USA v. Disangro
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-mj-00508-RBC
Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen B. Hogan +1 617 748 3106 +1 617 748 3960
Office Boston
Filed 10/15/2004
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case CR 04-20798 Southern District of Florida
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered as to Paul Disangro (Russo, Noreen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Rule 5 Documents Sent
    Rule 5 Documents Sent as to Paul Disangro to Sourthern District of Florida District. # 7001 1940 0007 5354 9041 (Russo, Noreen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Real Property Documents Filed with the Clerk's Off
      Real Property Documents Filed with the Clerk's Office as to Paul Disangro for property located at 1184 Hyde Park Ave Boston, MA. Documents surrendered: 10/22/2004,. (Attachments: # (1) Real Estate Appraisal # (2) Real Estate Appraisal - Supplemental Materials # (3) Escrow # (4)Deed.(Russo, Noreen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Bond
      Appearance Bond Entered as to Paul Disangro in amount of $500,000.00, secured by Real Estate at 1184 Hyde Park, Boston, MA. (Russo, Noreen)
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Bond
        Appearance Bond Entered as to Paul Disangro in amount of $25,000.00, Receipt # 321 59639. (Russo, Noreen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
          Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Paul Disangro (1). Two Bonds: one for $500,000.00 secured by real estate at 1184 Hyde Park, Boston, MA and one for $25,000.00 in cash secured by check deposited for same amount with Court. (Russo, Noreen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Motion for Release from Custody
            MOTION Defendant's Proposal Regarding Release from Custody as to Paul Disangro. (Russo, Noreen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Order of Removal to Another DistrictCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered ORDER OF REMOVAL to District of Southern District of Florida as to Paul Disangro. (Russo, Noreen)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Detention Hearing
                Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Detention Hearing as to Paul Disangro held on 10/22/2004. Maureen Hogan for Gov't and A. Cardinale for Def't. Def't present as are Joannne Disangro and Daniel Disangro. Def't and Gov't agree on conditions of release contained in Proposal [5]. Court sets conditons of release including two appearance bonds. Court questions original request for two bonds at $250,000.00 each and takes recess for attorneys to speak to Southern District of Florida AUSA. After recess court sets conditions of release as to Paul Disangro and explains to Daniel Disangro, Joanne Disangro, and Paul Disangro the consequences of Def't failure to appear. Two apperance bonds are set: one in the amount of $500,000.00 secured by real estate at 1184 Hyde Park Ave. Boston, MA and one in the amount of $25,000.00 secured by a check in that amount. Both bonds are signed by Def't, Joanne Disangro, and Daniel Disangro. Def't ordered to appear at US District Court in Miami, Florida by Noon on November 1, 2004. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen) Modified on 11/17/2004 (Catino2, Theresa).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anthony M. Cardinale appearing for Paul Disangro (Russo, Noreen)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Hearing (Other)
                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Detention Hearing as to Paul Disangro held on 10/19/2004. AUSA Hogan for Gov't and A. Cardinale for Def't. Def't waives identity hearing and requests further hearing by end of the week to attempt to work out conditions of release with Gov't. Further hearing set for 10/22/04 at 3:00 PM. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Paul Disangro (Russo, Noreen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Affidavit - Rule 5
                        RULE 5 AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Paul Disangro by Affiant Dale Dutton. (Russo, Noreen)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Initial Appearance/Rule 5
                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings :Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to Paul Disangro held on 10/15/2004. Def't read rights, charges, and max penalties. Def't not sure if will be able to get / afford attorney. Financial Affidavit filled out but no attorney appointed. Gov't requests a 3 day continuance Detention hearing set down for October 19, 2004 at 11:15 AM. (Digital Recording) (Russo, Noreen)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                            Attorney update in case as to Paul Disangro. Attorney Maureen B. Hogan for USA added. (Russo, Noreen)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Arrest - Rule 5
                              Arrest (Rule 5) of Paul Disangro, from warrant issued in the Southern District of Florida. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 2,046 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?