Altegrity, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 15-10226
District Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 5, 2021 at 11:51 AM DT (1.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Altegrity, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jasmine Ball +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836
Space Craig Allan Bruens +1 212 909 6000
Space M Natasha Labovitz +1 212 909 6000
Space Joseph P. Moodhe +1 212 909 6000 +1 212 909 6836 jpmoodhe@debevoise.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan M. Bartley +1 302 571 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph M. Barry +1 302 571 6600
Space Edmon L. Morton +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S. Kenney +1 302 573 6491 +1 302 573 6497
  Entries (999) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 1618 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None ?
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
    Corrective Entry - this order should not have been entered, formal order vacating to be filed (related document(s)1034) (LCo) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)932) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Final Application for Compensation and Fifth Monthly of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 10, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)1002) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Final Application for Compensation and Sixth Monthly for Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 24, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)999, 1006) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
            Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(15-10226-LSS) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 7801850, amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
              Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) to Allow Injury Claim to Proceed Against Insurance Coverage. Fee Amount $176. Filed by Svetlana V. Dobritsa. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 12/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Notice # 3 Proposed Form of Order) (Meyers, Max) Modified on 11/19/2015 (MDW). (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Max J. Meyers (Related Doc # 1033) Order Signed on 11/16/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                  Motion to Appear pro hac vice Max J. Meyers. Receipt Number 024339, Filed by Svetlana V. Dobritsa. (Meyers, Max) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                    Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed on 11/16/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                      Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                        The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 11/13/2015 to 11/27/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 12, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1024) (Smith, David) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of a Final Decree (A) Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases, (B) Waiving Certain Reporting Requirements and (C) Amending Case Caption. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1026) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None
                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Calvin C. Liu Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 11/11/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                Motion for Final Decree (A) Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases, (B) Waiving Certain Reporting Requirements and (C) Amending Case Caption Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)990) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                    HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                      Post-Confirmation Report Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                        The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/30/2015 to 11/13/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable. Telephone number (302) 654-8080 . (AJL) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred of AlixPartners, LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)965) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 30, 2015 (related document(s)968) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Sebastian V. Higgins Regarding (Supplemental) Second Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions, and Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)976) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Objection to Motion of Ronald Mukasa Maiteki for Leave to File Proof of Claim After the Bar Date. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)1017) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Objection to Motion of Ronald Mukasa Maiteki for Leave to File Proof of Claim After the Bar Date (related document(s)969, 973) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Fifth) of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)958) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC (related document(s)957) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Final Professionals' Fee Applications (related document(s)991, 993, 996, 997, 998, 999, 1000, 1002, 1003, 1004, 1005, 1006) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)1011) Notice Date 10/21/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Calvin C. Liu Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization UnderChapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B)Occurrence of Effective DateThereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/15/2015 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2016. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] (RE: related document(s) 986). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/26/2015. Redaction Request Due By 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/19/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2016. (BJM) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 15, 2015 at10:00 A.M. (ET). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)986) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/16/2015 to 10/30/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims - Request For Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expense Claim Filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jack Rolovich # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Certificate of Service) (Yoder, James) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Corrective Entry: The image for Docket No. 998 has been modified to remove a page that had been erroneously attached to the Main Document. (related document(s)998) (MAS) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Exhibit(s) / Annex 2 and 3 to Final Application for Compensation and Sixth Monthly for Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 24, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)999) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Final Application for Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses of Ropes & Gray LLP, Ordinary Course Professinal for the Debtors for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Final Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC as Administrative Agent to the Debtors for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period (Final) of Februrary 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Final Application for Compensation and Third Monthly of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC, Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 25, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Final Application for Compensation and Fifth Monthly of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 10, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims Filed by Oracle America, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Oracle America Inc.'s Request for Allowance and Payment of a Chapter 11 Administrative Expense Claim # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service # 5 Service List) (Huggett, James) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      Final Application for Compensation and Sixth Monthly for Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 24, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the period February 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C - Part 1 # 5 Exhibit C - Part 2 # 6 Exhibit C - Part 3 # 7 Exhibit C - Part 4 # 8 Exhibit C - Part 5 # 9 Exhibit D) (Justison, Elizabeth) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2015 (MAS). (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period February 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Final Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Minutes of Hearing held on: 10/15/2015 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (201324)). (related document(s) 986) (LJJ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Withdrawal of Claim # 956 in the amount of $141,000.00. Filed by Carol Rademacher. (NAB) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Final Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of AlixPartners, LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)947) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Final Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to August 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 11/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims \\ Request of Blue Star Properties, Inc. for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 503(b) Filed by Blue Star Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Form of Order # 4 Certificate of Service) (Heilman, Leslie) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Quarterly Claims Register (Alphabetical). Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Quarterly Claims Register (Numerical)) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Second Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions, and Summary of First and Final Fee Application of Williams & Connolly LLP as an Ordinary Course Professional for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period from July 1, 2015 through and including July 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)976, 977) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims Filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Yoder, James) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) //Request by Bus Driver Defendants for Status Conference in Connection with Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s)572, 684, 835) Filed by Bus Driver Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation [Sixth] of of AlixPartners, LLP as Restructuring Advisor for Debtors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)925) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 30, 2015 (related document(s)968) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred of AlixPartners, LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)965) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 (related document(s)947) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Fifth) of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)958) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Williams & Connolly LLP as an Ordinary Course Professional for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Order (Second) Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452. (related document(s)912) Order Signed on 10/8/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of Claim #1107 on April 30, 2015. Filed by QBE Regional Insurance. (Nixon, Timothy) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Withdrawal of Claim No. 938 and Claim No. 1288. Filed by SAP America, Inc.. (Ludman, Donald) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Proof of Claim After the Bar Date (related document(s)969) Filed by Ronald Mukasa Maiteki. (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses/Claims Filed by Banc of America Leasing & Capital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Certificate of Service) (Weaver, John) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 (related document(s)912) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Motion of Ronald Mukasa Maiteki for Leave to File a Proof of Claim After the Bar Date (related document(s)969) Filed by Ronald Mukasa Maiteki. (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date. Filed by Ronald Mukasa Maiteki. Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Mann, Kevin) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) Modified Text on 10/7/2015 (LB). (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental) of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/2/2015 to 10/16/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred of AlixPartners, LLP for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 10/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from August 1, 2015 through August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)957) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Ward, Matthew) has withdrawn from the case Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Holders of Senior Priority Debt. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Ward, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)907) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)906) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)897) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Address Change Filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (McFarland, Sean) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses (Fifth) of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc. Objections due by 10/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) Modified text on 10/1/2015 (MDW). (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC as Administrative Agent to the Debtors for the period August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 10/20/2015. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)948) Notice Date 09/25/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)903) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Disinterestedness of Caldwell Leslie & Proctor, PC in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional (related document(s)941) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)906, 907) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)903) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript regarding Hearing Held 09/17/2015 RE: Omnibus Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/22/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at telephone number: 302-654-8080.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/30/2015. Redaction Request Due By 10/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/26/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/22/2015. (related document(s)928, 930) (MPM) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period June 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 10/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)903) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates (related document(s)903) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)932) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Order Granting Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive), and Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)931, 932) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifth) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)870) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Disinterestedness of Caldwell Leslie & Proctor, PC Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Final Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)927) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Reorganized Debtors' Response in Further Support of Motion for an Order (A) Setting a Hearing to Determine the Amount of Oklahoma State Income Tax Liability of Certain Debtors, (B) Establishing a Briefing Schedule in Support of the Tax Determination Hearing and (C) Staying Current Tax Proceeding (related document(s)926) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Disinterestedness of OMelveny & Myers LLP in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional, Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 17, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET) (related document(s)929, 930) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding (Supplemental) Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)850) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 9/18/2015 to 10/2/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Application by AlixPartners, LLP as Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors for Approval of the Success Fee, Sixth Monthly Fee Application of AlixPartners, LLP for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred as Restructuring Advisor for Debtors for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015, and Notice of Final Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)924, 925, 927) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes of Hearing held on: 09/17/2015 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (201323)). (related document(s) 930) (LJJ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2015 (LJJ). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order (WITH REVISIONS) Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims ( Substantive) (related document(s)807) Signed on 9/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (NAB) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order (WITH REVISIONS) Granting Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive). (related document(s)808) Signed on 9/16/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of O'Melveny & Myers LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Professionals' Compensation // Notice of Final Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of August 1, 2015 to August 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response in Further Support of Motion for an Order (A) Setting a Hearing to Determine the Amount of Oklahoma State Income Tax Liability of Certain Debtors, (B) Establishing a Briefing Schedule in Support of the Tax Determination Hearing and (C) Staying Current Tax Proceeding (related document(s)871, 916) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for Compensation [Sixth] of of AlixPartners, LLP as Restructuring Advisor for Debtors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 10/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Approve // Application by AlixPartners, LLP as Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors for Approval of the Success Fee Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 11/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 (related document(s)853) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Second Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)912) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurrence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Part 2) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of Verizon Communications Inc., and its Subsidiaries to Proposed Cure Amounts in Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures (related document(s)683) Filed by Verizon Communications Inc. and its subsidiaries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)841) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Objection to Claim by Claimant(s) Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive) (related document(s)808) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive). (related document(s)807) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to Motion to Approve (related document(s)871) Filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service) (McFarland, Sean) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of (related document(s)914) Filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission. (McFarland, Sean) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (WITHDRAWN ON Objection 9/9/15 - SEE DOCKET # 915 (related document(s)871) Filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (McFarland, Sean) Modified on 9/10/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Joshua D. Falda Regarding Noteholder Distribution Registration Form, Stockholders Agreement and Signature Page. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second Motion to Extend the Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1452 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of Claim(s): 725. Filed by Sears Holdings Management Corp. (Barry, Joseph) Modified on 9/11/2015 to Add Claim Number (LB). (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)819) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)899) Notice Date 09/03/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)898) Notice Date 09/03/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 9/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 9/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 9/3/2015 to 9/17/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)897) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Effective Date - Notice of (A) Entry of Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code as Modified, (B) Occurence of Effective Date Thereunder, and (C) Related Deadlines for Filing Claims Against the Estates (related document(s)835) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures and (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim Regarding (I) Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive) and (II) Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive). Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (related document(s)807, 808) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Declaration of Gregg D. Freeman in Support of Debtors Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive), Notice of Second Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of May 1, 2015, to July 30, 2015 and Notice of Filing of Gilbert LLP Declaration of Disinterestedness. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)854, 893, 895) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/27/2015 RE: Status Conference Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/30/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at telephone number: 302-654-8080.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/8/2015. Redaction Request Due By 9/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/2/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/30/2015. (related document(s)860) (MPM) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/18/2015 RE: Omnibus Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/30/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at telephone number: 302-654-8080.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/8/2015. Redaction Request Due By 9/22/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/2/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/30/2015. (related document(s)828, 838, 840) (MPM) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 9/21/2015. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Notice of Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim, Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Altegrity, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of HireRight, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of HireRight Solutions, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Kroll Associates, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Kroll Background America, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Kroll Information Assurance, Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Kroll Ontrack Inc., Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of National Diagnostics, Inc. and Notice of Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of US Investigations Services, LLC. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)873, 874, 875, 876, 877, 878, 879, 880, 881) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Disinterestedness of Gilbert LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)776) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Professionals' Compensation - Second Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of May 1, 2015 to July 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 8/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plan Supplement- Fourth Supplement to the Plan Supplement in Connection With the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)532, 533, 641, 663, 765, 813) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Fifth Monthly Application of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 and Debtors' Motion for an Order (A) Setting a Hearing to Determine the Amount of Oklahoma State Income Tax Liability of Certain Debtors, (B) Establishing a Briefing Schedule in Support of the Tax Determination Hearing and (C) Staying Current Tax Proceeding. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)870, 871) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements(15-10226-LSS) [misc,amdsch] ( 30.00). Receipt Number 7703061, amount $ 30.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch E, Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- US Investigations Services, LLC - 15-10262 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- National Diagnostics, Inc. - 15-10258 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- Kroll Ontrack Inc. - 15-10255 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- Kroll Information Assurance, Inc.- 15-10252 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- Kroll Background America, Inc. - 15-10246 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- Kroll Associates, Inc. - 15-10245 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- HireRight Solutions, Inc. - 15-10239 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30.- Hireright, Inc. - 15-10241 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Schedules/Statements filed: , Sch E, Sch F, ,. Fee Amount $30. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/27/2015 Subject: Status Conference. (vCal Hearing ID (203171)). (related document(s) 860) (LJJ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Approve Order (A) Setting a Hearing to Determine the Amount of Oklahoma State Income Tax Liability of Certain Debtors, (B) Establishing a Briefing Schedule in Support of the Tax Determination Hearing and (C) Staying Current Tax Proceeding Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 9/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (Fifth) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 9/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)783) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)780) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)850) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Third Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)841) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)819) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 27, 2015 at 3:30 P.M. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)860) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Pierre Labissiere Regarding Asset Sale Offer to Purchase 9.50% Senior First Lien Secured Notes due 2019 and Asset Sale Offer Letter of Transmittal Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Fourth Fee Application of Bayard, P.A. for Compensation for Service Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from July 1, 2015 through July 31, 2015 (related document(s)853) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)766) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)778) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Second Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 18, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. (ET), and Notice of Confirmation of Debtors' Plan of Reorganization, Treatment of Certain Claims in Class A7-B for Altegrity Holding Corp. as Non-Voting, Related Rights of Reconsideration, and Related Deadlines. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)839, 840) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Independent Auditor and Financial Consultant Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Dates Specified Herein and Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2, Notice of Filing of Fragomen, Del Rey, Bernsen & Loewy, LLP Declaration of Disinterestedness and Notice of Status Conference. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)845, 849, 851) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Gregg D. Freeman in Support of Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive) (related document(s)807) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period July 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 9/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)837) Notice Date 08/19/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing - Notice of Status Conference Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/27/2015 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of Fragomen, Del Rey, Bernsen & Loewy, LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 8/19/2015 to 9/2/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 18, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)828) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Exhibit A to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 14, 2015 at 10:00 A.M., and Revised Exhibit A to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al.. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)822, 823, 827) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ Pricewaterhousecoopers LLP as Independent Auditor and Financial Consultant effective Nunc PRO Tunc to the Dates Specified Herein and Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2 (Related Doc # 767) Order Signed on 8/18/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/18/2015 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (201322)). (related document(s) 840) (LJJ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2015 (LJJ). (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)682) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 9/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Confirmation of Debtors' Plan of Reorganization, Treatment of Certain Claims in Class A7-B for Altegrity Holding Corp. as Non-Voting, Related Rights of Reconsideration, and Related Deadlines Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Morton, Edmon) Modified to Correct Text on 8/19/2015 (LB). (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 8/14/2015 RE: Omnibus/Confirmation. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/16/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Relabile, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] (RE: related document(s) 823). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/24/2015. Redaction Request Due By 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/17/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/16/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Supplemental Application/Motion to Employ/Retain PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Independent Auditor and Financial Consultant (related document(s)767) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization (With Revisions Made by the Court)(related document(s) 641, 663, 765) Signed on 8/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Rider A # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (MML) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures [a non-customized version of which is attached hereto as [Exhibit A] Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/14/2015 Subject: Confirmation/Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (202023)). (MPM) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2015 (MPM). (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order (WITH REVISIONS MADE BY THE COURT) Authorizing The Debtors To Enter Into, And Approving, A Settlement Agreement With The United States. (Related Doc 802) Order Signed on 8/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1) Exhibit 1) (BJM) (Modified Text on 8/17/2015 (JohnstonJ, Julie). (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Debtors Leave To Exceed Page Limit Requirements With Respect To Debtors' Memorandum Of Law In Support Of, And In Response To Objections To, Confirmation Of The Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Altegrity, Inc., et al. (Related Doc # 815) Order Signed on 8/14/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Fee Applications of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP (related document(s)780, 783) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Hassan Alli-Balogun Regarding Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the United States. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)806) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 828 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit A to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc. et al. (related document(s)814, 822) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) Modified text on 8/14/2015 (MDW). (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the United States, Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the United States, Debtors' Objection to the Motion of Carrie Wirt for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)802, 803, 804) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of David M. Smith Regarding Notice of First Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of February 8, 2015 to April 30, 2015, Notice of Debtors' Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive), Notice of Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive), Declaration of Kevin McShea in Support of Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Declaration of Lloyd Sprung in Support of Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Declaration of James Daloia of Prime Clerk LLC Regarding the Solicitation of Votes and Tabulation of Ballots Cast on the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Notice of Filing of Technical Amendments to Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Third Supplement to the Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan, Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Debtors' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Requirements with Respect to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Notice of Filing of Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Confirming Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code, Declaration of David R. Fontaine in Support of Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive) and Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 14, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET) (related document(s)805, 807, 808, 809, 810, 811, 812, 813, 814, 815, 816, 817, 818) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Disinterestedness of Akerman LLP in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)801) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of Exhibit A to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc. et al. (related document(s)814) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 (related document(s)754) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Disinterestedness of F. Greg Bowman in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professionals. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)794) (Steele, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 8/13/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 9/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of David R. Fontaine in Support of Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive) (related document(s)808) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (related document(s)529, 532) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit Requirements with Respect to Debtors' Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. (related document(s)814) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law in Support of, and in Response to Objections to, Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc. et al. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Plan Supplement to the Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)532, 533, 641, 663, 765) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of Technical Amendments to Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. (related document(s)515, 532) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of James Daloia of Prime Clerk LLC Regarding the Solicitation of Votes and Tabulation of Ballots Cast on the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Lloyd Sprung in Support of Confimration of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kevin McShea in Support of Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Claim by Claimant(s) Claim Nos. 974 and 1036 (Substantive).. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit 2) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Omnibus Objection to Claims - Third Omnibus Objection to Certain Duplicate Claims (Substantive). Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit 2) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Shortening the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the United States (related document(s)802, 803). Signed on 8/10/2015. (SJS) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Quarterly Statement of Payments Made to Ordinary Course Professionals for the Period of February 8, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) Modified docket text on 8/11/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection to the Motion of Carrie Wirt for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)744, 746, 747, 748, 759, 760) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Shorten the Time for Notice of Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement With the United States (related document(s)802) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order) (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 802 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement With the United States. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Morton, Edmon) Modified docket text on 8/11/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of Akerman LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Reservation of Rights Regarding Debtors' Joint Plan (related document(s)661) Filed by Banc of America Leasing & Capital LLC. (Weaver, John) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding First Amendment and Consent to Credit Agreement, First Amendment to and Partial Waiver of Restructuring Support Agreement and Omnibus Order Approving First Quarterly Fee Applications Omnibus Order Approving First Quarterly Fee Applications. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)788, 789, 790) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Fifth Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals, Declaration of Disinterestedness of B.T. Atkinson, on Behalf of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional and Declaration of Disinterestedness of Vinson & Elkins LLP in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)784, 785, 786) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Ingamar D. Ramirez Regarding Notice of Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim (related document(s)339) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation of AlixPartners, LLP for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)740) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)738) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Disinterestedness of WIlliams & Connolly LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Fee Applications of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP (related document(s)780, 783) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (related document(s)738) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Fourth Monthly Application of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Lease Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)778) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order (OMNIBUS) Approving First Quarterly Fee Applications.(related document(s)633, 634, 635, 638, 639, 715) Order Signed on 8/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (NAB) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) Notice of Amendment to Restructuring Support Agreement (related document(s)79, 208) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) - Notice of Amendment to DIP Loan Agreement (related document(s)11, 207) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 8/4/2015 to 8/18/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Disinterestedness of Vinson & Elkins LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of Ordinary Course Professionals - Fifth Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Fee Application of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2015 through June 30, 2015 (related document(s)776) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures, and (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 779 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 31, 2015 at 9:30 A.M. (ET) (related document(s)769) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Fourth) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 8/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 8/18/2015. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Supplemental Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Independent Auditor and Financial Consultant Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Dates Specified Herein, and Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)767) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures Substantive) Objection to Claims and Order Sustaining, in Part, Debtors' Tenth (10th) Omnibus (Substantive) Objection to Claims. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Filing of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP Declaration of Disinterestedness, (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures and (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)761) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Disinterestedness of Conner & Winters, LLP in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professionals. Filed by Kiran A. Phansalkar . (NAB) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Berkeley Research Group, LLC as Successor Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2015 (related document(s)632) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 769 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2015 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Filing of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP Declaration of Disinterestedness (related document(s)761) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Application/Motion to Employ/Retain PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP as Independent Auditor and Financial Consultant Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 8/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second Plan Supplement in Connection With the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)532, 533, 641, 663) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015; 2) List of Ordinary Course Professionals - Fourth Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals; 3) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC; 4) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Lindquist & Vennum LLP; and 5) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Sherman & Howard L.L.C.. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)754, 755, 756, 757, 758) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation Third Monthly Application Of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses As Lead Counsel To The Statutory Committee Of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)713) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Affidavit of Service/ Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing //Notice of Motion (related document(s)744) Filed by Carrie Wirt. Hearing scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., Wilmington, DE. Objections due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Shorten Time (related document(s)748) Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Disinterestedness of Sherman & Howard L.L.C. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Disinterestedness of Lindquist & Vennum LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Disinterestedness of Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of Ordinary Course Professionals - Fourth Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation (Third) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period June 1, 2015 to June 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance Filed by New York State Department of Taxation and Finance. (Testa, Louis) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 7/20/2015 to 8/3/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable. Telephone number (302)654-8080. (GM) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures and (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)737) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (WITHDRAWN ON 7/22/15 - SEE DOCKET # 759) Motion to Shorten Time (related document(s)744) Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service Matrix) (Arban, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Document (related document(s)746) Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ( WITHDRAWN ON 7/16/15 - SEE DOCKET # 747) Motion to Shorten Time (related document(s)744) Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Form of Order # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Service Matrix) (Arban, Brian) Modified on 7/17/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay (B)(15-10226-LSS) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00). Receipt Number 7650120, amount $ 176.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE) . Fee Amount $176. Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Service Matrix) (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 (related document(s)667) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Memorandum Order on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal Certain Supplements to the Debtors' Statements of Financial Affairs and Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates and Schedules of Assets Liabilities. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)721, 731) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 741 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Quarterly Claims Register Alphabetical. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Quarterly Claims Register - Numerical) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application for Compensation of AlixPartners, LLP for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 8/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 8/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Orders Approving First Quarterly Fee Applications (related document(s)633, 634, 635, 638) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 7/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reservation of Rights of Liberty Mututual Insurance Company with respect to the Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan and the Notices Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures (related document(s)532) Filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Certificate of Service) (Hill, R.) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing / Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding (Customized) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REVISED - Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware . Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM., 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM., 10/15/2015 at 10:00 AM., 11/12/2015 at 10:00 AM., 12/10/2015 at 10:00 AM. Signed on 7/9/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)631) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)637) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to February 28, 2015 (related document(s)636) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding First Omnibus Objection to Claims - No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)571) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Limited Objection of LexisNexis Creditors to Proposed Cure Amounts Pursuant to Altegrity, Inc.'s Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)641) Filed by LexisNexis Creditors (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Kunz, Carl) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Third Monthly Application Of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses As Lead Counsel To The Statutory Committee Of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)713) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) The Travelers Indemnity Companys Statement in Support and Clarification of the Debtors Proposed Assumption of Insurance Programs in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc. (related document(s)532, 641) Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Bifferato, Karen) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum Order regarding Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal certain Supplements to the Debtors' Statements of Financial Affairs and Schedules of Assets and Liabilities the United States Trustee's objection to the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal certain Supplements to the Debtors' statements of Financial Affairs and Schedules of Assets and Liabilities [D.I. 379] and the United States Office of Personnel Management's Statement in Limited Support of Debtors' Motion to Seal Certain Documents. (related document(s)348, 378, 379, 394) Order Signed on 7/6/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 719 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)625) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 718 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)620) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)619) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 716 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to February 28, 2015 (related document(s)618) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 715 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) - Supplement to First Interim Fee Application of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (related document(s)636, 637, 638) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 7/6/2015 to 7/20/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable. Telephone number (302)654-8080. (GM) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application for Compensation Third Monthly Application Of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP For Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses As Lead Counsel To The Statutory Committee Of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 7/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Notice) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on July 1, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET), Order Denying Without Prejudice the Motion of Karen Dillaman for Relief from the Automatic Stay, and Order Denying Without Prejudice the Motion of Kathleen Galante for Relief from the Automatic Stay and Order Extending Exclusive Periods for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Accepatances Thereof (related document(s)696, 698, 699) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Application for Compensation for Service Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)613) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)615) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Third Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred of Alix Partners, LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)612) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Berkeley Research Group, LLC as Successor Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2015 (related document(s)632) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance Filed by IBM Corporation. (LMD) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Claim #983. Filed by AT&T Services, Inc.. (LMD) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)603) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures; and 2) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected and Related Procedures. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Adler, Adam) Modified docket text on 7/2/2015 (LMD). (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Denying Without Prejudice the Motion of John Salyers for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code. (related document(s)401, 621) Order Signed on 7/1/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim Regarding (I) Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive) and (II) Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive). Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (related document(s)571, 572) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Tim Braun Regarding Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Confirmation of the Plan and Notice of Monthly Fee Application of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from May 1, 2015 through May 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)680, 682) (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Extending the Exclusive Periods for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Acceptances Thereof. (related document(s)599) Order Signed on 6/29/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying Without Prejudice the Motion of Kathleen Galante for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code. (related document(s)503, 611) Order Signed on 6/30/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Denying Without Prejudice the Motion of Karen Dillaman for Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to Section 362(d) of the Bankruptcy Code. (related document(s)504, 611) Order Signed on 6/30/2015. (NAB) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of John Salyers for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s)401, 621) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Irv Ackelsberg (Related Doc # 693) Order Signed on 6/30/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Irv Ackelsberg, Esquire with Langer, Grogan & Diver, PC. Receipt Number DEX023706, Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Irv Ackelsberg, Esquire of Langer, Grogan & Diver, PC (related document(s)681) Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Relief from Stay (related document(s)503, 611) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Relief from Stay (related document(s)504, 611) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 689 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the period from (i) February 8, 2015 through February 28, 2015, (ii) March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 and (iii) April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)582) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 688 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)581) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection regarding First Omnibus Objection to Claims - No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive). (related document(s)571) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 685 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of Salesforce.com, Inc. to the Cure Amount Related to the Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Salesforce.com, Inc.'s Executory Contracts Pursuant to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc. (related document(s)532, 641) Filed by Salesforce.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Declaration of Jack Rolovich # 4 Certificate of Service) (Yoder, James) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by Bus Driver Plaintiffs to: (A) Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive) and (B) Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing a Limited Waiver of the Requirements of Local Rule 3007-1(F)(I) with Respect to the Debtors' Second Motion to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive) (related document(s)572, 573) Filed by Bus Driver Plaintiffs (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Proposed Cure Amounts in Notice Regarding (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed or Assumed and Assigned, (B) Proposed Cure Amounts, and (C) Related Procedures (related document(s)532, 533, 641) Filed by Verizon Communications Inc. and its subsidiaries (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Taylor, William) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk LLC, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 7/16/2015. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ( WITHDRAWN ON 6/30/15 - SEE DOCKET # 692) Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Irv Ackelsberg, Esquire with Langer, Grogan & Diver, PC. Receipt Number DEX023706, Filed by Carrie Wirt. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Irv Ackelsberg, Esquire) (Arban, Brian) Modified on 6/30/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Confirmation of the Plan Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Confirmation Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service (related document(s)678) Filed by Fairfield Property Associates, LLC. (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Debtors' Proposed Cure Amount (related document(s)532, 533) Filed by Fairfield Property Associates, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Agreement of Lease) # 2 Exhibit B (Proof of Claim) # 3 Exhibit C (Request for Payment Administrative Claim) # 4 Exhibit D (Arrears Report)) (Leonhardt, Scott) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement (related document(s)599) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Limited Objection to Plan Supplement and First Supplement to Plan Supplement (related document(s)641, 663) Filed by FD Holdings, LLC, CBCInnovis, Inc. (Cobb, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Tim Braun Regarding Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (related document(s)672) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)667) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Confirmation of Plan // Objection by Bus Driver Plaintiffs to Confirmation of Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Bus Driver Plaintiffs (related document(s)528, 533, 338, 532, 385, 529). (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Confirmation of Plan of Altegrity, Inc. et al (related document(s)515) Filed by United States Trustee (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kenney, Mark) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)625) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 25, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)574) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Tim Braun Regarding First Supplement to the Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)663) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period May 1, 2015 to May 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Scott J. Freedman (Related Doc # 628) Order Signed on 6/22/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Anne Marie P. Kelley (Related Doc # 627) Order Signed on 6/22/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)648) Notice Date 06/20/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plan Supplement// First Supplement to the Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)532, 533, 641) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service (related document(s)657) Filed by Louisiana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CM-ECF Filing Receipt -- Objection to Confirmation) (Bonaccorso-Saenz, Florence) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reservation of Rights Regarding Debtors' Joint Plan (related document(s)532) Filed by Banc of America Leasing & Capital LLC. (Weaver, John) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order and Stipulation Tolling Creditors' Committee Challenge Period (related document(s)11, 53, 190, 207) Order Signed on 6/19/2015. (SH) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)641) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reservation of Rights Regarding Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Altegrity, Inc., et al. (related document(s)532, 533, 562, 641) Filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service List) (Huggett, James) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document(s)532) Filed by Louisiana Department of Revenue (Bonaccorso-Saenz, Florence) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection to Confirmation of Plan Filed by Tennessee Department of Revenue (related document(s)532, 562). (McCloud, Laura) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection to Confirmation of Plan // Objection to Confirmation of Joint Chapter 11 Plan by Carrie Wirt, Class Action Plaintiff Filed by Carrie Wirt (related document(s)532). (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Service Matrix) (Arban, Brian) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document(s)532) Filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Zhao, Victor) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Tolling Creditors' Committee Challenge Period (related document(s)207) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Florence Bonaccorso-Saenz (Related Doc # 651) Order Signed on 6/19/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice Florence Bonaccorso-Saenz for the Louisiana Department of Revenue. Receipt Number DEX023676, Filed by Louisiana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Receipt-Clerk-Delaware District Court) (Bonaccorso-Saenz, Florence) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document(s)532) Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Stern, John) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance Filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Doshi, Amish) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript regarding Hearing Held 6/17/2015 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/16/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] (RE: related document(s) 630). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/25/2015. Redaction Request Due By 7/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/20/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/16/2015. (BJM) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/18/2015 to 7/2/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing . Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Holders of Senior Priority Debt. (related document(s)624) (Matthews, Gene) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/17/2015 Subject: Omnibus. (vCal Hearing ID (197768)). (related document(s) 630) (LJJ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2015 (LJJ). (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Proofs of Claim Numbers 1237 and 1238 Filed by Continental Casualty Company a/s/o Ceridian LLC. (Kleinman, Keith) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Tim Braun Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 17, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET), Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Authorization to Retain and Employ Berkeley Research Group, LLC as Successor Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2015, Notice of First Interim Fee Application of Certain of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period from February 8, 2015 through and including April 30, 2015, Supplement to First Interim Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP, Second Monthly Application of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC, Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered During the Period from April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015, First Interim Fee Application Request of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC, Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses from February 25, 2015 through April 30, 2015, Notice of First Interim Fee Application of Bayard, P.A., Summary of First Interim Fee Application of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for the Period from February 24, 2015 through April 30, 2015, First Monthly Fee Application of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from February 8, 2015 through February 28, 2015, and Second Monthly Fee Application of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP as Co-Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 (related document(s)630, 631, 632, 633, 634, 635, 636, 637, 638, 639) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Debtors' Objection to the Motion of John Salyers for Relief From the Automatic Stay (related document(s)621) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plan Supplement in Connection with the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s)532, 533) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Continental Casualty Company a/s/o Ceridian LLC for Relief from Automatic Stay (related document(s)467, 483) Filed by Continental Casualty Company a/s/o Ceridian LLC. (Kleinman, Keith) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) // Supplement to First Interim Fee Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP (related document(s)638) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Interim Application for Compensation of Certain of the Debtors' Professionals for the period February 8, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to February 28, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Interim Application for Compensation (First) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP for the period February 24, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E # 7 Exhibit F) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Interim Application for Compensation (First) of Bayard, P.A. for the period March 10, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Certificate) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Application for Compensation (First) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC for the period February 25, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Berkeley Research Group, LLC as Successor Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Time Braun Regarding 1) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP; 2) Omnibus Objection to Motions of Kathleen Galante and Karen Dillaman for Relief From the Automatic Stay; and 3) Objection to Motion of Continental Casualty Company A/S/O Ceridian LLC for Relief From the Automatic Stay. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)609, 611, 617) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Scott J. Freedman, Esquire. Receipt Number 1738193, Filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Weis, Martin) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Anne Marie P. Kelley, Esquire. Receipt Number 1738193, Filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Weis, Martin) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance Filed by The Dow Chemical Company. (Weis, Martin) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP as Fresh-Start Accounting Services Provider to the Debtors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/2/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 2019 Statement // Second Supplemental Verified Statement Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Filed by Ad Hoc Group of Holders of Senior Priority Debt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Ward, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)618, 619, 620) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service (related document(s)612, 613, 615) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to the Motion of John Salyers for Relief From the Automatic Stay (related document(s)401) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to February 28, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 7/1/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Motion of Continental Casualty Company A/S/O Ceridian LLC for Relief From the Automatic Stay (related document(s)483) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding First Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)581) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 10, 2015 to April 30, 2015 (related document(s)545) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third Application for Compensation for Service Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred of Alix Partners, LLP for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 6/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Omnibus Objection to Motions of Kathleen Galante and Karen Dillaman for Relief From the Automatic Stay (related document(s)503, 504) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Removal from Mailing List Filed by Carl N. Kunz, III, Esquire. (Kunz, Carl) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Removal from Mailing List Filed by Bank Alkhair B.S.C., Dar Al Arkan Real Estate Development Company. (Candeub, Douglas) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Removal from Mailing List Filed by Bank Alkhair B.S.C., Dar Al Arkan Real Estate Development Company. (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding Second Monthly Application of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)603) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Tim Braun Regarding Debtors' Motion for an Order Extending the Exclusive Periods for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Soliciting Acceptances Thereof, and Notice of Filing of LeClairRyan Declaration of Disinterestedness (related document(s)599, 601) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Fallon, Brett) has withdrawn from the case Filed by Bank Alkhair B.S.C., Dar Al Arkan Real Estate Development Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Application for Compensation (Second) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 6/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Timothy R. Quinn Regarding 1) List of Ordinary Course Professionals - Third Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals; and 2) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ropes & Gray LLP. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)587, 595) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of LeClairRyan Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance Filed by IBM Corporation (NAB) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 6/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 6/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement (related document(s)597) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 6/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (WITHDRAWN ON 6/7/15 - SEE DOCKET # 598) Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Bartley, Ryan) Modified Text on 6/8/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 06/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Regarding Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)524) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ropes & Gray LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the period from (i) February 8, 2015 through February 28, 2015, (ii) March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 and (iii) April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)582) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Supplemental Declaration of Disinterestedness of John G. Lavoie in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)580) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Carrianne J.M. Basler. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)577) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 24, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)523) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of James Daloia of Solicitation Materials (related document(s)334, 335, 528, 529, 562) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/4/2015 to 6/18/2015 . To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Publication of The Wall Street Journal (US Edition), the San Francisco Chronicle, USA Today (National Edition), the Los Angeles Times, and The Wall Street Journal (Europe and Asia Edition) Regarding Notice of (A)Approval of Disclosure Statement, (B) Deadline for Voting on the Plan, (C) Hearing to Consider Confirmation of the Plan and (D) Deadline for Filing Objections to the Confirmation of the Plan (related document(s)562) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              List of Ordinary Course Professionals - Third Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) First Omnibus Objection to Claims - No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive); 2) Second Omnibus Objection to Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive); 3) Motion to Authorize a Limited Waiver of the Requirements of Local Rule 3007-1(f)(i) With Respect to the Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive); 4) Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 25, 2015 to March 31, 2015; and 5) Declaration of David R. Fontaine in Support of Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive). Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)571, 572, 573, 574, 576) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Bar Date. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)339) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Declaration of Disinterestedness of McDermott Will & Emery LLP. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)569) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)514) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation of Prime Clerk, Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the period from (i) February 8, 2015 through February 28, 2015, (ii) March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 and (iii) April 1, 2015 to April 30, 2015. Filed by Prime Clerk. Objections due by 6/22/2015. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of Deloitte Financial Advisory Services LLP for the period February 8, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Objections due by 6/22/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Declaration of Disinterestedness of John G. Lavoie in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Claim -- Withdrawal of Claim Nos. 1186, 1301 and 1403. Filed by Bank Alkhair B.S.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Claim -- Withdrawal of Claim Nos. 1183, 1185 and 1221. Filed by Dar Al Arkan Real Estate Development Company. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 5/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Carrianne J.M. Basler in Support of Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive) (related document(s)571) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of David R. Fontaine in Support of Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive) (related document(s)572) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2015 Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Capstone Advisory Group, LLC and Capstone Valuation Services, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period February 25, 2015 to March 31, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 6/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Authorize a Limited Waiver of the Requirements of Local Rule 3007-1(f)(i) With Respect to the Debtors' Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive) (related document(s)572) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Omnibus Objection to Claims Related to Pending Litigation (Substantive). Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Omnibus Objection to Claims - No-Documentation Claims (Non-Substantive). Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Declaration of Dennis L. Jenkins Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Disinterestedness of McDermott Will & Emery LLP (related document(s)204) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/29/2015 to Add Related Docket Number (LB). (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Letter Response to Motion to Intervene as Creditors under Fed. R. Bank. P and Rule 24(a) Rule 24(b) as Filed by Oskar Groning, Jimmy J. Teal, Bernardine Dohrn, Wayde R. Albright, Ann Arias, Amber Lambert, Kamal Karna Roy, Frederick Banks (related document(s)560) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)524) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)514) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Notice of (A) Approval of Disclosure Statement, (B) Deadline for Voting on the Plan, (C) Hearing to Consider Confirmation of the Plan and (D) Deadline for Filing Objections to Confirmation of the Plan. Filed by Prime Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3 # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4 # 5 Exhibit B # 6 Exhibit C - Part 1 # 7 Exhibit C - Part 2 # 8 Exhibit D) (related document(s)562) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Jordan D. Searles Regarding 1) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP and 2) Declaration of Disinterestedness of Haddon, Morgan and Foreman, P.C.. Filed by Prime Clerk. (related document(s)547, 548) (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Hassan Alli-Balogun Regarding Notice of Filing of Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ernst & Young LLP (related document(s)554) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Confirmation Hearing - Notice of (A) Approval of Disclosure Statement, (B) Deadline for Voting on the Plan, (C) Hearing to Consider Confirmation of the Plan and (D) Deadline for Filing Objections to Confirmation of the Plan Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. Confirmation Hearing scheduled for 7/1/2015 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Morton, Edmon) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Supplemental Declaration of Stephen R. Goldstein in Support of Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Retain and Employ Evercore Group LLC as Financial Advisor and Investment Banker Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date and Waiving Certain Information Requirements of Local Rule 2016-2, Order Granting Debtors Leave and Permission to File a Reply in Support of Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving the Disclosure Statement and Granting Related Relief, Order Approving the Disclosure Statement and Granting Related Relief, Order (A) Establishing Procedures for Solicitation and Tabulation of Votes to Accept or Reject the Plan, Including (I) Approving Form and Manner of Solicitation Procedures, (II) Approving the Form and Notice of the Confirmation Hearing, (III) Establishing Record Date and Approving Procedures for Distribution of Solicitation Packages, (IV) Approving Forms of Ballots, (V) Establishing Deadline for Receipt of Ballots, and (VI) Approving Procedures for Vote Tabulations; (B) Establishing Deadline and Procedures for Filing Objections to Confirmation of the Plan and (C) Granting Related Relief, Notice of Second Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals, Order Extending Time to Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property, Order Extending the Period within which the Debtors May Remove Actions, and Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 20, 2015 at 10:00 A.M.(ET) (related document(s)525, 527, 528, 529, 536, 538, 539) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response - Letter Response to Motion to Intervene as Creditors under Fed. R. Bank. P and Rule 24(a) Rule 24(b) as Filed by Oskar Groning, Jimmy J. Teal, Bernardine Dohrn, Wayde R. Albright, Ann Arias, Amber Lambert, Kamal Karna Roy, Frederick Banks (related document(s)505) Filed by Altegrity, Inc. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 5/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s)553) Notice Date 05/24/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Tim Braun Regarding First Fee Application of Bayard, P.A. for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from March 10, 2015 through April 30, 2015 (related document(s)545) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to Motion to extend the Period withthin the Debtors may remove actions. Filed by Kennard L. Turner Jr (NAB) Modified on 5/26/2015 (NAB). (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Second Application for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)524) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service regarding Application for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for AlixPartners, LLP for the period March 1, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)514) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Disinterestedness of Ernst & Young LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Justison, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/15/2015 RE: Disclosure Statement. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/20/2015. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/29/2015. Redaction Request Due By 6/12/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/22/2015. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/20/2015. (related document(s)521) (GM) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 5/21/2015 to 6/4/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Reliable. Telephone number (302)654-8080. (GM) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Regarding First Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Evercore Group L.L.C. for the period February 8, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)484) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Adversary case 15-50313. Complaint by Blake Percival against Altegrity, Inc., US Investigations Services, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 09/18/2015. (Golston, Larry) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Jordan D. Searles Regarding Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 15, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET), Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al., Notice of Filing of Blacklines of the Debtors' Revised Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Altegrity, Inc., et al. and the Accompanying Disclosure Statement, Debtors' Motion for and Order Granting Leave and Permission to File a Reply in Support of Debtors' Motion for an Order Approving the Disclosure Statement and Granting Related Relief, Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 15, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. (ET) and Notice of, and First Monthly Application of, Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Lead Counsel to the Statutory Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period February 24, 2015 to March 31, 2015 (related document(s)515, 516, 517, 518, 519, 521, 523) Filed by Prime Clerk. (Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Disinterestedness of Haddon, Morgan and Foreman, P.C. Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Disinterestedness of Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Barry, Joseph) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Sean R. McFarland (Related Doc # 544) Order Signed on 5/20/2015. (CMB) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Application for Compensation (First) of Bayard, P.A. as Co-Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 10, 2015 to April 30, 2015 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 6/8/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E) (Alberto, Justin) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Appear pro hac vice Sean R. McFarland. Receipt Number DEX023536, Filed by Oklahoma Tax Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (McFarland, Sean) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Dated 5/11/15 Requesting The Filing of a Late Claim. Filed by Tami N Wong . (JohnstonJ, Julie) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) - Notice of Filing of Blacklines of the Debtors' Further Revised Joint Chapter 11 Plan and the Accompanying Disclosure Statement (related document(s)515, 516, 528, 532, 533) Filed by Altegrity, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Bartley, Ryan) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 2,819 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?