Dalton v. United States of America
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-205

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 4:49 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3350 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 04/21/2015, disposing of the appeal to EDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1489860] [15-205] [Entered: 04/21/2015 09:55 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
    NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1489854] [15-205] [Entered: 04/21/2015 09:52 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
      MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [33] filed by Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. [1489851][37] [15-205] [Entered: 04/21/2015 09:52 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
        MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. Service date 04/20/2015 by CM/ECF. [1489530] [15-205] [Entered: 04/20/2015 05:18 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. Service date 02/18/2015 by CM/ECF.[1440345] [15-205] [Entered: 02/18/2015 12:12 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. Service date 02/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1440304] [15-205] [Entered: 02/18/2015 11:42 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
              NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1439988] [15-205] [Entered: 02/18/2015 09:48 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1430856] [15-205] [Entered: 02/04/2015 04:38 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 02/04/2015 by CM/ECF. [1430844] [15-205] [Entered: 02/04/2015 04:34 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 01/30/2015 by CM/ECF. [1427005] [15-205] [Entered: 01/30/2015 11:49 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                      SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Michael Dalton Brief due date as 04/29/2015;. Joint Appendix due date as 04/29/2015, FILED.[1426776] [15-205] [Entered: 01/30/2015 10:06 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                        LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, informing Court of proposed due date 04/29/2015, RECEIVED. Service date 01/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1426034] [15-205] [Entered: 01/29/2015 01:09 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LETTER, [13], on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED.[1425928] [15-205] [Entered: 01/29/2015 12:20 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                            NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1425922] [15-205] [Entered: 01/29/2015 12:18 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. Service date 01/28/2015 by CM/ECF.[1424744] [15-205]--[Edited 01/28/2015 by HT] [Entered: 01/28/2015 01:26 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. Service date 01/28/2015 by CM/ECF.[1424741] [15-205] [Entered: 01/28/2015 01:23 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                  ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1423270] [15-205] [Entered: 01/26/2015 09:44 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/13/2015, RECEIVED.[1423268] [15-205] [Entered: 01/26/2015 09:43 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Michael Dalton, FILED. [1423258] [15-205] [Entered: 01/26/2015 09:40 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?