Myers, et al v. Cyrix Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:94-cv-02746
District Judge A. Joe Fish, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 7:00 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Holly Cohen, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard J D Myers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard Barrack +1 215 963 0600 +1 215 963 0838 lbarrack@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted M. Richard Komins +1 215 963 0600 +1 215 963 0838 rkomins@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Gerald J. Rodos +1 215 963 0600

Toggle Switch Represented by Rudolph Salmon Goldstein Rochestie & Dorian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Stephan H Goldstein +1 215 299 9900

Toggle Switch Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Eugene A. Spector +1 215 496 0300 +1 215 496 6611 espector@srkw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Barry C. Barnett +1 214 754 1903 +1 214 754 1933 bbarnett@susmangodfrey.com
v.
Cyrix Corporation Cyrix Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Clarke, Jr. +1 212 450 4000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Robert Frank Wise, Jr. +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3512 rwise@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Robert C Walters +1 214 698 3114 +1 214 571 2900 RWalters@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Gerald D Rogers, Defendant
No Logo Harvey B Cash, Defendant
No Logo Ronald P Edgerton, Defendant
No Logo Thomas B Brightman, Defendant
No Logo Barry B Roseman DMD MD Profit Sharing Plan, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Roberta D. Liebenberg - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 rliebenberg@finekaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman Silverstein Kohl Rose & Podolsky, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted James M Orman +1 215 575 7630
No Logo Chester W Green, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lawrence A. Sucharow +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477
No Logo Marilyn Mandel, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Lawrence G Soicher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence G Soicher +1 212 883 8000
No Logo Max Fecht, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by dallascriminallawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing John Michael Helms, Jr. +1 214 720 9552 +1 214 720 9594 john@dallascriminallawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Genna C Driscoll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Genna C Driscoll +1 215 875 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Sherrie R Savet

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrie R Savet +1 215 875 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Bemporad +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 rb@ddw-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Terrell Wallace Oxford +1 214 754 1902 +1 214 754 1933 toxford@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Michael Malone, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Neil Stockhamer, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman Malchman Kirby & Squire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger W Kirby +1 212 371 6600
Space Peter S Linden +1 212 371 6600
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Jeffrey H Squire +1 212 371 6600 + 212 751 2540

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Kenneth A Elan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Allen Elan +1 212 619 0261 +1 212 385 2751
No Logo Norman Cooper, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Syputa, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas E Genna, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ABBEY GARDY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Mark Cassar Gardy +1 212 889 3700 +1 212 684 5191

Toggle Switch Represented by Claxton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Roger F Claxton +1 214 969 9029 +1 214 953 0583 roger@claxtonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill & Hill Attorneys and Counselors PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Robert J Hill +1 469 241 9355 +1 469 241 9356 rhill@hillandhill-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Daniel Alan Weinstein +1 214 969 9099 + 214 953 0133

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Richard S. Schiffrin +1 610 667 7706 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Squitieri & Fearon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Lee Squitieri +1 212 421 6492 +1 212 241 6553
No Logo Thomas W Randall, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Theodore C Anderson +1 214 379 0810 +1 214 379 0846 tca@kilgorelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing W D Masterson, III +1 214 969 9099 +1 214 953 0677 wdm@kilgorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted David J. Bershad +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 dbershad@milberg.com
Bar Status: Not Admitted Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Turley Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing William G Shaw, Jr. +1 214 295 4755 +1 214 775 2666 wshaw@iplawtexas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Joseph H. Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslurie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan L Lurie +1 310 208 2800
No Logo Tyger Group, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brower Piven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted David A P Brower +1 917 696 8558 +1 212 501 0300

Toggle Switch Represented by World Trade Center Baltimore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Not Admitted Charles J Piven +1 410 332 0030
No Logo Berry Cash, Consol Defendant
No Logo Geoffrey S Eccleston, Consol Defendant
No Logo James N Chapman, Consol Defendant
No Logo Kevin Mcdonough, Consol Defendant
No Logo Melvin Sharp, Consol Defendant
No Logo Michael E Barton, Consol Defendant
No Logo Nancy B Dechaud, Consol Defendant
No Logo Robert T Derby, Consol Defendant
No Logo Stephen Domenick, Consol Defendant
No Logo Timothy W Kinnear, Consol Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: None
JUDGMENT for defendant Cyrix Corporation, defendant Gerald D Rogers, defendant Thomas B Brightman, defendant Ronald P Edgerton, defendant Harvey B Cash, consolidated defendant Stephen Domenick, consolidated defendant Timothy W Kinnear, consolidated defendant Berry Cash, consolidated defendant James N Chapman, consolidated defendant Kevin McDonough, consolidated defendant Robert T Derby, consolidated defendant Geoffrey S Eccleston, consolidated defendant Michael E Barton, consolidated defendant Nancy B Dechaud, consolidated defendant Melvin Sharp against plaintiff Leonard J D Myers, plaintiff Holly Cohen, consolidated plaintiff Thomas E Genna, consolidated plaintiff Robert Syputa, consolidated plaintiff Max Fecht, consolidated plaintiff Thomas W Randall, consolidated plaintiff Neil Stockhamer, consolidated plaintiff Marilyn Mandel, consolidated plaintiff Barry B Roseman, consolidated plaintiff Michael Malone, consolidated plaintiff Chester W Green, consolidated plaintiff Norman Cooper, consolidated plaintiff Tyger Group... Pltf's take nothing from dft's on their claims in this case & that dft's recover their costs of court. ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 9/27/96 Page(s): 1 (krs) (Entered: 09/27/1996)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: None
    ORDER denying as moot [23-1] motion for class certification ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 9/27/96 Page(s) 1 (krs) (Entered: 09/27/1996)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/20/1996, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM ORDER granting [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim, denying [21-1] motion to strike matters outside the pleadings introduced from [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Pltf's shall have leave to amend their complaint to cure the deficiencies noted, if they can do so. Any such amendment must be filed & served w/in 20 days of this date. ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 8/21/96 Page(s) 16 (krs) Modified on 09/26/1996 (Entered: 08/21/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF REFERENCE: [16-1] motion to stay of discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Wm F. Sanderson Jr ( Signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 3/28/96 Page(s): 1 (jyg) (Entered: 03/28/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Name Change of law firm Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach (3) cysystem (jyg) (Entered: 03/08/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/16/1996, Entered: None
            NOTICE of entry of attorney appearance for plaintiffs Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group by Stephan H Goldstein (8) (jyg) (Entered: 01/18/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of Robert F Wise, Jr, attorney for defendants in support Re: [34-1] response reply to motion to dismiss, [33-1] response reply to motion for a stay of discovery (15+) (jyg) (Entered: 09/29/1995)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: None
                RESPONSE by defendant in opposition to [21-1] motion to strike matters outside the pleadings introduced from [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim (15+) (jyg) (Entered: 09/29/1995)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: None
                  REPLY Memorandum by defendant to response in further support of [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (10) (jyg) (Entered: 09/29/1995)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/28/1995, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE by defendants to [23-1] motion for class certification (2) (jyg) (Entered: 09/29/1995)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/26/1995, Entered: None
                      ORDER granting [30-1] joint motion for order to extend time to answer, Response to motion reset to 9/28/95 for [23-1] motion for class certification , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 9/28/95 for [16-1] motion to stay of discovery, reset to 9/28/95 for [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 9/27/95 Page(s) 1 (jyg) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: None
                        JOINT MOTION for order to extend time to answer by plaintiffs, defendants, and consolidated parties (5) (jyg) (Entered: 09/28/1995)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: None
                          ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Robert F Wise Jr, John J Clarke Jr to appear pro hac vice ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 9/14/95 Page(s) 1 (jac) (Entered: 09/15/1995)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                            Declaration/AFFIDAVIT of Barry C. Barnett Re: [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (8) (jac) (Entered: 09/12/1995)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: None
                              Revised MEMORANDUM by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group in opposition to [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (15+) (jac) (Entered: 09/12/1995)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: None
                                MOTION by defendant Cyrix Corporation for Robert F Wise Jr, John J Clarke Jr to appear pro hac vice (8) (jac) (Entered: 09/12/1995)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group in opposition to [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (15+) (jac) (Entered: 09/11/1995)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group in support of [23-1] motion for class certification (15+) (jac) (Entered: 09/11/1995)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                                      MOTION by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group for class certification (3) (jac) (Entered: 09/11/1995)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group in support of [21-1] motion to strike matters outside the pleadings introduced from [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim (15+) (jac) (Entered: 09/11/1995)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/8/1995, Entered: None
                                          MOTION by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Thomas E Genna, Robert Syputa, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group to strike matters outside the pleadings introduced from [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim (7) (jac) (Entered: 09/11/1995)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                            ORDER granting [19-1] joint motion to extend time/set uniform deadline for responding to and filing certain motions, Response to motion reset to 9/8/95 for [16-1] motion to stay of discovery, reset to 9/8/95 for [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim and to file motion for class certification ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 8/22/95 Page(s) 1 (jac) (Entered: 08/23/1995)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: None
                                              JOINT MOTION and Supporting Brief to extend time/set uniform deadline for responding to and filing certain motions by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Cyrix Corporation, Gerald D Rogers, Thomas B Brightman, Ronald P Edgerton, Harvey B Cash, Thomas E Genna, Stephen Domenick, Timothy W Kinnear, Robert Syputa, Berry Cash, James N Chapman, Kevin McDonough, Robert T Derby, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Geoffrey S Eccleston, Michael E Barton, Nancy B Dechaud, Melvin Sharp, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group (6) (jac) (Entered: 08/16/1995)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                AFFIDAVIT Robert F. Wise, Jr. Re: [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (13) (jac) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM by defendant Cyrix Corporation in support of [16-1] motion to stay of discovery (9) (jac) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by defendant Cyrix Corporation to stay of discovery (4) (jac) (Entered: 07/27/1995)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Robert F. Wisr, Jr. Re: [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim ***UNDER SEPARATE COVER*** (15+) (jac) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM by defendant Cyrix Corporation, defendant Gerald D Rogers, defendant Thomas B Brightman, defendant Ronald P Edgerton, defendant Harvey B Cash, consolidated defendant Stephen Domenick, consolidated defendant Timothy W Kinnear, consolidated defendant Berry Cash, consolidated defendant James N Chapman, consolidated defendant Kevin McDonough, consolidated defendant Robert T Derby, consolidated defendant Geoffrey S Eccleston, consolidated defendant Michael E Barton, consolidated defendant Nancy B Dechaud, consolidated defendant Melvin Sharp in support of [13-1] motion to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim (15+) (jac) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by defendant Cyrix Corporation, defendant Gerald D Rogers, defendant Thomas B Brightman, defendant Ronald P Edgerton, defendant Harvey B Cash, consolidated defendant Stephen Domenick, consolidated defendant Timothy W Kinnear, consolidated defendant Berry Cash, consolidated defendant James N Chapman, consolidated defendant Kevin McDonough, consolidated defendant Robert T Derby, consolidated defendant Geoffrey S Eccleston, consolidated defendant Michael E Barton, consolidated defendant Nancy B Dechaud, consolidated defendant Melvin Sharp to dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim (4) (jac) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                            AGREED ORDER granting [11-1] joint motion to extend time to answer, RESET answer due for 7/21/95 for Harvey B Cash, for Ronald P Edgerton, for Thomas B Brightman, for Gerald D Rogers, for Cyrix Corporation ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 7/21/95 Page(s) 1 (jac) (Entered: 07/24/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                              JOINT MOTION to extend time to answer by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Cyrix Corporation, Gerald D Rogers, Thomas B Brightman, Ronald P Edgerton, Harvey B Cash, Thomas E Genna, Stephen Domenick, Timothy W Kinnear, Robert Syputa, Berry Cash, James N Chapman, Kevin McDonough, Robert T Derby, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Geoffrey S Eccleston, Michael E Barton, Nancy B Dechaud, Melvin Sharp, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group (5) (jac) (Entered: 07/18/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address and Change of Firm Name by attorney Joseph H. Weiss (4) (jac) (Entered: 07/12/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by plaintiff Leonard J D Myers, plaintiff Holly Cohen, consolidated plaintiff Thomas E Genna, consolidated plaintiff Robert Syputa, consolidated plaintiff Max Fecht, consolidated plaintiff Thomas W Randall, consolidated plaintiff Neil Stockhamer, consolidated plaintiff Marilyn Mandel, consolidated plaintiff Barry B Roseman, consolidated plaintiff Michael Malone, consolidated plaintiff Chester W Green, consolidated plaintiff Norman Cooper, consolidated plaintiff Tyger Group , (Answer due 6/12/95 for Melvin Sharp, for Nancy B Dechaud, for Michael E Barton, for Geoffrey S Eccleston, for Robert T Derby, for Kevin McDonough, for James N Chapman, for Berry Cash, for Timothy W Kinnear, for Stephen Domenick, for Harvey B Cash, for Ronald P Edgerton, for Thomas B Brightman, for Gerald D Rogers, for Cyrix Corporation ) amending [1-1] complaint (15+) (jac) (Entered: 06/06/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER granting [7-1] joint motion to extend time to file amended complint until 6/2/95 ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 5/18/95 Page(s) 1 (jac) (Entered: 05/19/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      JOINT MOTION and Brief to extend time to file amended complint by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Cyrix Corporation, Gerald D Rogers, Thomas B Brightman, Ronald P Edgerton, Harvey B Cash, Thomas E Genna, Stephen Domenick, Timothy W Kinnear, Robert Syputa, Berry Cash, James N Chapman, Kevin McDonough, Robert T Derby, Max (5) Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Geoffrey S Eccleston, Michael E Barton, Nancy B Dechaud, Melvin Sharp, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group (jac) (Entered: 05/19/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/20/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 filed...See Order for specifics. ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 3/21/95 Page(s): 17 (jac) (Entered: 03/22/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Leonard J D Myers, Holly Cohen, Cyrix Corporation, Gerald D Rogers, Thomas B Brightman, Ronald P Edgerton, Harvey B Cash, Thomas E Genna, Stephen Domenick, Timothy W Kinnear, Robert Syputa, Berry Cash, James N Chapman, Kevin McDonough, Robert T Derby, Max Fecht, Thomas W Randall, Geoffrey S Eccleston, Michael E Barton, Nancy B Dechaud, Melvin Sharp, Neil Stockhamer, Marilyn Mandel, Barry B Roseman, Michael Malone, Chester W Green, Norman Cooper, Tyger Group in support of [5-1] joint motion for entry of pre-trial order no. 1 (6) (jac) (Entered: 03/20/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED ORDER, consolidating cases ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 3/17/95 Page(s) 4 (jac) (Entered: 03/20/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER, consolidating cases ( signed by AJF) Copies to counsel: 3/14/95 Page(s) 4 (jac) (Entered: 03/15/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for defendant Cyrix Corporation by and through its registered agent for service of process Ronald P Edgerton, defendant Gerald D Rogers, defendant Thomas B Brightman, defendant Ronald P Edgerton, defendant Harvey B Cash (Issued 5) (bjj) Modified on 12/21/1994 (Entered: 12/21/1994)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff Leonard J D Myers, plaintiff Holly Cohen (bjj) (Entered: 12/21/1994)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?