USA v. Yun
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-mj-01343

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:49 AM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Identity Hearing - Rule 5(c)(3) - (fka Rule 40)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MINUTES OF RULE 5(c)(3) IDENTITY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Jane Doe. Attorney: Terry W Bird/Gary S. Lincenberg, Retained, present. Court orders defendant held to answer to Southern District of Iowa. (MANDARIN) INTERPRETER Required. Court Smart: CS 7/8/14. Late docketing due to Clerks Office error. (ja) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER RELEASING COPY OF SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF JULY 8, 2014, IDENTITY HEARING TO DEFENSE COUNSEL AND GOVERNMENT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (See Order for details) 11 Ex Parte Application for Order (vm) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Release of Copy of Sealed Transcript of July 8 2014 Hearing to Defense Counsel and Government Filed by Defendant Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bird, Terry) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER GOVERNING CUSTODY AND TRANSPORT OF THE DEFENDANT TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Jane Doe(mhe) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Jane Doe. Court Smart (CS).Order for: Criminal Non Appeal. Transcript portion requested: Other: 7/8/14 Identity Hearing. Category: Daily. Court will contact Shemena Johnson at snj@birdmarella.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder.(Chi, Karis) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Jane Doe. Court Reporter.Order for: Criminal Non Appeal. Transcript portion requested: Other: 07/03/2014 Detention Hearing. Category: Daily. Court will contact Diane Hunsaker at dh@birdmarella.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder.(Bird, Terry) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Jane Doe. Recommended that the defendant be allowed 1 social telephone call. (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MINUTES OF Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Jane Doe, The Court Orders: Jane Doe (1) $500,000 Appearance Bond see attached bond for terms and conditions. Identity Hearing set for 7/8/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Bond stayed until Monday, July 7, 2014 at 11 :00 a.m. Abstract of Court Proceeding (CR-53) issued. Copy forwarded Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Defendant Mo Yun arrested on warrant issued by the USDC Southern District of Iowa at Des Moines. (Attachments: # 1 Charging Documents)(mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Mo Yun (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner as to Defendant Mo Yun Defendant arraigned and states true name is Jane Doe. Attorney: Terry W Bird for Mo Yun, Retained, present. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (MANDARIN) INTERPRETER Required as to Defendant Mo Yun Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Mo Yun; defendants Year of Birth: 1972; date of arrest: 7/1/2014 (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Mo Yun, originating in the Southern District of Iowa. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:1832 and 2314. Signed by agent Mark Betten, FBI, Special Agent. (mhe) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?