Koujan v. EgyptAir, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-03661
District Judge Frederic Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 24, 2017 at 6:22 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Samar Smoudi Koujan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JAVERBAUM, WURGAFT, HICKS, KAHN, WIKSTROM & SININS, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GERALD H. BAKER +1 201 659 2635 ghb@bakerlaw-nj.com
v.
No Logo EgyptAir, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clyde & Co US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Carlsen +1 212 710 3900 +1 212 710 3950 christopher.carlsen@clydeco.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Moataz Mohammed Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM et al. (Skinner, Jerry) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 416 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jerome L. Skinner for Moataz Mohammed, Dhalia Mohammed, and Mohammed Mohammed. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/5/06. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt No. 332924 for $25.00) (Black, Amanda) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by H. Rowan Gaither (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Gaither, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 407 Motion for Limited Admission of Kevin D. Boyce to practice pro hac vice. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/7/06. (Black, Amanda) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of firm and address by Christopher Carlsen firm and address Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Randal R. Craft, Jr on behalf of EgyptAir Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Craft, Randal) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              Letter from Hoda El Shawarby & Adel El Sayed to Judge Block, requesting permission to forward documents necessary to this case. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 391 Motion for Limited Admission Ordered by JudgeKiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/9/06. (Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Frederic Block : Status Conference held on 3/14/2006. Settlement discussed. Counsel will submit infant compromises soon. (Court Reporter Not Reported) Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Meryl Iris Schwartz on behalf of all parties Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Schwartz, Meryl) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: The parties are directed to submit via ECF, with courtesy copies to chambers, an updated joint status report on or before 11-11-05. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11-03-05. (Mattiske, Kristin) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: That the action is administratively closed without prejudice. c/m by chambers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/25/05. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-00795-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-01388-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03661-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03663-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03664-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03665-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-04059-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-04232-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-05007-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05123-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05357-FB,1:00-cv-05358-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05359-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05360-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05362-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05409-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05410-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05793-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05956-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05957-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06161-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06210-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06211-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06212-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06213-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06222-FB-CLP,1:00-cv-06471-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06473-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06483-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06485-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06486-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06501-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06521-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06523-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06524-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06525-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06727-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07160-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-07161-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07165-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-07237-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07238-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07527-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07623-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00168-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00169-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00170-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00171-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00172-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00173-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00174-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00175-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00176-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00177-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00178-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00179-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00180-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00269-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00461-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00462-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00463-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01465-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01885-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01886-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01887-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01888-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01889-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01890-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01891-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01892-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01893-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01894-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01895-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-02092-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-02116-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-03132-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-03273-FB-ASC,1:99-cv-08251-FB-ASC(Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: None
                          SEALED AMENDED INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER. (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 10/15/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: None
                            TRANSCRIPT filed of settlement conference before JUdge Block for dates of 9/25/01 at 12:00p.m. Plaintiff counsel: Gerald Baker and Abed Awad. Court Reporter: Gene Rudolph. (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None
                              SEALED COMPROMISE ORDER (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 10/01/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Calendar entry:Before Judge Block on 9/25/01 at 11:00a.m. Int: Abed Awad-Arabic. Case called. Counsel for plaintiffs and infants present, plaintiff contacted by telephone in Syria, the court signs the infant compromise order as amended in court on the recird, counsel will submit a amended infant compromise order. Court Reporter/ESR Gene Rudolph (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 09/27/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  LETTER dated 8/8/01 from Gerald Baker to Judge Block, advising that the parties have settled the above case and request the case be set for an infant compromise hearing. (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 09/06/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    INTER-OFFICE MEMO from Mag. Chrein to Judge Block dated 8/8/01, stating that this case has been settled and the actual settlement will require an infant compromise. (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 08/16/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER dated 8/8/01 from Gerald Baker to Judge Block, advising that the parties have settled the above case after a mediation conference with Mag. Chrein. (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure of interested parties by EgyptAir, Inc. in 1:00-cv-03661, filed in S.D.N.Y. on 1/19/00. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by EgyptAir, Inc. in 1:00-cv-03661, filed in the S.D. of N.Y. on 1/19/00. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 07/18/2000)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: None
                                            Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of S.D.N.Y., except for Document No. 1, the Complaint, and except for Document No. 6, the Rule 1.9 Certificate filed by EgyptAir; they will be sent when they are located. Their case number is 99-cv-11415. (Vaughn, Terry) Modified on 07/18/2000 (Entered: 07/12/2000)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None
                                              Certified Copy of the M.D.L. Panel's Transfer Order. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2000, Entered: None
                                                LETTER dated June 7, 2000, from the M.D.L. Panel to the U.S.D.C., E.D.N.Y., enclosing a copy of the Panel's Transfer Order transferring the civil actions listed in Schedule A to the E.D. of N.Y. for consolidation into M.D.L. No. 1,344, re Air Crash Near Nantucket Island, Massachusetts, on October 31, 1999, and assigned to the Honorable Frederic Block, U.S.D.J. The cases listed in Schedule A are the following: (1) from E.D.N.Y. 1:99-8251, 1:00-cv-795 and 1:00-cv-1388; (2) from S.D.N.Y. 1:99-11415 and 1:00-1720; (3) from C.D. of Calif. 2:00-1460 and 2:00-1710; and (4) from E.D. of Penn. 1:00-1266. (Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 06/21/2000)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?