HERNANDEZ v. M&T BANK
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00470

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 10:51 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 2/25/16. (sr, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?