Fallow, et al v. Herbalife Intl, Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 2:04-cv-00175-TLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 8:33 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clint S Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON & SILVER, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
No Logo Daniel S Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
No Logo Mary Lynn Fallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000
v.
Herbalife International Of America, Inc. Herbalife International Of America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000
Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Philip Hoxie +1 602 382 6000
Space Monica Anne Limon-Wynn +1 602 382 6000
No Logo Clint S Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON & SILVER, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
No Logo Daniel S Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON & SILVER, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
No Logo Mary Lynn Fallow, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Joseph Giunta +1 602 307 0837

Toggle Switch Represented by GORDON & SILVER, LTD.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Littler +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 256 0345 tlittler@gordonsilver.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald E Warnicke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald E Warnicke +1 602 256 0400 +1 602 225 0402
Office CDA - Northern
Filed 4/5/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $400000
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County Kootenai - Northern
Terminated 3/2/2005
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags JURY
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Terry L Myers for all further proceedings. Judge Edward J. Lodge no longer assigned to case. Granting [4] Motion to refer case filed by Herbalife International, Inc.,, Herbalife International of America, Inc.,.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (dkh, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Honorable Edward J. Lodge ; VACATING the telephonic scheduling conference set for 7/6/04 pending ruling on motion to refer case to Bankruptcy Judge (cc: all counsel) (ja)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Affidavit
      AFFIDAVIT of Daniel J. Gibbons regarding motion to refer case to bankruptcy judge [4-1] (ja)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION by defs to refer case to bankruptcy judge (ja)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Order
          LITIGATION ORDER by Honorable Edward J. Lodge ; Telephonic scheduling conference set for 7/6/04 at 9:30am (cc: all counsel) (ja)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice of AvailabilityCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs, defendants, counter-claimants and counter-defendants re complaint [1-1] (jml)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
              REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register) (jml)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER, docket sheet and original file from Arizona received (jml)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 181 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?