Quintero Community Assoc. Inc., et al v. FDIC as Receiver, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 14-2266

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2190 - Contract: Other Contract Action
  Entries (236) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802597667 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Thomas R. Larson for Robert Campbell, Hillcrest Bancshares, Brian K. Schneider, George A. Lieberman, Thomas J. Davies, Joel Richards, Tim Gervy, G. Richard Degen, Gerald M. White, Paul S. Fingersh, Jack N. Fingersh, Irwin Blitt, Scott I. Asner, Dan Schwartzkopf, Wanda Holderman, Nicole Davis, Jeffrey F. Wheeler, Jon Forgey and Sue Gallatin for argument in February, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4237633] [14-2266] (TRL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802587902 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
    ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Linus L. Baker for Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz for argument in February, at the U.S. Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri. [4233094] [14-2266] (LLB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802587854 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
      ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Jerome A. Madden for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank for argument in February, at the U.S. Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri. [4233074] [14-2266] (JAM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 00802551105 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
        BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank, w/service 11/12/2014 , Length: 4,918 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank due 11/18/2014 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due on 11/28/2014. [4215836] [14-2266] (DMS)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802550704 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
          APPELLEE brief of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4215664] [14-2266] (JAM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802550353 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
            Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Jerome A. Madden for Appellee Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank. [4215495] [14-2266] (DMS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802550348 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
              ADDENDUM of APPELLEE FILED by Appellees Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White , w/service 11/10/2014 [4215493] [14-2266] (DMS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 00802550344 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White, w/service 11/10/2014 , Length: 14,968 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM ABOVE APPELLEES due 11/17/2014 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4215492] [14-2266] (DMS)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802549815 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                  Addendum of APPELLEE submitted for review by Mr. Kenneth Nichols and Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White [4215227] [14-2266] (SAW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802549812 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                    APPELLEE brief of Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4215226] [14-2266] (SAW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802549806 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                      APPELLEE brief of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4215224] [14-2266] (JAM)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802547572 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                        CLERK ORDER: Granting [4214209-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel. ALL APPELLEES' briefs are due by 11/10/2014. [4214239] [14-2266] (DMS)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802547493 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/10/2014 at 11:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel for Appellees Robert Campbell, Hillcrest Bancshares, Brian K. Schneider, George A. Lieberman, Thomas J. Davies, Joel Richards, Tim Gervy, G. Richard Degen, Gerald M. White, Paul S. Fingersh, Jack N. Fingersh, Irwin Blitt, Scott I. Asner, Dan Schwartzkopf, Wanda Holderman, Nicole Davis, Jeffrey F. Wheeler, Jon Forgey and Sue Gallatin w/service 11/06/2014. [4214209] [14-2266] (SAW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802535544 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                            CLERK ORDER:Granting [4208244-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel. Brief of ALL APPELLEES is due 11/06/2014. [4208333] [14-2266] (DMS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802535359 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/06/2014 at 11:59 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel for Appellees Robert Campbell, Hillcrest Bancshares, Brian K. Schneider, George A. Lieberman, Thomas J. Davies, Joel Richards, Tim Gervy, G. Richard Degen, Gerald M. White, Paul S. Fingersh, Jack N. Fingersh, Irwin Blitt, Scott I. Asner, Dan Schwartzkopf, Wanda Holderman, Nicole Davis, Jeffrey F. Wheeler, Jon Forgey and Sue Gallatin w/service 10/21/2014. [4208244] [14-2266] (SAW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520889 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4201257-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel. Brief of ALL APPELLEES due 10/23/2014. [4201286] [14-2266] (MER)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520830 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/23/2014, filed by Attorney Mr. Scott Andrew Wissel for Appellees Robert Campbell, Hillcrest Bancshares, Brian K. Schneider, George A. Lieberman, Thomas J. Davies, Joel Richards, Tim Gervy, G. Richard Degen, Gerald M. White, Paul S. Fingersh, Jack N. Fingersh, Irwin Blitt, Scott I. Asner, Dan Schwartzkopf, Wanda Holderman, Nicole Davis, Jeffrey F. Wheeler, Jon Forgey and Sue Gallatin w/service 08/29/2014. [4201257] [14-2266] (SAW)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520343 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Insulate SB, Inc.. w/service 09/26/2014 , Length: 13,558 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Insulate SB, Inc. due 10/06/2014 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Jack DeMita, Demilec (USA), LLC, Dove Equipment Co., Inc., Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Graco Minnesota, Inc., Graco, Inc., Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Nation, Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. due on 10/29/2014 [4201011] [14-2561] (MDS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520337 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                      Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Joseph R Saveri for Appellant Insulate SB, Inc.. New electronic copy of addendum due on 10/06/2014 [4201005] [14-2561] (MDS)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520279 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                        METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. and Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, Barnhardt Manufacturing Company, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Graco Minnesota, Inc., Graco, Inc., Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Nation, Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. - Joint Appendix w/service 09/26/2014 [4200974] [14-2561][Edited 09/29/2014 by MDS - Reason: DOCUMENT IS APPELLANT'S APPENDIX. COUNSEL CONTACTED. APPENDIX TO BE SENT IN HARD COPY.] (JRS)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520269 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to take judicial notice., filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R Saveri for Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. w/service 09/26/2014. [4200973] [14-2561]--[Edited 09/29/2014 by MDS - Reason: Edited to correct ECF relief.] (JRS)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520266 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                            Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Insulate SB, Inc. [4200972] [14-2561] (JRS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802520263 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                              APPELLANT brief of Insulate SB, Inc. submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4200971] [14-2561] (JRS)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802501910 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE filed by Ryan J. McEwan for Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. w/service 09/02/2014 [4192128] [14-2561] (RM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802501234 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham. w/service 08/29/2014 , Length: 15,371 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due 09/08/2014 WITH REVISED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR PAPER BRIEFS. . Brief of Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Crossover Capital LLC, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Private Club Financial Management, Quintero Capital LLC, Quintero Charter Properties LLC, Quintero Clubhouse Suites LLC, Quintero Clubhouse Villas LLC, Quintero Entrada LLC, Quintero Golf and Country Club LLC, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Robert Sperry, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White due on 10/02/2014 [4191752] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802500476 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                    APPELLANT brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4191362] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802500334 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham , w/service 08/29/2014 [4191299] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802500326 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz. [4191289] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802500161 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham [4191226] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802500156 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                            APPELLANT brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4191224] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802495164 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                              CLERK ORDER: [4188673-2] -- The motion for an extension of time to file appellants' brief is granted. Appellants' motion to file a brief containing 15,500 words is also granted. Brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due 09/15/2014, with NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. [4188816] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802494823 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/15/2014 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz w/service 08/22/2014. [4188673] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802491189 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. w/service 08/18/2014 [4187029] [14-2561] (JRS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802488197 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4184801-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Joseph R Saveri. Brief and appendix of Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC due 09/26/2014. [4185683] [14-2561] (SRD)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802488071 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Kellie C. Lerner for Appellees Graco Minnesota, Inc. and Graco, Inc. w/service 08/13/2014 [4185619] [14-2561] (SPS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802486265 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 09/26/2014, filed by Attorney Mr. Joseph R Saveri for Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. w/service 08/11/2014. [4184801] [14-2561] (JRS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802483944 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. - Joint Appendix w/service 08/07/2014 [4183752] [14-2561] (KR)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802483646 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Insulate SB, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4183609] [14-2561] (KR)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802483356 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Casey D. Marshall for Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. w/service 08/07/2014 [4183465] [14-2561] (CDM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802482173 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Thomas F. Berndt for Appellees Graco Minnesota, Inc. and Graco, Inc. w/service 08/05/2014 [4182911] [14-2561] (TB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802482101 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Joseph R. Saveri for Appellant Insulate SB, Inc. w/service 08/05/2014 [4182874] [14-2561] (JRS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 00802481729 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MANDATE ISSUED. [4182683] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802481576 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      CLERK ORDER:Granting [4181967-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Linus L. Baker. Brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due 08/25/2014 [4182608] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802480456 Filed: 8/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/25/2014 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz w/service 08/03/2014. [4181967] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802478793 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd.. - FOR CAL [4181130] [14-2561] (CRM)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802477833 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Spray Foam Nation. - FOR CAL [4180652] [14-2561] (KNH)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802477526 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Jeanne Welch Sopher, Esquire for Appellee Barnhardt Manufacturing Company w/service 07/29/2014 [4180506] [14-2561] (JWS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802476367 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Graco Minnesota, Inc. and Graco, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4179909] [14-2561] (SPS)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802474368 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Kay Nord Hunt for Appellee Spray Foam Nation w/service 07/24/2014 [4178910] [14-2561] (KNH)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802473721 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 09/02/2014. Appendix due 09/12/2014. BRIEF APPELLANT, Insulate SB, Inc. due 09/12/2014 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4178556] [14-2561] (JMM)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802473620 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 07/21/2014 denying plainttif's motion to amend or alter judgment or, in the alternative, for relief from the judgment, [4178553] [14-2561] (JMM)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802473277 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Lewis A. Remele, Jr. for Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. w/service 07/23/2014 [4178393] [14-2561] (LAR)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802473114 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Christopher R. Morris for Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, C.H. Reed, Inc., C.J. Spray, Coast Industrial Systems, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Endisys Fluid Delivery Systems, Golden State Paint Corporation, Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Specialty Produts, Inc., Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. w/service 07/23/2014 [4178320] [14-2561] (CRM)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802472490 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Christopher R. Morris for Appellees Advanced Finishing Systems, Inc., Airtech Spray Systems, C.H. Reed, Inc., Coatings Holdings, Ltd., Demilec (USA), LLC, Golden State Paint Corporation, Intech Equipment & Supply, LLC, MCC Equipment & Service Center, Marco Group International, Inc. (Marco), Spray Foam Systems, LLC, Spray-Quip, Inc. and Ultimate Linings, Ltd. w/service 07/22/2014 [4178019] [14-2561]--[Edited 07/23/2014 by MDS - Reason: (Document refiled to include all represented parties)] (CRM)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802472173 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by Anne M. Lockner for Appellees Graco Minnesota, Inc. and Graco, Inc. w/service 07/22/2014 [4177884] [14-2561] (SPS)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802472167 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Stephen P. Safranski for Appellees Graco Minnesota, Inc. and Graco, Inc. w/service 07/22/2014 [4177882] [14-2561] (SPS)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 00802466226 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion.. ROGER L. WOLLMAN, KERMIT E. BYE and BOBBY E. SHEPHERD Hrg Apr 2014 [4175121] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802466198 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Kermit E. Bye and Bobby E. Shepherd AUTHORING JUDGE:Roger L. Wollman (PUBLISHED) [4175109] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802465367 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4174148-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Linus L. Baker. Brief of George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due 08/04/2014 [4174738] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802464026 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/04/2014 at 05:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz w/service 07/11/2014. [4174148] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802456528 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 03/11/14, judgment filed 03/12/14 and docket entries. [4170617] [14-2561] (JMM)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802456525 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Civil case docketed. [4170609] [14-2561] (JMM)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802444870 Filed: 6/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham, II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham - Joint Appendix w/service 06/15/2014 [4165104] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802440506 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CLERK ORDER:[4162493-2] -- Granting appellants' motion for an extension of time to elect method of producing record filed by Mr. Linus L. Baker. [4163002] [14-2266] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802439516 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellants George Benz and Sons LLC and Quintero Community Association Inc.. - FOR CAL [4162538] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802439445 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file the record until 06/09/2014 at 09:55 am, filed by Attorney Mr. Linus L. Baker for Appellants Mr. Kenneth Nichols, Quintero Community Association Inc., Lyle P. Phillips, Phillips W. Upham, II, George Benz, Larry Hilcher, David Ostermeyer, Cathleen Ostermeyer, George Benz and Sons LLC, Karen Benz, Tory H. Upham, Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Sondra R. Upham, Peggy Phillips, Theodore B. Benz and George M. Benz w/service 06/09/2014. [4162493] [14-2266] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802436591 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Hillcrest Bancshares. - FOR CAL [4161210] [14-2266] (SAW)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802436588 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Scott A. Wissel for Appellees Scott I. Asner, Irwin Blitt, Robert Campbell, Thomas J. Davies, Nicole Davis, G. Richard Degen, Jack N. Fingersh, Paul S. Fingersh, Jon Forgey, Sue Gallatin, Tim Gervy, Hillcrest Bancshares, Wanda Holderman, George A. Lieberman, Joel Richards, Brian K. Schneider, Dan Schwartzkopf, Jeffrey F. Wheeler and Gerald M. White w/service 06/04/2014 [4161209] [14-2266] (SAW)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802436560 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Jerome A. Madden for Appellee Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Hillcrest Bank w/service 06/04/2014 [4161195] [14-2266] (JAM)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802434354 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: BRIEF OF APPELLANT George Benz, George M. Benz, Karen Benz, Theodore B. Benz, George Benz and Sons LLC, Larry Hilcher, Kenneth Nichols, Cathleen Ostermeyer, David Ostermeyer, Lyle P. Phillips, Peggy Phillips, Quintero Community Association Inc., Britton B. Upham, Nowell C. Upham, Phillips W. Upham II, Sondra R. Upham and Tory H. Upham due 07/14/2014. Appendix Also Due on 07/14/2014. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellants' reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4159941] [14-2266] (DMW)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802434335 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Orders of 12/6/11; 04/29/2014; 05/02/2014 and judgment of 05/02/2014 [4159937] [14-2266] (DMW)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802434322 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Civil case docketed. [4159932] [14-2266] (DMW)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802421057 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                LETTER from Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 05/13/2014 [4153729] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802402123 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ARGUED & SUBMITTED in St. Louis to Judges Roger L. Wollman, Kermit E. Bye, Bobby E. Shepherd on 04/16/2014. Mr. Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr. Mr. James Christopher Martin for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company. Rebuttal by Mr. Timothy G. Blood for William Murr RECORDED [4144697] [13-2045] (TAB)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 00802395701 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Richard John Rubin for Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor. [4141525] [14-1164] (MDS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802395633 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Ms. Sarah McIvor [4141501] [14-1164] (RJR)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802395630 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        APPELLANT brief of Ms. Sarah McIvor submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4141500] [14-1164] (RJR)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802391964 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Richard J. Rubin for Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor w/service 04/01/2014 [4139700] [14-1164] (RJR)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802383029 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. James Christopher Martin for Midland National Life Insurance Company for argument in April, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4135370] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802380172 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Timothy G. Blood for William Murr for argument in April, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4134077] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802379331 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                CLERK ORDER: The motion for an extension of time to file the brief is granted in part. [4133695-2] [4133709] Brief of Sarah McIvor due 04/07/2014. Appendix due on 04/07/2014. [4133709] [14-1164] (MDS)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802379282 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 04/14/2014 at 11:59 pm, filed by Mr. Jonathan Lester Robert Drewes for Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor and Mr. Bennett Hartz for Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor w/service 03/14/2014. [4133695] [14-1164] (JLD)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802374417 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER from Appellant Mr. Ronald L. Bernard regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 03/07/2014 [4131352] [13-3357] (EFR)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802365704 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from Appellees Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 02/25/2014 [4127031] [13-3036] (JAH)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802364998 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER from Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 02/24/2014 [4126691] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802364467 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Appellant Mr. Ronald L. Bernard regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 02/24/2014 [4126485] [13-3357] (EFR)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802364453 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from Appellant Mr. Ronald L. Bernard regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 02/24/2014 [4126479] [13-3357] (EFR)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802360238 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests. w/service 02/13/2014 , Length: 5,230 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due 02/24/2014 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . [4124372] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802359385 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY brief of Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4123968] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802358796 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Mr. Ronald L. Bernard. w/service 02/12/2014 , Length: 4554 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Ronald L. Bernard due 02/18/2014 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4123673] [13-3357] (MDS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802358586 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY brief of Mr. Ronald L. Bernard submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4123583] [13-3357] (EFR)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802358055 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Certificate of Appealability, filed by Appellant Mr. Aaron Williams w/service 02/12/2014 [4123337] [14-1321] (KNF)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802358019 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Kenneth N. Flaxman for Appellant Mr. Aaron Williams w/service 02/12/2014 [4123318] [14-1321] (KNF)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802357694 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Kindly submit these documents within 10 days. [4123148] [14-1321] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802357686 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 2/6/14, Memorandum & Order & Judgment filed 12/9/13, & docket entries, [4123146] [14-1321] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802357680 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Prisoner case docketed. [4123141] [14-1321] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802352120 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle, w/service 02/03/2014 , Length: 23 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Samuel Dotson III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Ronald K. Replogle due 02/10/2014 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due on 02/18/2014. [4120455] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802351646 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLEE brief of Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4120218] [13-3036] (JAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802350312 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor - Separate Appendix w/service 01/31/2014 [4119484] [14-1164] (BH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802350309 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor. Transcript ordered 1/21/14 [4119483] [14-1164] (BH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802350293 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Bennett Hartz for Appellant Ms. Sarah McIvor w/service 01/31/2014 [4119472] [14-1164] (BH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802350138 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Carolyn W. Colvin, w/service 01/30/2014 , Length: 5584 words. 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Carolyn W. Colvin due 02/05/2014 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Ronald L. Bernard due on 02/14/2014. [4119402] [13-3357] (MDS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802349331 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPELLEE brief of Carolyn W. Colvin submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4119065] [13-3357] (JPD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802348492 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Credit Control Services, Inc.. - FOR CAL [4118621] [14-1164] (RSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802348483 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by Russell S. Ponessa and Ashley M. DeMinck for Appellee Credit Control Services, Inc. w/service 01/29/2014 [4118618] [14-1164] (RSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802344080 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 03/04/2014. Appendix due 03/14/2014. BRIEF APPELLANT, Sarah McIvor due 03/14/2014 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4116590] [14-1164] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802344079 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order dated 12/17/13, judgment of 12/17/13 [4116589] [14-1164] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802344067 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Civil case docketed. [4116584] [14-1164] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802343053 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4116088-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. John Andrew Hirth. Brief of Samuel Dotson III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Ronald K. Replogle due 02/03/2014. [4116132] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802342922 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 02/03/2014 at 11:59 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. John Andrew Hirth for Appellees Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster, Mr. Ronald K. Replogle and Mr. Samuel Dotson, III w/service 01/22/2014. [4116088] [13-3036] (JAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802324992 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK ORDER:Granting [4107306-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. John Andrew Hirth. Brief of Samuel Dotson III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Ronald K. Replogle due 01/24/2014. [4107461] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802324663 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 01/24/2014 at 11:59 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. John Andrew Hirth for Appellees Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster, Mr. Ronald K. Replogle and Mr. Samuel Dotson, III w/service 12/19/2013. [4107306] [13-3036] (JAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802319595 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by J. Joshua Wheeler for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression w/service 12/11/2013 [4104909] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802318892 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE [4104572] [13-3036]APPEARANCE filed by J. Joshua Wheeler for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression w/service 12/11/2013 [4104572] [13-3036]--[Edited 12/11/2013 by JPP] APPEARANCE FORM IS BLANK. THIS EVENT WILL BE LOCKED. (JJW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802318675 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression w/service 12/11/2013 , Length: 13 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression due 12/16/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4104433] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802318597 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS brief of Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression submitted for review. [4104394] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802318527 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4103957-2] The Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression's motion leave to file amicus brief. [4104364] [13-3036] [4103957-2] [4104364] [13-3036]--[Edited 12/11/2013 by JPP] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802317694 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION interested party, Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Appellants. w/service 12/10/2013. [4103957] [13-3036] (JJW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802317352 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Thomas Jefferson Center for the Protection of Free Expression for Appellant Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests w/service 12/09/2013 [4103744] [13-3036] THIS EVENT HAS BEEN LOCKED. EVENT RESUBMITTED AS MOTION. [4103744] [13-3036]--[Edited 12/11/2013 by JPP] (JJW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312843 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Thomas More Society w/service 11/28/2013 , Length: 2,493 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Thomas More Society due 12/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs. [4101557] [13-3036] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312307 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4100765-2] motion for leave to file amicus brief in support of appellants by Thomas More Society. [4101331] [13-3036] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312256 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests , w/service 11/27/2013 [4101317] [13-3036] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802312240 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests. w/service 11/27/2013 , Length: 7,748 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due 12/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Appellees Samuel Dotson III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Ronald K. Replogle due on 01/02/2014 [4101312] [13-3036] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802311380 Filed: 11/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION interested party, Thomas More Society , for leave to file amicus curiae brief on behalf of Thomas More Society. w/service 11/28/2013. [4100765] [13-3036] (EV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802311353 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests [4100756] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802311350 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPELLANT brief of Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4100755] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802299048 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK ORDER:Granting [4094775-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Anthony E. Rothert. Brief of David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due 11/27/2013 [4094922] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802298769 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/27/2013 at 08:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Anthony E. Rothert for Appellants Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests, Mr. David Biersmith, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Call to Action w/service 11/11/2013. [4094775] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802289926 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 12/09/2013. Appendix due 12/19/2013. BRIEF APPELLANT, Traditonalist American Knights of the Ku Klux Klan due 12/19/2013 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4090638] [13-3368] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802289922 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and order 10/1/13 from district court [4090634] [13-3368] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802289910 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Civil case docketed. [4090630] [13-3368] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 00802289100 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Administrative record due 12/09/2013. Appendix due on 12/09/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Ronald L. Bernard due 12/09/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4090239] [13-3357] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802289083 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, R&R dated 7/1/13, order of 9/26/13, judgment of 9/26/13 [4090230] [13-3357] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802289080 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Civil case docketed. [4090228] [13-3357] (CYZ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802280629 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK ORDER:Granting in Part [4085927-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Anthony E. Rothert [4086224] Brief of David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due 11/18/2013. Appendix due on 11/18/2013. [4086224] [13-3036] (JPP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802279978 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 11/25/2013 at 06:00 pm, filed by Attorney Mr. Anthony E. Rothert for Appellants Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests, Mr. David Biersmith, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Call to Action w/service 10/16/2013. [4085927] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802277203 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from Appellant William Murr regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 10/10/2013 [4084674] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802276235 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF FILED - REDACTED REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant William Murr ,. w/service 10/09/2013 , Length: 6,489 words 1 REDACTED COPY AND 9 COMPLETE COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM William Murr due 10/15/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4084194] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802276221 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK ORDER:Granting [4084166-2] motion to seal portion of reply brief filed by Mr. Timothy G. Blood. The Court is hereby sealing the following: un-redacted version of reply brief. [4084189] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802276168 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to seal portion of Reply brief, filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr w/service 10/04/2013. [4084166] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802270187 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann, Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests and Appellees Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle. w/service 10/01/2013 [4081280] [13-3036] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802270181 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann, Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests and Appellees Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle - Joint Appendix w/service 10/01/2013 [4081277] [13-3036] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802269924 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of transcript filed by Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests. Transcript ordered on 9/30/2013 [4081156] [13-3036] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802264835 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by J. Andrew Hirth for Appellees Mr. Samuel Dotson, III, Jennifer M. Joyce, Chris Koster and Mr. Ronald K. Replogle w/service 09/23/2013 [4078639] [13-3036] (JAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802262400 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from Appellant William Murr regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 09/19/2013 [4077470] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802261099 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Anthony E. Rothert for Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests w/service 09/18/2013 [4076860] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802260854 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Call to Action. - FOR CAL [4076710] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802260851 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests. - FOR CAL [4076709] [13-3036] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802259665 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Grant R. Doty for Appellants Mr. David Biersmith, Call to Action, Ms. Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests w/service 09/17/2013 [4076137] [13-3036] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802258870 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 10/28/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT David Biersmith, Call to Action, Holly Hesemann and Survivors Network of Those Abused by Priests due 10/28/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4075721] [13-3036] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802258833 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal filed 8/13/13, Memo & Order & Judgment filed 4/19/13, Memo & Order filed 7/15/13 & docket entries, [4075713] [13-3036] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802258795 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil case docketed. [4075688] [13-3036] (JMH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802250753 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4071541-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Timothy G. Blood. Reply brief of William Murr due 10/04/2013. [4071866] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802250636 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant David P. Oetting , w/service 09/03/2013 [4071823] [13-2620] (CMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802250629 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by David P. Oetting. w/service 09/03/2013 , Length: 13,348 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM David P. Oetting due 09/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Green Jacobson due on 10/04/2013 [4071820] [13-2620] (CMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802250112 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 10/04/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr w/service 09/03/2013. [4071541] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249622 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by David P. Oetting [4071331] [13-2620] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249595 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPELLANT brief of David P. Oetting submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4071322] [13-2620] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802249324 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF FILED - REDACTED BRIEF filed by Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company ,. w/service 09/03/2013 , Length: 13,298 words 1 REDACTED COPY AND 9 COMPLETE COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Midland National Life Insurance Company due 09/09/2013 WITH revised certificate of service for paper briefs [4071191] [13-2045] Reply brief of Appellant due 09/17/2013. (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802248312 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK LETTER sent regarding updated caption per phone call. [4070675] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802247894 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4070431-2] motion for leave to file appellee's brief under seal filed by Mr. James C. Martin and Mr. David J. Bird. The Court is hereby sealing the following: appellee's brief [4070485] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802247801 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to seal appellee brief, filed by Mr. David J. Bird and Mr. James C. Martin for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 08/28/2013. [4070431] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802246149 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK LETTER sent regarding updated caption per phone call. [4069688] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802236699 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK LETTER sent regarding updated caption. [4065194] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802235549 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER: Upon consideration of appellee's motion to recaption, appellant's response and appellee's reply, appellant's cross-motion to recaption the case David Oetting v. Green Jacobsen, P.C. is granted, and the clerk will amend the caption. The parties have agreed to reduce the service list, and the new service list will be limited to: David P. Oetting, Frank. H. Tomlinson, Theodore H. Frank, Martin M. Green, Joe D. Jacobson and Jonathon F. Andres. [4058954-2]. [4064654] [13-2620] (CMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802235130 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE with no opposition to response [4062125-2] filed by Attorney Mr. Martin M. Green for Appellee NationsBank Classes , w/service 08/13/2013. [4064448] [13-2620] (MMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802232391 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of transcript *AND* Statement of the Issues, filed by Appellant David P. Oetting. No Transcript [4063140] [13-2620]--[Edited -to show also stmt of issues- 08/08/2013 by DMW] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802230910 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE with no opposition to response [4062125-2] filed by Mr. Jonathan F. Andres for Appellee NationsBank Classes, Mr. Martin M. Green for Appellee NationsBank Classes and Mr. Joe David Jacobson for Appellee NationsBank Classes , w/service 08/06/2013. [4062444] [13-2620] ENTRY LOCKED. COUNSEL ADVISED THEY FILED IN ERROR.--[Edited 08/07/2013 by CMD] (MMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802230472 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4061980-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. David J. Bird. Brief of Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company due 08/28/2013. [4062230] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802230225 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE motion for miscellaneous relief [4058954-2] filed by Attorney Mr. Theodore H. Frank for Appellant David P. Oetting , w/service 08/05/2013. [4062125] [13-2620] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802229855 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 08/28/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. David J. Bird for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 08/05/2013. [4061980] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802223929 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Re-caption the appeal; limit sevice list, filed by Attorney Mr. Joe David Jacobson for Appellant David P. Oetting and Appellee NationsBank Classes w/service 07/26/2013. [4058954] [13-2620] (JDJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802223872 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Joe D. Jacobson for Appellee NationsBank Classes w/service 07/26/2013 [4058933] [13-2620] (JDJ)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802223697 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER from Appellant William Murr regarding Notice of Change of Firm Name and Contact Information. w/service 07/26/2013 [4058862] [13-2045] (MLP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802223665 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Theodore H. Frank for Appellant David P. Oetting w/service 07/26/2013 [4058850] [13-2620] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802222552 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/03/2013. BRIEF OF APPELLANT David P. Oetting due 09/03/2013. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4058360] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802222548 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, and orer 6/24/13 from district court. [4058359] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802222539 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil case docketed. [4058353] [13-2620] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802209657 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant William Murr , w/service 07/08/2013 [4052142] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802209559 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF FILED - REDACTED BRIEF filed by Appellant William Murr ,. w/service 07/08/2013 , Length: 12,407 words 1 REDACTED COPY AND 9 COMPLETE COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM William Murr due 07/15/2013 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4052094] [13-2045] Brief of Appellee due 08/07/2013. (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802209522 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4051973-2] motion to seal portion of brief filed by Mr. Timothy G. Blood. The Court is hereby sealing the following: un-redacted version of appellant brief [4052076] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802209497 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4051598-2] motion to seal Appellant's Appendix filed by Mr. Timothy G. Blood and Appellant William Murr. The Court is hereby sealing the following: entire appendix. [4052066] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802209318 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to seal portion of brief, filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr w/service 07/03/2013. [4051973] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802208501 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to seal entire appendix, filed by Attorney Mr. Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr w/service 07/01/2013. [4051598] [13-2045] (MER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802180994 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant William Murr - Separate Appendix w/service 05/22/2013 [4038307] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802180990 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant William Murr. No Transcript [4038304] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802178228 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Brad J. Brady for Appellant William Murr w/service 05/17/2013 [4036911] [13-2045] (BJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177615 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by James Hail for Appellant William Murr w/service 05/16/2013 [4036592] [13-2045] (JH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177299 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company. - FOR CAL. [4036459] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177262 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Jonathan M. Gallagher for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036444] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177259 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Michael A. Dee for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036443] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177256 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPEARANCE filed by David J. Bird for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036442] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177253 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by James C. Martin for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036440] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177248 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by James A. Rolfes for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036438] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177239 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE filed by William H. Higgins for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036435] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802177233 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPEARANCE filed by Robert D. Phillips, Jr. for Appellee Midland National Life Insurance Company w/service 05/16/2013 [4036433] [13-2045] (DJB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802176591 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Paula M. Roach for Appellant William Murr w/service 05/15/2013 [4036115] [13-2045] (PMR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802176588 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEARANCE filed by Thomas J. O'Reardon II for Appellant William Murr w/service 05/15/2013 [4036114] [13-2045] (TJO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802176585 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by Timothy G. Blood for Appellant William Murr w/service 05/15/2013 [4036113] [13-2045] (TGB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802173742 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/19/2013. Appendix due 07/01/2013. BRIEF APPELLANT, William Murr due 07/01/2013 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4034664] [13-2045] (EDG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802173741 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order and Judgment both dated 4/11/13 from the district court. [4034662] [13-2045] (EDG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802173738 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Civil case docketed. [4034660] [13-2045] (EDG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802161832 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/08/2013, filed by Attorney Mr. Jeremiah J. Morgan, Sr. for Appellant State of Missouri in 13-1108 w/service 04/24/2013. [4028786] [13-1072, 13-1108, 13-1410, 13-1618, 13-1619] (JJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802161107 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1072 [4028408] [13-1072, 13-1108, 13-1410, 13-1618, 13-1619] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802161094 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPELLANT brief of Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1072 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4028403] [13-1072, 13-1108, 13-1410, 13-1618, 13-1619] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802141378 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4018716-2] Motion to consolidate 13-1618 and 13-1619 with appeal numbers 13-1072, 13-1108 and 13-1410 is granted. Appellant Matthew Peters in 13-1072 is granted leave to file a substitute brief to incorporate the issues in 13-1618 and 13-1619. Appellant briefs are due April 24, 2013. Appellee/Cross Appellant brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues th Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellants' brief ASSOCIATION CREATED. [4018769] [13-1072, 13-1108, 13-1410, 13-1618, 13-1619] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802141238 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to consolidate cases 13-1072; 13-1108; 13-1410; 13-1618., filed by Mr. Jeremiah J. Morgan, Sr. for Appellant State of Missouri, Mr. Grant R Doty for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III, Mr. Anthony E Rothert for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III and Mr. Albert M. Spradling, III for Not Party Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1619, Mr. Albert M. Spradling, III for Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters, Mr. Grant R Doty for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III and Mr. Anthony E Rothert for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III in 13-1072, Mr. Jeremiah J. Morgan, Sr. for Appellant State of Missouri, Mr. Grant R Doty for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III and Mr. Anthony E Rothert for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III in 13-1108, Mr. Grant R Doty for Appellant Mr. Frank L. Snider, III, Mr. Anthony E Rothert for Appellant Mr. Frank L. Snider, III and Mr. Albert M. Spradling, III for Appellee City of Cape Girardeau in 13-1410, 13-1618 w/service 03/27/2013. [4018716] [13-1619, 13-1072, 13-1108, 13-1410, 13-1618] (JJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802122955 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters , w/service 02/27/2013 [4009946] [13-1072] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802122951 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Matthew Peters. w/service 02/27/2013 , Length: 6,996 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Matthew Peters due 03/05/2013 WITH REVISED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR PAPER BRIEFS. [4009943] [13-1072] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802121792 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Matthew Peters [4009331] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802121788 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPELLANT brief of Mr. Matthew Peters submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4009328] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802121453 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Addendum deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Albert M. Spradling, III for Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters. New electronic copy of addendum due on 03/04/2013 [4009122] [13-1072] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802121443 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Albert M. Spradling, III for Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters. [4009088] [13-1072] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802120374 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPELLANT brief of Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1072, 13-1108 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4008580] [13-1072, 13-1108] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802120365 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1072, 13-1108 [4008577] [13-1072, 13-1108] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802120359 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPELLANT brief of Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1072, 13-1108 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4008573] [13-1072, 13-1108] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802119596 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 04/08/2013. Appendix due 04/17/2013. BRIEF APPELLANT, Matthew Peters and State of Missouri due 04/17/2013. Appellee/cross Appellant brief due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellant's brief. [13-1410, 13-1072, 13-1108] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802119412 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPELLEE'S FORM B RECEIVED from Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters and Not Party City of Cape Girardeau in 13-1072, Not Party City of Cape Girardeau and Mr. Matthew Peters in 13-1108 [4008109] [13-1072, 13-1108] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802099123 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK ORDER: -- Pursuant to counsel's notice that the district court has disposed of the motion to alter or amend, these cases are removed from abeyance status and the cases shall resume. Appellants' brief and appendix are due on 03/04/2013. [3998122] [13-1072, 13-1108] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802098987 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant State of Missouri in 13-1108 - Separate Appendix w/service 01/25/2013 [3998048] [13-1108, 13-1072] (JJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802097998 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status report filed by Mr. Frank L. Snider, III in 13-1072. w/service 01/24/2013 [3997615] [13-1072, 13-1108] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802094984 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK ORDER: -- The motion to hold the briefing schedule in abeyance has been considered and is granted. The parties are directed to advise the court of the district court's disposition of the pending motion to alter or amend. [3995958-2] [3996172] [13-1072, 13-1108] (DMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802094571 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to hold briefing schedule in abeyance., filed by Attorney Mr. Grant R. Doty for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III in 13-1072 w/service 01/17/2013. [3995958] [13-1072, 13-1108] (GRD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802089618 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/20/2013. Appendix due 03/04/2013. BRIEF APPELLANT, Matthew Peters and State of Missouri due 03/04/2013 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [3993601] [13-1072, 13-1108] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802088296 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPELLEE'S FORM B RECEIVED from Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters [3992979] [13-1072] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802088271 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE filed by Anthony E. Rothert for Appellee Mr. Frank L. Snider, III w/service 01/10/2013 [3992963] [13-1072] (AER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087608 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters. Transcript ordered [3992656] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087602 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters w/service 01/09/2013 [3992653] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087599 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters - Separate Appendix w/service 01/09/2013 [3992652] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087593 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters. w/service 01/09/2013 [3992650] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087482 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPEARANCE filed by A.M. Spradling, III for Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters w/service 01/09/2013 [3992603] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087475 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPELLANT'S FORM A FILED from Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters [3992601] [13-1072] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087472 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE filed by A.M. Spradling, III for Appellant Mr. Matthew Peters w/service 01/09/2013 [3992599] [13-1072] [3992599] [13-1072]--[Edited 01/09/2013 by DMS --- THIS DOCUMENT IS BEING LOCKED; IT IS INCORRECTLY FILED WITH A DIFFERENT CASE NUMBER AND PARTIES.] (AMS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087030 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/19/2013. Appendix due 02/28/2013. BRIEF APPELLANT, Matthew Peters due 02/28/2013 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [3992412] [13-1072] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087025 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order and judgment 12/14/12 from district court.[3992409] [13-1072] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802087010 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Civil case docketed. [3992404] [13-1072] (LLB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?