Perez et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-04914
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 2:07 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Baselice Ralph, Plaintiff
No Logo Derek G. Walther, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Koonce, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth Kay Besom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gladstein, Reif & Meginniss, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Reif +1 212 228 7727 +1 212 228 7654 jreif@GRMNY.COM
No Logo Henry Perez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by District 22 Political Forum

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Douglass Gribben +1 212 815 1450 +1 212 815 1440 jgribben@dc37.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Edward Sykes +1 212 815 1450 +1 212 815 1440 ssykes@dc37.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Gladstein, Reif & Meginniss, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Chung +1 212 228 7727 +1 212 228 7654 jchung@grmny.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Reif +1 212 228 7727 +1 212 228 7654 jreif@GRMNY.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amelia Kristin Tuminaro +1 212 222 7654 atuminaro@grmny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth Allen Falk +1 212 366 4600 +1 212 366 6950 kfalklaw@gmail.com
No Logo Jerry Cordero, Plaintiff
No Logo Joseph Oro, Plaintiff
No Logo Juan Bayron, Plaintiff
No Logo Pedro Rosado, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Eason, Plaintiff
No Logo Ruben Rios, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Adrian Benepe, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael R. Bloomberg"
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Elena Leone +1 212 788 8285 +1 212 788 8877 kleone@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Mary O'Connor +1 212 676 2750 +1 212 788 8877 aoconnor@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Asad Rizvi +1 212 788 6838 +1 212 788 0877 arizvi@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Transit Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eamonn Francis Foley +1 212 356 2442 +1 212 788 8877 eamonn.foley@nyct.com
No Logo The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation, Defendant
No Logo Adrienne D. Johnson, ADR Provider
No Logo alena brace, ADR Provider
No Logo Aliah Kelly, ADR Provider
No Logo andrew howell, ADR Provider
No Logo Asha Harris, ADR Provider
No Logo Aston A. McKen, ADR Provider
No Logo Barthel Joseph, ADR Provider
No Logo Brenda Cruz, ADR Provider
No Logo Bruce Langston, ADR Provider
No Logo carillo maizio, ADR Provider
No Logo Charles St. Louis, ADR Provider
No Logo Chatory Brown, ADR Provider
No Logo Cheriese Henderson, ADR Provider
No Logo Chris Galgano, ADR Provider
No Logo Dana Hawkins, ADR Provider
No Logo Darlene Lewis, ADR Provider
No Logo davina r. yancey, ADR Provider
No Logo Destiny Colon, ADR Provider
No Logo Domingo Sanchez, ADR Provider
No Logo Donald Koonce, ADR Provider
No Logo donette n. davis, ADR Provider
No Logo Earl Fisher, ADR Provider
No Logo earline e. reed, ADR Provider
No Logo Eli Seyfried, ADR Provider
No Logo Eric Handy, ADR Provider
No Logo eunice yvonne hill, ADR Provider
No Logo Frederica Johnson, ADR Provider
No Logo Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., ADR Provider
No Logo Gina Berdecia, ADR Provider
No Logo Haydee Fajardo, ADR Provider
No Logo Hilario Ramos, ADR Provider
No Logo Iris Hernandez, ADR Provider
No Logo Jacqueline Deleon, ADR Provider
No Logo jamal charles, ADR Provider
No Logo jasmine brooks, ADR Provider
No Logo Jayme Likey-Alston, ADR Provider
No Logo Jeffrey Edusei, ADR Provider
No Logo Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, ADR Provider
No Logo Jerry Cordero, ADR Provider
No Logo Jessica Torres, ADR Provider
No Logo Juan Bayron, ADR Provider
No Logo kervin charlemagne, ADR Provider
No Logo Kiaran Pierre, ADR Provider
No Logo laura spies, ADR Provider
No Logo Lori Knowles, ADR Provider
No Logo Marlena Poelz-Giga, ADR Provider
No Logo matthew l. greenberg, ADR Provider
No Logo Mercedes Velilla, ADR Provider
No Logo michele mason, ADR Provider
No Logo nancy mercado, ADR Provider
No Logo Paige Lener, ADR Provider
No Logo raquel ramos, ADR Provider
No Logo Rasheem Johnson, ADR Provider
No Logo Renso Vidal, ADR Provider
No Logo Richard Ventura, ADR Provider
No Logo Robert Green, ADR Provider
No Logo Robin Wickert, ADR Provider
No Logo roxann small, ADR Provider
No Logo Ruslan Shulyar, ADR Provider
No Logo Ruthie Perez, ADR Provider
No Logo Samuel Hendricks, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Gladstein, Reif & Meginniss, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amelia Kristin Tuminaro +1 212 222 7654 atuminaro@grmny.com
No Logo Sandra Lawrence, ADR Provider
No Logo stanley yu, ADR Provider
No Logo Steven Arriola, ADR Provider
No Logo Sunny Corrao, ADR Provider
No Logo Tammy Williams, ADR Provider
No Logo Tanisha Harris, ADR Provider
No Logo tashawna sadler, ADR Provider
No Logo teresa l. madeem, ADR Provider
No Logo Tiffani Phillips, ADR Provider
No Logo Vincent Piccolo, ADR Provider
No Logo vladis tobel, ADR Provider
No Logo William Guzman, ADR Provider
No Logo Veronica White, All Defendants
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 171 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10557705. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Reif, James) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
    CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated January 15, 2015, Defendants' first argument prevails, and their motion is granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 01/16/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal, # 2 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 170 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER #105178 granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment. At the close of fact discovery, defendants moved for summary judgment on three grounds. First, defendants argue that the donning and doffing of AUPR uniforms is a non-compensable "preliminary or postliminary" activity. Second, defendants argue that the donning and doffing of AUPR uniforms is exempt from FLSA liability under the "changing clothes" clause of section 203(o) of the Act. Third, defendants argue that even if plaintiffs' legal position is sound, time spent donning and doffing is de minimus. For the reasons set forth below, defendants' first argument prevails, and their motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Dkt. No. 146) and close this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/15/2015) (kko) Modified on 2/2/2015 (ca). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Amelia K. Tuminaro dated December 15, 2014 re: Effect of U.S. Supreme Court's Integrity Staffing Solutions decision on Defendants' pending motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Andrea O'Connor dated December 15, 2014 re: Decision in Integrity Staffing Solutions. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: granting 163 Motion for leave to maintain a collective action pursuant to section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. With the consent of Defendants, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to maintain a collective action pursuant to section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close Dkt. No. 163. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/8/2014) (djc) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrea O'Connor dated August 4, 2014 re: Section 3(H) of Your Honor's Individual Practices. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 163 MOTION For Leave To Maintain Collective Action . . Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Reif, James) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of James Reif in Support re: 163 MOTION For Leave To Maintain Collective Action .. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Reif, James) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                    MOTION For Leave To Maintain Collective Action . Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Reif, James) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment. . Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reply to Plaintiffs' Counter 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Andrea O'Connor in Support re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit RRR, # 2 Exhibit SSS, # 3 Exhibit TTT (1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit TTT (2 or 2), # 5 Exhibit UUU)(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 158 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. 15. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/28/2014) (lmb) Modified on 5/29/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for defendants' reply memorandum in further support of their partial motion for summary judgment addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Andrea O'Connor dated May 27, 2014. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment. . Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A & B, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Reif, James) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                  COUNTER STATEMENT TO 148 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of James Reif in Opposition re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-19, # 3 Exhibit 20-27, # 4 Exhibit 28-39, # 5 Exhibit 40-50, # 6 Exhibit 51-60, # 7 Exhibit 61-68, # 8 Exhibit 69-75, # 9 Exhibit 76-82, # 10 Exhibit 83-93, # 11 Certificate of Service)(Reif, James) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 152 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/9/2014) (ft) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (CORRECTED) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Amelia K. Tuminaro dated May 9, 2014. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Amelia K. Tuminaro dated May 9, 2014. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER: granting 150 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment. SO ORDERED.Responses due by 5/16/2014 Replies due by 6/3/2014. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/16/2014) (djc) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 147 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, 148 Rule 56.1 Statement, 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 149 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Amelia K. Tuminaro dated April 15, 2014. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION of Andrea O'Connor in Support re: 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D part 1, # 4 Exhibit D part 2, # 5 Exhibit E, F, G, H, I, # 6 Exhibit J, K, L, M, # 7 Exhibit N, O, P, Q, R, # 8 Exhibit S, T, U, # 9 Exhibit V, W, X, Y, Z, # 10 Exhibit AA, BB, CC, DD, EE, # 11 Exhibit FF, GG, HH, II, JJ, KK, # 12 Exhibit LL, MM, NN, OO, PP, # 13 Exhibit QQ, RR, SS, TT, UU, VV, # 14 Exhibit WW, XX, YY, ZZ, AAA, BBB, # 15 Exhibit CCC, DDD, EEE, FFF, GGG, # 16 Exhibit HHH, III, JJJ, LLL, # 17 Exhibit MMM, NNN, OOO, PPP, QQQ)(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. Responses due by 4/17/2014(O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 144 Letter, filed by matthew l. greenberg, laura spies, Cheriese Henderson, Mercedes Velilla, Jacqueline Deleon, Chris Galgano, Tanisha Harris, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, vladis tobel, jasmine brooks, Earl Fisher, eunice yvonne hill, Baselice Ralph, tashawna sadler, Henry Perez, Vincent Piccolo, Destiny Colon, Kiaran Pierre, Lori Knowles, Joseph Oro, Juan Bayron, Tammy Williams, Renso Vidal, andrew howell, carillo maizio, stanley yu, donette n. davis, Sandra Lawrence, Ronald Eason, Gina Berdecia, Derek G. Walther, Ruthie Perez, Pedro Rosado, Asha Harris, Brenda Cruz, william guzman, roxann small, Iris Hernandez, earline e. reed, Robert Green, Haydee Fajardo, Richard Ventura, Jessica Torres, Jayme Likey-Alston, Barthel Joseph, kervin charlemagne, Jerry Cordero, Aston A. McKen, Dana Hawkins, davina r. yancey, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Marlena Poelz-Giga, nancy mercado, Eric Handy, Ruben Rios, Jr., alena brace, Donald Koonce, raquel ramos, Robin Wickert, Domingo Sanchez, Sunny Corrao, Rasheem Johnson, Adrienne D. Johnson, Jeffrey Edusei, Aliah Kelly, Eli Seyfried, Paige Lener, Bruce Langston, Chatory Brown, Frederica Johnson, michele mason, Darlene Lewis, jamal charles, Steven Arriola, Tiffani Phillips, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Hilario Ramos, Samuel Hendricks. ENDORSEMENT: The parties should prepare a proposed order and accompany it with a brief summary of the governing legal principles, along with any affidavits or other materials that the parties believe the Court should consider. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/17/2014) (djc) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from James Reif dated March 17, 2014 re: maintenance of collective action. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Reif, James) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: granting 142 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 4/3/2014. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/11/2014) (djc) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions and for an enlargement of the page limitations for the memorandum of law and Rule 56.1 statement addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathryn E. Martin dated March 11, 2014. Document filed by The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(Martin, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger, from Kathryn E. Martin, dated 2/20/2014, re: request a pre-motion conference to address a discovery dispute. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs are to produce to defendants' counsel all portions of notes by counselor their staff of individual plaintiffs' interviews insofar as those notes contain data used to create the chart of off-the-clock work that was provided to Mr. Ritz. They may redact the balance of those notes. Production is due by Feb. 24, 2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 2/21/2014) (ja) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 138 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Application Granted.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 2/11/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from James Reif dated February 11, 2014 re: Response to Defendants' February 11, 2014 Letter. Document filed by Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu.(Reif, James) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Expert Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Kathryn E. Martin dated February 11, 2014. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(Martin, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Andrea O'Connor dated 1/09/2014 re: I write today to apprise the Court of a discovery dispute that has arisen regarding expert discovery. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. A schedule for expert discovery is currently in place, and there is no reason to alter it. Whether plaintiffs intend to use an expert is for them to decide, but defendants are of course free to use one (or more). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/10/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/25/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/25/2013 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery shall be completed by January 17, 2014. Defendants' expert designation(s) and expert rcport(s) shall be submitted by January 20, 2014. Plaintiffs' rebuttul reports shall be submitted by February 4, 2014. Expert discovery shall be completed by February 18, 2014.Dispositive motions or the joint pretrial order shall be filed by March 20, 2014. No further extensions should be expected. (Motions due by 3/20/2014. Fact Discovery due by 1/17/2014. Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2014. Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/20/2014). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/13/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Kathryn E. Leone dated 12/10/2013 re: Counsel writes in response to Plaintiffs' letter dated December 6, 2013, which attached declarations from plaintiff Ronald Eason and legal assistant Tom Curtin. Defendants do not oppose conducting his deposition by telephone. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants may conduct the deposition of Mr. Eason either by Telephone or in person in Florida. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/9/2013) (ft) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from James Reif dated 12/6/2013 re: Enclosed please find the Declarations of Ronald Eason and Tom Curtin concerning Mr. Eason's financial status and expenses he would incur were he compelled to appear in person in New York City for a deposition in this action. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants may respond to this submission by December 11, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/9/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery shall be completed by December 16, 2013. Defendants' expert designation(s) and expert report(s) shall be submitted by January 6, 2014. Plaintiffs' rebuttal reports shall be submitted by January 21, 2014. Expert discovery shall be completed by February 4, 2014. Dispositive motions or the joint pretrial order shall be filed by March 6, 2014. (Motions due by 3/6/2014. Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2013. Expert Discovery due by 2/4/2014. Pretrial Order due by 3/6/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/13/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/15/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/15/2013 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrea Mary O'Connor on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (O'Connor, Andrea) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER: Conference set for 10/25/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 10/22/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (tn) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jane Chung on behalf of Steven Arriola, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Elizabeth Kay Besom, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Samuel Hendricks, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Gabriel Vazquez, Jr., Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Veronica White, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu. (Chung, Jane) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/20/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by Plaintiff Teresa L. Nadeem and Defendants that all claims herein by the said Teresa L. Nadeem are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/19/2013) (mro) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to yesterday's conference, we hereby ORDER the following discovery schedule: 1. Fact discovery is to be completed by no later than NOVEMBER 15, 2013. 2. Defendants are to designate their experts and provide expert reports by no later than DECEMBER 2, 2013. 3. Plaintiffs are to provide rebuttal reports by no later than DECEMBER 16, 2013. 4. All expert discovery is to be completed by DECEMBER 31, 2013. 5. The joint pretrial order or any dispositive motions are due no later than JANUARY 31, 2014., ( Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2013., Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2013., Motions due by 1/31/2014., Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 8/16/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by teresa l. madeem.(Tuminaro, Amelia) Modified on 8/16/2013 (jno). (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Elena Leone on behalf of Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (Leone, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Elizabeth Kay Besom.(Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/13/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action on THURSDAY, AUGUST 15, 2013, at 10:00 A.M., at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312, and as further set forth. (Conference set for 8/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 6/13/2013). Copies Sent By Chambers via Fax. (rjm) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference has been scheduled in the above captioned action on THURSDAY, JUNE 13, 2013, at 9:00 A.M., at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain the consent of those parties., ( Status Conference set for 6/13/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 6/3/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (lmb) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from James Reif dated 5/31/2013 re: Plaintiffs hereby request leave to submit this letter to reply to Defendants' May 29, 2013 Letter regarding Plaintiffs' requests for production of documents pertaining to certain events occurring prior to June 22, 2009. Document filed by Henry Perez.(cd) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Asad Rizvi dated 5/29/2013 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel in the Office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, one of the attorneys assigned to represent the defendants in the above-referenced Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") collective action. I write in response to plaintiffs' May 24, 2013 letter to the Court regarding their assertion that the statute of limitations should be equitably tolled in this case. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from James Reif dated 5/29/2013 re: Pursuant to this Court's directive on May 20, 2013, Plaintiffs submit this letter in response to Defendants' letter dated May 24, 2013. Document filed by Juan Bayron, Jerry Cordero, Ronald Eason, Donald Koonce, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Baselice Ralph, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Derek G. Walther.(lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Asad Rizvi dated 5/24/2013 re: Defendants respectfully withdraw their proposed March 6, 2013 order concerning representative discovery and consent to individualized discovery of all 81 claims. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(lmb) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamonn F. Foley on behalf of Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation (Foley, Eamonn) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Asad Rizvi dated 5/13/2013 re: For the foregoing reasons, defendants respectfully request that the Court "so order" its March 6, 2013 proposed Order concerning representative discovery. Document filed by The City of New York.(cd) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Initial Conference set for Monday, 5/20/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain the consent of those parties. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/9/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (cd) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Gabriel Vazquez, Jr..(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from James Reif dated 3/6/2013 re: The parties have been unable to reach agreement on a plan for the selection and use of representatives in discovery and at trial. Document filed by Henry Perez.(cd) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/3/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 103 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 73 Amended Complaint against Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation, Veronica White. Document filed by Juan Bayron, Donald Koonce, Jerry Cordero, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Pedro Rosado, Derek G. Walther, Ruben Rios, Jr., Ronald Eason, Baselice Ralph. Related document: 73 Amended Complaint, filed by Derek G. Walther, Joseph Oro, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Juan Bayron, Donald Koonce, Jerry Cordero, Henry Perez, Ronald Eason.(ja) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Samuel Hendricks.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asad Rizvi on behalf of Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation (Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Asad Rizvi dated 2/7/13 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to request that the Court grant an extension of time to 2/15/13 for the submission of their respective discovery status letters. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/8/2013) (mro) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from James Reif dated 2/4/2013 re: We received today an electronic copy of the Order dated January 31, 2013 (Doc. 98) wherein the Court scheduled a conference for February 14, 2013 at 11:00 am. I am writing to request an adjournment of said conference. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The conference is adjourned until 2/21/2013 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 519 of 40 Foley Square. (Status Conference set for 2/21/2013 at 04:00 PM, Crtrm. 519, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/5/2013) (rjm) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the attached letters from the parties seeking an extension of time to complete discovery. A conference with the Court shall be held on February 14, 2013, at 11:00 AM. On or before February 8, 2013, the parties shall each submit letters stating: (1) What discovery has been produced, (2) What remains to be completed, (3) What disputes remain unresolved, and (4) Providing a time frame for the completion of all discovery. The Court's willingness to grant an extension, and its view of the reasonable length of any such extension, will turn on the parties' ability to demonstrate diligence and good faith in conducting discovery thus far. ( Status Conference set for 2/14/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/31/2013) (mro) Modified on 2/4/2013 (mro). (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amelia Kristin Tuminaro on behalf of Steven Arriola, Ralph Baselice, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu (Tuminaro, Amelia) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Reif on behalf of Steven Arriola, Ralph Baselice, Juan Bayron, Juan Bayron, Gina Berdecia, Chatory Brown, Destiny Colon, Jerry Cordero, Jerry Cordero, Sunny Corrao, Brenda Cruz, Jacqueline Deleon, Ronald Eason, Jeffrey Edusei, Haydee Fajardo, Earl Fisher, Chris Galgano, Robert Green, Eric Handy, Asha Harris, Tanisha Harris, Dana Hawkins, Cheriese Henderson, Iris Hernandez, Adrienne D. Johnson, Frederica Johnson, Rasheem Johnson, Barthel Joseph, Aliah Kelly, Lori Knowles, Donald Koonce, Donald Koonce, Bruce Langston, Sandra Lawrence, Paige Lener, Darlene Lewis, Jayme Likey-Alston, Aston A. McKen, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Ruthie Perez, Tiffani Phillips, Vincent Piccolo, Kiaran Pierre, Marlena Poelz-Giga, Jennifer Ragoonanansingh, Baselice Ralph, Hilario Ramos, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Domingo Sanchez, Eli Seyfried, Ruslan Shulyar, Charles St. Louis, Jessica Torres, Mercedes Velilla, Richard Ventura, Renso Vidal, Derek G. Walther, Robin Wickert, Tammy Williams, alena brace, jasmine brooks, kervin charlemagne, jamal charles, donette n. davis, matthew l. greenberg, william guzman, eunice yvonne hill, andrew howell, teresa l. madeem, carillo maizio, michele mason, nancy mercado, raquel ramos, earline e. reed, tashawna sadler, roxann small, laura spies, vladis tobel, davina r. yancey, stanley yu (Reif, James) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan, from Kenneth Falk, dated 1/11/2013, re: I am attorney for plaintiffs, writing to notify the Court that I am hereby withdrawing as counsel, effective immediately. Request that the Court effectuate this withdrawal in the official records of the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court shall terminate the appearance of Mr. Falk. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 1/14/2013) (ja) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by eunice yvonne hill.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by jamal charles.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by laura spies.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by carillo maizio.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by raquel ramos.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by matthew l. greenberg.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by michele mason.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Aston A. McKen.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by roxann small.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by tashawna sadler.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by andrew howell.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by nancy mercado.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by stanley yu.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by alena brace.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by vladis tobel.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by donette n. davis.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by teresa l. madeem.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by earline e. reed.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by william guzman.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 73 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Asad Rizvi dated 11/5/2012 re: Accordingly, for the reasons outlined above, defendants respectfully request an extension of time until November 13, 2012 to serve their answer to the Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/6/2012) (djc) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Juan Bayron, Donald Koonce, Jerry Cordero, Joseph Oro, Henry Perez, Pedro Rosado, Derek G. Walther, Ruben Rios, Jr., Ronald Eason, Ralph Baselice. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Derek G. Walther, Joseph Oro, Ruben Rios, Jr., Pedro Rosado, Juan Bayron, Donald Koonce, Jerry Cordero, Baselice Ralph, Henry Perez, Ronald Eason.(djc) (rdz). (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/23/2012) (ft) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Deposition due by 1/9/2013. Fact Discovery due by 2/9/2013. Expert Discovery due by 3/26/2013, and as further set forth in this document. ENDORSEMENT: This case management plan shall supersedes the one entered by the court on 8/9/12 (docket #48). (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/16/2012) (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J Nathan from Asad Rizvi dated 10/15/2012 re: Joint letter advising of the status of discovery in this action and we propose submitting a joint stipulation on discovery of representative plaintiffs to the Court for its consideration by 11/30/2012. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The Court will open a referral to Judge Dolinger for a settlement conference. The Parties may contact him when they are ready. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/16/2012) (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/16/2012) (cd) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. The proposed "Court-Authorized Notice" attached to this Order is approved. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before October 15, 2012. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be submitted by November 5, 2012. Granting 64 Motion to Amend/Correct. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/1/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Allen Falk on behalf of Henry Perez (Falk, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ruslan Shulyar.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Steven E. Sykes in Support re: 64 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Henry Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Henry Perez.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Henry Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sykes Affirmation, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sykes, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 09/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kiaran Pierre.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rasheem Johnson.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Aliah Kelly.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Iris Hernandez.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Robin Wickert.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jessica Torres.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Tiffani Phillips.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Eric Handy.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Tanisha Harris.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Lori Knowles.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Cheriese Henderson.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Steven Arriola.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Destiny Colon.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Bruce Langston.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CASES INVOLVING FLSA CLAIMS: is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ.P. 26(f)(3). Plaintiff(s)' will move for conditional certification of this case as a collective action. Plaintiff(s)' motion to conditionally certify this case as an FLSA action shall be filed on or before Sept. 21, 2012. Defendant(s)' response to Plaintiff(s)' motion for conditional certification shall be filed on or before Oct. 12, 2012. Plaintiff(s)' reply concerning their motion for conditional certification shall be filed on or before Oct. 26, 2012. Depositions to be completed by January 9, 2013. Requests to admit shall be served by November 1, 2012. All expert Discovery to be completed no later than March 26, 2013. Plaintiffs' designation of an expert witness for trial, if any, and production of expert witness report: January 15, 2013. Defendants' designation of an expert witness in response to plaintiffs' expert, and production of expert witness report: February 26, 2013. Plaintiffs' designation of an expert witness in response to defendants' expert, and production of expert witness report: March 19, 2013. The parties shall be ready for trial on June 3, 2013. This case is to be tried by a jury. Motions due by 9/21/2012. Responses due by 10/12/2012, Replies due by 10/26/2012. Deposition due by 1/9/2013. Expert Discovery due by 3/26/2013. Ready for Trial by 6/3/2013. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2012) (ja) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: As discussed at the conference held on August 9, 2012, the parties shall on or before September 14, 2012, jointly submit to the Court for approval a proposal for a Notice to be mailed to all potential class members. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2012) (ja) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by jasmine brooks.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by kervin charlemagne.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation.(Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Dana Hawkins.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Tammy Williams.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Renso Vidal.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Jayme Likey-Alston.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Adrienne D. Johnson.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by Vincent Piccolo.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE flsa. Document filed by davina r. yancey.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jacqueline Deleon.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Earl Fisher.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ruthie Perez.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Asha Harris.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Sandra Lawrence.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Eli Seyfried.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jennifer Ragoonanansingh.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Haydee Fajardo.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Asad Rizvi dated 7/10/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request a four week extension of time to 8/10/12 to respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Adrian Benepe answer due 8/10/2012; Michael R. Bloomberg answer due 8/10/2012; The City of New York answer due 8/10/2012; The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation answer due 8/10/2012. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/11/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mercedes Velilla.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Chatory Brown.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jeffrey Edusei.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Marlena Poelz-Giga.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Sunny Corrao.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Brenda Cruz.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Domingo Sanchez.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Darlene Lewis.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Barthel Joseph.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asad Rizvi on behalf of Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation (Rizvi, Asad) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 17B of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/3/2012) Parties ordered to submit via email proposed case management plan and joint letter nine days before conference. (ft) Modified on 7/5/2012 (ft). (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Robert Green.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Richard Ventura.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Paige Lener.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mercedes Velilla.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Marlena Poelz-Giga.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Bayron.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jerry Cordero.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Hilario Ramos.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Gina Berdecia.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Frederica Johnson.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Donald Koonce.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Chris Galgano.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Charles St. Louis.(Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was accepted by Dmitry Aronov. Document filed by Pedro Rosado, Ruben Rios, Jr., Henry Perez, Baselice Ralph, Jerry Cordero, Ronald Eason, Donald Koonce, Joseph Oro. (Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Michael R. Bloomberg served on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012; Adrian Benepe served on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012; The City of New York served on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012; The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation served on 6/22/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. Service was accepted by Dmitry Aronov. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg; Juan Bayron; Henry Perez; Adrian Benepe; Jerry Cordero; Ronald Eason; Donald Koonce; Joseph Oro. (Sykes, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Adrian Benepe, Michael R. Bloomberg, The City of New York, The New York City Department of Parks & Recreation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1041711)Document filed by Pedro Rosado, Derek G. Walther, Juan Bayron, Ruben Rios, Jr., Henry Perez, Baselice Ralph, Jerry Cordero, Ronald Eason, Donald Koonce, Joseph Oro.(jfe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: # 1 exA) (ml). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?