Guy Coss v. Hyundai Motor America et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:15-cv-00237

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 5:23 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Guy Coss, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Ken Smiley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Mitchell Goldstein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Serafin Montenegro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Steven Thibert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
No Logo Torry Somers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jae Kook Kim +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 jkk@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. McCune, Jr. +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 rdm@mccunewright.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C Wright +1 909 557 1250 +1 909 557 1275 dcw@mccunewright.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Hyundai Motor America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A Fretty +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 daf@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hernan D Vera +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 hvera@birdmarella.com
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 35 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting 30 for Summary Judgment. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Converting Hyundai Motor America's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Class Allegations from First Amended Complaint into Motion for Summary Judgment 30 filed by Plaintiffs Guy Coss, Mitchell Goldstein, Serafin Montenegro, Ken Smiley, Torry Somers, Steven Thibert. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Statement of Genuine Disputes, # 2 Declaration of David C. Wright In Support, # 3 Exhibit "1" to Wright Declaration, # 4 Exhibit "2" to Wright Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Guy Coss, # 6 Declaration of Serafin Montenegro, # 7 Declaration of Ken Smiley, # 8 Declaration of Torry Somers, # 9 Declaration of Steven Thibert)(Kim, Jae) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Order Converting MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to MOTION for Summary Judgment [filed 5/4/15] 17 . (mt) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          **NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Hearing 26 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Hyundai Motor America's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Class Allegations from First Amended Complaint. Having considered the Stipulation, the Court hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS as follows: The hearing on Hyundai Motor America's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike Class Allegations from First Amended Complaint is continued from June 22, 2015 to July 13, 2015 @ 1:30 p.m. (lwag) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Hyundai Motor America's Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion To Strike Class Allegations from First Amended Complaint from June 22, 2015 to July 13, 2015 Re: MOTION to Strike Class Allegations From First Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 18 , MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 17 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Douglas A. Fretty, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fretty, Douglas) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                REPLY in Support of MOTION to Strike Class Allegations From First Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 18 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Fretty, Douglas) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                    REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 17 filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (Fretty, Douglas) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                        OPPOSITION to MOTION to Strike Class Allegations From First Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 18 filed by Plaintiffs Guy Coss, Mitchell Goldstein, Serafin Montenegro, Ken Smiley, Torry Somers, Steven Thibert. (Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Mitchell Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Serafin Montenegro(pty:pla), Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Ken Smiley(pty:pla), Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Torry Somers(pty:pla), Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Steven Thibert(pty:pla))(Kim, Jae) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None For Judicial Notice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hyundai Motor America, identifying Hyundai Motor Company, Ltd.. (Fretty, Douglas) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ekwan E Rhow on behalf of Defendant Hyundai Motor America (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION to Vacate Local Rule 23-3 Deadline for Filing of Class Certification Motion filed by Plaintiffs Guy Coss, Mitchell Goldstein, Serafin Montenegro, Ken Smiley, Torry Somers, Steven Thibert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Attorney David C Wright added to party Mitchell Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Serafin Montenegro(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Ken Smiley(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Torry Somers(pty:pla), Attorney David C Wright added to party Steven Thibert(pty:pla))(Wright, David) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America answer now due 5/4/2015, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 filed by defendant Hyundai Motor America.(Attorney Hernan D Vera added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft))(Vera, Hernan) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (lwag) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, 9 filed by Plaintiffs Guy Coss, Mitchell Goldstein, Serafin Montenegro, Ken Smiley, Torry Somers, Steven Thibert. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Hyundai Motor America amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiffs Guy Coss, Serafin Montenegro, Mitchell Goldstein, Torry Somers, Ken Smiley, Steven Thibert (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A")(Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Serafin Montenegro(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Ken Smiley(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Steven Thibert(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Mitchell Goldstein(pty:pla), Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Torry Somers(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Guy Coss, (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Guy Coss. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Guy Coss. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-15194294 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Guy Coss. (Attorney Richard D McCune, Jr added to party Guy Coss(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?