Smith v. Egyptair, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-07901
District Judge Barbara S. Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 9:11 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George B. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michel Francis Baumeister +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 mbaumeister@baumeisterlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Dorothea M. Capone +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 tcapone@baumeisterlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
v.
No Logo Egyptair, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332al
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: None
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring action from the U.S.D.C. (S.D.N.Y.) to the Eastern District of New York. (bm) (Entered: 01/23/2001)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Egyptair. (lf) (Entered: 01/05/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None
      ANSWER to Complaint by Egyptair (Attorney Desmond T. Barry Jr.from the Firm: Condon & Forsyth LLP). (lf) (Entered: 01/05/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice of assignment to Judge Barbara S. Jones . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Dorothea M. Capone, Douglas A. Latto, Michel F. Baumeister .(jp) Modified on 11/02/2000 (Entered: 11/02/2000)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: None
          COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 387531. (bm) (Entered: 10/18/2000)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 57 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?