Carty v. American Airlines
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-03161
District Judge Robert W. Sweet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 4:42 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fabrizio Oskar Carty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Heriberto Antonio Cabrera +1 718 439 3600 +1 718 439 1452 herblaw11220@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Air Service Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie, Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie G.I.E., Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie GIE, Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie of North America Holdings, Inc., Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Clyde & Co US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Carlsen +1 212 710 3900 +1 212 710 3950 christopher.carlsen@clydeco.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo AMR Corp., Defendant
No Logo Air Service Co., Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie, Cross Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie G.I.E., Cross Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie GIE, Cross Defendant
No Logo Airbus Industrie of North America Holdings, Inc., Cross Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Cross Claimant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo AMR Corp., Cross Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331al
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL, This Document Relates To: All Actions, WHEREAS, attached as an Addendum to this Order is a list prepared by Holland & Knight LLP, co- counsel for defendants American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporation (collectively "American"), of individual cases in which original stipulations of dismissal (hereinafter "Stipulations"), with prejudice and without costs, have been signed by counsel for the respective parties but have not yet been filed; WHEREAS, there are more than 250 Stipulations, the Court's files for some of the cases referred to in the Stipulations have already been ordered to be closed (administratively or otherwise), and the filing of the Stipulations may result in unnecessary administrative burdens to the offices of the Clerk of the Court; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Stipulations are hereby deemed to have been filed with and docketed by the Clerk of this Court; 2. In accordance with the Stipulations, the cases referred to in the Stipulations are hereby dismissed with prejudice but without interest or costs to any party; and 3. The Stipulations shall be retained by the law firm of Holland & Knight LLP, in their offices or in offsite storage, for a period of no less than seven years. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/20/10) (pl) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
    REDACTED OPINION [UNREDACTED VERSION FILED UNDER SEAL 5/2/05]; re: Finally, Garcia has argued that the proposed settlement of the claims arising from Gilbert's death is excessive and is intended to deprive her of her rights of participation in proceeds from the settlement of the wrongful death cause of action arising from Genimiz' death. Garcia has proffered no evidence to support this argument. Moreover, the argument is rendered moot by the Court's determination that Garcia is entitled to a limited distribution of any damages from the Genimiz wrongful death action. Redacted pursuant to the Stipulation Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order of 9/3/02 (MDL No. 1448); An Unredacted Version of this Opinion was filed under seal on 5/2/05; (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/05) This Document Relates to: 02civ4755 and 03civ8322.(sac, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW any award of more than 10% would not be justified. Document filed by Fabrizio Oskar Carty. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/29/04 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.(Nocco, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Laura Anne Grossman dated 6/17/04 re: response to further objections raised by plaintiff's counsel to the proposed Order directing discovery (9/10/03 evidentiary hearing). (db, ) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Abram I. Bohrer dated 6/15/04 re: request that the Court sign the Proposed Order so that discovery can proceed. (db, ) (Entered: 06/29/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
              Letter addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Abram I. Bohrer dated 6/15/04 re: counsel for Fabrizio Oskar Carty responds to the objections raised by Heriberto Cabrera. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Heriberto A. Cabrera dated 6/14/04 re: Counsel for the Estates of Genimiz Carty and Gilbert Carty files objections to this proposed Order by 6/15/04 afternoon. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Letter addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Laura Anne Grossman dated 6/14/04 re: Counsel appeared before you on 6/10/04 in an attempt to resolve the dispute over an apportionment of the proceeds of settlement of this action between our client, Olga Garcia, who is the mother of the decendent Genimiz Carty, and the decedent's husband, Fabrizio Carty.(sac, ) (Entered: 06/22/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STIPULATION and ORDER, the caption is amended as set for this document. All references in this Complaint to Airbus Indusrie of North America, Inc., Airbus Industrie of North America Holdings, Inc., and Air Service Co., Inc. are abondoned and withdrawn without prejudice . ( signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet ) (kw) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. AND AMR CORPORATION ADOPTING THEIR AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CROSS-CLAIM: CROSSCLAIM by American Airlines, AMR Corp. against Airbus Industrie, Airbus Industrie GIE, Airbus Industrie NA, G.I.E., Air Service Co. (kw) (Entered: 05/07/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                        CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring action from the U.S.D.C. for the Eastern District of New York, Docket No.: 1:02-cv-394, MDL No.: 1448,, to the S.D.N.Y. Mailed letter requesting transfer of their file. (dle) Modified on 05/07/2002 (Entered: 05/02/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 227 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?