Sheehan et al v. United Electric Company, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12213-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo United Electric Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hudson Savings Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 10/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Suffolk
Terminated 11/16/2005
Origin 4
Reopened 5/3/2005
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
Letter from Valerie Keenan. (Attachments: # (1) EXHIBITS)(Bell, Marie)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
    Letter from Valerie Keenan. (Attachments: # (1) ATTACHMENTS)(Bell, Marie)
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
      Judge William G. Young : DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
              AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan in Support re [14] MOTION for Default Judgment Against United Electric Company, Inc. as to United Electric Company, Inc. filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION for Default Judgment Against United Electric Company, Inc. as to United Electric Company, Inc. filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                  MOTION for Default Judgment Against United Electric Company, Inc. as to United Electric Company, Inc. by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Judge William G. Young : ElectronicORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to 11/7/05 to File for Entry of Default Judgment. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/14/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to November 7, 2005 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                        Letter from Valerie Keenan. (Attachments: # (1) EXHIBITS)(Bell, Marie)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                          Letter from Valerie Keenan, CFO, United Electric Company, Inc. re: settlement. (Attachments: # (1) EXHIBITS)(Bell, Marie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                            Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re [9] Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default filed by United Electric Company, Inc., cc/cl: Untied Electric Company, Inc.(Bell, Marie)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                              NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to United Electric Company, Inc. cc/cl:United Electric Company, Inc. (Bell, Marie)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005, Terminated: 11/16/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                MOTION for Entry of Default by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order
                                  Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. re: [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. MOTION DENIED, THERE BEING NO SHOWING OF IMMEDIATE IRREPARABLE INJURY. cc/cl.(Bell, Marie)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Case Reopened
                                    Case Reopened (Bell, Marie)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                      Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered granting [7] Motion for Reconsideration re Order Administratively Closing Case. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005, Terminated: 5/3/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                        MOTION for Reconsideration to Reopen Case Ordered Administratively Closed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Terminated Case
                                          Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (Bell, Marie)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Order
                                            Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. re [6] Withdrawal of motion of Preliminary Injunction. ALLOWED. CASE ORDERED ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. IT MAY BE REOPENED BY ANY PARTY UPON A SHOWING THAT A LIVE CASE OF CONTROVERSY EXISTS. cc/cl. (Bell, Marie)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005 Withdrawal of Motion
                                              Withdrawal of motion: [4] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,, [5] Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,.. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 set/reset motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Bell, Marie)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan in Support re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1))(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005, Terminated: 3/14/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed United Electric Company, Inc. served on 1/4/2005, answer due 1/24/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Notice of Hearing.
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on the Request for Attachment and Injunctive Relief:Hearing set for 11/16/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Chief Judge William G. Young. It is the responsibility of the plaintiffs to notify defense counsel and/or defendants of the hearing time and place.(Smith, Bonnie)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Summons Issued
                                                            Summons Issued as to Hudson Savings Bank, United Electric Company, Inc.. (Bell, Marie)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 59500, filed by Local 103 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Anthony J. Salamone, Russell F. Sheehan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B-Part 1# (3) Exhibit B-Part 2# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C# (5) Civil Cover Sheet)(Bell, Marie)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Bell, Marie)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?