Meyers et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-09142
Magistrate Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 16, 2020 at 6:38 PM DT (11 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Meyers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Lance Mills +1 646 637 3693 plm36@columbia.edu
No Logo JOHN BAKER, Plaintiff
No Logo Justin Strekal, Plaintiff
No Logo Miles Walsh, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Chief of Dept. Joseph J. Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Hans Francois, Defendant
No Logo John Zaranis, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD Patrol Off Freddy Ynoa, Defendant
No Logo Officer Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Vasile Dubovici, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Redacted Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 56 Status Report filed by Michael Bloomberg, Miles Walsh, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly, Charles Meyers, John Baker, Justin Strekal, City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The parties should file a joint status report on or before May 16, 2016, addressing the status of the appeal. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/19/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                              STATUS REPORT. JOINT Document filed by John Baker, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh.(Mills, Paul) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 54 Status Report filed by Michael Bloomberg, Miles Walsh, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly, Charles Meyers, John Baker, Justin Strekal, City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The parties should provide a joint status report regarding ongoing appellate litigation on or before April 1, 2016. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/12/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                  STATUS REPORT. JOINT Document filed by John Baker, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh.(Mills, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying 52 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application DENIED. The parties are to report to tomorrow's scheduled conference. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2015) (spo) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Lucas dated 12/10/2015. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 47 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 49 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application Granted. The conference is adjourned until December 11, 2015 at 12:15 p.m. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2015 at 12:15 PM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/20/2015) (cdo) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference on November 23, 2015 addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Lamar D. Winslow dated November 19, 2015. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly.(Winslow, Lamar) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Vasile Dubovici, Joseph J. Esposito, Hans Francois, Raymond Kelly, Officer Does 1-100, Freddy Ynoa, John Zaranis with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Baker, Miles Walsh, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Miles Walsh, Charles Meyers, John Baker, Justin Strekal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhs Vol 1, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhs Vol 2)(Mills, Paul) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                OPINION & ORDER re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Michael Bloomberg, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly, City of New York. For the reasons described above, the City's motion to dismiss the claims grounded in violations of the First Amendment based on an impermissible time, place, and manner restriction, the Fourth Amendment based on eviction without a warrant, and the Fourteenth Amendment's Due Process Clause based on eviction without notice and an opportunity to be heard is GRANTED. "In the ordinary course, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure provide that courts should freely give leave to amend a complaint when justice so requires. Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(2). This permissive standard is consistent with our strong preference for resolving disputes on the merits." Williams v. Citigroup Inc., 659 F.3d 208, 212-13 (2d Cir. 2011) (internal quotation marks omitted). Accordingly, Meyers may his amend his complaint as to those claims. The City's motion to dismiss all other claims is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court also schedules a status conference for November 23, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties should report to Courtroom 1306 at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/27/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/19/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion, 33 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 39 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 41 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 15 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 12 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 32 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 36 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 35 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 44 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 37 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 18 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 30 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 22 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 40 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 29 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 28 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 34 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 17 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 38 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 21 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 13 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 20 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 16 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 19 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 31 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 27 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 10 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 24 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 25 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 26 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 42 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 14 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, 43 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Paul L. Mills dated 05-14-2015. Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh.(Mills, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) Modified on 5/15/2015 (db). (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Andrew Lucas in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Trial Transcript)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. Responses due by 5/13/2015(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joy Tolulope Anakhu on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 3 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding proposed 12(b) motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Lucas dated 2/20/15. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly. Pre-motion conference set for 3/30/2015 at 11:15 a.m. So ordered. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 3/30/2015 at 11:15 AM before Judge Andrew L. Carter Jr.). (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/27/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Paul L. Mills dated 02-25-2015 re: 3 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding proposed 12(b) motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Lucas dated 2/20/15. . Document filed by John Baker, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal, Miles Walsh. (Mills, Paul) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding proposed 12(b) motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Andrew Lucas dated 2/20/15. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph J. Esposito, Raymond Kelly.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (laq) (moh). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Vasile Dubovici, Joseph J. Esposito, Hans Francois, Raymond Kelly, Officer Does 1-100, Freddy Ynoa, John Zaranis. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1109)Document filed by John Baker, Miles Walsh, Charles Meyers, Justin Strekal.(laq) (moh). (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?