Sonus Networks, Inc. v. Inventergy, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00322

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 10:07 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sonus Networks, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Shane Brun +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 sbrun@goodwinlaw.com
Space Srikanth K. Reddy +1 617 570 1465 sreddy@goodwinprocter.com
Space Michael Gavin Strapp +1 617 570 1658 +1 617 523 1231 mstrapp@goodwinproctor.com
v.
No Logo Inventergy Global, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Inventergy, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Amended Document (Not Motion)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                CLERK'S NOTICE. Status Report due by 11/17/2015. Status Conference reset from 11/12/2015 to 11/24/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sonus Networks, Inc. byInventergy Global, Inc., Inventergy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Holm, Chris) (Filed on 8/6/2015) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC from 9:30 a.m. to 1:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE - CMC set for 5/14/15 at 1:30 p.m. A joint CMC statement shall be filed by 5/7/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC from 5/7/15 to 5/14/15 at 1:30 p.m. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER - The Court hereby defers consideration of Defendant Inventergy Inc.'s motion to dismiss, or in the alternative transfer venue, Docket No. 34, and motion to strike, Docket No. 35, until Plaintiff Sonus Network's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint, Docket No. 40, is heard and decided by this Court. The motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is currently set for hearing on May 14, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. If Plaintiff's motion for leave is denied, Defendant may re-notice its currently pending motions for a new hearing date. Issued by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2015) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Re-notice motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Inventergy Global, Inc., Inventergy, Inc... (Holm, Chris) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Inventergy Global, Inc., Inventergy, Inc. of Related Cases (Holm, Chris) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by Inventergy Global, Inc., Inventergy, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/3/2015. Replies due by 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Holm, Chris) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?