Skokomish Indian, et al v. USA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 06-35403

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 2:50 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CG)The parties’ joint motion to remand this case to the district court is granted. Remand is without prejudice to the parties’ reinstatement of this appeal in the event that the District Court does not enter a consent decree consistent with the parties’ Settlement Agreement. Notice of reinstatement must be filed within 28 days of the entry of the district court order on the parties’ motion to enter the requested consent decree. The Tribe and Tacoma agree to bear their own costs and attorneys fees related to this appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [7825136] (KM) [Entered: 07/19/2011 01:01 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Skokomish Indian Tribe and Appellee Tacoma Public Utilit Joint Motion to remand case. Date of service: 07/18/2011. [7823070] (MDM) [Entered: 07/18/2011 10:44 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
      Filed order MEDIATION (CG): Unless appellants file a motion or stipulation for remand in the interim, on or before July 29, 2011, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7760329] (KM) [Entered: 05/20/2011 04:59 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
        Filed order MEDIATION (CG): This appeal is stayed until May 4, 2011, or pending the effective date of the damages agreement, whichever occurs first. Within 14 days after expiration of the stay, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7582308] (KM) [Entered: 12/15/2010 04:53 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
          Filed order MEDIATION (CG):This appeal is stayed until December 1, 2010, or pending the effective date of the damages agreement, whichever occurs first. Within 14 days after expiration of the stay, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7376602] (KM) [Entered: 06/17/2010 04:12 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
            Filed order MEDIATION (CG): This appeal is stayed until June 2, 2010, or pending the effective date of the damages agreement, whichever occurs first. Within 14 days after expiration of the stay, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [7152719] (KM) [Entered: 12/04/2009 04:28 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
              Filed order MEDIATION (CG): This appeal is stayed until December 2, 2009, or pending the effective date of the damages agreement, whichever occurs first. Within 14 days after expiration of the stay, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. [6965990] (KM) [Entered: 06/23/2009 12:55 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                Filed order MEDIATION (CG): This appeal is stayed until June 3, 2009, or pending the effective date of the damages agreement, whichever occurs first. Within 14 days after expiration of the stay, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. (SB) [Entered: 01/15/2009 04:19 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                  Filed order MEDIATION (CG): Unless appellants file a motion or stipulation for voluntary dismissal in the interim, on or before January 7, 2009, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. A copy of any motion or stipulation should be served on the mediator at Seattle. (SB) [Entered: 11/14/2008 11:56 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                    Filed order MEDIATION (CG): On or before 10/22/08, counsel is requested to contact the mediator to report on the status of the case. (SB) [Entered: 09/09/2008 01:17 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 55 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?