Rasetta v. Rainha Construction Co., Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12322-WGY

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:42 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
Space Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
Space Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
Space Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis Rasetta, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
Space Mary T. Sullivan +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 msullivan@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo JR Enterprises Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ratcliffe Burke Harten & Elias, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Richard Ratcliffe +1 401 331 3400 +1 401 331 3440 rratcliffe@rhbglaw.com
No Logo Rainha Construction Co., Inc., Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 11/2/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Suffolk
Terminated 7/18/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Terminated Case
Civil Case Administratively Closed. It May Be Reopened Upon the Motion of Either Party. (Paine, Matthew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered re [39] Joint Motion for Order to Conditionally Dismiss Action and Retain Jurisdiction. (Paine, Matthew)
      LREF
      Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006, Terminated: 7/18/2006 Motion for Order
      Joint MOTION for Order to Conditionally Dismiss Action and Retain Jurisdiction by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sills, Anne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. re [37] Joint Statement is SO ORDER as the case Management Scheduling Order. DISCOVERY DUE February 1, 2007 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE February 15, 2007. (Paine, Matthew)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Joint submission
          Amended JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta.(Sills, Anne)
            LREF
            Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Summons Returned Executed
            SUMMONS Returned Executed JR Enterprises Corp. served on 3/13/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed Rainha Construction Co., Inc. served on 3/13/2006, answer due 4/3/2006. (Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Joint submission
                  JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mary T. Sullivan on behalf of all plaintiffs (Sullivan, Mary)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing : Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Notice of Reassignment
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge William G. Young added. Judge Robert E. Keeton no longer assigned to case. From this date forward the case number on all pleadings should be followed by the initials WGY. (Folan, Karen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Stipulation
                          STIPULATION re [28] Second Amended Complaint, by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta, JR Enterprises Corp.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Answer to Amended Complaint
                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by JR Enterprises Corp..(Filo, Jennifer)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by J. Richard Ratcliffe on behalf of JR Enterprises Corp. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006 Summons Issued
                                Summons Issued as to Rainha Construction Co., Inc., JR Enterprises Corp.. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Amended Complaint
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against JR Enterprises Corp., Rainha Construction Co., Inc., filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    Judge Robert E. Keeton: ORDER entered; JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendant.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                      Judge Robert E. Keeton: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.(Filo, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                        Judge Robert E. Keeton: Electronic ORDER entered granting [14] Motion for Entry of Default, granting [20] Motion to Add Defendant and, granting [25] Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                          MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Notice regarding mandatory use of ECF
                                          NOTICE issued to Attorney Girard Visconti regarding mandatory use of ECF in compliance with Local Rule 5.4. Failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Folan, Karen)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc., Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                              AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support re [20] MOTION to Add Defendant filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [20] MOTION to Add Defendant filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  MOTION to Add Defendant by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Affidavit
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Affidavit
                                                        AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Affidavit
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Gina M. Alongi as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [14] MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Rainha Construction Co., Inc. filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 2/1/2006 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                              MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Rainha Construction Co., Inc. by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                                                Judge Robert E. Keeton : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re [12] Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Rainha Construction Co., Inc., (Folan, Karen)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                                                  NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Rainha Construction Co., Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Request for notice of default
                                                                    Request for notice of default. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Stipulation
                                                                      STIPULATION by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc..(Folan, Karen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Campbell on behalf of Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Girard R. Visconti on behalf of Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Bacon Construction Co., Inc. served on 3/29/2005, answer due 4/18/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed Agostini Construction Co., Inc. served on 3/29/2005, answer due 4/18/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Rainha Construction Co., Inc. served on 3/28/2005, answer due 4/18/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Summons Issued
                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Rainha Construction Co., Inc., Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc.. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Agostini Construction Co., Inc., Bacon Construction Co., Inc., Rainha Construction Co., Inc., filed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta, Jr, John J. Shaughnessy, Christopher Barletta. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 1/20/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Rainha Construction Co., Inc. served on 12/9/2004, answer due 12/29/2004. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Rainha Construction Co., Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 59754, filed by Christopher Barletta, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 4, Louis Rasetta Jr., John J. Shaughnessy. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Category Sheet# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C)(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Cohen. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Rainha Construction Co., Inc.. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?