Hilton v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-10322

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 3, 2019 at 3:33 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eric Hilton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by kelawpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Evanchek +1 810 767 1670 John@kelawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Warner Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Charles Warner +1 312 238 9820 +1 312 638 9139 cwarner@warnerlawllc.com
v.
No Logo Encore Capital Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron L. Vorce +1 517 374 9150 +1 517 374 9191 avorce@dykema.com
No Logo Midland Credit Management, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron L. Vorce +1 517 374 9150 +1 517 374 9191 avorce@dykema.com
Midland Funding LLC Midland Funding LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore Wilson Seitz +1 517 374 9149 +1 517 374 9191 tseitz@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron L. Vorce +1 517 374 9150 +1 517 374 9191 avorce@dykema.com
No Logo Stillman Law Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stillman Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica N. Hunt +1 248 851 6000 +1 248 851 6029 mhunt@stillmanlaw.com
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Judgment*
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Appeal Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
            Certificate of Service re 44 Notice of Appeal. (LGra) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Eric Hilton re 43 Order Dismissing Case. Receipt No: 0645-5670177 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Dismissing Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Motion - Free
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Leave to File
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Withdraw Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Certify Class
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Appear*
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midland Funding LLC identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Funding LLC. (Vorce, Aaron) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                          STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Vorce, Aaron) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                            STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Encore Capital Group, Inc. (Vorce, Aaron) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                  EXHIBIT , Supplemental Appendix 3 4 , Bentauos v. Asset Acceptance, LLC, Civl No. - JFM-13-3314, (D. Md. 2014), Affidavit of Kevin R. Smith and Select Attached Exhibits re 25 Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by Eric Hilton (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                          [STRICKEN] STIPULATION re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Trial Court Proceedings (Second Filing) by Eric Hilton (Warner, Curtis) Modified on 4/17/2015 (Loury, R). (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                              [STRICKEN] STIPULATION re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Trial Court Proceedings to file excess pages and for an extension of time for Defendants' Reply by Eric Hilton (Warner, Curtis) Modified on 4/17/2015 (Loury, R). (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    EXHIBIT A re 1 Complaint,, by Eric Hilton (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stillman Law Office identifying Corporate Parent Stillman Law Office for Stillman Law Office. (Hunt, Monica) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2015, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Aaron L. Vorce appearing on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Vorce, Aaron) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Theodore W. Seitz appearing on behalf of Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC (Seitz, Theodore) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 2/16/2015, answer due 3/9/2015. (Evanchek, John) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Midland Funding LLC served on 2/16/2015, answer due 3/9/2015. (Evanchek, John) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Encore Capital Group, Inc. served on 2/20/2015, answer due 3/13/2015. (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Stillman Law Office served on 2/3/2015, answer due 2/24/2015. (Evanchek, John) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. Evanchek appearing on behalf of Eric Hilton (Evanchek, John) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TMcg) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/24/2015, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/24/2015, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by Eric Hilton against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4996001 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: San Diego County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Warner, Curtis) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?