Christie v. Prescott
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00566

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2018 at 10:35 AM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lance T. Christie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 409

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Merly +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jmerly@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo J. Prescott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl E. Johnson +1 203 596 7353 +1 203 596 0570 attycjohnson@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by waterburyct.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A. Mengacci +1 203 574 5731 +1 203 574 8340 jmengacci@waterburyct.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda T. Wihbey +1 203 574 6731 +1 203 574 8340 lwihbey@waterburyct.org
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Copy
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Copy
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Document Forwarded to the Court of Appeals
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Merly on behalf of Lance T. Christie (Merly, Joseph) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 44 Motion to Continue, on consent. Bench trial will be held on July 22, 2016, 10:00 a.m. to 3:00 p.m., Courtroom Two. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/8/16. (Tooker, A.) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Continue Modify Trial Schedule by J. Prescott. (Mengacci, Joseph) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 4/18/2016. Total Time: 1 hours and 0 minutes(Court Reporter Julia Cashman.) (Villano, P.) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/29/2016.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Order on Pretrial Deadlines: : This case was transferred to Judge Janet Bond Arterton, all deadlines remain in effect until further order of the Court. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT WILL ISSUE. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/29/2016.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/29/2016.(Villano, P.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order of Transfer
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 31 Motion to Take Deposition of Lance T. Christie. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/12/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Reconsideration. Discovery relating only to the plaintiff's deposition shall be completed by December 11, 2015. Dispositive motions shall be filed by January 22, 2016 and if no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by January 22, 2016. This case shall be trial ready February, 2016. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/12/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. The Court notes that this is the third motion for extension of time filed in this case. The defendant shall provide the Court with an explanation regarding his trial schedule, indicating case names and dates of trial. The Court also notes that the defendant has requested only an extension of time to file a dispositive motion, a trial memorandum and the trial ready date, but indicates in his request that he still needs to complete the deposition of the plaintiff. Discovery concluded on October 23, 2015 and without the request of an extension for discovery, the defendant is barred from taking a deposition without first getting approval from this Court. The defendant may resubmit his request for an extension to the Court with the explanations as outlined above. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 11/3/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cheryl E. Johnson terminated. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 9/22/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting in part 23 Motion for Extension of Time. All discovery, including but not limited to expert reports and depositions, shall be completed by October 23, 2015. Dispositive motions shall be filed by November 23, 2015 and if no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by November 23, 2015. This case shall be trial ready December, 2015. The Court hereby gives notice to the parties that it does not look favorable for extensions of time that are not timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 8/17/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting in part 21 Motion for Extension of Time. All discovery, including but not limited to expert reports and depositions, shall be completed by August 3, 2015. Dispositive motions shall be filed by September 1, 2015 and if no dispositive motion is filed, the parties shall file their joint trial memorandum by September 1, 2015. This case shall be trial ready October, 2015. If the parties would like a settlement conference after the close of discovery, if not before, they shall contact chambers. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Dominic J. Squatrito on 5/11/15. (Pike, C.) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2015.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER granting 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2014 To Respond to Defendant's Request for Interrogatories and Request for Production. Signed by Clerk on 7/15/2014. (Lynch, K.) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2014 To Respond to Defendant's Request for Interrogatories and Request for Production by Lance T. Christie. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by J. Prescott.(Johnson, Cheryl) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/22/2014; Discovery due by 4/1/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2015; Trial Ready Date 7/1/2015; Trial Brief due by 6/1/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 05/20/2014.(Norman, D.) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/20/2014. (Norman, D.) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Johnson, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until June 22, 2014 Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by J. Prescott. (Johnson, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl E. Johnson on behalf of J. Prescott (Johnson, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance T. Christie. J. Prescott served on 5/1/2014, answer due 5/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Marshal's Return)(Williams, John) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *J. Prescott* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm St., Ste. 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Lynch, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Protective Order, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Lance T. Christie, 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Lance T. Christie Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2014.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/28/2014.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/28/2014.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/28/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2014 Discovery due by 10/28/2014 Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2014 Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2014.(Lynch, K.) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Lance T. Christie (Williams, John) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against J. Prescott ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3227130.), filed by Lance T. Christie.(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 395 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?