Pion-Guerrero v. American Airlines
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 7:02-cv-00182
District Judge Ricardo H. Hinojosa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 11:27 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Seberiano Pion-Guerrero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bandas Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A Bandas +1 361 698 5200 +1 361 698 5222 cbandas@bandaslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wyatt Law Firm Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula A Wyatt +1 210 340 5550 +1 210 340 5581
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Officer/Director, AMR Corporation
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Atlas Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael William Mills +1 956 682 5501 +1 956 686 6109 mkmills@atlashall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan K Worthington +1 956 682 5501 +1 956 686 6109 dkw@atlashall.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Martin +1 214 969 1229 +1 214 969 1751 john.martin@tklaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
Conditional interdistrict transfer Order transferring case to Southern District of New York MDL#: 1448 , filed. Parties notified. (bgarces) (Entered: 11/04/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: None
    Plaintiff's Proof of Service of Orginal Petition by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 08/29/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting [16-1] motion to stay consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand staying [9-1] motion to remand , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Ricardo H. Hinojosa ) (jdelacruz) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: None
        RESPONSE by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero in opposition to [16-1] motion to stay consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 08/20/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF by American Airlines in further support of [12-1] motion to transfer venue , filed. (jdelacruz) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
            OPPOSED MOTION to stay consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by American Airlines, Motion Docket Date 8/20/02 [16-1] motion , filed. (jdelacruz) (Entered: 07/31/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: None
              RESPONSE by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero in opposition to [12-1] motion to transfer venue , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 07/18/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None
                RESPONSE by American Airlines to [9-1] motion to remand , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: None
                  JOINT DISCOVERY/Case Management Plan by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero, American Airlines , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: None
                    Opposed MOTION to transfer venue and brief in support by American Airlines, Motion Docket Date 7/18/02 [12-1] motion , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None
                      SUPPLEMENT to [8-1] motion to vacate [2-1] order by American Airlines , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                        PARTIAL JOINDER by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero in support of [8-1] motion to vacate [2-1] order , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 06/21/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                          OPPOSED MOTION to remand by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero, Motion Docket Date 7/11/02 [9-1] motion , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/21/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None
                            Expedited MOTION to vacate [2-1] order by American Airlines, Motion Docket Date forthwith , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero in support of motion to remand , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 06/19/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
                                CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Airlines , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Seberiano Pion-Guerrero , filed. (bgarces) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                    Original Answer and DEMAND for jury trial by American Airlines , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                      Statment of Related Litigation Pursuant to L.R. 5.3 by American Airlines , filed (bgarces) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 2:30 7/9/02 before Judge Ricardo H. Hinojosa and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bgarces) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines filed FILING FEE $ 150 RECEIPT # 717819 (bgarces) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?