Landmark Technology LLC v. The Michaels Companies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00068

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 5:05 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Martin Gibson +1 310 201 3548 +1 310 203 0567 sgibson@jmbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
v.
No Logo The Michaels Companies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A Pine jpine@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victor C. Johnson +1 214 462 6400 +1 214 462 6401 vjohnson@dykema.com
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 37 Motion to Stay. All deadlines and proceedings are stayed to 8-20-2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/22/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION for Entry of the Parties' Proposed Protective Order by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/9/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by The Michaels Companies, Inc.. (Johnson, Victor) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/25/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landmark Technology LLC. The Michaels Companies, Inc. served on 1/29/2015, answer due 2/19/2015. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to The Michaels Companies, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?