Smith v. EgyptAir
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00180
District Judge Frederic Block, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 5:08 PM ST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Judge George B. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baumeister & Samuels, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Baumeister +1 212 363 1200
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothea M. Capone +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 tcapone@baumeisterlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Latto +1 212 363 1200 +1 212 363 1346 dlatto@baumeisterlaw.com
v.
No Logo Egyptair, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by Moataz Mohammed Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM et al. (Skinner, Jerry) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 416 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jerome L. Skinner for Moataz Mohammed, Dhalia Mohammed, and Mohammed Mohammed. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 12/5/06. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt No. 332924 for $25.00) (Black, Amanda) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by H. Rowan Gaither (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Gaither, H.) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 407 Motion for Limited Admission of Kevin D. Boyce to practice pro hac vice. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 8/7/06. (Black, Amanda) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of firm and address by Christopher Carlsen firm and address Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Carlsen, Christopher) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Randal R. Craft, Jr on behalf of EgyptAir Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Craft, Randal) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              Letter from Hoda El Shawarby & Adel El Sayed to Judge Block, requesting permission to forward documents necessary to this case. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 391 Motion for Limited Admission Ordered by JudgeKiyo A. Matsumoto on 6/9/06. (Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Frederic Block : Status Conference held on 3/14/2006. Settlement discussed. Counsel will submit infant compromises soon. (Court Reporter Not Reported) Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:02-cv-01787-FB-ASC, 1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/15/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Meryl Iris Schwartz on behalf of all parties Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-00795-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-01388-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03661-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03663-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03664-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-03665-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04059-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-04232-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05007-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05123-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05357-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05358-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05359-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05360-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05362-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05409-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-05410-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05793-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05956-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-05957-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06161-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06210-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06211-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06212-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06213-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06222-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06471-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06473-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06483-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06485-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06486-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06501-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06521-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06523-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06524-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-06525-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-06727-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07160-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07161-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07165-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07237-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07238-FB-KAM,1:00-cv-07527-FB-KAM, 1:00-cv-07623-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00168-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00169-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00170-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00171-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00172-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00173-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00174-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00175-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00176-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00177-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00178-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00179-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00180-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00269-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00461-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-00462-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-00463-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01465-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01885-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01886-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01887-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01888-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01889-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01890-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01891-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01892-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01893-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-01894-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-01895-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02092-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-02116-FB-KAM, 1:01-cv-03132-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-03273-FB-KAM,1:01-cv-05877-FB-ASC,1:99-cv-08251-FB-KAM(Schwartz, Meryl) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: The parties are directed to submit via ECF, with courtesy copies to chambers, an updated joint status report on or before 11-11-05. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 11-03-05. (Mattiske, Kristin) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: That the action is administratively closed without prejudice. c/m by chambers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/25/05. Associated Cases: 1:00-md-01344-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-00795-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-01388-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03661-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-03662-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03663-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03664-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-03665-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-03888-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-04059-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-04232-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-05007-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05081-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05123-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05357-FB,1:00-cv-05358-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05359-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05360-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05362-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05409-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05410-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-05793-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05956-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-05957-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06161-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06210-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06211-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06212-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06213-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06222-FB-CLP,1:00-cv-06471-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06473-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06483-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06485-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06486-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06501-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06503-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06521-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06523-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06524-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-06525-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-06727-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07160-FB-VVP,1:00-cv-07161-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07165-FB-ASC, 1:00-cv-07237-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07238-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07527-FB-ASC,1:00-cv-07623-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00168-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00169-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00170-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00171-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00172-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00173-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00174-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00175-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00176-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00177-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00178-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00179-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00180-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00269-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00461-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-00462-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-00463-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01465-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01885-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01886-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01887-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01888-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01889-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01890-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01891-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01892-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01893-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-01894-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-01895-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-02092-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-02116-FB-ASC,1:01-cv-03132-FB-ASC, 1:01-cv-03273-FB-ASC,1:99-cv-08251-FB-ASC(Williams-Jackson, Sandy) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                          STIPULATION and ORDER of dismissal, with prejudice and without costs to either party. ( signed by Judge Frederic Block , on 8/2/01) (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None
                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (Frullo, Veronica) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER (w/attachments) dated 4/30/01 from Douglas Latto of Baumeister & Samuels to Judge Block advising the Court that the parties have reached a settlement with respect to the deaths of Arthur and Betty Smith. Mr. Latto requests that Judge Block execute the proposed Order formally approving the settlement of this action. (Frullo, Veronica) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: None
                                Original file, including the complaint and EgyptAir's answer, a certified copy of the MDL Panel's transfer order and a certified copy of the docket sheet received from the Southern District of New York pursuant to the MDL Panel's CTO-8 for the consolidation of this action into MDL 1344 regarding Air Crash Near Nantucket Island, Massachusetts, on October 31, 1999. SDNY's case no. is 00-CV-7901. (Frullo, Veronica) (Entered: 01/26/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None
                                  LETTER dated 1/16/01 from Veronica Frullo, Deputy Clerk to James Parkison, Clerk in S.D. of New York, enclosing a certified copy of the Panel's Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-8) and requesting a certified copy of their docket sheet and their file for consolidation of this action into MDL 1344 re: Air Crash Near Nantucket Island. Their case number is 1:00-cv-7901. (Frullo, Veronica) Modified on 01/16/2001 (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None
                                    LETTER dated 12/29/00 from MDL Panel to Robert Heinemann enclosing a Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-8) for consolidation of this action into MDL 1344 re: Air Crash Near Nantucket Island, Massachusetts, on October 31, 1999. (Frullo, Veronica) (Entered: 01/16/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?