Felton et al v. Restoration et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00400

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 8:48 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jean Doar 1-100, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jean Doar 1-100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Doar 1-100
No Logo John Doar 1-100, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John Doar 1-100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doar 1-100
No Logo Pamela Felton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pamela Felton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Felton
v.
No Logo Adult Protective Service, Defendant
No Logo Ali Almont, Defendant
No Logo Anita Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Annette Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Apostle, Defendant
No Logo AR&R Security, Defendant
No Logo Arkady Frakhtman & Associates, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Felton, Defendant
No Logo Brenda McNeil, Defendant
No Logo Bro. Thomas Perry, Defendant
Chase Bank USA, NA Chase Bank USA, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Chase Bank"
No Logo Chris Brandwell, Defendant
No Logo Civil Court Supreme Court, Defendant
No Logo Colvin Grannum, Defendant
No Logo Community Bible Institute & Seminary, Defendant
No Logo Dhcr, Defendant
No Logo Davon Felton, Defendant
No Logo Diann Clark, Defendant
No Logo Dime Bank, Defendant
No Logo Goldberg, Scdieri & Lindenberg P.C., Defendant
No Logo Harry Panagos, Defendant
No Logo Henry Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Hon J.F. Marchisotto, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Alterson, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Chin, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Scheckspwite, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Anthony Froclla, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Betsy Barros, Defendant
No Logo Hon. John S. Lansden, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Louis Fiorillo, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Maria Milin, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Thomas Filzpatrick, Defendant
No Logo Housing Court Bklyn, Defendant
No Logo Interfaith Hospital Record Room, Defendant
No Logo Jacqueline Ferrell, Defendant
No Logo Jacueline C. Brown, Defendant
No Logo James, Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Judith Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Kim Hayward, Defendant
No Logo King County Supreme Court, Defendant
No Logo Menatl Health Court Bklyn, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Minnie Archer, Defendant
No Logo N.Y.C. Department of Homeless Service, Defendant
No Logo NYC Administration For Children's Services, Defendant
No Logo Pam Trading Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pastor Linda G. Matthew, Defendant
No Logo Pastor Annie, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Glenn, Defendant
No Logo Peacon L. Fadden, Defendant
No Logo Pearlean Clark, Defendant
No Logo Queens County Civil Court, Defendant
No Logo Restoration , Defendant
No Logo Roberta Alston, Defendant
No Logo Rose Felton, Defendant
No Logo Sharron Hargrove Boynton, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon Rosablott, Defendant
No Logo Sis Fadden, Defendant
No Logo Social Service, Defendant
No Logo Stephaine Brantley, Defendant
No Logo Stuart J. Young, Defendant
No Logo Suny Downstate Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo Surrogate Court,, Defendant
No Logo Tanya Merchant, Defendant
No Logo The Daily News, Defendant
No Logo Tinseing Bettle, Defendant
No Logo US Department of Urban Development, Defendant
No Logo Victoria Bampus, Defendant
No Logo William Hayward, Defendant
No Logo Willie Blending, Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Felton. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Barbara Felton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 112 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?