Guichardo et al v. Hanson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00585

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 4:18 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carmen C. Guichardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 95-30 Roosevelt Ave., Apt.# 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen C. Guichardo +1 347 456 2507
No Logo Carmen R. Yentes Puesan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 95-30 Roosevelt Ave., Apt.# 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carmen R. Yentes Puesan +1 347 456 4401
No Logo Elido A. Guichardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elido A. Guichardo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elido A. Guichardo
No Logo Elijah J. Guichardo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 95-30 Roosevelt Ave., Apt.# 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elijah J. Guichardo +1 347 994 7830
v.
No Logo Alan C. Marin, Defendant
No Logo Alfonso Tardy, Defendant
No Logo Allen J. Charne, Defendant
No Logo Alquena Reed, Defendant
No Logo Ana Latony Ramirez, Defendant
No Logo Anna Hutchenson, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Lugo, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Sclafani, Defendant
No Logo Arlene Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Arne Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Betsy Vega, Defendant
No Logo Carrie Conners, Defendant
No Logo Christopher W. Alexander, Defendant
No Logo City College Of New York, Defendant
No Logo CUNY, York College, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Nibot, Defendant
No Logo Derwent Dawkins, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder"
No Logo Francine White, Defendant
No Logo Frank D. Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Gail Baksh-Jarrett, Defendant
No Logo Gail O. Mellow, Defendant
No Logo Ian James, Defendant
No Logo Jamal Cooks, Defendant
No Logo James Grantham, Defendant
No Logo Jane Devine, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-16, Defendant
No Logo John Henry Davis, Defendant
No Logo John B. King, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Doe 1-15, Defendant
No Logo John McKee, Defendant
No Logo John Trujillo, Defendant
No Logo Jon Aceto, Defendant
No Logo Jose Plasencia, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Fantozzi, Defendant
No Logo Juan Tejada, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Tighe, Defendant
No Logo Keith Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Laguardia Community College, Defendant
No Logo Lauren McGhie, Defendant
No Logo Linda Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Despain, Defendant
No Logo Lisa S. Coico, Defendant
No Logo Luis Merchant, Defendant
No Logo Maria Riggs, Defendant
No Logo Mark Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Mary Ruth Strzeszewski, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Goldstein, Defendant
No Logo Matthews S. Joffe, Defendant
No Logo Mercedes Bains, Defendant
No Logo Michael R. Pagan, Defendant
No Logo Michael A. Baston, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo NY State Education Department, Defendant
No Logo Nys Court Of Claims, Defendant
No Logo Pardeep Kaur, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Mori-Vignola, Defendant
No Logo Phyllis Orlikoff Flug, Defendant
No Logo Regina Varin-Mignano, Defendant
No Logo Robert T. Decataldo, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Dickinson, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Sellers Hanson, Defendant
No Logo Scott Ethier, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Jablonsky, Defendant
No Logo Steven Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Supreme Court or Queens County, Defendant
No Logo T. Porter Brannon, Defendant
No Logo Tammie Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Terry J. Cole, Defendant
No Logo Terry Parker, Defendant
No Logo Thelma Mason, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dempsey, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Hladek, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Tony Abreu, Defendant
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Education"
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "USDOJ"
No Logo Victor J Caputo, Defendant
No Logo Wendy J. Thornton, Defendant
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carmen C. Guichardo. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM & ORDER [ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE]: The 10 Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and for failure to conform to the pleading requirements under Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiffs are hereby directed to show cause, by written affirmation, within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, why the Court should not bar them from filing any future in forma pauperis complaints without prior leave of Court. 28 U.S.C. § 1651. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 5/20/2016. C/mailed. (Motion 11 terminated.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Expedite
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
            MOTION to Expedite Case by Carmen C. Guichardo, Elido A. Guichardo, Elijah J. Guichardo, Carmen R. Yentes Puesan. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, filed by Carmen C. Guichardo, Elijah J. Guichardo, Elido A. Guichardo, Carmen R. Yentes Puesan. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  [NOTICE of Change of Address] / Letter dated 1/7/2016 from Carmen C. Guichardo and family to Judge Brodie. (Priftakis, Tina) (Modified) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM & ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiffs' requests to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (ECF Nos. 2 - 5 .) the Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and for failure to conform with the federal pleading requirements under Rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff Elijah is granted 30 days' leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs Carmen C. Guichardo, Elido A. Guichardo and Carmen R. Yentes Puesan are also permitted to replead their complaint to the extent that they can establish standing. The amended complaint must be captioned as "Amended Complaint," and bear the same docket number as this Memorandum and Order. If Plaintiffs fail to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Court shall dismiss this Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Margo K. Brodie, on 11/6/2015. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carmen R. Yentes Puesan. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elido A. Guichardo. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carmen C. Guichardo. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elijah J. Guichardo. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carmen C. Guichardo, Elijah J. Guichardo, Elido A. Guichardo, Carmen R. Yentes Puesan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, (Bowens, Priscilla) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/5/2015) (Davis, Kimberly). Modified on 5/11/2015 (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?