USA v. Brimley
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-mj-00511-RBC
Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn MacKinley +1 617 748 3215 Glenn.MacKinley@usdoj.gov
Office Boston
Filed 10/15/2004
County Bristol
Terminated 11/17/2004
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Terminate Criminal Case
Case Terminated as to Randy Brimley (Catino, Theresa)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 3/16/2005 Terminate Merged Defendant
    Terminated merged defendant case for Randy Brimley, pending deadlines, motions, and excludables. Please see 04cr10344-RGS for further proceedings regarding deft. Brimley...(Indictment filed) (Catino, Theresa)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
      Gov'ts NOTICE Concerning Local Charges, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/19/2004 as to Randy Brimley. (Russo, Noreen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 order on motion for detentionCourt Filing
          Judge Robert B. Collings : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION PURSUANT TO 18:3142 (e), ENTERED granting [] Motion for Detention Bond set for Randy Brimley (1) NO BAIL. as to Randy Brimley (1): Accordingly, pursuant to 18:3142(e), it is ORDERED that the deft be, and he hereby is, DETAINED pending trial... (Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 10/21/2004 to correct typographical error (Boyce, Kathy).
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
            WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Randy Brimley, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
              Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PERMIT REVOCATION OF CONDITIONAL RELEASE, DEPORTATION OR EXCLUSION as to Randy Brimley (Boyce, Kathy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Randy Brimley, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Initial Appearance
                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Initial Appearance as to Randy Brimley held on 10/19/2004. G. MacKinley for Gov't. Defendant fills out financial affidavit and Federal Defender Richie is appointed. Defendant waives probable cause hearing and will notify the court if such a hearing is requested. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen) Modified on 10/26/2004 (Russo, Noreen).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 motion for detention
                    ORAl MOTION for Detention as to Randy Brimley by USA made in open court(Boyce, Kathy)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Arrest
                      Arrest of Randy Brimley (Boyce, Kathy)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Arrest Warrant Issued
                        Arrest Warrant Issued as to Randy Brimley. (Boyce, Kathy)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Arrest Warrant Issued
                          Arrest Warrant Issued as to Randy Brimley. (Russo, Noreen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT as to Randy Brimley (1). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of John L. Faria) (Boyce, Kathy)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 421 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?