USA v. Szafranski
Criminal Case Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cr-60010-WPD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2019 at 3:15 PM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evelyn Baltodano-Sheehan +1 305 961 9125 evelyn.sheehan@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey Kaplan +95435 672 55X3515 +3567 356 356 7336 jeffrey.kaplan@usdoj.gov
Space Lawrence D. LaVecchio +1 954 356 7255 +1 954 356 7230 lawrence.lavecchio@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Schwartz +1 954 356 7255 +3567 356 356 7230 paul.schwartz@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Ft Lauderdale
Filed 1/22/2015
County Broward (Office
Terminated 10/26/2015
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 2-12
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flags BNDAOV,CLOSED,LSS
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Travel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Return of Property/PostTrial
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Re: [67] Joint Motion to Reduce Sentence Under Rule 35 as to Michael Szafranski. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/16/2016. (ar2)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Travel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016 Order on Motion to Reduce SentenceCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [67] Joint Motion for Reduction of Sentence as to Michael Szafranski (1). Michael Szafranski (1), Count(s) 1, 2-12, DISMISSED; Count 1s, AMENDED IMPRISONMENT: 20 Months. SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 Years. ASSESSMENT: $100.00. PRIOR JUDGMENT: IMPRISONMENT: 30 Months. SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 Years. ASSESSMENT: $100.00. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/16/2016. (ar2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Travel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: 3/16/2016, Terminated: 3/16/2016 Reduce Sentence Pursuant to Rule 35/60/Other Miscellaneous
                    Joint MOTION to Reduce Sentence Under Rule 35 by USA as to Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 4/4/2016 (LaVecchio, Lawrence)
                      LREF
                      Blank 66 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 SentencingCourt Filing
                      PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Sentencing held on 10/26/2015 as to Michael Szafranski. Sentence Imposed: 30 months imprisonment, 3 years supervised release, No Fine, $100 assessment. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (kc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 JudgmentCourt Filing
                        JUDGMENT as to Michael Szafranski (1), Count(s) 1, 2-12, DISMISSED.; Count(s) 1s, IMPRISONMENT: 30 Months. SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 Years. ASSESSMENT: $100.00. Closing Case for Defendant. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/26/2015. (ar2) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing Additional Letters in Mitigation of Sentence by Michael Szafranski re [60] Sentencing Memorandum (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letters In Mitigation)(Srebnick, Scott)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                            NOTICE OF RECEIPT as to Michael Szafranski Re: [62] Letter from Rabbi Arthur (Avraham) Rockmill. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/23/2015. (ar2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Letter
                              Letter from Rabbi Arthur (Avraham) Rockmill as to Michael Szafranski (ar2)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Filing Additional Letters for Sentencing by Michael Szafranski (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Additional Letters in Mitigation of Sentence)(Srebnick, Scott)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Sentencing Memorandum
                                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Michael Szafranski (Srebnick, Scott)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Filing Letters in Mitigation of Sentence by Michael Szafranski (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letters in Mitigation of Sentence)(Srebnick, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 - - AUTHORIZED USERS: See the Court's website for instructions on viewing the PSI report - - Disclos
                                      FINAL Addendum 1 Disclosure of Presentence Investigation Report of Michael Szafranski. This is a limited access document. Report access provided to attorneys Paul Schwartz, Jeffrey Kaplan, Lawrence D. LaVecchio, Scott Alan Srebnick by USPO (bmy)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Order on Motion to Continue SentencingCourt Filing
                                        ORDER RESCHEDULING SENTENCING and granting [56] Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Michael Szafranski (1). Sentencing reset for 10/26/2015 01:15 PM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/30/2015. (ar2)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015, Terminated: 9/30/2015 Continue Sentencing
                                          Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing (proposing date of October 26, 27, or 28) by Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 10/19/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Rescheduling Sentencing Date)(Srebnick, Scott)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 - - AUTHORIZED USERS: See the Court's website for instructions on viewing the PSI report - - Disclos
                                            DRAFT Disclosure of Presentence Investigation Report of Michael Szafranski. This is a limited access document. Report access provided to attorneys Paul Schwartz, Jeffrey Kaplan, Lawrence D. LaVecchio, Scott Alan Srebnick by USPO (bmy)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF RECEIPT as to Michael Szafranski re [53] Letter filed by Harvey Finkel Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/11/2015. (yha)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                Letter from Harvey Finkle as to Michael Szafranski by Harvey Finkel (yha)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF RECEIPT as to Michael Szafranski Re: [51] Letter from Harvey Finkel. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/8/2015. (ar2)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Letter
                                                    Letter from Harvey Finkle as to Michael Szafranski. (ar2)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Receipt as to Michael Szafranski Re: [49] Letter Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/26/2015. (ar2)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Letter
                                                        Letter from Daniel Gielchinsky as to Michael Szafranski (ar2)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Notice of Probation Officer Assignment
                                                          Notice of Presentence Investigation Assignment of Michael Szafranski to US Probation Officer Kathryn Gomez in the Fort Lauderdale U.S. Courthouse and he/she can be contacted at 954-769-5505 or Kathryn_Gomez@flsp.uscourts.gov. (bmy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or SentencingCourt Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF SENTENCING HEARING as to Michael Szafranski. Sentencing set for 10/21/2015 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (kc)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                                                              STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS as to Michael Szafranski (kc)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Plea Agreement/Factual Proffer Statement
                                                                PLEA AGREEMENT as to Michael Szafranski (kc)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 ~Util - Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Change of Plea Hearing as to Michael Szafranski held on 7/29/2015 Michael Szafranski (1) Guilty Count 1s., ( Sentencing set for 10/21/2015 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (kc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Order Re: Status Conference/Speedy Trial/Pretrial MattersCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT, SPEEDY TRIAL,PRETRIAL MATTERS as to Michael Szafranski Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 7/28/2015. (ots)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Michael Szafranski (ots)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: ARRAIGNMENT as to Michael Szafranski (1) Count 1,1s,2-12 held on 7/28/2015. No new Standing Discovery Order will be entered. (Digital 11:04:29) (ots)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                          PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Szafranski Arraignment set for 7/28/2015 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Information - Felony
                                                                            SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to Michael Szafranski (1) count(s) 1s. (ar2)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of Receipt as to Michael Szafranski Re: [37] Notice/Letter filed by Harvey Finkel. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/22/2015. (ar2)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                NOTICE to the Court Re: Sentencing by Harvey Finkel as to Michael Szafranski (ar2)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/13/2015 Notice/Order of Change of Plea and/or SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Michael Szafranski. Change of Plea Hearing set for 7/29/2015 at 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (dby)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [34] Motion to Travel as to Michael Szafranski (1). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/9/2015. (dby)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015, Terminated: 7/9/2015 Travel
                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Travel to the Northern District of New York on July 19, 2015 by Michael Szafranski. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Travel)(Srebnick, Scott)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: 5/29/2015 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [32] Motion to Travel as to Michael Szafranski (1). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/29/2015. (dby)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015, Terminated: 5/29/2015 Travel
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Travel By Car Between the Southern District of Florida and Eastern District of New York (from June14-22, 2015) by Michael Szafranski. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Travel)(Srebnick, Scott)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: 5/7/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Michael Szafranski Time excluded from 5/7/2015 until 10/26/2015. Calendar Call set for 10/23/2015 09:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2015 09:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/7/2015. (ar2)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 ~Util - Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Calendar Call as to Michael Szafranski held on 5/6/2015, ( Calendar Call reset for 10/23/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Jury Trial reset for 10/26/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. (kc)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Order on Motion to Continue TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER denying [28] Motion to Continue Trial as to Michael Szafranski (1). Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/24/2015. (ar2)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015, Terminated: 4/24/2015 Continue Trial
                                                                                                  Defendant's MOTION to Continue Trial (continuance unopposed -- government defers to the Court regarding further scheduing) by Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Srebnick, Scott)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                    PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Szafranski Calendar Call set for Wednesday, 5/6/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. ( This notice is just to clarify Trial Notice)(kc)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Notice of trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                      AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL as to Michael Szafranski Calendar Call set for 5/6/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (kc)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Notice of trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF TRIAL as to Michael Szafranski Calendar Call set for 5/6/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (kc)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Order Re: Status Conference/Speedy Trial/Pretrial MattersCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER RE: SPEEDY TRIAL, PRETRIAL MATTERS as to Michael Szafranski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/3/2015. (dby)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Paperless Standing Discovery OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            PAPERLESS STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER as to Michael Szafranski: The defendant(s) having been arraigned this date in open Court, it is Ordered that within 14 days of the date of this order that all parties to this action shall review and comply with Southern District of Florida Local Rules 88.10 (Criminal Discovery), and 88.9(c) (Motions in Criminal Cases). Upon a sufficient showing, the Court may at any time, upon a properly filed motion, order that the discovery or inspection provided for by this Standing Order be denied, restricted or deferred, or make such other order as is appropriate. It is expected by the Court, however, that counsel for both sides shall make a good faith effort to comply with the letter and spirit of this Standing Order. It shall be the continuing duty of counsel for both sides to immediately reveal to opposing counsel all newly discovered information or other material within the scope of Local Rule 88.10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 4/3/2015. (dby)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: ARRAIGNMENT as to Michael Szafranski (1) Count 1,2-12 held on 4/3/2015. (Digital 10:08:09.) (dby) (Main Document 22 replaced on 4/3/2015) (dby).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Scott Alan Srebnick appearing for Michael Szafranski (dby) Modified on 4/3/2015 (dby).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Add Attorneys
                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Michael Szafranski. Attorney Scott Alan Srebnick for Michael Szafranski added (dby)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                    PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING **PLEASE NOTE CHANGE IN TIME** as to Michael Szafranski. Arraignment set for 4/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 4/3/2015 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dby)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [18] Motion to Continue as to Michael Szafranski (1). Arraignment reset for 4/3/2015 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 4/3/2015 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 3/12/2015. (dby)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015, Terminated: 3/12/2015 Continue
                                                                                                                        Second MOTION to Continue Reset Arraignment and Report re Counsel (Unopposed) by Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Srebnick, Howard)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Michael Szafranski's unopposed [13] Motion to Clarify One of His Bond Conditions. Defendant's bond conditions are amended to permit Defendant to access other people's personal identifiers during the ordinary course of his AAMCO business. All other conditions of release shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/18/15. (ms01)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                            Reset Hearings as to Michael Szafranski: Arraignment RESET for 3/13/2015 AT 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing RESET for 3/13/2015 AT 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (at)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Michael Szafranski's [15] Unopposed Motion to Reset Arraignment and Report of Counsel. Defendant's arraignment is hereby reset for March 13, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/13/2015. (ms01)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015, Terminated: 2/13/2015 Continue
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Continue Reset Arraignment and Report re Counsel by Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Srebnick, Howard)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE That His Motion to Clarify Bond is Unopposed by Michael Szafranski re [13] Defendant's MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (To Clarify One of his Bond Conditions) (Srebnick, Howard)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015, Terminated: 2/18/2015 Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (To Clarify One of his Bond Conditions) by Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 2/23/2015 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Srebnick, Howard)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Bond Hearing as to Michael Szafranski held on 2/5/2015, Initial Appearance as to Michael Szafranski held on 2/5/2015. as to Michael Szafranski (1) $250,000 PSB( Arraignment set for 2/17/2015 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate., Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 2/17/2015 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate.). (Digital 11:19:51.) (dd)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        $250,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Michael Szafranski Approved by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle Special Conditions: a. Surrender all passports and travel documents to the Pretrial Services Office;b. Report to Pretrial Services as directed;c. Submit to substance abuse testing and/or treatment as directed by Pretrial Services;d. Refrain from excessive use of alcohol, or any use of a narcotic drug or other controlled substance;q. Comply with additional conditions of bond: Avoid contact with witnesses or victims unless seen at religious services. Travel in SD/FL & ED/NY. Surrender firearm by 2/9/15 (Atty & PTS will decide where to surrender). No access to personal info of others. (dd)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Order on Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Order on Initial Appearance as to Michael Szafranski for proceeding held on 2/5/2015. Bond set $250,000 PSB. Arraignment set for 2/17/2015 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 2/17/2015 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/5/2015. (dd)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Notice of Temporary Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Howard Milton Srebnick appearing for Michael Szafranski (dd)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Evelyn Baltodano-Sheehan appearing for USA. Regarding the forfeiture issues on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Evelyn Baltodano-Sheehan added to party USA(pty:pla). (Baltodano-Sheehan, Evelyn)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Notice of Compliance
                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance pursuant to [6] Order to Unseal (dby)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Order to UnsealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Order to Unseal as to Michael Szafranski. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 2/5/2015. (dby)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Report Commencing Criminal Action
                                                                                                                                                    Report Commencing Criminal Action as to Michael Szafranski - YOB: **/**/1978 Prisoner #: 07361-104 (dby)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                      Arrest of Michael Szafranski (dby)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                        PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING as to Michael Szafranski. Initial Appearance set for 2/5/2015 at 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate. (dby)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT AND FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS as to Michael Szafranski (1) count(s) 1, 2-12. (dby)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [1] Motion to Seal as to Michael Szafranski (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 1/22/2015. (dby).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015, Terminated: 1/22/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal by USA as to Michael Szafranski. Responses due by 2/9/2015 (dby).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?