Sheehan et al v. Chris Mealey Electrical, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12209-EFH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony J. Salamone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Russell F. Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Chris Mealey Electrical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo First Trade Union Bank, Trustee
No Logo Fleet Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 10/21/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Suffolk
Terminated 6/4/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE.(Folan, Karen)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [36] Motion for order conditionally dismissing action and retaining jurisdiction. (Folan, Karen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION for Order Conditionally Dismissing Action and Retaining Jurisdiction by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Geiman, Gregory)
        LREF
        Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
        NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 6/4/2007 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. (Folan, Karen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
          AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman in Support re [32] MOTION Renewed Motion for the Issuance of a Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
            AFFIDAVIT of Sean E. Donlan in Support re [32] MOTION Renewed Motion for the Issuance of a Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION Renewed Motion for the Issuance of a Capias by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Status Conference
                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Harrington : Status Conference held on 3/28/2007. Both parties are present. Plaintiff states that defendant has complied with handing over the tax records and they are currently in the process of conducting a more thorough audit. (Folan, Karen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                  NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 3/28/2007 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. (Folan, Karen)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                    Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered granting motion for the issuance of a capias. (Folan, Karen)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [27] Motion for the issuance of a capias. (Folan, Karen)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 Order on Motion for Order
                        Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Motion for Order compelling defendant's compliance with court order of March 23, 2006. (Folan, Karen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                          AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman in Support re [27] MOTION for the Issuance of Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [27] MOTION for the Issuance of Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Errata C# (4) Errata D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F)(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION for the Issuance of Capias by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Status Conference
                              ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Harrington : Status Conference held on 12/20/2006. Defendant does not appear. Plaintiff would like a capias issued for the defendants arrest. Plaintiff to file a motion. Plaintiff would like defendant to produce records and pay fine already imposed. (Folan, Karen)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                AFFIDAVIT of Gregory A. Geiman in Support re [25] MOTION for Order to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court Order of March 23, 2006 filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Order
                                  MOTION for Order to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court Order of March 23, 2006 by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Hearing : Status Conference set for 12/20/2006 11:00 AM before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. (Folan, Karen)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                      Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered granting [22] Motion for compliance with Court Orders. SO ORDERED (Holahan, Sandra)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006, Terminated: 3/23/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION for Compliance with Court Orders by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Terminate Motions
                                          Motions terminated: [11] MOTION for Sanctions filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,, [20] MOTION for Compliance with Court Order filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,, [13] MOTION for Contempt and Issuance of a Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,, [19] MOTION Plaintiffs' Recommendation with Regard to Finding of Contempt Against Christopher Mealey re Status Conference, filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [21] Motion for compliance with Court Order. MOTION ALLOWED. SO ORDERED. TO BE EFFECTIVE 3/17/2006. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION Recommendation with Regard to Christopher Mealey re [20] MOTION for Compliance with Court Order by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION for Compliance with Court Order by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Electronic Endorsement (non-order)
                                                  Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT re [19] MOTION Plaintiffs' Recommendation with Regard to Finding of Contempt Against Christopher Mealey re Status Conference, filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MOTION Plaintiffs' Recommendation with Regard to Finding of Contempt Against Christopher Mealey re Status Conference, by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Status Conference
                                                      ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Harrington : Status Conference held on 1/31/2006. Counsel for the plaintiff appears; Defendant appears pro se; Defendant is advised he is contempt of court for failure to comply with court orders; Defendant is to meet with plaintiff asap and reccomendation to be filed within 10 days from date of this hearing. (Court Reporter Niles.) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 Warrant Issued
                                                        CAPIAS WARRANT for arrest issued (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Judge Edward F. Harrington : FINDINGS AND ORDER FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT AND ISSUANCE OF A CAPIAS entered. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for a short order of notice. MOTION ALLOWED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 12/20/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                MOTION for a Short Order of Notice by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                  Proposed Document(s) submitted by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. Document received: Findings and Order for Civil Contempt and Issuance of a Capias. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [13] MOTION for Contempt and Issuance of a Capias filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Contempt
                                                                      MOTION for Contempt and Issuance of a Capias by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                        ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Harrington : Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2005 re [11] MOTION for Sanctions filed by Russell F. Sheehan,, Anthony J. Salamone,, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers,. Counsel for plaintiffs appear; Defendant failed to appear for court hearing; Defendant has not responded to the Court's Order; Plaintiff to prepare motion for capis warrant with short order of notice. (Court Reporter none.) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [11] MOTION for Sanctions: Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2005 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. SO ORDERED. cc/cl(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005, Terminated: 3/15/2006 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER entered. re [7] Order for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED. cc/cl(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                ElectronicClerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Edward F. Harrington : Status Conference held on 10/19/2005. Counsel for plaintiff informs the Court that defendant has not complied with preliminary injunction order; Court to issue new order immediately; (Court Reporter none.) (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Order on Motion for Contempt
                                                                                  Judge Edward F. Harrington : ElectronicORDER entered finding as moot [8] Motion for Contempt. MOTION IS MOOT. SO ORDERED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [8] MOTION for Contempt for Finding of Civil Contempt and for Further Action filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005, Terminated: 10/19/2005 Motion for Contempt
                                                                                      MOTION for Contempt for Finding of Civil Contempt and for Further Action by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Set Hearings
                                                                                        Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered. Status Conference set for 10/19/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Edward F. Harrington. S0 ORDERED. cc/cl(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          Judge Edward F. Harrington : ORDER for Preliminary Injunction entered. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                            Judge Edward F. Harrington : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Preliminary Injunction. MOTION ALLOWED. SO ORDERED. cc/cl (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Russell Sheehan in Support re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [4] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: # (1))(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Russell F. Sheehan, Anthony J. Salamone, Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Chris Mealey Electrical, Inc. served on 2/10/2005, answer due 3/2/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Remark
                                                                                                      Civil Cover Sheet (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Chris Mealey Electrical, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 59498, filed by Local 103, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Anthony J. Salamone, Russell F. Sheehan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B Part 1# (3) Exhibit B Part 2# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D)(Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Chris Mealey Electrical, Inc.. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge ALEXANDER. (Holahan, Sandra)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?