Landmark Technology, LLC v. Assurant, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:15-cv-00076

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 4:43 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com
v.
No Logo Assurant, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Weston Musselman, Jr. +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 pwm@fr.com
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Assurant, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?