order; the Answers previously served by defendants Trans World Airlines, Inc., and The Boeing Co. shall constitute their Answers to the Complaint as deemed amended in this action and it is understood and agreed that the allegations, denials, and affirmative defenses set forth in said Answers apply with equal effect to the amended complaint ( signed by Judge John G. Koeltl, Part I ). (ae) Modified on 08/17/1998 (Entered: 08/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Hydro-Aire, Inc.; by attorney Mark Dombroff for defendant Hydro-Aire, Inc. (ls) (Entered: 08/12/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (cd) (Entered: 08/11/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; Firm of: Haight Gardner Holland & Knight by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (cd) (Entered: 08/11/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (This relates to 98 civ. 5106) (kw) (Entered: 08/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (This relates to 98 civ. 5103) (kw) (Entered: 08/05/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Steven R. Pounian by Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo in support of Re: [120-1] motion for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law (ae) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 56.1(a) statement filed by Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo (ae) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo in support of [120-1] motion for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law (ae) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Michael Steward, Robert J. Loffredo; for summary judgment striking each of defendant Trans World Airlines, Inc.'s affirmative defenses based on state workers' compensation law , Return date 8/26/98 (ae) (Entered: 08/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to 98 civ. 4991) (kw) (Entered: 08/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to 98 civ. 5071) (kw) Modified on 08/03/1998 (Entered: 08/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company, Cynthia A. Feigin for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 07/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney) by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 07/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/23/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (Attorney George F. Hritz) (This document is relates to 98 civ. 4877) (kw) (Entered: 07/27/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, TWA and Boeing will not move to dismiss 97cv9250, due to the lack of capacity of the plntf to bring or maintain the cause of action on behalf of the decedent's beneficiaries without first providing notice to plntf's counsel and allowing plntf a period of 120 days in which to obtain the appointment of a personal representative or administrator and, if necessary, have the personal representative or administrator joined or substituted as a plntf, which joinder or substitution shall relate back to the date of filing of the complaint in accordance with FRCP 17(a). This stipulation shall not apply unless the conditions set forth within are met ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (cd) (Entered: 07/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER; it is hereby stipulated and agreed that defts will not oppose pltffs' motion for leave to amend their current complaints in the Houck, Anderson, Kwan and Orrick actions. It is further stipulated and agreed that the Answers previously served and filed by the defts in each of these actions shall constitute its Answers to the amended complaints, specifically the Second Amended Complaint at Law in Houck, Anderson, Kwan and Orrick. It is understood and agreed that the allegations, denials and affirmative defenses set forth in said Answers apply with equal effect to the new claims asserted in the amended complaints. It is futher understood and agreed that the defts specifically deny that pltffs in Houck, Anderson, Kwan and Orrick actions are entitled to punitive damages under the applicable law ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ). (sac) Modified on 07/22/1998 (Entered: 07/20/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Meryem Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, John Babb, Alfred Babb , (Answer due 7/27/98 for The Boeing Company, for Trans World Airlines ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER; the parties herein hereby stipulate that the pltffs may amend their complaint in this action as set forth in this stip. The parties additionally stipulate that the defts previously filed an answer may apply to this Amended Complaint and any new allegations are deemed denied as of this time ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ). (sac) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER; that the caption to this action is amended as set forth in this stipulation; that the introduction and first paragraph of the complt. in this action is amended as set forth in this stipulation ; that the answers previously served by defts The Boeing Co. and Tans World Airlines, Inc. shall constitute their answers to the complt. as deemed amended in this action; that the allegations, denials and affirmative defenses set forth in said answers apply w/ equal effect to the claims deemed herein to have been made on behalf of newly named pltffs ; ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ). (ls) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Meryem Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, Nathaniel Ersoz, John Babb, Alfred Babb; (Answer due 7/29/98 for Hydro-Aire, Inc., for Lear Romec, for Crane Co. ); amending [1-1] complaint; summons issued. (ls) Modified on 07/17/1998 (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER, TWA and Boeing will not move to dismiss an action due to the lack of capacity of the plaintiff to bring or maintain the cause of action on behalf of the decedent's beneficiaries without first providing notice to plaintiff's counsel and allowing plaintiff a period of 120 days in which to obtain the appointment of a personal representative or administrator and, if necessary, have that personal representative or administrator joined or substituted as a plaintiff, which joinder or substitution shall relate back to the date of filing of the complaint in accordance with FRCP 17(a) ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein/Part I ). (kw) Modified on 07/20/1998 (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER TO AMEND THE COMPLT.; that the pltffs may amend their complt. as set forth in this Stipulation ; that the defts previously fld. answer may apply to this amended complt. and any new allegations are deemed denied as of this time ; ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ). (ls) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/13/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER granting [89-1] motion pursuant to FRCP 15(a), for leave to Amend Complaint and Order ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ). (djc) (Entered: 07/17/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4288) (kw) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4288) (kw) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4859) (kw) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4859) (kw) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4863) (kw) (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4863) (kw) Modified on 07/16/1998 (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION for an order pursuant to Rule 24 of the FRCP, permitting Henry Allen and Joceil Allen to intervene as party plaintiffs ; affirmation in support, affidavit in support and memo of law are attached; Return date 8/12/98. (this relates to 97 civ. 6033) (kw) Modified on 07/16/1998 (Entered: 07/16/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE; that Deborah E. Barnard and Ralph T. Leport, III, withdraw from representing pltffs Melvile Chapin and Edwin H., Brooks, II, Executors of the Estate of Ruth D.Brooks a/k/a Ruth Daugherty Brooks a/k/a Ruth Louise Brooks and Melville Chapin and Edwing H. Brooks, II, Executors of the Estate of Edwin B. Brooks ak/a Edwin Bickford Brooks in the captioned matter; representation of pltff will continue by Donald S. Nolan of the Law Offices of Donald S. Nolan, who appearance has already been entered in this matter and by Warner & Stackpole LLP through Michael M. DeMarco, whose appearance is entered simultaneously in this matter; (docket & file as per chmbrs.) (ls) Modified on 07/15/1998 (Entered: 07/15/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4297) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4297) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4302) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4302) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4304) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4304) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (this relates to 98 civ. 4127) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (this document relates to GASQ COSTE, 98 CIV. 4127) (kw) (Entered: 07/07/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Catherine Dadi, Judith M. Story, John M. Lucien, John L. Hull, Betty L. Miller, Jennifer Bone, Berthe, Lindley H. Eshleman, Carol M. Olsen, Krista A. Koponen, Robert P Thomas, Dorothy Emerson, James Alexander, Barbara Verhaeghe; pursuant to FRCP 15(a), for leave to Amend Complaint and Order (ae) (Entered: 07/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (This document relates to Ronald J. Dwyer and Ann K. Dwyer) 98 civ. 3359) (kw) (Entered: 06/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company w. acknowledgment of service. (djc) (Entered: 06/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION #80672, denying [29-1] motion purs to Rule 12 of the FRCP, dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims ( Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (ae) (Entered: 06/02/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/6/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Sweet filed for dates of 3/6/98 (bm) (Entered: 05/06/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (jp) (Entered: 04/21/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 03/24/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 03/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines. (This document relates to Gough, 98 civ. 1524) (kw) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines. (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.) (This document relates to Gough, 98 civ. 1524) (kw) (Entered: 03/18/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (This document relates to Caleb Benjamin 98 civ. 1123) (kw) (Entered: 03/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 03/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by The Boeing Company etal re: moiton to dimiss claims for non pecuniary damages (cd) Modified on 03/04/1998 (Entered: 03/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to Drew R. Dickey and Eugene R. Lorson, 98 civ. 1042) (kw) (Entered: 03/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (this document relates to Helene Mursinna 97 civ. 863) by attorney (kw) (Entered: 03/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (this document relates to Richard A. Frey, 98 civ. 1043) (kw) Modified on 03/04/1998 (Entered: 03/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 03/04/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (kw) (Entered: 02/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company by attorney George F. Hritz** This document relates to Hazel L. Thomas, 97 Civ. 8866** (kk) (Entered: 02/25/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (kw) (Entered: 02/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company by attorney George F. Hritz ** This document relates to Trevor B. Minnis 98 Civ. 442. (kk) (Entered: 02/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/17/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Pltffs' Committee in opposition to defts' Joint Motion to exclude remedies under all laws other than the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 USC 761-767 (emil) (Entered: 02/23/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/30/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO PLTFFS' FIRST REQUEST TO ADMIT by Hydro-Aire, Inc. (ls) (Entered: 02/03/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, that Torrington Company be permitted to intervene in Stuart v. Trans World Airlines, Inc and the Boeing Company, 97 cv 5093 (signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet) (djc) (Entered: 01/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines by attorney Randal Craft Jr. .. This document relates to 97 Civ. 7570 LUCIEN. (kk) (Entered: 12/01/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines.. This document relates to 97 Civ. 8231 PERCY. (kk) (Entered: 12/01/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal Craft Jr.)... This docment relates to 97 Civ. 8231 PERCY (kk) (Entered: 12/01/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by The Boeing Company to amended complaint .. Relates to Antonio Furlano, 97 Civ. 8049. (kk) (Entered: 11/28/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Hydro-Aire, Inc. (djc) (Entered: 11/20/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint in Intervention by Hydro-Aire, Inc. (Attorney Mark Dombroff); by attorney Mark Dombroff for defendant Hydro-Aire, Inc. (djc) (Entered: 11/20/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to The State Compensation Insurance Fund's Complaint In Intervention, by The Boeing Company; Firm of: Davis Weber by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (cd) (Entered: 11/06/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings held before Hon. Robert W. Sweet filed for dates of 9/11/97. (em) (Entered: 11/03/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (pl) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSOLDIATED ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. (pl) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSOLIDATED ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; by attorney George F. Hritz (pl) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney); by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines, William C. Brown III for defendant Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company, Cynthia A. Feigin for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company, Cynthia A. Feigin for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company. (kw) (Entered: 10/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, regarding procedures that will govern the handling of "Confidential Information" ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (kw) Modified on 10/09/1997 (Entered: 10/08/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz), ; Firm of: Davis Webber by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (cd) (Entered: 09/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney Cynthia A. Feigin); by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company, Cynthia A. Feigin for defendant The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 09/24/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; Firm of: Davis Weber by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (cd) (Entered: 09/23/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/16/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Trans World Airlines that, pursuant to Section VIII C. of Pretrial Order No. 1, dated 5/7/97, defendant hereby adopts its Consolidated Answer (a copy of which is attached) as its Answer to the Complaint. (ae) (Entered: 09/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/17/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER #2, the pretrial order of this Court, dated 5/8/97, is hereby amended pursuant to this Amended Order ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (ae) (Entered: 09/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by The Boeing Company (pl) (Entered: 09/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company; by attorney George F. Hritz (pl) (Entered: 09/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings held before Hon. Robert W. Sweet filed for dates of 06/09/97. (em) Modified on 08/11/1997 (Entered: 08/11/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Trans World Airlines by Haight Gardner Holland & Knight (cd) (Entered: 08/08/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection(s) to Pltffs' First Request for Production of Documents by Hydro-Aire, Inc. (kk) (Entered: 07/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo endorsed on motion; for Mark Anthony Gloade to appear pro hac vice to represent the estate of Andrew Krukar, and the minor children Kyle Krukar and Jerod Krukar ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (this document to be filed in 97cv5073 as per chambers on 7/18/97) (pl) (Entered: 07/18/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/3/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings filed before Judge Sweet for dates of May 21, 1997 (jp) (Entered: 07/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by The Boeing Company in support of [29-1] motion purs to Rule 12 of the FRCP, dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims (djc) (Entered: 07/02/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by The Boeing Company purs to Rule 12 of the FRCP, dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims ; Return date 10/8/97; w. attached affidavit (djc) (Entered: 07/02/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (pl) (Entered: 06/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines; by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (pl) (Entered: 06/25/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ), ; Firm of: Davis, Scott, Wever, et ano. by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft Jr.), ; Firm of: Haight, Gardner, et al. by attorney Randal R. Craft Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (ls) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney ), ; Firm of: by attorney Alan D. Reitzfeld for defendant Trans World Airlines, William C. Brown III for defendant Trans World Airlines, Randal R. Craft, Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consolidated ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney),: by attorney Alan D. Reitzfeld for defendant Trans World Airlines, William C. Brown III for defendant Trans World Airlines, Randal R. Craft, Jr. for defendant Trans World Airlines (djc) (Entered: 06/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER, extending defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint , reset answer due for 6/15/97 for Trans World Airlines. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (ae) Modified on 06/02/1997 (Entered: 06/02/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney ), ; Firm of: by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company; received in night dep. 5:28pm. (djc) (Entered: 05/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 1.9 certificate filed by The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 05/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSOLIDATED ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz), ; Firm of: Davis, Scott Weber & Edwards, by attorney George F. Hritz for defendant The Boeing Company (ls) (Entered: 05/30/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/28/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ORDER TO PRETRIAL ORDER #1, The pretrial Order of this Court, dated 5/8/97, is hereby amended to include the following procedures for case file management: Counsel wishing to file any documents relating to the above-entitled action only and not to be included in the main consolidated case file 96CV.7986, are to identify each document as follows: 96 Civ. 7986 (RWS) This doc. shall be filed in case file 96 Civ. 7986A after docketing. This doc. relates to 96 Civ. 7986 (RWS) only and shall not be filed in the main consolidated case file 96 Civ. 7986 (RWS). The Clerk's Office shall prepare and maintain a seperate file labelled 96 Civ. 7986A to receive all documents filed for the action 96 Civ. 7986 (RWS) only. All other conditions of pretrial Order #1 are unchanged. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) Copies mailed (ae) Modified on 05/29/1997 (Entered: 05/29/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company : amends [4-1] answer (pl) (Entered: 05/28/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter filed by attorneys' for Trans World Airlines dated 4/16/97 re Letter dated 4/14/97 (dkt. & flds. as per instr. of chambers on 5/15/97) (pl) (Entered: 05/19/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by Steven R. Pounian dated 4/16/97 re proposed order (pl) (Entered: 05/19/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER #1.. consolidating cases 96 Civ. 7986, 96 Civ. 8289, 96 Civ. 8370, 96 Civ. 8371 and any action previously or subsequently filed in or transferred to this district that arises out of the same facts as alleged or involves claims similar to those alleged in the Consolidated Action. Master Docket 96 Civ. 7986 for pretrial purposes and for all other related cases consolidated herewith. set pretrial conference for 5/21/97 ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed (kk) (Entered: 05/15/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION # 78533, FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH ABOVE, PRETRIAL ORDER NUMBER 1 WILL BE ENTERED W/ A PROVISION CHARGING THE PLTFFS' COMMITTEE W/ CONDUCTING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING COMMON LEGAL AND FACTUAL ISSUES RELATING TO DAMAGES. THE NEXT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 5/21/97 AND WILL ADDRESS SCHEDULING MATTERS. , set pretrial conference for set for 5/21/97...SO ORDERED... ( Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ); Copies mailed. (ls) (Entered: 05/09/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter dated 3/6/97 to Judge Sweet from Barclay Palmer. Request to bring a television camera into the courtroom is granted. Any portion of any tape of Mr. Kreindler shall be sealed and not used. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 03/10/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 9 certificate filed by Trans World Airlines (kw) (Entered: 01/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Trans World Airlines (Attorney Randal R. Craft, Jr., William C. Brown III, Alan D. Reitzfeld) (kw) (Entered: 01/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 1/7/97 for Trans World Airlines ( signed by Judge John S. Martin ). (djc) (Entered: 12/24/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION, extending time for deft Trans World Airlines, Inc. to answer to the Summons & Complaint is hereby extended to 12/19/96 , reset answer due for 12/19/96 for Trans World Airlines, Inc. ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ). (kg) (Entered: 12/03/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 9 certificate filed by The Boeing Company (emil) (Entered: 11/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company (Attorney George F. Hritz) (emil) (Entered: 11/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for The Boeing Company by George F. Hritz (emil) (Entered: 11/26/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of service as to The Boeing Company upon Paula Cash on 11/4/96 Answer due on 11/24/96 for The Boeing Company (djc) (Entered: 11/13/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 273096 (ba) (Entered: 10/29/1996)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 775 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?