USA v. Acct 263226700, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-04483
District Judge John A. Nordberg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 8:11 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marsha A. McClellan +1 312 353 5300 +1 312 353 4324 marsha.mcclellan@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Funds in Account Number 00400220 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 263226700 held by First Heritage Bank in the name of Bola Tinubu, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 39483134 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 39483396 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 39936383 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 39936404 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 4650279566 held by Citibank, N.A. in the name of Bola Tinubu or Compass Finance & Investment Co.,, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 52050-89451952 held by Citibank, International in the name of Bola Tinubu, Defendant
No Logo Funds in Account Number 52050-89451953 held by Citibank, International in the name of Bola Tinubu, Defendant
No Logo Alhaji Mogati, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whyte Hirschboeck Dudek, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Sean Coffey +1 312 523 2080 pcoffey@whdlaw.com
No Logo Bola Tinubu, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whyte Hirschboeck Dudek, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Sean Coffey +1 312 523 2080 pcoffey@whdlaw.com
No Logo K O Tinubu, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whyte Hirschboeck Dudek, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Sean Coffey +1 312 523 2080 pcoffey@whdlaw.com
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 0881
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Office Chicago
Filed 7/26/1993
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Cause Section 21 U.S.C. § 0881 Forfeiture of Property
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Cook
Terminated 10/4/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags KEYS,TERMED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/1993, Entered: 10/5/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
MINUTE ORDER of 10/4/93 by Hon. John A. Nordberg : Counsel for the plaintiff appeared. Enter Decree of Forfeiture as to funds held by First Heritage Bank. It is ordered that the funds in the amount of $460,000 in account 263226700 held by First Heritage Bank in the name of Bola Tinubu are forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 USC 881(a)(6) and 18 USC 981. It is ordered that First Heritage Bank shall issue a check in the amount of $460,000 payable to Federal Reserve Bank of Chicago terminating case Mailed notice (fce)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/1993, Entered: 10/5/1993 Order
    DECREE OF FORFEITURE as to funds held by First Heritage Bank. (fce)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: 10/5/1993 text entry
      CERTIFICATE of publication by plaintiff (vkd)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 Affidavit
        RULE 39 Affidavit of Patrick Sean Coffey (vkd)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 Attorney Appearance
          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for claimants Bola Tinubu, K O Tinubu and Alhaji Mogati by Patrick Sean Coffey (vkd)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
            MINUTE ORDER of 9/15/93 by Hon. John A. Nordberg : Status hearing held; continued to 10/04/93 at 9:00 a.m. Enter settlement order of claims to funds held by Heritage Bank and Citibank. Patrick Coffey granted leave to file an appearance on behalf of claimants Bola Tinubu, K.O. Tinubu and Alhaji Mogati. Mailed notice (vkd)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 Order
              SETTLEMENT ORDER of claims to funds held by Heritage Bank and Citibank. (vkd)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993 Stipulation
                STIPULATION and compromise settlement of claims to the funds held by Heritage Bank and Citibank. (vkd)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Return of Service .....
                  RETURN OF SERVICE by U.S. Marshals Service executed upon Kevin Moss, IRS on 8/25/93 (vkd)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Return of Service .....
                    RETURN OF SERVICE by U.S. Marshals Service executed upon defendant Acct 263226700 on 8/24/93 (vkd)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Return of Service .....
                      RETURN OF SERVICE by U.S. Marshals Service executed upon Patrick S Coffey on 8/26/93 (vkd)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/7/1993 Return of Service .....
                        RETURN OF SERVICE by U.S. Marshals Service executed upon defendants Acct 52050-89451952, Acct 52050-89451953, Acct 39483134, Acct 39483396, Acct 4650279566, Acct 00400220, Acct 39936404 and Acct 39936383 on 8/24/93 (vkd)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/1993, Entered: 8/20/1993 attorney designation
                          DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY Marsha A. McClellan as US Attorney (vkd)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 8/19/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                            MINUTE ORDER of 8/18/93 by Hon. John A. Nordberg : Ex parte motion of the United States for order relating to execution of seizure [3-1] is granted. Mailed notice (vkd)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 8/19/1993 Order
                              ORDER regarding motion for order relating to execution of seizure [3-1] (vkd)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/18/1993, Entered: 8/19/1993 Motion for Order
                                EX PARTE MOTION by plaintiff USA for order relating to execution of seizure . (vkd) Modified on 08/19/1993
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/27/1993, Entered: 7/28/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                  MINUTE ORDER of 7/27/93 by Hon. John A. Nordberg : Status hearing set for 09/15/93 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall notify all other parties of hearing. Mailed notice (vkd)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 7/28/1993 Complaint
                                    VERIFIED COMPLAINT for forfeiture; Affidavit; - Civil cover sheet - Marsha A. McClellan as AUSA (No summonses issued) ( Documents: 1-1 through 1-3) (vkd) Modified on 07/28/1993
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Blank  Warrant Issued
                                      WARRANT of seizuer & monition issued, three originals and three copies. (vkd)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 1,735 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?