Sonya Salkin v. Gaudreault
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12245-DPW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:40 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo David B. Gaudreault, Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Pierce +1 781 245 3235 +1 781 245 3389
No Logo Sonya Salkin, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Roach & Carpenter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Ellen Carpenter +1 617 720 1800 +1 617 720 0720
Office Boston
Filed 10/25/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Suffolk
Terminated 3/21/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated. (Rynne, Michelle)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with c/s by Sonya Salkin. (Carpenter, M.)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ElectronicORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time; Appellant's brief by 3/10/05; appellee's brief by 3/25/05; appellant's reply brief by 4/8/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 1/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by 60 Days Pending Bankruptcy Court Approval of Settlement with certificate of service by Sonya Salkin.(Carpenter, M.)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/16/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion for Extension of Time: Appellant's Brief Deadline 1/10/05; Appellee's Brief Deadline 1/25/05; Appellant's Reply Brief deadline 2/8/05. (Rynne, Michelle)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004, Terminated: 11/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Enlarge Briefing Schedule By Sixty Days Pending Bankruptcy Court's Approval of Settlement by Sonya Salkin.(Carpenter, M.)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order
              Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/10/2004. Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2004. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/6/2004. (Gawlik, Cathy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Bankruptcy Appeal
                Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. File received, filed by Sonya Salkin.(Gawlik, Cathy)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?