Hyde v. State of Massachusetts
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-12429-RWZ

Tags
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:42 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael J. Hyde, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J. Hyde

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Hyde +1 781 341 4299
v.
No Logo Bob Pino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Carl Selavka, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Edward A. Flynn, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Jason Bolio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Max Pearlman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Norfolk County House of Correction, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mahoney Diamond Bennett & Harnais

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert W. Harnais +1 617 770 0000 +1 617 770 4091 robert@harnaislaw.com
No Logo Paul Baker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott W. Dunlap +1 781 762 4877 +1 781 769 6088 swdesq@comcast.net
No Logo Rachel Ruthier, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott W. Dunlap +1 781 762 4877 +1 781 769 6088 swdesq@comcast.net
No Logo Salvatore Paterna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
Officially listed as "State of Massachusetts"

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Thomas Connors, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo Thomas Reilly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
No Logo William R. Keating, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette C. Benedetto +1 617 727 2200 +1 617 727 5755 Annette.Benedetto@AGO.state.ma.us
Office Boston
Filed 11/17/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Norfolk
Terminated 3/24/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-1777'['First Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 57 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [54] Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael J. Hyde. This cause came on to be submitted on the briefs and original record on appeal from the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The judgment of the district court is affirmed. (Mandate issued in the USCA 4/17/2007) (Ramos, Jeanette)
    LREF
    Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006, Terminated: 4/18/2007 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number 06-1777 for [54] Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael J. Hyde,. (Ramos, Jeanette)
      LREF
      Legal Document 55 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006, Terminated: 4/18/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
      Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [54] Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # (1))(Ramos, Jeanette)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Filing Fee/Payment Received
        Filing fee: $ 455, receipt number 72127 for [54] Notice of Appeal,, (Johnson, Jay)
          LREF
          Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006, Terminated: 4/18/2007 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [52] Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, Order on Motion for Joinder,,,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, by Michael J. Hyde. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Appeal Record due by 5/3/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Remark
            Remark: Cashier returned check to Plaintiff, waiting for correct filing fee amount of $455.00 (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth)
              LREF
              Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
              Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT entered dismissing the complaint. (Urso, Lisa)
                LREF
                Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered; Memorandum of Decision;granting [25] Motion for Leave to File, granting [26] Motion to Dismiss, denying [30] Motion for Sanctions, denying [35] Motion to Strike, denying [37] Motion for Sanctions, denying [39] Motion, denying [41] Motion for Discovery, granting [49] Motion to Dismiss, denying [13] Motion for Joinder, denying [16] Motion for Joinder, granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time, granting [19] Motion to Dismiss. Judgment may be entered dismissing the complaint. (Urso, Lisa)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Exhibit
                  List of EXHIBITs re [49] MOTION to Dismiss by Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier. (Urso, Lisa)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [49] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier. (Urso, Lisa)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006, Terminated: 3/23/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss by Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier.(Urso, Lisa)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                        Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [33] Motion for Leave to File late motion to dismiss. (Urso, Lisa)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Hyde re [32] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Johnson, Jay)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Hyde re [30] Emergency MOTION for Sanctions. (Johnson, Jay)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael J. Hyde re [34] Response to Motion. (Johnson, Jay)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                Judge Rya W. Zobel : ORDER entered. Plaintiff shall serve on defendants all papers filed in court as required by Rule 5.(Urso, Lisa)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [43] MOTION to Compel filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Compel
                                    MOTION to Compel Defendants to Answer the Full Complaint by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [41] MOTION for Discovery filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                        MOTION for Discovery by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [39] MOTION Suppress filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            MOTION to Suppress by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [37] MOTION for Sanctions filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Sanctions
                                                MOTION for Sanctions by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [35] MOTION to Strike filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                    MOTION to Strike by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Response to Motion
                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [33] MOTION for Leave to File filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Late Motion to Dismiss by Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [19] MOTION to Dismiss, [26] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Attachments: # (1))(Johnson, Jay)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Opposition to Motion
                                                            Opposition re [19] MOTION to Dismiss, [26] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : ElectronicORDER entered granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time. Opposition due 10/31/05 (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                #30 EMERGENCY MOTION for Sanctions by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 9/18/2006 (Johnson, Jay). Document #30 removed from electronic docket because of identifying personal information. Modified on 9/18/2006 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norfolk County House of Correction re [25] MOTION for Leave to File, [26] MOTION to Dismiss, [27] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [28] Exhibit List. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [26] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Norfolk County House of Correction. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Norfolk County House of Correction.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005, Terminated: 3/23/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File late motion to dismiss by Norfolk County House of Correction.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Exhibit
                                                                          #28 Exhibit List by Norfolk County House of Correction.. (Johnson, Jay) Modified on 9/18/2006 Document removed because of personal identifying information. Modified on 9/18/2006 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/31/05 to respond to defendants motion to dismiss by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, Bob Pino, Carl Selavka to Robert W. Harnais Norfolk County Sheriff's Office of documents filed September 30, 2005. (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                Document #23 Notice of Filing list of exhibits, removed from from electronic docket because of personal identifying information . Modified on 9/18/2006 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  NOTICE by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, Bob Pino, Carl Selavka of filing with clerk's office of exhibits (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [19] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, Bob Pino, Carl Selavka. (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005, Terminated: 3/23/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, Bob Pino, Carl Selavka.(Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005, Terminated: 3/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to September 30, 2005 to file motion to dismiss by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, Bob Pino, Carl Selavka.(Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                          Judge Rya W. Zobel : Electronic ORDER entered granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bob Pino, Carl Selavka, Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier, Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Norfolk County House of Correction, Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts, filed by Michael J. Hyde. (Attachments: # (1))(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder in Co-Defendants Motion for a More Definite Statement by Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Dunlap on behalf of Paul Baker, Rachel Ruthier (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                    Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting [7] Motion for More Definite Statement without opposition. Plaintiff shall file a short, concise complaint that clearly sets out his claims. It shall be double spaced on one side of the papers only and it shall be filed on or before 9/1/05. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                      MOTION for Joinder in co-defendants motion for more definite statement by Norfolk County House of Correction.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Harnais on behalf of Norfolk County House of Correction (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Annette C. Benedetto on behalf of Massachusetts State Police Crime Lab (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Request for notice of default
                                                                                                            Request for notice of default. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                              Judge Rya W. Zobel : endorsedORDER entered granting [9] Motion for Order for exemption. (Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 6/30/2005 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                MOTION for Order to Exempt defendants' counsel from rules requiring confering with opposing party by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts.(Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [7] MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts. (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005, Terminated: 8/17/2005 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                    MOTION for More Definite Statement by Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, William R. Keating, Jason Bolio, Max Pearlman, Edward A. Flynn, Jr, Thomas Reilly, Mitt Romney, State of Massachusetts.(Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Annette C. Benedetto on behalf of Salvatore Paterna, Thomas Connors, Max Pearlman, Edward A. Flynn, Jr (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael Hyde regarding return receipts. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                          Return receipt received for mail sent to State Police Delivered on (No Date) (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                            Return receipt received for mail sent to Norfolk County Correctional Center Delivered on (No Date) (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                              Return receipt received for mail sent to Norfolk County D.A. Delivered on 3/16/05 (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                Return receipt received for mail sent to Dedham District Court Delivered on 3/16/05 (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                  Return receipt received for mail sent to Office of Public Safety Delivered on 3/16/05 (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                    Return receipt received for mail sent to Mass. State Police Crime Lab, 59 Horse Pond Rd, Sudbury. Ma. Delivered on 3/16/05 (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to June 29, 2005 to File Answer by State of Massachusetts.(Benedetto, Annette) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2005 (Johnson, Jay).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Annette C. Benedetto on behalf of State of Massachusetts (Benedetto, Annette)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Massachusetts, filed by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against State of Massachusetts Filing fee: $ 150, receipt number 60207, filed by Michael J. Hyde.(Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Magistrate Judge Assignment
                                                                                                                                              If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to State of Massachusetts. (Johnson, Jay)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?