ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00200

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 7:04 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zachary John Corey +1 202 616 0042 zachary.j.corey@usdoj.gov
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
        MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David Hardy with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Peter C. Sprung with Exhibits, # 3 Declaration Declaration of William E. Bordley, # 4 Exhibits to Bordley Declaration, # 5 Declaration Declaration of Vanessa Brinkmann with Exhibits, # 6 Declaration Declaration of Katherine L. Myrick, # 7 Exhibits to Myrick Declaration, # 8 Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Dispute, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Answer
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?