Daniel Steven Fallow- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Idaho Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 03-06021-TLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 4:59 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Herbalife International, Inc. Herbalife International, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Fallow, Daniel Steven, Defendant
Office Coeur dAlene
Filed
County 03/27/2006
Terminated
Fee
Discharged
Origin 1
Reopened 03/14/2006
Dismissed
Lead Case 02-21424-TLM
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Docket Text: Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Signed on 3/14/2006 (RE: related document(s)[51] Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP), Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP), Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)). (au, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
    Docket Text: Court's Certificate of Service re [51] Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP), A notice of entry of the related document has been served on Registered Participants as reflected by the Notice of Electronic Filing. A Notice of Entry has also been served by First Class Mail Addressed to: Daniel Steven Fallow, POB 1964, Sandpoint, ID 83864, Mark J. Giunta,845 N 3rd Ave, Phoenix, AZ 85003, Joel Philip Hoxie, Snell & Wilmer, 1 Arizona Ctr, 400 E Van Buren, Phoenix AZ 85004-0001, Monica Anne Limon-Wynn, Snell & Wilmer, 1 Arizona Ctr 400 E Van Buren Phoenix, AZ 85004-0001, Thomas E Littler, Warnicke & Littler, 1411 N 3rd St, Phoenix, AZ 850040-1612, and Ronald E. Warnicke, Warnicke & Littler, 1411 N. 3rd St, Phoenix, AZ 85004-1612 (RE: related document(s)[51] Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)(rkb, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Notice of Conditional Dismissal (AP)
      Docket Text: Notice of Conditional DismissalUPON EXAMINATION of the record herein, the Court finds that cause exists to believe that the parties are NOT diligently prosecuting this adversary case.YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that pursuant to Local Rule 7041.1 relating to dismissal in inactive cases, the above entitled case will be DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION unless a party takes further action in accordance with Local Rule 7041.1(a).Cameron S Burke, Clerk of CourtThis is the Official Notice from the Court. No Document is attached Adversary Action due by 3/2/2006. (rkb, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order on Motion to Consolidate Case
        Docket Text: Order Granting Motion To Consolidate on Case 03-6021 and 05-7008.(Related Doc # 46) Signed on 6/29/2005. (rkb, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Hearing Held (Other)
          Docket Text: Hearing Held Appearances: Daniel Gibbons - counsel for PlaintiffReport of Proceedings: Motion to Consolidate with Case #05-7008 - No objectons written or heard. Motion GRANTED. Order forthcoming. (RE: related document(s)46 Motion to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc) (randyf, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Certificate Of Service.
            Docket Text: Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc (RE: related document(s)46 Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 03-6021 with 05-07008, 47 Notice of Hearing, ). (Gibbons, Daniel)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Notice of Hearing.
              Docket Text: Notice of Hearing and Notice of Motion Filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc (RE: related document(s)46 Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 03-6021 with 05-07008 Filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc (Gibbons, Daniel) filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc). Hearing to be held on 6/23/2005 at 09:30 AM CDA - US Courthouse Coeur d' Alene for 46, (Gibbons, Daniel)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Motion to Consolidate
                Docket Text: Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 03-6021 with 05-07008 Filed by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc (Gibbons, Daniel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit
                  Docket Text: Affidavit of Daniel J. Gibbons Regarding Cause to Retain Adversary Proceeding. tb
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Notice Of Conditional Dismissal re Non Payment of Filing Fees
                    Docket Text: Notice of Conditional Dismissal re : Last Day to Reply 2/1/04 jg
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Order(Generic)
                      Docket Text: Order Denying [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc . jp
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                        Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc . Afger agruments, motion DENIED. Order forthcoming. Court will entertain stip pretrial order. Court will check on progress in approx 40 days. Court's oral comments constitute it's findings of fact & conclusions of law. bm
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Affidavit
                          Docket Text: Affidavit of Defendant in Opposition to Modify injunction and Abstention RE: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc sb
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Memorandum
                            Docket Text: Memorandum by: Daniel Steven Fallow In Reference to: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc jg
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                              Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Michael J Paukert for Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc Of [38-1] Affidavit, [37-1] Brief by Michael J Paukert . jg
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Affidavit
                                Docket Text: Affidavit by Monica Limon-Wynn in Support of RE: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc jg
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Brief
                                  Docket Text: Brief Filed by Michael J Paukert for Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc re: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc jg
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Creditor Request for Notice
                                    Docket Text: Notice of Appearance By Daniel Steven Fallow, Defendant to Appear Pro Se. jp
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                      Docket Text: Hearing Re: [31-1] Motion for Abstention by Herbalife International Inc rescheduled For 9:30 10/28/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA) jg
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey H Andrews for Defendant of [32-1] Order . tb
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                                          Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews - GRANTED, order signed & filed. jp
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Order(Generic)
                                            Docket Text: Order Granting [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews . Involvement of attorney Jeffrey H Andrews for Daniel Steven Fallow. tb
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 ~Generic~ MOTION
                                              Docket Text: Motion by Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc for Abstention jg
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Affidavit
                                                Docket Text: Affidavit RE: [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews jg
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Re: [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews set For 9:30 9/3/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA) jg
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                                                    Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews - Hrg Continued for 9:30 9/3/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA). Mr Andrews to file an affidavit in response to Mr Fallows Objection to motion jp
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Objection
                                                      Docket Text: Objection By Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow To [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews . jp
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                                                        Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: Pretrial Conference - Motion to withdraw as Counsel for Defendant has been filed. Pretrial VACATED. Court to review case in aproximately 45 days to determine status of representation of Defendant. jp
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey H Andrews for Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow Of [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record Andrews. tb
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Re: [23-1] Motion To Withdraw As Attorney of Record by Jeffrey H Andrews Set For 9:30 8/5/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA) tb
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Docket Text: Motion By Jeffrey H Andrews for Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow, Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow To Withdraw As Attorney of Record . bm
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                                                                Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Rule 55(b)(2) - Matter resoved as previous hearing. Hearing this date VACATED. jp
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                                  Docket Text: Pre-Trial Hearing Set For 9:30pt/10:30mt 7/23/03 by way of telephone conference. Court will initiate call. jp
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Order(Generic)
                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow . jp
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Re: [1-2] Complaint NOS 498 Other Action, Not Related ; Pre-Trial Hearing Set For 9:30 pacific time 7/23/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA), [1-1] Complaint NOS 426 Dischargeability 523 jg
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
                                                                        Docket Text: Amended Answer by Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow Re: [6-1] Answer tb
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                          Docket Text: Motion By Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc For Default Judgment as to Count One, Count Two and Count Three . so
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Minute Entry Confirmation Hearing Held
                                                                            Docket Text: Minute Entry Re: [10-1] Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default - GRANTED, Order forthcoming. jp
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Support Brief/Memorandum
                                                                              Docket Text: Brief/Memorandum By Jeffrey H Andrews for Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow, Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow In Support Of [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow . so
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Response
                                                                                Docket Text: Response By Plaintiff Herbalife International Inc To [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow . so
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Jeffrey H Andrews for Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow, Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow Of [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow, [11-1] Affidavit, [12-1] Hearing . so
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Re: [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow Set For 9:30 4/17/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA) so
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                      Docket Text: Affidavit RE: [10-1] Motion by Daniel Steven Fallow so
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Motion to Set Aside
                                                                                        Docket Text: Motion by Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow to Set Aside [5-1] Judgment Order by Daniel Steven Fallow so
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 ~Generic~ NOTICE
                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of [3-1] Motion For Default Judgment by Herbalife International Inc so
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Hearing (Bk Motion) Set
                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Re: [3-1] Motion For Default Judgment by Herbalife International Inc Scheduled For 9:30 6/10/03 at U.S. Courthouse (CDA) tb
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                              Docket Text: Affidavit of Defendant in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default. (Motion NOT Filed) jp
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                Docket Text: Answer To Complaint by Defendant Daniel Steven Fallow . jp
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                  Docket Text: Clerk's Entry of Default as to Daniel Steven Fallow jp
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Affidavit Re: Non Military Service
                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit Re Non-Military Service by Plaintiff jp
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion By Plaintiff For Default Judgment . jp
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Summons Service Executed
                                                                                                        Docket Text: Summons Served 1/20/03 on Daniel Steven Fallow. jp
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                          Docket Text: Complaint (03-6021) Herbalife International Inc vs. Daniel Steven Fallow . NOS 426 Dischargeability 523 , NOS 498 Other Action, Not Related . ( Filing Fee $ 150.00 Receipt # 12315) jp
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?