Rasetta et al v. P.A. Fiore Company, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12335-MLW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Barletta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaughnessy, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo John J. Shaugnessy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Louis G. Rasetta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory A Geiman +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 ggeiman@segalroitman.com
Space Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo P.A. Fiore Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Beverly National Bank, Trustee
Office Boston
Filed 11/3/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Default
County Suffolk
Terminated 12/7/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006 Order on Motion for TRO
Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [31] Motion for TRO, granting [36] Motion to Withdraw (O'Leary, Dennis)
    LREF
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006, Terminated: 4/12/2006 Motion to Withdraw
    MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
      Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs (O'Leary, Dennis)
        LREF
        Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. Document received: Order forTemporary Restraining Order. (Geiman, Gregory)
          LREF
          Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Affidavit in Support of Motion
          AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support re [31] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (With Notice) filed by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
            LREF
            Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
            MEMORANDUM in Support re [31] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (With Notice) filed by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
              LREF
              Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005, Terminated: 4/12/2006 Motion for TRO
              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (With Notice) by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [25] Motion for Default Judgment. ALLOWED. Judgment for plaintiffs shall enter in the amount of $27,724.80. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                  Proposed Document(s) submitted by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. Document received: Default Judgment. (Geiman, Gregory)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Affidavit
                    AFFIDAVIT of Anne R. Sills by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Affidavit
                        AFFIDAVIT of Gina M. Alongi as to Military Service, Infancy and Incompetence by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Geiman, Gregory)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [25] MOTION for Default Judgment as to P.A. Fiore Construction, Inc. filed by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Geiman, Gregory)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Default Judgment
                            MOTION for Default Judgment as to P.A. Fiore Construction, Inc. by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : ElectronicORDER entered granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File. ALOWED. The motion or dismissal shall be filed by 11/30/2005 (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2005 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. ALLOWED. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005, Terminated: 9/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to October 15, 2005 to File for Entry of Default Judgment by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Standing Order re motions for default judgmentCourt Filing
                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default
                                        NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to P.A. Fiore Construction, Inc. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                                          Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [18] Motion for Entry of Default. ALLOWED with regard to Fiore Construction only. The claim against Fiore individually is voluntarily dismissed. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Order on Motion for TRO
                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered withdrawing [9] Motion for TRO, granting [19] Motion to Withdraw Motion for TRO. (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005, Terminated: 8/2/2005 Motion to Withdraw
                                                MOTION to Withdraw [9] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005, Terminated: 8/8/2005 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                  MOTION for Entry of Default by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4.(Geiman, Gregory)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, John J. Shaughnessy, Jr, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4 (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed County Homes, Inc. served on 6/14/2005, answer due 7/5/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed MASSACHUSETTS ELECTRIC COMPANY served on 6/10/2005, answer due 6/30/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Paul Fiore served on 6/14/2005, answer due 7/5/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed P.A. Fiore Construction, Inc. served on 6/14/2005, answer due 7/5/2005. (Geiman, Gregory)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Order on Motion for Order
                                                              Judge Mark L. Wolf : Electronic ORDER entered granting [3] Motion for Ex Parte Order of Attachment (O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy. Document received: Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Affidavit in Support
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of James Bucci in Support of [9] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of [9] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, FILED, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005, Terminated: 8/2/2005 Motion for TRO
                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against P.A. Fiore Company, Inc.and Massachusetts Electric Company and County Homes, Inc. filed by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 6/6/2005 to add the Reach and Apply Defts in the text of this entry (Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Affidavit
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT Re Document No. 3, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Affidavit
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT Re Document No. 3 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Remark
                                                                              Certificate re Document No. 3 (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [3] EX PARTE MOTION filed by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION by Louis G. Rasetta, John J. Shaugnessy, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed P.A. Fiore Company, Inc. served on 1/11/2005, answer due 1/31/2005. (Sills, Anne)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against P.A. Fiore Company, Inc. Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 59796, filed by Christopher Barletta, Louis G. Rasetta, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 4, John J. Shaughnessy Jr., John J. Shaugnessy. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Category Sheet# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B)(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to P.A. Fiore Company, Inc.. (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                        If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Bowler (Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?