Data Carriers, LLC v. The Medicines Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00192

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 7:54 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Data Carriers, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Austin Hansley Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Hansley +1 469 587 9776 +1 855 347 6329 Austin@TheTexasLawOffice.com
v.
No Logo The Medicines Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by 1201 Elm Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Daniel Strachan +1 214 939 8707 +1 214 939 8787 mstrachan@swtriallaw.com
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 28 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?