Sheehan v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12364-JGD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Erik Sheehan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by reverelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Domenic Finelli +1 781 286 1484 +1 781 289 0410 dom-finelli@msn.com
Space Paul Tuttle +1 781 286 1484 +1 781 289 0410 ptuttle@reverelaw.com
v.
No Logo Carolyn Driscoll, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Doreen Toben, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Doug Wilder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Laura Cardinale, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Linda Richelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Lisa Damask, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Paul McGovern, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windy Rosebush Catino +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 wcatino@eapdlaw.com
Space Timothy P. Van Dyck +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 227 4420 tvandyck@eapdlaw.com
Office Boston
Filed 11/8/2004
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Suffolk
Terminated 2/27/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADR, CLOSED
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 43 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
    LREF
    Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Settlement Order of DismissalCourt Filing
    Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006 Terminated Case
      Civil Case Terminated. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
        Letter/request (non-motion) from Windy L. Rosebush Reporting on Scheduling of ADR. (Rosebush, Windy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Order Referring Case to ADR
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
            LREF
            Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
            Letter/request (non-motion) from Timothy P. Van Dyck. (Van Dyck, Timothy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Windy L. Rosebush Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address (Rosebush, Windy)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [37] Joint Motion to Extend the Summary Judgment Deadline to 3/2/06.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006, Terminated: 1/26/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to March 2, 2006 to File Joint Motion to Extend the Summary Judgment Deadline by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Rosebush, Windy)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order
                    Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered regarding [36] Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Finelli. The parties shall report to the court by 1/30/06 if court sponsored ADR should be scheduled.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Letter/request (non-motion)
                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Domenic Finelli. (Tuttle, Paul)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                        Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [30] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Motion Hearing
                          Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2006 re [30] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Erik Sheehan,.; Attorneys Tuttle and Rosebush inform court #'s 3,4,& 5 have been resolved, and present arguments on remaining requests; USMJ Dein makes rulings and will issue order; Counsel shall report within 10 days if mediation is possible. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005, Terminated: 12/21/2005 Motion to Continue
                            Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Rosebush, Windy)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                              Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [34] Joint Motion to Continue Hearing. The motion hearing has been continued to 1/3/06 at 2:00PM before Magistrate Judge Dein in Courtroom #15 on the 5th floor. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                Electronic NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents: Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                  Opposition re [30] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Written Warning# (2) Exhibit B, March 2002 E-mail Chain# (3) Exhibit C, Additional E-mails March 2002 E-mail Chain# (4) Exhibit D, E-mails and drafts of June 2002 Letter# (5) Exhibit E, Excerpts of Depo. of Linda Richelson)(Rosebush, Windy)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                  Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [32] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to 12/2/2005to Respond to [30] Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 2, 2005 to File Response/Reply as to [30] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents, [31] Memorandum in Support of Motion by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Rosebush, Windy)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [30] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Erik Sheehan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Tuttle, Paul)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 1/3/2006 Motion to Compel
                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Erik Sheehan.(Tuttle, Paul)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                        Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Status Conference
                                          Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Status Conference held on 10/27/2005.; Attorneys Tuttle, Rosebush and VanDyck report current case status; USMJ Dein extends fact discovery to 11/30/05 and motions to compel due 11/14/05. (Court Reporter DR.) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Joint statement of counsel
                                            JOINT STATEMENT of counsel Pursuant to May 23, 2005 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Rosebush, Windy)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              Judge Judith G. Dein : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/27/2005 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.(Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                AMENDED ANSWER to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Rosebush, Windy)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                                  Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Scheduling Conference held on 5/23/2005.; Attorneys Tuttle and Van Dyke report type of case and scope of discovery; USMJ Dein adopts proposed schedule and sets next conference for 10/27/05 @ 2:30pm. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Rosebush, Windy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Erik Sheehan.(Tuttle, Paul)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Van Dyck, Timothy)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2005 02:45 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                            Judge Judith G. Dein : MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [6] Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss, and denying [10] Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Tuttle Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 62119. by Erik Sheehan.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                Judge Judith G. Dein : Electronic ORDER entered granting [20] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul Tuttle for Erik Sheehan (Dein, Judith)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Motion Hearing
                                                                  Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Judith G. Dein : Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2005 re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants,, [10] MOTION to Remand filed by Erik Sheehan,.; Attorneys Van Dyck and Tuttle make arguments on the motions and USMJ Dein takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter D.R..) (Quinn, Thomas)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                    Electronic NOTICE of Hearing on [6] MOTION to Dismiss, and [10] MOTION to Remand: Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Order case reassigned to Magistrate Judge for TriaCourt Filing
                                                                      Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. ORDER entered: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. for all purposes, including trial and entry of final judgment. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Consent by all parties to Jurisdiction by US MagisCourt Filing
                                                                        CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Erik Sheehan, Verizon Communications, Inc., FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) Modified on 1/27/2005 to correct the filing date from 1/21/04 to 1/21/05 Boyce, Kathy).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                          Letter/request (non-motion) from Timothy P. Van Dyck. (Rosebush, Windy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered. The parties are being ordered to inform the court by January 13, 2005 whether they consent to a transfer of thiscase to Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Attachments: # (1))(O'Leary, Dennis)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004 state court record
                                                                              Local Rule 8.1 Statement with STATE COURT Record, FILED, c/s. (Attachments: # (1))(Boyce, Kathy)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Opposition re [10] MOTION to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Rosebush, Windy)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erik Sheehan. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Opposition re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erik Sheehan. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [10] MOTION to Remand filed by Erik Sheehan. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004, Terminated: 5/10/2005 Motion to Remand
                                                                                        MOTION to Remand to the Superior Court of Massachusetts by Erik Sheehan.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Mark L. Wolf for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph L. Tauro no longer assigned to case Counsel are directed to the Court's Standing Orders re: Electronic Case Filing.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [6] MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Rosebush, Windy)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004, Terminated: 5/10/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants.(Rosebush, Windy)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Answer
                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Rosebush, Windy)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Windy L. Rosebush, Timothy P. Van Dyck on behalf of all defendants (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Linda Richelson. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Paul McGovern. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Suffolk Superior Court, case number 2004-cv-03961. $ 150, receipt number 59932, filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                          If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Dein. (Abaid, Kim)
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5,244 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?