Adkins v. The City Of New York , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-07519
District Judge Jed S. Rakoff, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 2:16 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Justin Adkins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Juanita Ritchie +1 646 831 1243 +1 646 831 1243 andreajritchie@aol.com
v.
No Logo Jack Jaskaran, Defendant
No Logo James and Julie Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo James Hall, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant
No Logo Kendal Creer, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Patrick Devlin, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Richard and Rachel Roes 1-50, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City Of New York ,"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cheryl Leah Shammas +1 212 788 1570 +1 212 788 9776 cshammas@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dara Lynn Weiss +1 212 676 1307 +1 212 788 9776 DAWEISS@LAW.NYC.GOV
No Logo Verga, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER: Due to the ongoing appeal in the related case, Garcia v. City, 1:11-cv-6957, and the overlap between the issues on appeal and those in the instant case, the parties herein stipulate and agree that oral argument on the motion to dismiss is adjourned sine die and discovery in this action is stayed pending the decision in the Garcia appeal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/16/2015) (ama) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss . the Complaint with Prejudice. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Kendal Creer, Patrick Devlin, Joseph Esposito, James Hall, Jack Jaskaran, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York,, Verga. (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Justin Adkins. (Ritchie, Andrea) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss . Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. 12(b)(6). Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Kendal Creer, Patrick Devlin, Joseph Esposito, James Hall, Jack Jaskaran, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York,, Verga. (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Kendal Creer, Patrick Devlin, Joseph Esposito, James Hall, Jack Jaskaran, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York,, Verga. Responses due by 12/15/2014 Return Date set for 12/22/2014 at 11:59 PM.(Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cheryl Leah Shammas on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, Kendal Creer, Patrick Devlin, Joseph Esposito, James Hall, Jack Jaskaran, Raymond Kelly, The City Of New York,, Verga. (Shammas, Cheryl) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: This Court requires that this case shall be ready for trial on 03-23-2015. After consultation with counsel for the parties, the following Case Management Plan is adopted. This plan is also a scheduling order pursuant to Rules 16 and 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The case is to be tried to a jury. All Deposition due by 2/1/2015. All Discovery due by 2/9/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/23/2015 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument set for 3/23/2015 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 3/23/2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/22/2014) (ama) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dara Lynn Weiss on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Weiss, Dara) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/22/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/2/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                        STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 11cv6957. Document filed by Justin Adkins.(moh) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, Kendal Creer, Patrick Devlin, Joseph Esposito, James Hall, James and Julie Does 1-50(In their official capacities, jointly and severally (the names John and Jane Doe, Richard and Rachel Roe and James and Julie Doe, being fictitious, as the true names of these defendants are presently unknown), James and Julie Does 1-50(New York City Police Officers, individually, jointly and severally (the names John and Jane Doe, Richard and Rachel Roe and James and Julie Doe, being fictitious, as the true names of these defendants are presently unknown), Jane Doe 1, Jack Jaskaran, Raymond Kelly, Richard and Rachel Roes 1-50, The City Of New York,, Verga. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401105280)Document filed by Justin Adkins.(moh) (moh). (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 430 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?