USA v. Giraldo, et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cr-00166-CBA

Tags
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 4:59 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo Adriana Marquez, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Perez, Defendant
No Logo Dario Giraldo, Defendant
No Logo GUSTAVO GARCIA, Defendant
No Logo Hector Fabio Gualteros, Defendant
No Logo Julio Zuluaga, Defendant
No Logo Libardo Moncada, Defendant
No Logo Nelson Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Garcia, Defendant
No Logo Ruben Dario Velasquez, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: 5/4/2012 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Gustavo Garcia; The court orders that the Probation Department shall disseminate the offender's presentence report to New York State Parole Department. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 4/18/2012. (rec'd 5/4/12 in docketing) (Fernandez, Erica)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER as to Gustavo Garcia; The Court has received Gustavo Garcia's petition to seal the record of his adult criminal court appearances and the dispositions thereof. "No federal statute provides for the expungement of an arrest record," United States v. Schnitzer, 567 F.2d 536, 539 (2d Cir. 1977). To the extent that the ability to expunge a criminal record lies within the equitable discretion of the federal courts, this relief is granted only in "extreme circumstances." Id. No such circumstances have been shown here, and Mr. Garcia's petition is therefore denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/6/2011. (Fernandez, Erica)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
      CASE reassigned to Judge Unassigned (Chow, Alice)
        LREF
        Blank 102 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Sentencing before Judge Amon filed in case as to Gustavo Garcia for dates of 9/29/95; Court Reporter/ESR: Robert Eppenstein. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Paul E. Warburgh, Esq., represented the defendant. (DiTomasso, Mike)
          LREF
          Blank 101 Filed: 6/12/1996, Entered: 6/12/1996 Order
          CJA 20 as to Adriana Marquez Authorization to Pay $ 120.00 to Raul Cuesta, Voucher # 05281724 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , Dated 2/16/96. (DiTomasso, Mike)
            LREF
            Blank 100 Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: 5/6/1996 Order
            CJA 21 as to Adriana Marquez Authorization to Pay Raul Cuesta $ 120.00 for Expert Services Voucher # 0528172-3 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 2/27/96) (DiTomasso, Mike)
              LREF
              Blank 99 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
              MOTION by Hector Fabio Gualteros for Return of Property - [99-1] motion hearing to be set by the Court. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                LREF
                Blank 98 Filed: 4/23/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                LETTER dated 4/20/96 from Hector Gualteros to Judge Amon, regarding the Forfeiture Agreement of his fully paid automobile. Additional property as stated in this letter has not been returned and was not a part of the Forfieture Agreement. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                  LREF
                  Blank 97 Filed: 1/17/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996 Order
                  Judgment Returned Executed as to Gustavo Garcia ; on 1/2/96; Defendant delivered to FCI Fort Dix, NJ. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                    LREF
                    Blank 96 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER as to Gustavo Garcia endorsed on letter dated 11/28/95, from Paul E. Warburgh, Jr., to Judge Amon. Defendant is allowed to surrender on 1/2/96, as requested in this letter. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon dated: 11/28/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                      LREF
                      Blank 95 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995 Order
                      Judgment Returned Executed as to Carlos Perez ; on 10/27/95; Defendant delivered to Federal Prison Camp, Lewisberg, PA. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                        LREF
                        Blank 94 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                        LETTER dated 10/12/95 from Joseph A. Bondy to Judge Amon, requesting withdrawal of their motion to redetermine sentence, per Fed. R. Crim P. 35(c). After conversation with Mr. Garcia, he has indicated to our office that he no longer wnato to go forward with his application. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                          LREF
                          Blank 93 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Pleading before Mag. Judge Azrack filed in case as to Gustavo Garcia for dates of 6/15/95 ; Court AUSA Frank Mc.Clain-Sauer. Paul e. Warburgh, Esq. presentend the Defendant. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                            LREF
                            Blank 92 Filed: 10/13/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                            JUDGMENT Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) cmp. Defendant assessed $50.00. Defendant sentenced to 33 months of imprisonment followed by 3 years of supervised release. The Court recommend that the defendant be incarcerated at a facility in Fort Dix, NJ. Defendant shall surrender before 2:00 p.m. on 12/8/95. Statement of reasons attached. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 10/3/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                              LREF
                              Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                              DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Gustavo Garcia Terminated motions:, Counts Dismissed: Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                LREF
                                Blank 88 Filed: 10/12/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                NOTICE of Hearing as to Gustavo Garcia :, Oral Argument set for 9:30 10/20/95 as to: Gustavo Garcia, re: (40-1) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 90 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                  NOTICE of representation by Richard A. Canton, Esq. for Gustavo Garcia. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 89 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/12/1995 Motion for Reconsideration
                                    MOTION by Gustavo Garcia redetermining sentence . [89-1] motion (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 91 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/13/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Gustavo Garcia ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 9/29/95 for Sentencing. Defendant present on bail, with attorney Paul Warburgh. AUSA Frank Mc.Clain-Sewer. Court Reporter - Robert Eppenstein. Eric Rubenstein - Probation Officer. Defendant sentenced as to Count 1 of the Superseding Information. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                        Sentencing held Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1s, on 9/29/95. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 87 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/28/1995 Order
                                          Judgment Returned Executed as to Hector Fabio Gualteros ; on 9/7/95; Defendant delivered to Loretto (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 86 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                            JUDGMENT Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1s. Defendant assessed $50.00. Defendant is placed on probation for a term of 5 years. Defendant while on probation, shal not commit another Federal, State, or local crime and shall comply with the standard conditions that have been adopted by this Court. If this Judgment imposes a fine or a restitution obligation, it shall be a condition of probation that the defendat pay any such fine or restitution. Defendant shall comply with the Standard Conditions of Supervision as setforth in this Judgment. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 9/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 85 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              CALENDAR ENTRY as to Patricia Garcia ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 9/15/95 for sentencing. Defendant present on bail, with attorney Jerald Levine representing her. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Interpreter - Anna Marie Siveri. Defendant to Count 1 of the superseding information. Court Reporter/ESR -Lisa Auson (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 84 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                JUDGMENT Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1s. Defendant assessed $50.00. Defendant sentenced and placed on probation for a term of 5 years. The execution of sentence is stayed to 11/17/95. Defendant shall serve 6 months under monitored home dentention as scheduled by the probation department. The defendant shall not possess a Firearm or destructive device. Statment of reasons attached. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 8/18/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of pleading before mag. Judge Azrack filed in case as to Adriana Marquez, and Carlos Perez for dates of 6/15/95. AUSA Frank MC Clain-Sewer. Barry Schulman, Esq., representing Defendant Marquez. Hugh Cunniffe, Esq., representing defendant Perez. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                    Sentencing held Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1s on 9/15/95. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Patricia Garcia, endorsed on letter dated 8/14/95 from Jerald Levine to Judge Amon, resetting Sentencing for 9:30 9/15/95 for Patricia Garcia before Judge Carol B. Amon . ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , dated: 8/18/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        JUDGMENT Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1s. Defendant assessed $50.00. Defendant sentenced 5 months of imprisonment, followed by 3 years of supervised release. Defendant shall not possess a firearm or destructie device. It is further condition of supervised release that the defendant serve 5 months under monitored home detention as scheduled by the probation department. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons before 2:00 p.m. on 10/27/95. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 8/18/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 8/22/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER dated 8/11/95 from Hugh Cunniffee to Judge Amon to supplement the probation report with additional relevant information. The defendant has request this information to be conveyed to the Court in support of an application at the time of sentence to reduce his role from that of a minor to a minimal participant and allow him to be sentenced as a Zone C offender under the guidelines. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Endorsed ORDER dtd 8/16/95 that the sentencing of the dft Gustavo Garcia is adjourned to 9/29/95 at 9:30. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon on letter dtd 8/15/95 from Paul Warburgh Jr. ). (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of guilty plea before Mag Chrein filed in case as to Libardo Moncada for dates of 3/2/95. (Greves, Liz)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                CALENDAR ENTRY as to Adriana Marquez ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 8/18/95 for Sentencing. Defendant present, on bail with attorney Barry Schulman. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Court Reporter/ESR - Monique Dawkins. Defendant sentenced as to Count 1. Court adopts Mag. Judge Azrack's recommendation to accept Guilty Plea. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/22/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  CALENDAR ENTRY as to Carlos Perez ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 8/18/95 for Sentencing. Defendant present with attorney Hugh Cunniffe. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Court Interpreter - Estrellita Plested. Joan Collins - Probation Officer present. Court adopts Mag. Judge Azrack's recommendation to accept guilty plea. Court Reporter/ESR - Monique Dawkins (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 08/22/1995
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    JUDGMENT Hector Fabio Gualteros (5) count(s) 1. Deft sentenced to 24 months imprisonment; $50.00 special assessment; 3 years supervised release. Deft not to possess a firearm or destructive device. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 8/15/95) (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      JUDGMENT Libardo Moncada (2) count(s) 1. Deft sentenced to imprisonment for a period of one year and one day; 3 years supervised release; $50.00 special assessment. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , Dated 8/16/95) (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                        DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Adriana Marquez Terminated motions:, Counts Dismissed: Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1 (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                          Sentencing held Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1s. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                            DISMISSAL of Count(s) on Government Motion as to Carlos Perez Terminated motions: Counts Dismissed: Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                              Sentencing held Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1s (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER dated 8/17/95 from Barry E. Schulman to Judge Amon, regarding sentencing of Adriana Marquez, with 2 letter enclosed, 1 by the defenant and the other by defendant's husband, requesting consideration at the time of sentencing. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 8/17/1995, Entered: 8/17/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                  Letter from Alan Seidler, counsel for deft Hector Gualteros, to Judge Amon dated Aug. 17, 1995. Submitted in response to the Probation Dept's Addendum dated July 18, 1995. Counsel states that for the Probation Dept. to now suggest that the deft is longer entitled to a "3" point adjustment is unwarranted. (Joseph, Derek)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/16/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                    LETTER dated 8/11/95 from Guy Oksenhendler to Michael Glatthaar regarding dft Marquez's pre-sentence report. (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Hector Fabio Gualteros ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 8/14/95 for sentencing. Deft present with counsel, B. Alan Seidler; AUSA Frank McLain Sewer; ESR Jeffrey Howell; Interpreter: Estrellita Plested (Sp.); Probation Dept: Ken Wong. Deft sentenced to 24 months imprisonment; 3 years supervised release; fine waived; $50.00 special assessment. Court adopts the recommendation of ASC to accept the plea; deft's objections are withdrawn; Gov't's motion for a downward departure is granted. (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/18/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        CALENDAR ENTRY as to Libardo Moncada ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 8/14 for sentencing. Deft present with counsel Ruben Oliva; AUSA Frank Mclain-Sewer also present; Interpreter: Estrellita Plested (Sp.). ESR Robert Eppenstein. Deft to: 1 yr plus 1 day; 3 yrs. supervised release; fine waived; $50.00 special assessment. (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                          Sentencing held Libardo Moncada (2) count(s) 1. (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                            NOTICE, dated 7/21/95 of rescheduling of sentencing as to Libardo Moncada from 7/27/95 to 8/14/95 at 10:00. (Asreen, Wendy)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              Endorsed ORDER dtd 6/29/95 that dft Adriana Marquez is granted permission to travel to Virginia Beach. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon on letter dtd 6/28/95 from Barry Schulman). (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of deputy clerk as to Hector Fabio Gualteros : sentencing rescheduled to 8/14/95 at 10:00 before Judge Amon. (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 7/24/1995, Entered: 7/24/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER dated 7/12/95 from Alan Seidler to Judge Amon in objection to certain factual statements contained in dft Gualteros' Presentence Report. (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    Sentencing reset for 10:00 on 8/14/95 for Libardo Moncada before Judge Carol B. Amon, count(s) 1. (Asreen, Wendy)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of pleading filed in case as to Gustavo Garcia for dates of 6/15/95 before Mag. Judge Azrack; Court Reporter/ESR: - not noted. AUSA Frank Mc Clain-Sauer. Paul E. Warburgh, Esq. representing the Defendant. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Criminal Cause for Pleading filed in case as to Adriana Marquez, Carlos Perez for dates of 6/15/95 before Magistrate Azrack; Court Reporter: Dawn Mc Donough, P.D. Transcribing. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/5/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Criminal Cause for Pleading filed in case as to Patricia Garcia for dates of 6/15/95 before Magistrate Azrack; Court Reporter: Dawn McDonough, P.D. Transcribing. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 6/27/1995, Entered: 6/27/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE of adjournment of sentencing by Venessa Holley Courtroomm Deputy to Judge Amon as to Libardo Moncada, scheduled for 7/3/95 adjourned to 7/27/95, at 2:00. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              CALENDAR ENTRY as to Patricia Garcia ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 6/15/95 for Pleading. Defendant present on bail. Jerald Levine representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Tape # -95/39(6-1804). Defendant withdraws not guilty plea and enters Guilty: Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1s . The Court sets Sentencing for 9:30 8/18/95 for Patricia Garcia before Judge Carol B. Amon . Waiver of indictment executed by defendant. Superseding/Information filed. Court find factual basis for the Plea. Bail continues for defendant. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Patricia Garcia on 6/15/95. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Order
                                                                                                                  Consent to Have a Plea Taken before a United States Magistrate as to Patricia Garcia. ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Patricia Garcia referring the case to Mag. Judge Azrack for pleading. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Carlos Perez ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 6/15/95 for Pleading. Defendant present on bail. Hugh Cunniffe, Esq., representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McCalin-Sewer. Tape # - 95/39(2164-4916). Defendant withdraws not guilty plea and enters Guilty: Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1s . Superseding/Information filed. Court finds factual basis for the plea. The Court sets Sentencing for 9:30 8/18/95 for Carlos Perez before Judge Carol B. Amon . (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Carlos Perez (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Consent to have a plea taken before a United States Magistrate Judge as to defendant Carlos Perez. ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack, dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Carlos Perez referring case to Mag. Judge Azrack for Pleading. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon , dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              CALENDAR ENTRY as to Adriana Marquez ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 6/15/95 for Pleading. Defendant present on bail. Barry Schulman representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer. Tape # 95/39 (2164-4916), Defendant withdraws not guilty plea and enters a Plea of Guilty: Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1s . setting Sentencing for 9:30 8/18/95 for Adriana Marquez before Judge Carol B. Amon . (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Indictment
                                                                                                                                SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1s, Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1s, Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1s . (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 06/22/1995
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Waiver - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Adriana Marquez on 6/15/95 before Mag. Judge Azrack. (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 06/22/1995
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Consent to have a pleaa taken before a United States Magistrate Judge, as to Adriana Marquez ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack, dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 06/22/1995
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Adriana Marquez referring case to Mag. Judge Azrack for plea. ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 06/22/1995
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        CALENDAR ENTRY as to Gustavo Garcia ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 6/15/95 for Pleading. Tape # 95/39(4916-6756). Defendant present, in custody. Paul E. Warburgh representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McClain-Sawer. Waiver of indictment executed for defendant. Superseding/Information Filed. Defendant withdraws plea of not guilty and enters plea of Guilty: Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1s . Magistrate recommends that Plea be accepted. setting Sentencing for 9:30 8/18/95 for Gustavo Garcia before Judge Carol B. Amon . Pursuant to the Judge's referral order to Mag. Judge Azrack dated 6/5/95 Mag Azrack did aminister the allocution pursuant to F.R.C.P., Rule 11 and a finding was made that the plea was knowingly and voluntarily made and not coerced and recommends to the Judge that the Plea of Guilty should be accepted. Plea Agreement marked as Court Exhibit 1. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Indictment
                                                                                                                                          SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1s . (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 Waiver - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Gustavo Garcia before Mag. Judge Azrack. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Consent to have a Plea Taken before a United states Magistrate Judge, as to Gustavo Garcia ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER referring case to Magistrate Azrack to determine if the defendant wishes to consent to enter a plea of guilty. as to Gustavo Garcia ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon dated: 6/15/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995, Terminated: 4/28/2011 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Gustavo Garcia to suppress statements . [40-1] motion. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 6/3/1995, Entered: 6/13/1995 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia to suppress any and all communications intercepted in this case and all evidence derived therefrom; for a bill of particulars; to complel the prosecution to identify documents that they intend to use at trial; to disclose trial witnesses; etc. Attached is an affidavit of Paul Warburgh, Jr., Barry Schulman and Jerald Levine in support of joint omnibus motion for defts. (Vaughn, Terry) Modified on 06/13/1995
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 6/2/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Adriana Marquez to suppress ; for a Bill of Particulars; to compell; for discovery; and permitting the Defendant to make additional pretrial motions is warranted. Motion Hearing/Return date of 6/15/95 for Adriana Marquez [39-1] motion. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 5/30/1995, Entered: 5/30/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER endorsed on letter dated 5/24/95, from Barry E. Schulman, Esq., to Judge Amon resetting pretrial motion filing deadline (Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon ) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by B.Alan Seidler for Hector Fabio Gualteros (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 4/28/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ENVELOPE containing LETTER dated 4/27/95 from Government (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 4/17/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                              CJA 20 as to Hector Fabio Gualteros : Appointment of Attorney Voucher # 05440019 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , Dated 2/14/95) (Drayton, Lorraine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                PRB BOND entered by Patricia Garcia in Amount $ 300,000. ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated 4/13/95). (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/13/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                  CALENDAR ENTRY as to Patricia Garcia ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 4/13/95 for bail hearing. Tape # 95/25 (1412-1583). AUSA Frank McClain-Sewer present. Dft present w/ counsel Jerry Levine. Dft release on $300,000 PRB co-sign by friend. (Yuen, Sui May)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 4/12/1995, Entered: 4/17/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                    (copy) LETTER dated 04/11/95 from AUSA, Frank McClain-Sewer to Barry Schulman, Esq. as to Adriana Marquez, providing counsel with discovery. (Asreen, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, and Carlos Perez. Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 4/10/95 for Status Conference. Court Reporter/ESR - Mark Gjelaj. Barry Schulman appeared for A. Marquez. Paul Warburgh appeared for Gustavo Garcia. Jerald Levine appeared for Patricia Garcia(not produced). Hugh Cunniffe appeared for Carlos Perez. AUSA Frank McClain Sewer appeared for the Government. Defendants to file Wiretap & any other motions by 5/26/95. Government to respond 6/9/95. Government to provide translation of transcripts it intends to use at trial. The Court sets status conference for 9:00 6/15/95 for Adriana Marquez, for Garcia, for Patricia Garcia, for Carlos Perez before Carol B. Amon . (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                        PRB/Surety BOND entered by Gustavo Garcia in Amount $ 500,000.00; Signed by Suretors and property posted. ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated 4/10/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/13/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                          CALENDAR ENTRY as to Gustavo Garcia ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 4/10/95 for Detention Hearing held. Defendant present in custody. Paul Warburg representing Defendant. AUSA Frank McLaine-Sewer representing the Government. Tape # 95/22, Defendant was released on Bond which is set at $500,000.00 - PRB/Surety for Gustavo Garcia . Bond to be co-signed by 5 Sureties and 1 home posted and 7 trucks. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 40 Documents as to Libardo Moncada received from U.S.D.C., S.D. of Florida. Florida's case number is 95-2173-Turnoff. Documents enclosed: Report Commencing Criminal Action (reflects defendant arrested on 2/2/95 at 11:30 a.m.) (SPANISH INTERPRETER required), Order by Mag. Judge Johnson regarding stipulation for pre-trial detention, Mag. Judge Turnoff's Order on Initial Appearance, Ceterfied copy of the Docket sheet, Waiver of Removal Hearing, Warrant of Removal, and copy of the Warrant of Arrest. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Detention - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST of Libardo Moncada in Southern District of Florida on 2/2/95. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Azrack has been selected by random selection to handle any matters that may be referred in this case. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Guilty Plea before Judge Chrein filed in case as to Libardo Moncada for dates of 3/2/95. Rank McClain-Sewer, Esq. representing the Government. Ruben Oliva, Esq. representing the Defendant. Proceedings recorded by ESR. Tape #: not noted on transcription. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    PRB/Surety BOND entered by Carlos Perez in Amount $ 500,000.00. Defendant must remain in and not leave the area of D.N.J/E.D.N.Y./S.D.N.Y. Defendant shall report to U.S. Pretrial Services by telephone 1 time per week. (Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated 3/24/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Carlos Perez ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 3/24/95 for Status hearing held. Defendant present, in custody. Hugh Cunniffe representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McLaine-Sewer representing the Government. Court Interpreter - Rosa Oliveros. Tape # 95/15 (1168). Defendant released on $500,000.00 PRB Bond. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/30/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance BOND entered by Carlos Perez in Amount $ 500,000.00. Defendant shall remain in and not leave the areas of D.N.J./E.D.N.Y./S.D.N.Y. The Defendant shall report to U.S. Pretrial Service by telephone 1 time per week. ( Signed by Magistrate Joan M. Azrack , dated 3/24/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 20 as to Patricia Garcia : Appointment of Attorney Stuart D. Rubin, Voucher # 0578332 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann, Dated 3/21/95) (Nunc Pro Tunc Date 2/2/95). (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Adriana Marquez : Appointment of Attorney Neil Checkman, Voucher # 0709799. ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann, Dated 3/21/95) (Nunc Pro Tunc Date 2/2/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/24/1995, Entered: 3/24/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 20 as to Hector Fabio Gualteros : Appointment of Attorney David G. Secular, Voucher # 0709798. (Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann, Dated 3/21/95). (Nunc Pro Tunc Date 2/2/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE reassigned to Judge Unassigned (Chow, Alice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CALENDAR ENTRY as to Carlos Perez ; Case called before Magistrate Joan M. Azrack on date of 3/22/95 for Detention Hearing held. Defendant not present, in custody. Hugh Cunnifee representing the Defendant. AUSA Frank McLaine Sewer representing the Government. ESR - Tape # 95/13 (2273-2553). Court Interpreter - Ana Silverio. Bond set in the amount of $500,000.00 PRB. All suretors signed bond. Defendant to sign bond on 3/24/95. (Attorney Cunniffe's card attached) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Gustavo Garcia by Attorney Paul E. Warburgh Jr.. (Ferguson, Frances)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance for Adriana Marquez by Attorney Barry E. Schulman (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of Excludable Delay as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, and Carlos Perez. The Court excludes 3/13/95 to 4/10/95 until 4:30 p.m. . ( Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon, dated: 3/13/95) (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance for Carlos Perez by Attorney (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance for Patricia Garcia by Attorney Levine.(DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 03/24/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CALENDAR ENTRY as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, and Carlos Perez ; Case called before Judge Carol B. Amon on date of 3/13/95 for Arraignment on Indictment. The following Defendants were present with counsel: Adriana Marquez represented by Barry Schulman, defendant Gustavo Garcia represented by Paul Warburgh, defendant Patricia Garcia represented by Jerald Levine, defendant Carlos Perez represented by Hugh Cunniffe, and attorney David Secular representing defendant Hector Gualteros, not present (ill). Frank McClain Sewer representing the Government. Alfredo Garcia, Spanish Interpreter. The Court sets next status conference for 4:30 p.m on 4/10/95 for Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, and Carlos Perez before Judge Carol B. Amon , a plea of Not Guilty was entered by counsel on behalf of Hector Fabio Gualteros (5) count(s) 1, Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1, Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1, Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1, and Carlos Perez (9) 1 . An Order of Excludable Delay was entered. (DiTomasso, Mike) Modified on 03/22/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing held Hector Fabio Gualteros (5) count(s) 1 (Glenn, Marilyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/8/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance for Patricia Garcia by Attorney Jerald Levine (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    P.R.B. BOND entered by Adriana Marquez in Amount $ 500,000.00. Sheet with additional suretors approved by Mag. Judge Mann, dated 3/3/95, attached. ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated March 3, 1995) (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/8/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CALENDAR ENTRY as to Adriana Marquez ; Case called before Magistrate Roanne L. Mann on date of March 3, 1995 for detention hearing. Tape # 95/39 (1200-2274). Deft. represented by Neil Checkman; the Govt. by Frank McClain-Sewer. Bail package accepted. All suretors signed bond. Deft. released on a $500,000.00, P.R.B., with conditions. (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        P.R.B. BOND entered by Adriana Marquez in Amount $ 500,000.00. Deft. to surrender passport for both deft. and husband. Deft. must remain in and not leave the areas of S.D.N.Y., E.D.N.Y. and D.N.J. Deft. shall report to Pretrial Services one time per week in person. Sureties signed bond. ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated March 3, 1995) (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance for Libardo Moncada by Attorney Ruben Ocwa. (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ruben Ocwa attorney for Libardo Moncada (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 9/6/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF REFERRAL/DEFENDANT'S CONSENT as to Libardo Moncada (Signed by Judge Carol B. Amon, dated: 3/2/95) (Coleman, Daphine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Azrack has been selected by random selection to handle any matters that may be referred in this case. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Azrack has been selected by random selection to handle any matters that may be referred in this case. (DiTomasso, Mike)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/2/1995, Entered: 3/3/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CALENDAR ENTRY as to Libardo Moncada ; Case called before Magistrate A. S. Chrein on date of March 2, 1995, at 2 p.m., for pleading. Deft. in custody. Deft. represented by Ruben Oliva, and the Govt. rep. by Frank McClain-Sewer. Interpreter: Carmen Pasqual. Tape # 95/13 (4575-7294) and 95/14 (0-399). Guilty: Libardo Moncada (2) count(s) 1 ; set Sentencing for 10:30 4/28/95 for Libardo Moncada before Judge Carol B. Amon (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to Dario Giraldo (1) count(s) 1, Libardo Moncada (2) count(s) 1, Nelson Sanchez (3) count(s) 1, Ruben Dario Velasquez (4) count(s) 1, Hector Fabio Gualteros (5) count(s) 1, Adriana Marquez (6) count(s) 1, Gustavo Garcia (7) count(s) 1, Patricia Garcia (8) count(s) 1, Carlos Perez (9) count(s) 1, Julio Zuluaga (10) count(s) 1. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CALENDAR ENTRY as to Dario Giraldo, Libardo Moncada, Nelson Sanchez, Ruben Dario Velasquez, Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez, Julio Zuluaga ; Case called before Magistrate Roanne L. Mann on 2/28/95 for Grand Jury Presentment ordered handed up and filed. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 21 as to Hector Fabio Gualteros Authorization to Pay Candido A. Valderrama $ 135.00 for Expert Services Voucher # 0531697 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 2/9/95) [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Chrein has been selected by random selection to handle any matters that may be referred in this case. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Detention - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DETENTION as to Adriana Marquez ( Signed by Magistrate John L. Caden , dated: 2/7/95) [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Mulqueen, Ellen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PORTION OF COMPLAINT STILL UNDER SEAL. SEALED ENVELOP W/COMPLAINT PLACED IN VAULT. [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Detention - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEMPORARY COMMITMENT issued as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 2/2/95) [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance for Carlos Perez by Attorney Hugh Cunniffe [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Detention - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST of Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT as to 1-95-m-174-01, 1-95-m-174-02, 1-95-m-174-03, 1-95-m-174-04, Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez, 1-95-m-174-10 [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Arraignment as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez held before Mag. Mann. All parties present. AUSA: Frank McClain-Sewer. A temporary order of detention entered as to all deft. Setting Detention Hearing for Feb. 08, 1995 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Caden. Tape #95/20(994-2152). (Defendant informed of rights.) [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Service - Miscellanous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued as to 1-95-m-174-01, 1-95-m-174-02, 1-95-m-174-03, 1-95-m-174-04, Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez, 1-95-m-174-10 [ 1:95-m -174 ] (Polanco, Marcie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?