USA v. 1-95-m-174-01, et al
Federal Court Proceeding New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:95-mj-00174-ASC

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 11:26 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
v.
No Logo 1-95-m-174-01, Defendant
No Logo 1-95-m-174-02, Defendant
No Logo 1-95-m-174-03, Defendant
No Logo 1-95-m-174-04, Defendant
No Logo 1-95-m-174-10, Defendant
No Logo Adriana Marquez, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Perez, Defendant
No Logo GUSTAVO GARCIA, Defendant
No Logo Hector Fabio Gualteros, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Garcia, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/30/1995, Entered: 12/1/1995 Miscellaneous Document
SEALED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed; Court Reporter: Anthony Mancuso. (Murphy, Margaret)
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: 3/22/1995 Order
    CJA 21 as to Patricia Garcia Authorization to Pay Candido A. Valderrama $ 135.00 for Expert Services Voucher # 0546699 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 3/14/95) (Drayton, Lorraine)
      LREF
      Blank  Miscellaneous Document
      PORTION OF COMPLAINT STILL UNDER SEAL. SEALED ENVELOP W/COMPLAINT PLACED IN VAULT. (Polanco, Marcie)
        LREF
        Blank  Miscellaneous Document
        PORTION OF COMPLAINT STILL UNDER SEAL. SEALED ENVELOP W/COMPLAINT PLACED IN VAULT. (Polanco, Marcie)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 2/9/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995 Order
          CJA 21 as to Hector Fabio Gualteros Authorization to Pay Candido A. Valderrama $ 135.00 for Expert Services Voucher # 0531697 ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 2/9/95) (Polanco, Marcie)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 2/7/1995, Entered: 2/23/1995 Detention - Miscellaneous
            ORDER OF DETENTION as to Adriana Marquez ( Signed by Magistrate John L. Caden , dated: 2/7/95) (Mulqueen, Ellen)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Detention - Miscellaneous
              TEMPORARY COMMITMENT issued as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez ( Signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , dated 2/2/95) (Polanco, Marcie)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Utility - Miscellaneous
                NOTICE of Appearance for Carlos Perez by Attorney Hugh Cunniffe (Polanco, Marcie)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Detention - Miscellaneous
                  ARREST of Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez (Polanco, Marcie)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Miscellaneous Document
                    COMPLAINT as to 1-95-m-174-01, 1-95-m-174-02, 1-95-m-174-03, 1-95-m-174-04, Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez, 1-95-m-174-10 (Polanco, Marcie)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Minutes-Miscellaneous
                      Magistrate Arraignment as to Hector Fabio Gualteros, Adriana Marquez, Gustavo Garcia, Patricia Garcia, Carlos Perez held before Mag. Mann. All parties present. AUSA: Frank McClain-Sewer. A temporary order of detention entered as to all deft. Setting Detention Hearing for Feb. 08, 1995 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Caden. Tape #95/20(994-2152). (Defendant informed of rights.) (Polanco, Marcie)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 189 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?