CRAWFORD v. JOHNSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00436

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2019 at 11:41 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Crawford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRIS E. FISCHER, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morris Eli Fischer +1 301 328 7631 +1 301 328 7638 morris@mfischerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Jay Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/26/2015 Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Settlement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Terminate Hearings
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Answer
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Order advising plaintiff to respond to 3 MOTION to Dismiss by 7/21/2014, or Court may deem matter as conceded. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/23/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss by JAY JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of JAY JOHNSON (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          COMPLAINT against JAY JOHNSON ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616062703) filed by JAMES CRAWFORD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am, ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?